LNER Gresley "D49" Class 4-4-0
Class | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shire/Hunt | 234 | 2700 | 62700 | 29/10/1927 | HLB 53D 53B W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1956 19/10/1957 08/10/1958 |
08/10/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 251 | 2701 | 62701 | 26/11/1927 | HLB BRI 53B 53D 53B 53A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1949 22/01/1955 18/06/1955 19/10/1957 20/06/1959 24/09/1959 |
24/09/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 253 | 2702 | 62702 | 11/1927 | STM 50A 50A 50B W |
St Margarets York (North) York (North) Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 13/09/1958 12/11/1958 |
12/11/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 256 | 2703 | 62703 | 08/12/1927 | HLB 53D 53D 53B W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 19/10/1957 24/06/1958 |
24/06/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 264 | 2704 | 62704 | 14/12/1927 | THJ W |
Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/08/1958 |
18/08/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 265 | 2705 | 62705 | 22/12/1927 | HAY W |
Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1959 |
30/11/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 266 | 2706 | 62706 | 28/12/1927 | HAY 62A W |
Haymarket Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/05/1957 03/02/1958 |
03/02/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 236 | 2707 | 62707 | 14/01/1928 | HLB BRI 53B 53D 53B 53D 53B 53A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1949 22/01/1955 18/06/1955 16/06/1956 20/10/1956 19/10/1957 20/06/1959 06/10/1959 |
06/10/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 270 | 2708 | 62708 | 20/01/1928 | THJ W |
Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/05/1959 |
04/05/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 277 | 2709 | 62709 | 24/01/1928 | HAY W |
Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1960 |
01/01/1960 |
Shire/Hunt | 245 | 2710 | 62710 | 07/02/1928 | HLB 53D 53B 53A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1954 22/01/1955 20/06/1959 03/10/1960 |
03/10/1960 |
Shire/Hunt | 281 | 2711 | 62711 | 09/02/1928 | HAY STM W |
Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 01/05/1961 |
01/05/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 246 | 2712 | 62712 | 20/02/1928 | HAY STM 62A 64G W |
Haymarket St Margarets Thornton Junction Hawick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 15/02/1958 09/04/1960 03/07/1961 |
03/07/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 249 | 2713 | 62713 | 21/02/1928 | DEE 62A 62A W 91N |
Dundee Tay Bridge Thornton Junction Thornton Junction Withdrawn To North Eastern Region (Re-instd) |
01/01/1948 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 09/09/1957 12/1957 |
09/09/1957 |
Shire/Hunt | 250 | 2714 | 62714 | 02/03/1928 | PTH 63B W |
Perth (LNER) Stirling Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 26/08/1959 |
26/08/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 306 | 2715 | 62715 | 06/03/1928 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/06/1959 |
29/06/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 307 | 2716 | 62716 | 17/03/1928 | THJ 64A W |
Thornton Junction St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1960 28/04/1961 |
28/04/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 309 | 2717 | 62717 | 26/03/1928 | THJ 53B 53B 53A W |
Thornton Junction Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1951 20/01/1951 20/06/1959 13/01/1961 |
13/01/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 310 | 2718 | 62718 | 03/05/1928 | DEE 64A 64A W |
Dundee Tay Bridge St Margarets St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 24/04/1961 |
24/04/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 311 | 2719 | 62719 | 05/05/1928 | HAY 64G W |
Haymarket Hawick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1959 01/01/1960 |
01/01/1960 |
Shire/Hunt | 318 | 2720 | 62720 | 07/05/1928 | HLB 53A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 06/10/1959 |
06/10/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 320 | 2721 | 62721 | 23/05/1928 | HAY STM W |
Haymarket St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1948 18/08/1958 |
18/08/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 322 | 2722 | 62722 | 10/07/1928 | HLB 53A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 20/10/1959 |
20/10/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 327 | 2723 | 62723 | 11/07/1928 | HLB 53A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 16/01/1961 |
16/01/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 335 | 2724 | 62724 | 28/08/1928 | HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1957 |
17/12/1957 |
Shire/Hunt | 329 | 2725 | 62725 | 30/08/1928 | PTH 63B W |
Perth (LNER) Stirling Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/10/1953 10/11/1958 |
10/11/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 352 | 2726 | 62726 | 15/03/1929 | SBK YK 50E W |
Starbeck York (North) Scarborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 19/09/1953 18/12/1957 |
18/12/1957 |
Shire/Hunt | 336 | 2727 | 62727 | 01/06/1929 | HLB YK 50D 50D 53A W |
Hull Botanic Gardens York (North) Starbeck Starbeck Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 19/09/1959 16/01/1961 |
16/01/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 2753 | 2728 | 62728 | 20/02/1929 | DEE 62A W |
