GER/LNER Holden "F3" Class 2-4-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 8080 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 8094 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 8080 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | LOW | Lowestoft | |
10/1936 | Condemned | 8090 | COND | ||||
02/1937 | Condemned | 8074 | COND | ||||
03/1937 | Condemned | 8076 | COND | ||||
03/1937 | Condemned | 8069 | COND | ||||
12/1937 | Condemned | 8098 | COND | ||||
02/1938 | Condemned | 8083 | COND | ||||
03/1938 | Condemned | 8065 | COND | ||||
04/1938 | Condemned | 8086 | COND | ||||
05/1938 | Condemned | 8084 | COND | ||||
07/1938 | Condemned | 8091 | COND | ||||
10/1938 | Condemned | 8087 | COND | ||||
11/1938 | Condemned | 8073 | COND | ||||
12/1938 | Condemned | 8080 | LOW | Lowestoft | COND | ||
03/1947 | Condemned | 7123 | COND | ||||
04/1947 | Condemned | 7121 | COND | ||||
04/1947 | Condemned | 7142 | COND | ||||
04/1947 | Condemned | 7145 | COND | ||||
06/1947 | Condemned | 7133 | COND | ||||
07/1947 | Condemned | 7148 | COND | ||||
08/1947 | Condemned | 7118 | COND | ||||
08/1947 | Condemned | 7125 | COND | ||||
08/1947 | Condemned | 7129 | COND | ||||
08/1947 | Condemned | 7138 | COND | ||||
08/1947 | Condemned | 7146 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7116 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7122 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7130 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7131 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7132 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7135 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7136 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7137 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7144 | COND | ||||
11/1947 | Condemned | 7147 | COND | ||||
12/1947 | Condemned | 7120 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7114 | LOW | Lowestoft | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7115 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7117 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7119 | LOW | Lowestoft | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7124 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7126 | LOW | Lowestoft | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7127 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7128 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7134 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7139 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7140 | MC | Melton Constable | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7141 | LOW | Lowestoft | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7143 | IPS | Ipswich | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7149 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7150 | MC | Melton Constable | |||
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7141 | LOW | Lowestoft | IPS | Ipswich | |
18/02/1948 | Condemned | 7119 | LOW | Lowestoft | COND | ||
12/03/1948 | Condemned | 7114 | LOW | Lowestoft | COND | ||
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 7117 | CAM | Cambridge | SL | South Lynn | |
08/05/1948 | Reallocation | 7140 | MC | Melton Constable | IPS | Ipswich | |
08/05/1948 | Reallocation | 7150 | MC | Melton Constable | IPS | Ipswich | |
13/05/1948 | Condemned | 7115 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
13/05/1948 | Condemned | 7117 | SL | South Lynn | COND | ||
15/05/1948 | Reallocation | 7126 | LOW | Lowestoft | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
29/05/1948 | Condemned | 7134 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
29/05/1948 | Condemned | 7141 | IPS | Ipswich | COND | ||
26/06/1948 | Reallocation | 8090 | 98W | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
22/07/1948 | Condemned | 7143 | IPS | Ipswich | COND | ||
03/1949 | Condemned | 67140 | IPS | Ipswich | COND | ||
05/03/1949 | Reallocation | 8065 | 98W | BID | Bidston | ||
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 67127 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | IPS | Ipswich | |
18/07/1949 | Condemned | 67149 | KL | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
10/1949 | Condemned | 67150 | IPS | Ipswich | COND | ||
01/1950 | Condemned | 67126 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
03/1950 | Condemned | 67124 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | COND | ||
27/08/1950 | Reallocation | 67127 | IPS | Ipswich | 32C | Lowestoft | |
23/09/1950 | Reallocation | 67127 | 32C | Lowestoft | 32C | Lowestoft | |
12/1950 | Condemned | 67139 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
04/12/1950 | Condemned | 67128 | IPS | Ipswich | COND | ||
17/01/1953 | Reallocation | 67127 | 32C | Lowestoft | 32B | Ipswich | |
08/04/1953 | Condemned | 67127 | 32B | Ipswich | COND |