Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 264 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4432 Week
» 19546 Month
» 322736 Year
» 1544301 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Hill "D16" Class 4-4-0


Class GER LNER (1924) LNER (1942) LNER (Amend) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D16/3 1900 8900 7770   2500   03/1900 W Withdrawn 05/1947 05/1947
D16/3 1899 8899 7769   2510 62510 07/1900 NOR
31A
31C
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1956
19/01/1957
07/10/1957
07/10/1957
D16/3 1880 8880 7750   2511 62511 04/1901 NOR
32A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1957
17/12/1959
17/12/1959
D16/3 1882 8882 7752   2513 62513 05/1901 KL
31E
31B
31A
W
Kings Lynn
Bury St Edmunds
March
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1951
20/07/1957
13/09/1958
03/11/1958
03/11/1958
D16/3 1883 8883 7753   2514 62514 05/1901 KL
W
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/03/1957
11/03/1957
D16/3 1884 8884 7754   2515 62515 05/1901 MC
W
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/04/1958
01/04/1958
D16/3 1885 8885 7755   2516 62516 05/1901 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/08/1957
18/08/1957
D16/3 1886 8886 7756   2517 62517 06/1901 YAR
32C
32E
32F
32A
31B
W
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Yarmouth Vauxhall
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1954
24/04/1954
22/09/1956
31/01/1959
27/06/1959
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
D16/3 1887 8887 7757   2518 62518 06/1901 KL
31C
W
Kings Lynn
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
13/10/1958
13/10/1958
D16/3 1888 8888 7758   2519 62519 06/1901 COL
W
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/01/1957
01/01/1957
D16/3 1870 8870 7740   2521 62521 03/1902 YAR
31A
31C
31A
31C
W
Yarmouth South Town
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1953
19/01/1957
20/04/1957
20/07/1957
10/02/1958
10/02/1958
D16/3 1871 8871 7741   2522 62522 03/1902 NOR
31C
31A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/01/1956
14/06/1958
04/08/1958
04/08/1958
D16/3 1872 8872 7742   2523 62523 03/1902 COL
32A
W
Colchester
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
27/08/1956
27/08/1956
D16/3 1873 8873 7743   2524 62524 03/1902 YAR
32F
32A
W
Yarmouth South Town
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1958
31/01/1959
10/03/1960
10/03/1960
D16/3 1874 8874 7744   2525 62525 03/1902 CAM
31C
31A
W
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
15/11/1952
19/09/1955
19/09/1955
D16/3 1875 8875 7745   2526 62526 04/1902 IPS
31B
W
Ipswich
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1953
21/05/1957
21/05/1957
D16/3 1876 8876 7746   2527 62527 04/1902 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/07/1952
07/07/1952
D16/3 1878 8878 7748   2529 62529 05/1902 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1959
23/11/1959
D16/3 1879 8879 7749   2530 62530 05/1902 CAM
31B
W
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/12/1957
22/09/1958
22/09/1958
D16/3 1860 8860 7730   2531 62531 05/1903 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/03/1955
21/03/1955
D16/3 1861 8861 7731   2532 62532 05/1903 STR
91M
9E
31A
35C
31A
W
Stratford
To London Midland Region
Trafford Park (LMS)
Cambridge
Spital Bridge
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
17/06/1950
21/06/1952
18/10/1952
19/09/1953
12/11/1956
12/11/1956
D16/3 1862 8862 7732   2533 62533 05/1903 MC
W
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/09/1957
23/09/1957
D16/3 1863 8863 7733   2534 62534 06/1903 SL
31C
31A
31C
W
31A
South Lynn
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
Cambridge
01/01/1948
21/04/1951
20/04/1957
24/08/1957
11/11/1958
15/11/1958
11/11/1958
D16/3 1864 8864 7734   2535 62535 06/1903 NOR
31A
35C
40A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Spital Bridge
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/06/1952
18/10/1952
20/04/1957
25/11/1957
25/11/1957
D16/3 1865 8865 7735   2536 62536 09/1903 CAM
31A
35C
W
Cambridge
Cambridge
Spital Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/06/1952
15/11/1952
25/07/1955
25/07/1955
D16/3 1866 8866 7736       09/1903 W Withdrawn 09/1945 09/1945
D16/3 1868 8868 7738   2539 62539 10/1903 MAR
