LNER Hill "D16" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/1935 | Reallocation | 8859 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 8843 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 8831 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 8831 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
09/1945 | Condemned | 7736 | COND | ||||
11/1946 | Condemned | 2550 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
11/1946 | Condemned | 2595 | COND | ||||
05/1947 | Condemned | 2500 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2510 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2511 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2513 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2514 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2515 | MC | Melton Constable | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2516 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2517 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2518 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2519 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2521 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2522 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2523 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2524 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2525 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2526 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2527 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2529 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2530 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2531 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2532 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2533 | MC | Melton Constable | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2534 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2535 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2536 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2539 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2540 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2541 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2542 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2543 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2544 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2545 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2546 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2547 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2548 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2549 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2551 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2552 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2553 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2554 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2555 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2556 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2557 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2558 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2559 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2560 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2561 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2562 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | MC | Melton Constable | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2563 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2564 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2565 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2566 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2567 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2568 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2569 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2570 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2571 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2572 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2573 | SL | South Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2574 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2575 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2576 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2577 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2578 | MC | Melton Constable | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2579 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2580 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2581 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2582 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2583 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2584 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2585 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2586 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2587 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2588 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2589 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2590 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2591 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2592 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2593 | LOW | Lowestoft | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2594 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2596 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2597 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2598 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2599 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2600 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2601 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2602 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2603 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2604 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2605 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2606 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2607 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2608 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2609 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2610 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2611 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2612 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2613 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2614 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2615 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2616 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2617 | COL | Colchester | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2618 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2619 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2620 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
10/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2588 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2536 | CAM | Cambridge | KL | Kings Lynn | |
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2560 | IPS | Ipswich | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2617 | COL | Colchester | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2536 | KL | Kings Lynn | CAM | Cambridge | |
07/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2564 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2555 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
14/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2560 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2555 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2571 | CAM | Cambridge | KL | Kings Lynn | |
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2593 | LOW | Lowestoft | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
28/02/1948 | Reallocation | 2616 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
06/03/1948 | Reallocation | 2571 | KL | Kings Lynn | CAM | Cambridge | |
27/03/1948 | Reallocation | 2516 | CAM | Cambridge | KL | Kings Lynn | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 2560 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
17/04/1948 | Reallocation | 2616 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 2549 | CAM | Cambridge | KL | Kings Lynn | |
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 2516 | KL | Kings Lynn | CAM | Cambridge | |