Dundee Tay Bridge Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/03/1957 29/10/1959 |
29/10/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 2754 | 2729 | 62729 | 08/04/1929 | THJ THJ 64A W |
Thornton Junction Thornton Junction St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 09/04/1960 01/05/1961 |
01/05/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 2755 | 2730 | 62730 | 15/03/1929 | CAR 50D 50D 50A 50A 50C W |
Carlisle Canal Starbeck Starbeck York (North) York (North) Selby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1950 23/09/1950 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 13/09/1958 11/12/1958 |
11/12/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 2756 | 2731 | 62731 | 21/03/1929 | CAR 50D 50D 50A 50A 50E 50E 50F 50A 50D 50A 50C W |
Carlisle Canal Starbeck Starbeck York (North) York (North) Scarborough Scarborough Malton York (North) Starbeck York (North) Selby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1950 23/09/1950 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 14/02/1953 19/03/1955 23/07/1955 20/07/1957 03/04/1959 |
03/04/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 2757 | 2732 | 62732 | 28/03/1929 | CAR 50D 50D 50A 50A 12B 12B 12B 12B W |
Carlisle Canal Starbeck Starbeck York (North) York (North) Carlisle Canal Carlisle Canal Carlisle Canal Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1950 23/09/1950 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 15/07/1951 17/07/1951 21/07/1951 08/09/1951 03/11/1958 |
03/11/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 2758 | 2733 | 62733 | 28/03/1929 | HAY 62A 64A 64G W |
Haymarket Thornton Junction St Margarets Hawick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/02/1958 07/05/1960 11/02/1961 24/04/1961 |
24/04/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 2759 | 2734 | 62734 | 05/1929 | CAR 50D 50D 50A 50A 12B 12B 12B 12B W |
Carlisle Canal Starbeck Starbeck York (North) York (North) Carlisle Canal Carlisle Canal Carlisle Canal Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1950 23/09/1950 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 15/07/1951 17/07/1951 21/07/1951 08/09/1951 04/03/1961 |
04/03/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 2760 | 2735 | 62735 | 20/06/1929 | CAR 50D 50D 50A 50A 50E W |
Carlisle Canal Starbeck Starbeck York (North) York (North) Scarborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1950 23/09/1950 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 24/04/1954 25/08/1958 |
25/08/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 201 | 2736 | 62736 | 20/04/1932 | GHD YK 50D W |
Gateshead York (North) Starbeck Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 21/10/1950 19/06/1958 |
19/06/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 211 | 2737 | 62737 | 04/05/1932 | HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1958 |
01/01/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 220 | 2738 | 62738 | 03/05/1932 | GHD SBK 50A W |
Gateshead Starbeck York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 19/09/1959 21/09/1959 |
21/09/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 232 | 2739 | 62739 | 17/05/1932 | GHD NEV 50E 50E W |
Gateshead Neville Hill Scarborough Scarborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 11/10/1960 |
11/10/1960 |
Shire/Hunt | 235 | 2740 | 62740 | 02/06/1932 | YK 50D 50D 50B 50A 50C 53A W |
York (North) Starbeck Starbeck Neville Hill York (North) Selby Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 21/07/1956 06/12/1958 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 01/08/1960 |
01/08/1960 |
Shire/Hunt | 247 | 2741 | 62741 | 14/07/1932 | HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/10/1958 |
30/10/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 255 | 2742 | 62742 | 03/08/1932 | GHD YK 50B 50B W |
Gateshead York (North) Neville Hill Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 12/11/1958 |
12/11/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 269 | 2743 | 62743 | 23/08/1932 | HLB 64B 64B W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Haymarket Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1951 20/01/1951 09/05/1960 |
09/05/1960 |
Shire/Hunt | 273 | 2744 | 62744 | 12/10/1932 | HLB YK 62B 62B 62B 62A 64G W |
Hull Botanic Gardens York (North) Dundee Tay Bridge Dundee Tay Bridge Dundee Tay Bridge Thornton Junction Hawick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 23/02/1952 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 16/03/1957 09/04/1960 30/12/1960 |
30/12/1960 |
Shire/Hunt | 282 | 2745 | 62745 | 24/10/1932 | GHD YK 50D 50A 50E W |
Gateshead York (North) Starbeck York (North) Scarborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 18/12/1954 23/07/1955 13/09/1958 16/03/1959 |
16/03/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 283 | 2746 | 62746 | 18/08/1933 | HLB NEV SCA NEV 50A 50A 50D 50D W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Neville Hill Scarborough Neville Hill York (North) York (North) Starbeck Starbeck Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 15/05/1948 29/05/1948 28/07/1951 18/08/1951 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 16/05/1958 |
16/05/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 288 | 2747 | 62747 | 21/08/1933 | GHD BLA 50A 12C W |
Gateshead Blaydon York (North) Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 16/06/1956 08/11/1958 04/03/1961 |
04/03/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 292 | 2748 | 62748 | 23/08/1933 | NEV W |
Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1957 |
17/12/1957 |
Shire/Hunt | 297 | 2749 | 62749 | 30/08/1933 | NEV GHD SCA SBK 50B W |
Neville Hill Gateshead Scarborough Starbeck Neville Hill Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 21/08/1948 01/10/1949 17/12/1955 02/07/1958 |
02/07/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 298 | 2750 | 62750 | 01/09/1933 | GHD 53D 53B 53D 53B W |
Gateshead Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/03/1950 22/01/1955 18/06/1955 19/10/1957 04/11/1958 |
04/11/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 205 | 2751 | 62751 | 10/07/1934 | YK SCA W |
York (North) Scarborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 13/03/1959 |
13/03/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 214 | 2752 | 62752 | 14/07/1934 | SBK W |
Starbeck Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/07/1958 |
29/07/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 217 | 2753 | 62753 | 17/07/1934 | SBK 50A W |
Starbeck York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/09/1959 22/09/1959 |
22/09/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 222 | 2754 | 62754 | 20/07/1934 | HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/11/1958 |
03/11/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 226 | 2755 | 62755 | 23/07/1934 | YK SCA SBK SBK 50B 50C W |
York (North) Scarborough Starbeck Starbeck Neville Hill Selby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 12/1949 03/12/1949 16/06/1956 20/10/1956 12/11/1958 |
12/11/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 230 | 2756 | 62756 | 10/08/1934 | NEV 50E 50E W |
Neville Hill Scarborough Scarborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 30/04/1958 |
30/04/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 238 | 2757 | 62757 | 17/08/1934 | HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1957 |
10/12/1957 |
Shire/Hunt | 258 | 2758 | 62758 | 22/08/1934 | NEV W |
Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 11/12/1957 |
11/12/1957 |
Shire/Hunt | 274 | 2759 | 62759 | 28/08/1934 | YK 50D 53A W |
York (North) Starbeck Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/12/1954 19/09/1959 13/01/1961 |
13/01/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 279 | 2760 | 62760 | 03/09/1934 | YK 53B 53A W |
York (North) Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 20/06/1959 21/10/1959 |
21/10/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 353 | 2761 | 62761 | 12/09/1934 | YK 50D 50D 50B 50C W |
York (North) Starbeck Starbeck Neville Hill Selby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 21/07/1956 20/10/1956 06/12/1957 |
06/12/1957 |
Shire/Hunt | 357 | 2762 | 62762 | 22/09/1934 | SBK 50E W |
Starbeck Scarborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 13/10/1960 |
13/10/1960 |
Shire/Hunt | 359 | 2763 | 62763 | 28/09/1934 | YK SBK 53A W |
York (North) Starbeck Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 19/09/1959 16/01/1961 |
16/01/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 361 | 2764 | 62764 | 02/10/1934 | GHD SCA 50B 50B W |
Gateshead Scarborough Neville Hill Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1949 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 13/11/1958 |
13/11/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 362 | 2765 | 62765 | 11/10/1934 | NEV SBK 50C 53A W |
Neville Hill Starbeck Selby Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 16/01/1961 |
16/01/1961 |
Shire/Hunt | 363 | 2766 | 62766 | 15/11/1934 | GHD 53D 53B 53D 53B W |
Gateshead Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/03/1950 22/01/1955 18/06/1955 16/06/1956 30/09/1958 |
30/09/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 364 | 2767 | 62767 | 19/11/1934 | HLB W |
Hull Botanic Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1958 |
20/10/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 365 | 2768 | 62768 | 01/12/1934 | SBK W |
Starbeck Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/11/1952 |
03/11/1952 |
Shire/Hunt | 366 | 2769 | 62769 | 07/12/1934 | NEV SCA W |
Neville Hill Scarborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 12/09/1958 |
12/09/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 368 | 2770 | 62770 | 12/12/1934 | NEV SCA 50C 50A W |
Neville Hill Scarborough Selby York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 23/09/1959 |
23/09/1959 |
Shire/Hunt | 370 | 2771 | 62771 | 15/01/1935 | GHD BLA 50A W |
Gateshead Blaydon York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 16/06/1956 17/10/1958 |
17/10/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 374 | 2772 | 62772 | 22/01/1935 | NEV SBK 50B 50C W |
Neville Hill Starbeck Neville Hill Selby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1948 16/06/1956 20/10/1956 24/09/1958 |
24/09/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 375 | 2773 | 62773 | 26/01/1935 | SBK 50B W |
Starbeck Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/07/1957 05/08/1958 |
05/08/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 376 | 2774 | 62774 | 02/02/1935 | NEV SCA NEV SCA 50A 50A 50D 50B W |
Neville Hill Scarborough Neville Hill Scarborough York (North) York (North) Starbeck Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 15/05/1948 21/08/1948 02/10/1948 15/09/1951 22/09/1951 18/12/1954 20/07/1957 13/11/1958 |
13/11/1958 |
Shire/Hunt | 377 | 2775 | 62775 | 11/02/1935 | NEV 50C W |
Neville Hill Selby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1956 04/12/1958 |
04/12/1958 |