D9 |
1013
|
6013
|
2300
|
62300
|
10/1901 |
11/1949 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
09/1918 |
D9 |
1014
|
6014
|
2301
|
62301
|
10/1901 |
04/1950 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
12/1919 |
D9 |
1015
|
6015
|
2302
|
62302
|
10/1901 |
20/03/1950 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
06/1913 |
D9 |
1016
|
6016
|
2303
|
62303
|
10/1901 |
15/08/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1916 |
D9 |
1017
|
6017
|
2304
|
62304
|
10/1901 |
16/01/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1921 |
D9 |
1018
|
6018
|
2305
|
62305
|
02/1902 |
24/07/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
08/1919 |
D9 |
1019
|
6019
|
2306
|
(62306)
|
02/1902 |
01/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1915 |
D9 |
1020
|
6020
|
|
|
02/1902 |
02/1943 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1914 |
D9 |
1021
|
6021
|
2307
|
62307
|
02/1902 |
12/06/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1913 |
D9 |
1022
|
6022
|
|
|
02/1902 |
08/1942 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1917 |
D9 |
1023
|
6023
|
2308
|
62308
|
02/1902 |
15/08/1949 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
05/1913 |
D9 |
1024
|
6024
|
2309
|
62309
|
02/1902 |
21/11/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1915 |
D9 |
1025
|
6025
|
(2310)
|
|
03/1902 |
11/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
08/1914 |
D9 |
1026
|
6026
|
2311
|
62311
|
03/1902 |
18/07/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1914 |
D9 |
1027
|
6027
|
2312
|
62312
|
03/1902 |
04/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
07/1920 |
D9 |
1028
|
6028
|
|
|
03/1902 |
05/1939 |
Rebuilt with Piston Valves |
12/1914 |
D9 |
1029
|
6029
|
2313
|
62313
|
03/1902 |
12/10/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1913 |
D9 |
1030
|
6030
|
2314
|
62314
|
03/1902 |
09/05/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1915 |
D9 |
1031
|
6031
|
2315
|
62315
|
03/1902 |
18/07/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1922 |
D9 |
1032
|
6032
|
(2316)
|
|
03/1902 |
03/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1921 |
D9 |
1033
|
6033
|
2317
|
62317
|
03/1902 |
18/07/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
01/1916 |
D9 |
1034
|
6034
|
2318
|
62318
|
03/1902 |
21/11/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
08/1914 |
D9 |
1035
|
6035
|
2319
|
62319
|
04/1902 |
18/07/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1914 |
D9 |
1036
|
6036
|
(2320)
|
|
04/1902 |
01/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1919 |
D9 |
1037
|
6037
|
2321
|
62321
|
05/1902 |
12/10/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1916 |
D9 |
1038
|
6038
|
2322
|
(62322)
|
03/1903 |
01/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1914 |
D9 |
1039
|
6039
|
(2323)
|
|
03/1903 |
01/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1922 |
D9 |
1040
|
6040
|
2324
|
62324
|
03/1903 |
07/11/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1919 |
D9 |
1041
|
6041
|
2325
|
62325
|
03/1903 |
06/02/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1913 |
D9 |
1042
|
6042
|
|
|
03/1903 |
07/1939 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
01/1927 |
D9 |
104
|
5104
|
(2326)
|
|
03/1904 |
09/1944 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1923 |
D9 |
105
|
5105
|
(2327)
|
|
03/1904 |
06/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1923 |
D9 |
106
|
5106
|
2328
|
|
04/1904 |
03/1947 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1914 |
D9 |
107
|
5107
|
2329
|
(62329)
|
04/1904 |
02/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
09/1924 |
D9 |
108
|
5108
|
2330
|
62330
|
04/1904 |
15/08/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1913 |
D9 |
109
|
5109
|
2331
|
|
04/1904 |
09/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1914 |
D9 |
110
|
5110
|
|
|
05/1904 |
03/1942 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
09/1923 |
D9 |
111
|
5111
|
2332
|
62332
|
05/1904 |
09/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1916 |
D9 |
112
|
5112
|
2333
|
62333
|
05/1904 |
12/12/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1924 |
D9 |
113
|
5113
|
|
|
06/1904 |
06/1939 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1923 |