GER/LNER Holden "F4" Class 2-4-2T
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
650 | 7650 | 07/1884 | 06/1927 | 42.92 | |||||||||
651 | 07/1884 | 12/1914 | 30.42 | ||||||||||
652 | 08/1884 | 10/1913 | 29.17 | ||||||||||
653 | 7653 | 09/1884 | 08/1923 | 38.92 | |||||||||
654 | 7654 | 09/1884 | 11/1927 | 43.17 | |||||||||
655 | 7655 | 09/1884 | 10/1926 | 42.08 | |||||||||
656 | 11/1884 | 12/1922 | 38.08 | ||||||||||
657 | 7657 | 11/1884 | 05/1926 | 41.5 | |||||||||
658 | 11/1884 | 06/1914 | 29.58 | ||||||||||
659 | 7659 | 11/1884 | 09/1925 | 40.83 | |||||||||
660 | 7660 | 12/1884 | 01/1926 | 41.08 | |||||||||
661 | 01/1885 | 09/1913 | 28.67 | ||||||||||
662 | 7662 | 03/1885 | 11/1926 | 41.67 | |||||||||
663 | 7663 | 03/1885 | 09/1925 | 40.5 | |||||||||
664 | 04/1885 | 09/1915 | 30.42 | ||||||||||
665 | 7665 | 05/1885 | 08/1926 | 41.25 | |||||||||
666 | 7666 | 06/1885 | 03/1926 | 40.75 | |||||||||
667 | 07/1885 | 12/1922 | 37.42 | ||||||||||
668 | 7668 | 07/1885 | 03/1926 | 40.67 | |||||||||
669 | 7669 | 07/1885 | 09/1926 | 41.17 | |||||||||
670 | 7670 | 08/1885 | 09/1927 | 42.08 | |||||||||
671 | 09/1885 | 12/1922 | 37.25 | ||||||||||
672 | 10/1885 | 09/1913 | 27.92 | ||||||||||
673 | 12/1885 | 12/1914 | 29 | ||||||||||
674 | 7674 | 10/1885 | 02/1926 | 40.33 | |||||||||
675 | 7675 | 12/1885 | 08/1927 | 41.67 | |||||||||
676 | 7676 | 01/1886 | 02/1926 | 40.08 | |||||||||
677 | 7677 | 02/1886 | 04/1925 | 39.17 | |||||||||
678 | 7678 | 03/1886 | 11/1929 | 43.67 | |||||||||
679 | 7679 | 02/1886 | 07/1925 | 39.42 | |||||||||
800 | 7800 | 09/1886 | 02/1927 | 40.42 | |||||||||
791 | 7791 | 09/1886 | 11/1924 | 38.17 | |||||||||
792 | 7792 | 10/1886 | 10/1926 | 40 | |||||||||
793 | 7793 | 10/1886 | 08/1923 | 36.83 | |||||||||
794 | 7794 | 11/1886 | 06/1925 | 38.58 | |||||||||
795 | 7795 | 11/1886 | 06/1927 | 40.58 | |||||||||
796 | 7796 | 12/1886 | 10/1924 | 37.83 | |||||||||
797 | 7797 | 01/1887 | 05/1927 | 40.33 | |||||||||
798 | 7798 | 01/1887 | 03/1927 | 40.17 | |||||||||
799 | 7799 | 01/1887 | 03/1926 | 39.17 | |||||||||
140 | 7140 | 06/1903 | 03/1932 | 28.75 | |||||||||
141 | 7141 | 7188 | 67188 | 06/1903 | 29/12/1955 | 09/1915 to F5 |
52.5 | ||||||
142 | 7142 | 7189 | 67189 | 06/1903 | 20/12/1956 | 11/1911 to F5 |
53.5 | ||||||
143 | 7143 | 7190 | 67190 | 06/1903 | 23/11/1955 | 10/1911 to F5 |
52.42 | ||||||
144 | 7144 | 7191 | 67191 | 06/1903 | 21/11/1955 | 06/1916 to F5 |
52.42 | ||||||
145 | 7145 | 7192 | 67192 | 07/1903 | 21/04/1958 | 09/1913 to F5 |
