GCR/LNER Robinson "D11" Class 4-4-0
GCR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Mileage | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
506 | 5506 | 2660 | 62660 | 12/1919 | 11/1960 | 40.92 | 1,280,897 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
507 | 5507 | 2661 | 62661 | 02/1920 | 18/11/1960 | 40.75 | 40.86 | ||||||
508 | 5508 | 2662 | 62662 | 03/1920 | 08/08/1960 | 40.42 | 40.45 | ||||||
509 | 5509 | 2663 | 62663 | 03/1920 | 23/05/1960 | 40.17 | 40.28 | ||||||
510 | 5510 | 2664 | 62664 | 05/1920 | 08/08/1960 | 40.25 | 40.28 | ||||||
501 | 5501 | 2665 | 62665 | 09/1922 | 08/05/1959 | 36.67 | 36.85 | ||||||
502 | 5502 | 2666 | 62666 | 10/1922 | 05/12/1960 | 38.17 | 38.19 | ||||||
503 | 5503 | 2667 | 62667 | 11/1922 | 12/08/1960 | 37.75 | 37.86 | ||||||
504 | 5504 | 2668 | 62668 | 11/1922 | 17/11/1960 | 38 | 38.11 | ||||||
505 | 5505 | 2669 | 62669 | 12/1922 | 12/08/1960 | 37.67 | 37.69 | ||||||
511 | 5511 | 2670 | 62670 | 12/1922 | 15/11/1960 | 37.92 | 38.11 |