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 2545 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 2549 | KL | Kings Lynn | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/05/1948 | Reallocation | 2565 | COL | Colchester | STR | Stratford | |
22/05/1948 | Reallocation | 2607 | CAM | Cambridge | SL | South Lynn | |
29/05/1948 | Reallocation | 2607 | SL | South Lynn | CAM | Cambridge | |
12/06/1948 | Reallocation | 2560 | MEL | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
12/06/1948 | Condemned | 2600 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
19/06/1948 | Reallocation | 2601 | CAM | Cambridge | KL | Kings Lynn | |
06/08/1948 | Condemned | 2563 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
07/08/1948 | Reallocation | 2545 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
28/08/1948 | Reallocation | 2572 | SL | South Lynn | STR | Stratford | |
04/09/1948 | Reallocation | 2560 | MEL | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
23/09/1948 | Condemned | 2602 | STR | Stratford | COND | ||
24/09/1948 | Condemned | 2560 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
09/10/1948 | Reallocation | 2561 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
16/10/1948 | Reallocation | 2613 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
23/10/1948 | Reallocation | 2611 | IPS | Ipswich | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
23/10/1948 | Reallocation | 2612 | IPS | Ipswich | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
30/10/1948 | Reallocation | 2545 | MEL | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
31/10/1948 | Reallocation | 2525 | CAM | Cambridge | SL | South Lynn | |
09/11/1948 | Reallocation | 2525 | SL | South Lynn | KL | Kings Lynn | |
23/11/1948 | Condemned | 2583 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 2561 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | LOW | Lowestoft | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 62571 | CAM | Cambridge | SL | South Lynn | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 2606 | CAM | Cambridge | KL | Kings Lynn | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 2545 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | LOW | Lowestoft | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 2606 | KL | Kings Lynn | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 2525 | KL | Kings Lynn | CAM | Cambridge | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 2545 | LOW | Lowestoft | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 2612 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | LOW | Lowestoft | |
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 62613 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 62540 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 62553 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 62561 | LOW | Lowestoft | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |
26/02/1949 | Reallocation | 2612 | LOW | Lowestoft | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
03/1949 | Condemned | 62594 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | COND | ||
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 2606 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | LOW | Lowestoft | |
30/04/1949 | Reallocation | 62540 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
07/05/1949 | Reallocation | 62553 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
07/1949 | Reallocation | 62553 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
07/1949 | Reallocation | 62607 | CAM | Cambridge | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 62553 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
30/07/1949 | Reallocation | 62612 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | IPS | Ipswich | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 62530 | CAM | Cambridge | KL | Kings Lynn | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 62551 | CAM | Cambridge | KL | Kings Lynn | |
15/10/1949 | Reallocation | 62551 | KL | Kings Lynn | CAM | Cambridge | |
19/10/1949 | Reallocation | 62535 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | GOR | Gorton | |
22/10/1949 | Reallocation | 2529 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | MAR | March | |
22/10/1949 | Reallocation | 2584 | MAR | March | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 62530 | KL | Kings Lynn | CAM | Cambridge | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 62540 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
07/01/1950 | Reallocation | 62592 | MEL | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
16/04/1950 | Reallocation | 62556 | IPS | Ipswich | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
17/04/1950 | Condemned | 62591 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | COND | ||
06/05/1950 | Reallocation | 62588 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 91M | To London Midland Region | |
06/05/1950 | Reallocation | 62599 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 91M | To London Midland Region | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 62532 | STR | Stratford | 91M | To London Midland Region | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 62572 | STR | Stratford | 30E | Colchester | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 62587 | STR | Stratford | 91M | To London Midland Region | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 62609 | COL | Colchester | 91M | To London Midland Region | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 62611 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 62532 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 62587 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 62609 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 9F | Heaton Mersey | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 62532 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 62572 | 30E | Colchester | 30E | Colchester | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 62587 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 62609 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 62611 | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | |
30/07/1950 | Reallocation | 62606 | LOW | Lowestoft | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
29/10/1950 | Reallocation | 62556 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32C | Lowestoft | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62543 | SL | South Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62556 | 32C | Lowestoft | 32C | Lowestoft | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62573 | SL | South Lynn | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62543 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62572 | 30E | Colchester | 30A | Stratford | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62573 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
23/12/1950 | Reallocation | 62572 | 30A | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
23/12/1950 | Reallocation | 62603 | MAR | March | 31A | Cambridge | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 62603 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
02/1951 | Condemned | 62547 | MAR | March | COND | ||
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 62579 | MAR | March | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 62579 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
07/04/1951 | Reallocation | 62590 | IPS | Ipswich | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 62513 | KL | Kings Lynn | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 62534 | SL | South Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 62558 | SL | South Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 62590 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 32B | Ipswich | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 62615 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
05/05/1951 | Reallocation | 62556 | 32C | Lowestoft | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 62556 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 62565 | STR | Stratford | 31A | Cambridge | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 62572 | 30A | Stratford | 31A | Cambridge | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 62598 | COL | Colchester | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