54.75 | ||||||
146 | 7146 | 07/1903 | 01/1930 | 26.5 | |||||||||
147 | 7147 | 7193 | 67193 | 07/1903 | 04/11/1957 | 04/1914 to F5 |
54.33 | ||||||
148 | 7148 | 08/1903 | 08/1931 | 28 | |||||||||
149 | 7149 | 08/1903 | 05/1931 | 27.75 | |||||||||
781 | 7781 | 7194 | 67194 | 10/1904 | 10/1956 | 11/1911 to F5 |
52 | ||||||
782 | 7782 | 7195 | 67195 | 11/1904 | 06/05/1958 | 12/1911 to F5 |
53.5 | 53.70 | |||||
783 | 7783 | 7196 | 67196 | 11/1904 | 07/03/1955 | 12/1911 to F5 |
50.33 | ||||||
784 | 7784 | 7197 | 67197 | 11/1904 | 14/03/1955 | 12/1911 to F5 |
50.33 | ||||||
785 | 7785 | 7198 | 67198 | 11/1904 | 15/08/1955 | 01/1912 to F5 |
50.75 | ||||||
786 | 7786 | 7199 | 67199 | 11/1904 | 05/02/1957 | 03/1912 to F5 |
52.25 | 46.28 | |||||
787 | 7787 | 7200 | 67200 | 11/1904 | 20/12/1957 | 12/1911 to F5 |
53.08 | 50.78 | |||||
788 | 7788 | 7201 | 67201 | 11/1904 | 17/12/1956 | 12/1911 to F5 |
52.08 | 52.29 | |||||
789 | 7789 | 7218 | 67218 | 12/1904 | 10/03/1958 | 07/1912 to F6 |
53.25 | ||||||
790 | 7790 | 7219 | 67219 | 12/1904 | 06/11/1956 | 11/1912 to F6 |
51.92 | 52.21 | |||||
91 | 7091 | 7202 | 67202 | 07/1905 | 16/12/1957 | 10/1913 to F5 |
52.42 | ||||||
92 | 7092 | 07/1905 | 04/1933 | 27.75 | |||||||||
93 | 7093 | 07/1905 | 05/1932 | 26.83 | |||||||||
94 | 7094 | 7203 | 67203 | 07/1905 | 16/12/1957 | 04/1913 to F5 |
52.42 | ||||||
95 | 7095 | 7204 | 67204 | 08/1905 | 27/09/1955 | 06/1913 to F5 |
50.08 | ||||||
96 | 7096 | 7205 | 67205 | 09/1905 | 23/11/1955 | 09/1911 to F5 |
50.17 | ||||||
97 | 7097 | 09/1905 | 12/1929 | 24.25 | |||||||||
98 | 7098 | 09/1905 | 11/1929 | 24.17 | |||||||||
99 | 7099 | 10/1905 | 05/1932 | 26.58 | |||||||||
100 | 7100 | 7206 | 67206 | 10/1905 | 27/09/1955 | 01/1912 to F5 |
49.92 | ||||||
101 | 7101 | 11/1905 | 11/1929 | 24 | |||||||||
102 | 7102 | 11/1905 | 02/1931 | 25.25 | |||||||||
103 | 7103 | 7207 | 67207 | 11/1905 | 06/12/1955 | 09/1911 to F5 |
50.08 | ||||||
104 | 7104 | 7208 | 67208 | 11/1905 | 10/01/1957 | 09/1911 to F5 |
51.17 | ||||||
105 | 7105 | 11/1905 | 03/1935 | 29.33 | |||||||||
106 | 7106 | 11/1905 | 02/1933 | 27.25 | |||||||||
107 | 7107 | 02/1906 | 12/1929 | 23.83 | |||||||||
108 | 7108 | 7209 | 67209 | 01/1906 | 18/02/1957 | 09/1911 to F5 |
51.08 | 51.12 | |||||
109 | 7109 | 7210 | 67210 | 02/1906 | 04/07/1955 | 09/1911 to F5 |
49.42 | 49.53 | |||||
110 | 7110 | 7211 | 67211 | 01/1906 | 10/1956 | 07/1913 to F5 |
50.75 | ||||||
780 | 7780 | 7212 | 67212 | 07/1906 | 05/05/1958 | 10/1914 to F5 |
