Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 228 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19139 Week
» 84093 Month
» 286757 Year
» 3313610 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NBR/LNER Reid "D32" Class 4-4-0
Class |
NBR |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
D32 |
882
|
9882
|
2443
|
(62443)
|
10/1906 |
02/03/1948 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
08/1924 |
D32 |
883
|
9883
|
2444
|
(62444)
|
11/1906 |
02/09/1948 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
07/1936 |
D32 |
884
|
9884
|
2445
|
(62445)
|
11/1906 |
12/1949 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1936 |
D32 |
885
|
9885
|
2446
|
(62446)
|
12/1906 |
09/1948 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1923 |
D32 |
886
|
9886
|
2447
|
|
12/1906 |
12/1947 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
04/1936 |
D32 |
887
|
9887
|
2448
|
(62448)
|
12/1906 |
02/09/1948 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1935 |
D32 |
888
|
9888
|
2449
|
(62449)
|
12/1906 |
13/11/1948 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1935 |
D32 |
889
|
9889
|
2450
|
(62450)
|
12/1906 |
26/02/1948 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
09/1935 |
D32 |
890
|
9890
|
2451
|
62451
|
01/1907 |
29/03/1951 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1935 |
D32 |
891
|
9891
|
2452
|
|
01/1907 |
11/1947 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
06/1935 |
D32 |
892
|
9892
|
2453
|
(62453)
|
01/1907 |
29/05/1948 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
07/1935 |
D32 |
893
|
9893
|
2454
|
(62454)
|
01/1907 |
09/1948 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
02/1935 |