31A
W
March
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/05/1956
28/10/1957
28/10/1957
D16/3 1869 8869 7739   2540 62540 11/1903 YAR
NOR
W
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1949
24/08/1959
24/08/1959
D16/3 1850 8850 7720   2541 62541 12/1903 NOR
31E
31A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
20/03/1954
17/10/1955
17/10/1955
D16/3 1851 8851 7721   2542 62542 12/1903 MAR
W
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/10/1956
15/10/1956
D16/3 1852 8852 7722   2543 62543 12/1903 SL
31A
31E
31B
W
South Lynn
Cambridge
Bury St Edmunds
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
23/08/1952
14/12/1957
13/10/1958
13/10/1958
D16/3 1853 8853 7723   2544 62544 12/1903 YAR
32A
W
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1957
24/11/1959
24/11/1959
D16/3 1854 8854 7724   2545 62545 01/1904 NOR
32C
32A
31E
31A
31C
31A
31C
W
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1952
20/09/1952
20/06/1953
20/03/1954
19/03/1955
20/04/1957
19/10/1957
22/09/1958
22/09/1958
D16/3 1855 8855 7725   2546 62546 02/1904 YAR
W
Yarmouth South Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/06/1957
18/06/1957
D16/2 1856 8856 7726   2547 62547 03/1904 MAR
W
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1951
02/1951
D16/3 1857 8857 7727   2548 62548 03/1904 MAR
W
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/10/1957
08/10/1957
D16/3 1858 8858 7728   2549 62549 03/1904 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/12/1955
12/12/1955
D16/3 1859 8859 7729   2550   04/1904 W Withdrawn 11/1946 11/1946
D16/3 1840 8840 7710   2551 62551 11/1906 CAM
31C
31A
31C
31A
35C
W
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Spital Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1952
21/06/1952
23/08/1952
15/11/1952
23/01/1954
16/07/1956
16/07/1956
D16/2 1841 8841 7711   2552 62552 11/1906 IPS
32B
32A
32B
W
Ipswich
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1952
20/06/1953
19/06/1954
25/10/1955
25/10/1955
D16/3 1842 8842 7712   2553 62553 11/1906 YAR
NOR
31A
W
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
22/10/1955
01/01/1957
01/01/1957
D16/3 1843 8843 7713   2554 62554 11/1906 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/11/1955
28/11/1955
D16/3 1844 8844 7714   2555 62555 11/1906 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1958
24/03/1958
D16/2 1845 8845 7715   2556 62556 11/1906 IPS
32C
32A
W
Ipswich
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
19/05/1951
01/01/1957
01/01/1957
D16/2 1846 8846 7716   2557 62557 12/1906 CAM
31C
31A
W
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1952
15/11/1952
31/10/1955
31/10/1955
D16/2 1847 8847 7717   2558 62558 12/1906 SL
31A
31C
31A
31C
31A
31C
W
South Lynn
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1951
20/10/1951
22/03/1952
21/06/1952
15/11/1952
12/11/1955
06/05/1957
06/05/1957
D16/3 1848 8848 7718   2559 62559 01/1907 SL
W
South Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/12/1955
12/12/1955
D16/3 1849 8849 7719   2560 62560 01/1907 IPS
W
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/09/1948
24/09/1948
D16/3 1830 8830 7700   2561 62561 03/1908 YB
32A
32G
W
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/09/1952
22/10/1955
10/02/1958
10/02/1958
D16/3 1831 8831 7701   2562 62562 03/1908 MC
32A
31A
31C
31A
31B
W
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
19/07/1952
23/08/1952
20/09/1952
20/03/1954
22/10/1957
22/10/1957
D16/3 1832 8832 7702   2563 62563 03/1908 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/08/1948
06/08/1948
D16/3 1833 8833 7703   2564 62564 04/1908 NOR
32A
32G
32A
32F
32A
32D
32A
31A
40A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/09/1952
24/04/1954
24/07/1954
22/01/1955
23/04/1955
12/11/1955
21/01/1956
19/01/1957
20/04/1957
24/03/1958
24/03/1958
D16/3 1834 8834 7704   2565 62565 04/1908 COL
31A
31C
W
Colchester
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
18/08/1951
01/01/1957
01/01/1957
D16/3 1835 8835 7705   2566 62566 05/1908 BSE
31C
W
Bury St Edmunds
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1957
02/12/1958
02/12/1958
D16/3 1836 8836 7706   2567 62567 05/1908 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1956
17/12/1956
D16/3 1837 8837 7707   2568 62568 06/1908 NOR
