Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 4348 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23259 Week
» 88213 Month
» 290877 Year
» 3317730 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NBR/LNER Reid "D30" Class 4-4-0 - 'Scott'
Class |
NBR |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
D30 |
400
|
9400
|
(2416)
|
|
09/1912 |
06/1945 |
Steam Reverse Fitted |
01/1943 |
D30 |
363
|
9363
|
2417
|
62417
|
10/1912 |
02/01/1951 |
Screw Reverse removed |
03/1943 |
D30 |
409
|
9409
|
2418
|
62418
|
04/1914 |
06/08/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
10/1935 |
D30 |
410
|
9410
|
2419
|
62419
|
04/1914 |
19/09/1957 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1935 |
D30 |
411
|
9411
|
2420
|
62420
|
04/1914 |
05/1957 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
05/1935 |
D30 |
412
|
9412
|
2421
|
62421
|
04/1914 |
25/06/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1936 |
D30 |
413
|
9413
|
2422
|
62422
|
05/1914 |
29/12/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1935 |
D30 |
414
|
9414
|
2423
|
62423
|
06/1914 |
18/12/1957 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1935 |
D30 |
415
|
9415
|
2424
|
62424
|
06/1914 |
05/08/1957 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
02/1935 |
D30 |
416
|
9416
|
2425
|
62425
|
06/1914 |
07/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
05/1935 |
D30 |
417
|
9417
|
2426
|
62426
|
07/1914 |
25/06/1960 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
01/1936 |
D30 |
418
|
9418
|
2427
|
62427
|
07/1914 |
20/04/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
05/1935 |
D30 |
419
|
9419
|
2428
|
62428
|
09/1914 |
29/12/1958 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
10/1935 |
D30 |
420
|
9420
|
2429
|
62429
|
10/1914 |
20/08/1957 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1936 |
D30 |
421
|
9421
|
2430
|
62430
|
10/1914 |
07/01/1957 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1935 |
D30 |
422
|
9422
|
2431
|
62431
|
10/1914 |
17/10/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1936 |
D30 |
423
|
9423
|
2432
|
62432
|
10/1914 |
04/12/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1936 |
D30 |
424
|
9424
|
2433
|
|
06/1915 |
11/1947 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1935 |
D30 |
425
|
9425
|
2434
|
62434
|
07/1915 |
04/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1935 |
D30 |
426
|
9426
|
2435
|
62435
|
07/1915 |
09/12/1957 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
06/1935 |
D30 |
427
|
9427
|
2436
|
62436
|
08/1915 |
05/06/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1935 |
D30 |
428
|
9428
|
2437
|
62437
|
08/1915 |
06/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
05/1936 |
D30 |
497
|
9497
|
2438
|
62438
|
12/1920 |
30/10/1957 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1937 |
D30 |
498
|
9498
|
2439
|
62439
|
11/1920 |
12/10/1959 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
11/1936 |
D30 |
499
|
9499
|
2440
|
62440
|
11/1920 |
07/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1935 |
D30 |
500
|
9500
|
2441
|
62441
|
11/1920 |
08/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
05/1936 |
D30 |
501
|
9501
|
2442
|
62442
|
12/1920 |
06/1958 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
03/1936 |