GCR/LNER Robinson "D11" Class 4-4-0
GCR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Mileage | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
6378 | 2671 | 62671 | 07/1924 | 11/05/1961 | 36.83 | 36.94 | |||||||
6379 | 2672 | 62672 | 08/1924 | 08/09/1961 | 37.08 | 37.11 | |||||||
6380 | 2673 | 62673 | 08/1924 | 15/07/1959 | 34.92 | 35.02 | |||||||
6381 | 2674 | 62674 | 08/1924 | 19/07/1961 | 36.92 | 37.44 | |||||||
6382 | 2675 | 62675 | 08/1924 | 29/10/1959 | 35.17 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 01/1960 | 35.44 | ||||
6383 | 2676 | 62676 | 08/1924 | 29/10/1959 | 35.17 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1960 | 35.53 | ||||
6384 | 2677 | 62677 | 09/1924 | 26/08/1959 | 34.92 | 35.02 | |||||||
6385 | 2678 | 62678 | 09/1924 | 03/03/1959 | 34.5 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 02/1960 | 35.44 | ||||
6386 | 2679 | 62679 | 10/1924 | 10/09/1958 | 33.92 | 34.94 | |||||||
6387 | 2680 | 62680 | 10/1924 | 08/09/1961 | 36.92 | 36.94 | |||||||
6388 | 2681 | 62681 | 10/1924 | 13/07/1961 | 36.75 | 36.86 | |||||||
6389 | 2682 | 62682 | 10/1924 | 29/07/1961 | 36.75 | 36.94 | |||||||
6390 | 2683 | 62683 | 10/1924 | 17/09/1958 | 33.92 | 34.44 | |||||||
6391 | 2684 | 62684 | 10/1924 | 29/10/1959 | 35 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1960 | 35.36 | ||||
6392 | 2685 | 62685 | 10/1924 | 15/01/1962 | 37.25 | 38.77 | |||||||
6393 | 2686 | 62686 | 10/1924 | 28/07/1961 | 36.75 | 37.86 | |||||||
6394 | 2687 | 62687 | 10/1924 | 02/08/1961 | 36.83 | 37.28 | |||||||
6395 | 2688 | 62688 | 11/1924 | 28/07/1961 | 36.67 | 36.86 | |||||||
6396 | 2689 | 62689 | 11/1924 | 13/07/1961 | 36.67 | 36.77 | |||||||
6397 | 2690 | 62690 | 11/1924 | 13/07/1961 | 36.67 | 36.86 | |||||||
6398 | 2691 | 62691 | 11/1924 | 20/11/1961 | 37 | 38.35 | |||||||
6399 | 2692 | 62692 | 11/1924 | 16/11/1959 | 35 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1960 | 35.27 | ||||
6400 | 2693 | 62693 | 11/1924 | 20/11/1961 | 37 | 38.35 | |||||||
6401 | 2694 | 62694 | 11/1924 | 16/11/1959 | 35 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1960 | 35.27 |