32A
31A
31D
35C
40A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
South Lynn
Spital Bridge
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/06/1952
19/07/1952
18/10/1952
15/11/1952
20/04/1957
28/04/1958
28/04/1958
D16/2 1838 8838 7708   2569 62569 07/1908 KL
W
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1956
26/11/1956
D16/2 1839 8839 7709   2570 62570 07/1908 NOR
31A
32D
31B
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Yarmouth South Town
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1953
20/07/1957
27/06/1959
24/11/1959
24/11/1959
D16/3 1820 8820 7690   2571 62571 06/1909 CAM
40A
W
Cambridge
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/04/1957
01/01/1959
01/01/1959
D16/3 1821 8821 7691   2572 62572 06/1909 SL
30E
30A
31A
31C
31B
W
South Lynn
Colchester
Stratford
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
23/12/1950
23/06/1951
21/07/1951
22/09/1951
28/07/1958
28/07/1958
D16/2 1822 8822 7692   2573 62573 09/1909 SL
31E
31C
W
South Lynn
Bury St Edmunds
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
19/04/1952
24/10/1955
24/10/1955
D16/3 1823 8823 7693   2574 62574 11/1909 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/12/1955
05/12/1955
D16/3 1824 8824 7694   2575 62575 11/1909 KL
W
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/05/1957
29/05/1957
D16/3 1825 8825 7695   2576 62576 11/1909 NOR
31A
31E
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Bury St Edmunds
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1953
20/03/1954
09/09/1957
09/09/1957
D16/2 1826 8826 7696   2577 62577 12/1909 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1956
10/1956
D16/2 1827 8827 7697   2578 62578 12/1909 MC
W
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1957
21/10/1957
D16/3 1828 8828 7698   2579 62579 12/1909 MAR
31C
W
March
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
07/03/1955
07/03/1955
D16/3 1829 8829 7699   2580 62580 12/1909 YAR
31A
31C
W
Yarmouth South Town
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1957
18/05/1957
09/06/1958
09/06/1958
D16/3 1810 8810 7680   2581 62581 03/1910 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/03/1953
09/03/1953
D16/3 1811 8811 7681   2582 62582 03/1910 KL
31A
W
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1958
01/01/1959
01/01/1959
D16/3 1812 8812 7682   2583 62583 03/1910 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1948
23/11/1948
D16/2 1813 8813 7683   2584 62584 04/1910 MAR
31A
31C
W
March
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1956
19/01/1957
23/12/1957
23/12/1957
D16/3 1814 8814 7684   2585 62585 04/1910 NOR
31A
31E
31A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1952
23/08/1952
18/10/1952
11/04/1955
11/04/1955
D16/3 1815 8815 7685   2586 62586 05/1910 YAR
32A
W
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/06/1957
05/03/1958
05/03/1958
D16/3 1816 8816 7686   2587 62587 06/1910 STR
91M
9E
31A
35C
W
Stratford
To London Midland Region
Trafford Park (LMS)
Cambridge
Spital Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
17/06/1950
21/06/1952
18/10/1952
17/12/1956
17/12/1956
D16/3 1817 8817 7687   2588 62588 06/1910 YAR
91M
32A
31B
31E
31C
31A
W
Yarmouth South Town
To London Midland Region
Norwich Thorpe
March
Bury St Edmunds
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/05/1950
21/06/1952
19/07/1952
20/03/1954
08/03/1958
14/06/1958
13/10/1958
13/10/1958
D16/3 1818 8818 7688   2589 62589 06/1910 MAR
W
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/05/1959
18/05/1959
D16/2 1819 8819 7689   2590 62590 06/1910 IPS
W
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1952
28/01/1952
D16/2 1800 8800 7670   2591 62591 07/1910 YAR
W
Yarmouth South Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/04/1950
17/04/1950
D16/3 1801 8801 7671   2592 62592 07/1910 YB
32A
32G
32A
32F
32G
32A
31A
31C
W
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth Beach
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/09/1952
25/07/1953
19/09/1953
19/03/1955
23/04/1955
14/05/1955
19/01/1957
20/04/1957
01/04/1958
01/04/1958
D16/3 1802 8802 7672   2593 62593 08/1910 LOW
W
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1957
07/10/1957
D16/3 1803 8803 7673   2594 62594 08/1910 YAR
W