26/05/1951 | Reallocation | 62608 | COL | Colchester | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62565 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62572 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62598 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62608 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62617 | MEL | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
30/06/1951 | Reallocation | 62608 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32G | Melton Constable | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 62572 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
07/07/1951 | Reallocation | 62609 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
17/07/1951 | Reallocation | 62609 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 62572 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
21/07/1951 | Reallocation | 62608 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32G | Melton Constable | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 62565 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
18/08/1951 | Reallocation | 62565 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
25/08/1951 | Reallocation | 62610 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 32G | Melton Constable | |
03/09/1951 | Condemned | 62603 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
15/09/1951 | Reallocation | 62572 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31B | March | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 62572 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 62610 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32G | Melton Constable | |
13/10/1951 | Reallocation | 62558 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 62558 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
17/11/1951 | Reallocation | 62516 | CAM | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
17/11/1951 | Reallocation | 62518 | KL | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
01/12/1951 | Reallocation | 62610 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 62608 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
19/01/1952 | Reallocation | 62608 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
28/01/1952 | Condemned | 62590 | 32B | Ipswich | COND | ||
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 62552 | IPS | Ipswich | 32B | Ipswich | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 62557 | CAM | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 62552 | 32B | Ipswich | 32B | Ipswich | |
23/02/1952 | Reallocation | 62557 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 62518 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 62523 | MEL | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 62541 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 62558 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 62616 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 62525 | CAM | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 62562 | MC | Melton Constable | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 62573 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
12/05/1952 | Condemned | 62598 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 62551 | CAM | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62532 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 31A | Cambridge | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62535 | GOR | Gorton | 31A | Cambridge | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62536 | CAM | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62551 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62558 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62568 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62587 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 31A | Cambridge | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62588 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62599 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62609 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62532 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62535 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62536 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62551 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62558 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62568 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62587 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62588 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62599 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62609 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
07/07/1952 | Condemned | 62527 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62545 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 32C | Lowestoft | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62562 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62568 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62585 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62588 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62599 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62609 | 31A | Cambridge | 31D | South Lynn | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62545 | 32C | Lowestoft | 32C | Lowestoft | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62562 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62568 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62585 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62588 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62599 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62609 | 31D | South Lynn | 31D | South Lynn | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 62551 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 62562 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 62585 | 31A | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 62543 | 31A | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 62551 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 62562 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 62585 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 62615 | 31A | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 62543 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
06/09/1952 | Reallocation | 62615 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 62545 | 32C | Lowestoft | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 62561 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 62562 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 62564 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 62592 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
20/09/1952 | Reallocation | 62596 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62545 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62561 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62562 | 31A | Cambridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62564 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62568 | 31A | Cambridge | 31D | South Lynn | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62592 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62596 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
04/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62609 | 31D | South Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
18/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62532 | 31A | Cambridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
18/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62535 | 31A | Cambridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
18/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62568 | 31D | South Lynn | 31D | South Lynn | |
18/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62585 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
18/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62587 | 31A | Cambridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
