GER/LNER Holden "D14" Class 4-4-0
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1942) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1900 | 8900 | 7770 | 2500 | 03/1900 | 05/1947 | 03/1925 to D15 |
47.17 | |||||||
1890 | 8890 | 7760 | 2501 | 62501 | 04/1900 | 25/06/1951 | 02/1916 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 51.17 | |||||
1891 | 8891 | 7761 | 2502 | 62502 | 04/1900 | 04/02/1952 | 03/1916 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 51.83 | 51.87 | ||||
1892 | 8892 | 7762 | 2503 | 62503 | 04/1900 | 12/02/1951 | 10/1927 to D15 |
Bury St Edmunds | 50.83 | 50.87 | ||||
1893 | 8893 | 7763 | 2504 | 62504 | 05/1900 | 06/1948 | 12/1926 to D15 |
Oban | 48.08 | |||||
1894 | 8894 | 7764 | 2505 | 62505 | 05/1900 | 19/11/1951 | 01/1918 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 51.5 | |||||
1895 | 8895 | 7765 | 2506 | 62506 | 06/1900 | 21/04/1952 | 11/1926 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 51.83 | 51.87 | ||||
1896 | 8896 | 7766 | 2507 | 62507 | 06/1900 | 21/04/1952 | 08/1915 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 51.83 | |||||
1897 | 8897 | 7767 | 2508 | 62508 | 06/1900 | 10/1950 | 09/1919 to D15 |
Bury St Edmunds | 50.33 | 50.45 | ||||
1898 | 8898 | 7768 | 2509 | 62509 | 07/1900 | 22/09/1952 | 06/1915 to D15 |
Norwich Thorpe | 52.17 | |||||
1899 | 8899 | 7769 | 2510 | 62510 | 07/1900 | 07/10/1957 | 02/1922 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 57.25 | 57.38 | ||||
1880 | 8880 | 7750 | 2511 | 62511 | 04/1901 | 17/12/1959 | 02/1918 to D15 |
Norwich Thorpe | 58.67 | 58.79 | ||||
1881 | 8881 | 7751 | 2512 | 62512 | 05/1901 | 08/1950 | 05/1930 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 49.25 | |||||
1882 | 8882 | 7752 | 2513 | 62513 | 05/1901 | 03/11/1958 | 02/1919 to D15 |
Cambridge | 57.5 | 57.62 | ||||
1883 | 8883 | 7753 | 2514 | 62514 | 05/1901 | 11/03/1957 | 01/1916 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 55.83 | 56.12 | ||||
1884 | 8884 | 7754 | 2515 | 62515 | 05/1901 | 01/04/1958 | 03/1922 to D15 |
Melton Constable | 56.92 | 57.12 | ||||
1885 | 8885 | 7755 | 2516 | 62516 | 05/1901 | 18/08/1957 | 05/1919 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 56.25 | 56.38 | ||||
1886 | 8886 | 7756 | 2517 | 62517 | 06/1901 | 28/09/1959 | 10/1925 to D15 |
March | 58.25 | 58.46 | ||||
1887 | 8887 | 7757 | 2518 | 62518 | 06/1901 | 13/10/1958 | 02/1918 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 57.33 | 57.54 | ||||
1888 | 8888 | 7758 | 2519 | 62519 | 06/1901 | 01/01/1957 | 01/1918 to D15 |
Melton Constable | 55.58 | 55.79 | ||||
1889 | 8889 | 7759 | 2520 | 62520 | 06/1901 | 27/08/1951 | 03/1917 to D15 |
Melton Constable | 50.17 | |||||
1870 | 8870 | 7740 | 2521 | 62521 | 03/1902 | 10/02/1958 | 04/1924 to D15 |
Kings Lynn | 55.92 | 56.12 | ||||
1871 | 8871 | 7741 | 2522 | 62522 | 03/1902 | 04/08/1958 | 04/1924 to D15 |
Cambridge | 56.42 | 56.62 | ||||
1872 | 8872 | 7742 | 2523 | 62523 | 03/1902 | 27/08/1956 | 03/1924 to D15 |
Norwich Thorpe | 54.42 | 54.96 | ||||
1873 | 8873 | 7743 | 2524 | 62524 | 03/1902 | 10/03/1960 | 01/1930 to D15 |
Norwich Thorpe | 58 | 58.21 | ||||
1874 | 8874 | 7744 | 2525 | 62525 | 03/1902 | 19/09/1955 | 05/1919 to D15 |
Cambridge | 53.5 | |||||
1875 | 8875 | 7745 | 2526 | 62526 | 04/1902 | 21/05/1957 | 03/1931 to D15 |
March | 55.08 | 55.46 | ||||
1876 | 8876 | 7746 | 2527 | 62527 | 04/1902 | 07/07/1952 | 06/1929 to D15 |
Cambridge | 50.25 | |||||
1877 | 8877 | 7747 | 2528 | 62528 | 04/1902 | 25/06/1951 | 02/1928 to D15 |
Melton Constable | 49.17 | |||||
1878 | 8878 | 7748 | 2529 | 62529 | 05/1902 | 23/11/1959 | 03/1929 to D15 |
March | 57.5 | 57.71 | ||||
1879 | 8879 | 7749 | 2530 | 62530 | 05/1902 | 22/09/1958 | 12/1927 to D15 |
March | 56.33 | 56.54 | ||||
1860 | 8860 | 7730 | 2531 | 62531 | 05/1903 | 21/03/1955 | 05/1919 to D15 |
Cambridge | 51.83 | |||||
1861 | 8861 | 7731 | 2532 | 62532 | 05/1903 | 12/11/1956 | 01/1921 to D15 |
Cambridge | 53.5 | |||||
1862 | 8862 | 7732 | 2533 | 62533 | 05/1903 | 23/09/1957 | 12/1923 to D15 |
Melton Constable | 54.33 | 54.62 | ||||
1863 | 8863 | 7733 | 2534 | 62534 | 06/1903 | 11/11/1958 | 01/1921 to D15 |
Cambridge | 55.42 | 55.71 | ||||
1864 | 8864 | 7734 | 2535 | 62535 | 06/1903 | 25/11/1957 | 05/1923 to D15 |
Lincoln | 54.42 | 54.62 | ||||
1865 | 8865 | 7735 | 2536 | 62536 | 09/1903 | 25/07/1955 | 04/1930 to D15 |
Spital Bridge | 51.83 | 55.62 | ||||
1866 | 8866 | 7736 | 09/1903 | 09/1945 | 06/1923 to D15 |
42 | ||||||||
1867 | 8867 | 7737 | 2538 | 62538 | 10/1903 | 28/04/1952 | 05/1923 to D15 |
Norwich Thorpe | 48.5 | |||||
1868 | 8868 | 7738 | 2539 | 62539 | 10/1903 | 28/10/1957 | 09/1929 to D15 |
Cambridge | 54 | 54.21 | ||||
1869 | 8869 | 7739 | 2540 | 62540 | 11/1903 | 24/08/1959 | 01/1922 to D15 |
Norwich Thorpe | 55.75 | 55.87 |