GCR/LNER Robinson "D10" Class 4-4-0
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D10 | 2650 | 08/1913 | PRINCE HENRY | 08/1913 | 28/02/1954 | 10/02/1954 | |
D10 | 2651 | 09/1913 | PURDOS VICCARS | 09/1913 | 31/03/1953 | 09/03/1953 | |
D10 | 2652 | 10/1913 | EDWIN A BEAZLEY | 10/1913 | 31/05/1954 | 08/05/1954 | |
D10 | 2653 | 10/1913 | SIR EDWARD FRASER | 10/1913 | 31/10/1955 | 08/10/1955 | |
D10 | 2654 | 10/1913 | WALTER BURGH GAIR | 10/1913 | 30/09/1953 | 05/09/1953 | |
D10 | 2655 | 11/1913 | THE EARL OF KERRY | 11/1913 | 31/08/1953 | 22/08/1953 | |
D10 | 2656 | 11/1913 | SIR CLEMENT ROYDS | 11/1913 | 31/01/1955 | 29/01/1955 | |
D10 | 2657 | 11/1913 | SIR BERKELEY SHEFFIELD | 11/1913 | 31/03/1953 | 16/03/1953 | |
D10 | 2658 | 11/1913 | PRINCE GEORGE | 11/1913 | 31/08/1955 | 13/08/1955 | |
D10 | 2659 | 12/1913 | WORSLEY-TAYLOR | 12/1913 | 30/11/1954 | 27/11/1954 |