18/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62599 | 31A | Cambridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
18/10/1952 | Reallocation | 62609 | 31A | Cambridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62525 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62532 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62535 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62536 | 31A | Cambridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62551 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62557 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62558 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62562 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62568 | 31D | South Lynn | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62585 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62587 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62599 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62609 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62525 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62536 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62551 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62557 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62558 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62568 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
23/02/1953 | Condemned | 62616 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
09/03/1953 | Condemned | 62581 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
18/04/1953 | Reallocation | 62521 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62526 | IPS | Ipswich | 31B | March | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62545 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62552 | 32B | Ipswich | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62570 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62576 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62606 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
25/07/1953 | Reallocation | 62592 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32G | Melton Constable | |
19/09/1953 | Reallocation | 62532 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/09/1953 | Reallocation | 62592 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
19/09/1953 | Reallocation | 62609 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/12/1953 | Reallocation | 62596 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32G | Melton Constable | |
19/12/1953 | Reallocation | 62609 | 31A | Cambridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 62517 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 32C | Lowestoft | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 62551 | 31A | Cambridge | 35C | Spital Bridge | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 62596 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 62541 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 62545 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 62562 | 31A | Cambridge | 31B | March | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 62576 | 31A | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 62588 | 31B | March | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 62517 | 32C | Lowestoft | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | |
24/04/1954 | Reallocation | 62564 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32G | Melton Constable | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 62552 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32B | Ipswich | |
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 62612 | IPS | Ipswich | 32B | Ipswich | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 62564 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 62607 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
22/01/1955 | Reallocation | 62564 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | |
07/03/1955 | Condemned | 62579 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 62545 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
19/03/1955 | Reallocation | 62592 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | |
21/03/1955 | Condemned | 62531 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
11/04/1955 | Condemned | 62585 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 62564 | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 62592 | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | 32G | Melton Constable | |
14/05/1955 | Reallocation | 62592 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
25/07/1955 | Condemned | 62536 | 35C | Spital Bridge | COND | ||
19/09/1955 | Condemned | 62525 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
10/10/1955 | Condemned | 62620 | MEL | COND | |||
17/10/1955 | Condemned | 62541 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 62553 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 62561 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32G | Melton Constable | |
22/10/1955 | Reallocation | 62608 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
24/10/1955 | Condemned | 62573 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
25/10/1955 | Condemned | 62552 | 32B | Ipswich | COND | ||
31/10/1955 | Condemned | 62557 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 62558 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 62564 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | |
12/11/1955 | Reallocation | 62610 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
28/11/1955 | Condemned | 62554 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
28/11/1955 | Condemned | 62607 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
05/12/1955 | Condemned | 62574 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
12/12/1955 | Condemned | 62549 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
12/12/1955 | Condemned | 62559 | SL | South Lynn | COND | ||
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 62605 | MAR | March | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/01/1956 | Reallocation | 62522 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
21/01/1956 | Reallocation | 62564 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
25/05/1956 | Reallocation | 62539 | MAR | March | 31A | Cambridge | |
16/07/1956 | Condemned | 62551 | 35C | Spital Bridge | COND | ||
21/07/1956 | Reallocation | 62510 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/07/1956 | Reallocation | 62584 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
27/08/1956 | Condemned | 62523 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
22/09/1956 | Reallocation | 62517 | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | |
10/1956 | Condemned | 62577 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
15/10/1956 | Condemned | 62542 | MAR | March | COND | ||
20/10/1956 | Reallocation | 62597 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | |
20/10/1956 | Reallocation | 62605 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
12/11/1956 | Condemned | 62532 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
26/11/1956 | Condemned | 62569 | KL | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
17/12/1956 | Condemned | 62567 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
17/12/1956 | Condemned | 62587 | 35C | Spital Bridge | COND | ||
01/01/1957 | Condemned | 62519 | MEL | COND | |||
01/01/1957 | Condemned | 62553 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
01/01/1957 | Condemned | 62556 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
01/01/1957 | Condemned | 62565 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
01/01/1957 | Condemned | 62601 | KL | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
01/01/1957 | Condemned | 62608 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
01/01/1957 | Condemned | 62611 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | COND | ||
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 62510 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 62521 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 62564 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 62580 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 62584 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
