NBR/LNER Reid "D32" Class 4-4-0
Class | NBR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D32 | 882 | 9882 | 2443 | 62443 | 10/1906 | TWD STM W |
Tweedmouth St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 02/03/1948 |
02/03/1948 |
D32 | 883 | 9883 | 2444 | 62444 | 11/1906 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/09/1948 |
02/09/1948 |
D32 | 884 | 9884 | 2445 | 62445 | 11/1906 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 |
D32 | 885 | 9885 | 2446 | 62446 | 12/1906 | THJ W |
Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1948 |
09/1948 |
D32 | 886 | 9886 | 2447 | 12/1906 | 12/1947 | ||||
D32 | 887 | 9887 | 2448 | 62448 | 12/1906 | TWD BLA W |
Tweedmouth Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 02/09/1948 |
02/09/1948 |
D32 | 888 | 9888 | 2449 | 62449 | 12/1906 | TWD BLA W |
Tweedmouth Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 13/11/1948 |
13/11/1948 |
D32 | 889 | 9889 | 2450 | 62450 | 12/1906 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1948 |
26/02/1948 |
D32 | 890 | 9890 | 2451 | 62451 | 01/1907 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/03/1951 |
29/03/1951 |
D32 | 891 | 9891 | 2452 | 01/1907 | 11/1947 | ||||
D32 | 892 | 9892 | 2453 | 62453 | 01/1907 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 |
29/05/1948 |
D32 | 893 | 9893 | 2454 | 62454 | 01/1907 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1948 |
09/1948 |