Yarmouth South Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1949
03/1949
D16/3 1804 8804 7674   2595   08/1910 W Withdrawn 11/1946 11/1946
D16/2 1805 8805 7672   2596 62596 09/1910 YB
32A
32G
32A
W
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/09/1952
19/12/1953
23/01/1954
28/10/1957
28/10/1957
D16/3 1806 8806 7673   2597 62597 09/1910 YAR
32F
32G
32A
31F
W
Yarmouth South Town
Yarmouth Beach
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Spital Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1956
18/05/1957
07/03/1959
18/04/1959
04/01/1960
04/01/1960
D16/3 1807 8807 7677   2598 62598 10/1910 COL
32A
W
Colchester
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
12/05/1952
12/05/1952
D16/3 1808 8808 7678   2599 62599 10/1910 NOR
91M
32A
31A
35C
40A
W
Norwich Thorpe
To London Midland Region
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Spital Bridge
Lincoln
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/05/1950
21/06/1952
19/07/1952
18/10/1952
20/04/1957
15/09/1958
15/09/1958
D16/3 1809 8809 7679   2600 62600 11/1910 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/06/1948
12/06/1948
D16/3 1790 8790 7660   2601 62601 02/1911 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/01/1957
01/01/1957
D16/3 1791 8791 7661   2602 62602 03/1911 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/09/1948
23/09/1948
D16/2 1792 8792 7662   2603 62603 03/1911 MAR
31A
W
March
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/12/1950
03/09/1951
03/09/1951
D16/3 1793 8793 7663   2604 62604 04/1911 YAR
32C
W
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/10/1959
05/02/1960
05/02/1960
D16/2 1794 8794 7664   2605 62605 05/1911 MAR
31A
31A
W
March
Cambridge
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1955
20/10/1956
06/06/1957
06/06/1957
D16/2 1795 8795 7665 8795 2606 62606 07/1911 CAM
31C
W
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1953
28/09/1959
28/09/1959
D16/2 1796 8796 7666   2607 62607 07/1911 CAM
BSE
31A
W
Cambridge
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1949
13/11/1954
28/11/1955
28/11/1955
D16/3 1797 8797 7667   2608 62608 07/1911 COL
32A
32G
32A
31A
W
Colchester
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
21/07/1951
19/01/1952
22/10/1955
01/01/1957
01/01/1957
D16/3 1798 8798 7668   2609 62609 08/1911 COL
91M
9F
9E
31A
31D
35C
31A
35C
W
Colchester
To London Midland Region
Heaton Mersey
Trafford Park (LMS)
Cambridge
South Lynn
Spital Bridge
Cambridge
Spital Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
17/06/1950
17/07/1951
21/06/1952
19/07/1952
18/10/1952
19/09/1953
19/12/1953
04/02/1957
04/02/1957
D16/3 1799 8799 7669   2610 62610 08/1911 NOR
32G
31A
31C
W
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
12/11/1955
19/10/1957
01/01/1959
01/01/1959
D16/3 1780 8780 7650   2611 62611 06/1923 IPS
32E
W
Ipswich
Yarmouth Vauxhall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
01/01/1957
01/01/1957
D16/2 1781 8781 7651   2612 62612 06/1923 IPS
32B
31F
W
Ipswich
Ipswich
Spital Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1954
18/04/1959
24/11/1959
24/11/1959
D16/2 1782 8782 7652   2613 62613 06/1923 YB
31F
31B
W
Yarmouth Beach
Spital Bridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/04/1959
06/02/1960
25/10/1960
25/10/1960
D16/2 1783 8783 7653   2614 62614 07/1923 KL
W
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/08/1958
18/08/1958
D16/2 1784 8784 7654   2615 62615 07/1923 BSE
31A
31E
31B
W
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Bury St Edmunds
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/04/1951
23/08/1952
20/07/1957
13/10/1958
13/10/1958
D16/2 1785 8785 7655   2616 62616 07/1923 NOR
31A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
23/02/1953
23/02/1953
D16/2 1786 8786 7656 8786 2617 62617 08/1923 COL
32G
W
Colchester
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
20/05/1957
20/05/1957
D16/2 1787 8787 7657   2618 62618 08/1923 CAM
31C
31B
W
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/03/1958
06/12/1958
23/11/1959
23/11/1959
D16/3 1788 8788 7658   2619 62619 09/1923 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/10/1957
07/10/1957
D16/3 1789 8789 7659   2620 62620 09/1923 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/10/1955
10/10/1955