19/01/1957 | Reallocation | 62592 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
04/02/1957 | Condemned | 62609 | 35C | Spital Bridge | COND | ||
11/03/1957 | Condemned | 62514 | KL | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62521 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62534 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62535 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 40A | Lincoln | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62545 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62564 | 31A | Cambridge | 40A | Lincoln | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62568 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 40A | Lincoln | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62571 | SL | South Lynn | 40A | Lincoln | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62592 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 62599 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 40A | Lincoln | |
06/05/1957 | Condemned | 62558 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 62580 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 62597 | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | 32G | Melton Constable | |
20/05/1957 | Condemned | 62617 | 32G | Melton Constable | COND | ||
21/05/1957 | Condemned | 62526 | 31B | March | COND | ||
29/05/1957 | Condemned | 62575 | KL | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
06/06/1957 | Condemned | 62605 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 62511 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 62544 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 62566 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
15/06/1957 | Reallocation | 62586 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
18/06/1957 | Condemned | 62546 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | COND | ||
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 62513 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31B | March | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 62521 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 62570 | 31A | Cambridge | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 62615 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31B | March | |
18/08/1957 | Condemned | 62516 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
24/08/1957 | Reallocation | 62534 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
09/09/1957 | Condemned | 62576 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | COND | ||
23/09/1957 | Condemned | 62533 | MC | Melton Constable | COND | ||
07/10/1957 | Condemned | 62510 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
07/10/1957 | Condemned | 62593 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
07/10/1957 | Condemned | 62619 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
08/10/1957 | Condemned | 62548 | MAR | March | COND | ||
19/10/1957 | Reallocation | 62545 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
19/10/1957 | Reallocation | 62610 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
21/10/1957 | Condemned | 62578 | MC | Melton Constable | COND | ||
22/10/1957 | Condemned | 62562 | 31B | March | COND | ||
28/10/1957 | Condemned | 62539 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
28/10/1957 | Condemned | 62596 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
25/11/1957 | Condemned | 62535 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
14/12/1957 | Reallocation | 62530 | CAM | Cambridge | 31B | March | |
14/12/1957 | Reallocation | 62543 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31B | March | |
23/12/1957 | Condemned | 62584 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
10/02/1958 | Condemned | 62521 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
10/02/1958 | Condemned | 62561 | 32G | Melton Constable | COND | ||
05/03/1958 | Condemned | 62586 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
08/03/1958 | Reallocation | 62588 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
08/03/1958 | Reallocation | 62618 | CAM | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
24/03/1958 | Condemned | 62555 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
24/03/1958 | Condemned | 62564 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
01/04/1958 | Condemned | 62515 | MC | Melton Constable | COND | ||
01/04/1958 | Condemned | 62592 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
28/04/1958 | Condemned | 62568 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
09/06/1958 | Condemned | 62580 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 62522 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 62588 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/07/1958 | Reallocation | 62524 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | |
28/07/1958 | Condemned | 62572 | 31B | March | COND | ||
04/08/1958 | Condemned | 62522 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
18/08/1958 | Condemned | 62614 | KL | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
13/09/1958 | Reallocation | 62513 | 31B | March | 31A | Cambridge | |
15/09/1958 | Condemned | 62599 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
22/09/1958 | Condemned | 62530 | 31B | March | COND | ||
22/09/1958 | Condemned | 62545 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
13/10/1958 | Condemned | 62518 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
13/10/1958 | Condemned | 62543 | 31B | March | COND | ||
13/10/1958 | Condemned | 62588 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
13/10/1958 | Condemned | 62615 | 31B | March | COND | ||
03/11/1958 | Condemned | 62513 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
11/11/1958 | Condemned | 62534 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 62534 | 98W | 31A | Cambridge | ||
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 62582 | KL | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
02/12/1958 | Condemned | 62566 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
06/12/1958 | Reallocation | 62618 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31B | March | |
01/01/1959 | Condemned | 62571 | 40A | Lincoln | COND | ||
01/01/1959 | Condemned | 62582 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
01/01/1959 | Condemned | 62610 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 62517 | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 62524 | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 62597 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 62597 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31F | Spital Bridge | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 62612 | 32B | Ipswich | 31F | Spital Bridge | |
18/04/1959 | Reallocation | 62613 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 31F | Spital Bridge | |
18/05/1959 | Condemned | 62589 | MAR | March | COND | ||
27/06/1959 | Reallocation | 62517 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31B | March | |
27/06/1959 | Reallocation | 62570 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 31B | March | |
24/08/1959 | Condemned | 62540 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
28/09/1959 | Condemned | 62517 | 31B | March | COND | ||
28/09/1959 | Condemned | 62606 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
31/10/1959 | Reallocation | 62604 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | 32C | Lowestoft | |
23/11/1959 | Condemned | 62529 | MAR | March | COND | ||
23/11/1959 | Condemned | 62618 | 31B | March | COND | ||
24/11/1959 | Condemned | 62544 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
24/11/1959 | Condemned | 62570 | 31B | March | COND | ||
24/11/1959 | Condemned | 62612 | 31F | Spital Bridge | COND | ||
17/12/1959 | Condemned | 62511 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
04/01/1960 | Condemned | 62597 | 31F | Spital Bridge | COND | ||
05/02/1960 | Condemned | 62604 | 32C | Lowestoft | COND | ||
06/02/1960 | Reallocation | 62613 | 31F | Spital Bridge | 31B | March | |
10/03/1960 | Condemned | 62524 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
25/10/1960 | Condemned | 62613 | 31B | March | COND |