51.83 | 52.04 | |||||
236 | 7236 | 7151 | 67151 | 07/1906 | 28/08/1951 | 45.08 | |||||||
237 | 7237 | 07/1906 | 09/1929 | 23.17 | |||||||||
238 | 7238 | 07/1906 | 07/1929 | 23 | |||||||||
239 | 7239 | 08/1906 | 11/1929 | 23.25 | |||||||||
240 | 7240 | 08/1906 | 06/1937 | 30.83 | |||||||||
241 | 7241 | 08/1906 | 10/1933 | 27.17 | |||||||||
242 | 7242 | 09/1906 | 10/1937 | 31.08 | |||||||||
243 | 7243 | 09/1906 | 12/1934 | 28.25 | |||||||||
244 | 7244 | 7152 | 67152 | 09/1906 | 04/02/1952 | 45.42 | |||||||
572 | 7572 | 02/1907 | 03/1933 | 26.08 | |||||||||
573 | 7573 | 7153 | 67153 | 03/1907 | 07/1951 | 44.33 | |||||||
574 | 7574 | 7154 | 67154 | 03/1907 | 03/09/1951 | 44.5 | |||||||
575 | 7575 | 03/1907 | 01/1931 | 23.83 | |||||||||
576 | 7576 | 03/1907 | 05/1937 | 30.17 | |||||||||
577 | 7577 | 04/1907 | 01/1931 | 23.75 | |||||||||
578 | 7578 | 7155 | 67155 | 04/1907 | 14/08/1951 | 44.33 | |||||||
579 | 7579 | 7156 | 67156 | 04/1907 | 11/1950 | 43.58 | |||||||
580 | 7580 | 04/1907 | 07/1937 | 30.25 | |||||||||
581 | 7581 | 7157 | 67157 | 05/1907 | 08/06/1956 | 49.08 | 49.29 | ||||||
582 | 7582 | 05/1907 | 03/1936 | 28.83 | |||||||||
583 | 7583 | 05/1907 | 05/1937 | 30 | |||||||||
584 | 7584 | 7158 | 67158 | 05/1907 | 13/01/1953 | 45.67 | |||||||
585 | 7585 | 05/1907 | 03/1933 | 25.83 | |||||||||
586 | 7586 | 7159 | 67159 | 06/1907 | 24/04/1948 | 40.83 | 40.86 | ||||||
587 | 7587 | 06/1907 | 10/1933 | 26.33 | |||||||||
588 | 7588 | 7160 | 67160 | 06/1907 | 04/1950 | 42.83 | |||||||
589 | 7589 | 7213 | 67213 | 06/1907 | 05/1955 | 06/1915 to F5 |
47.92 | 48.03 | |||||
590 | 7590 | 7214 | 67214 | 07/1907 | 05/05/1958 | 07/1915 to F5 |
50.83 | 50.87 | |||||
591 | 7591 | 07/1907 | 03/1933 | 25.67 | |||||||||
211 | 7211 | 08/1907 | 08/1934 | 27 | |||||||||
212 | 7212 | 08/1907 | 12/1933 | 26.33 | |||||||||
213 | 7213 | 09/1907 | 12/1933 | 26.25 | |||||||||
214 | 7214 | 7162 | 67162 | 09/1907 | 15/08/1955 | 47.92 | |||||||
215 | 7215 | 09/1907 | 05/1935 | 27.67 | |||||||||
216 | 7216 | 09/1907 | 03/1934 | 26.5 | |||||||||
217 | 7217 | 09/1907 | 04/1935 | 27.58 | |||||||||
218 | 7218 | 10/1907 | 03/1933 | 25.42 | |||||||||
219 | 7219 | 7163 | 67163 | 10/1907 | 12/12/1951 | 44.17 | |||||||
220 | 7220 | 10/1907 | 05/1934 | 26.58 | |||||||||
111 | 7111 | 7161 | 67161 | 11/1907 | 24/04/1948 | 40.42 | 40.44 | ||||||
221 | 7221 | 11/1907 | 06/1934 | 26.58 | |||||||||
222 | 7222 | 7164 | 67164 | 11/1907 | 27/08/1951 | 43.75 | |||||||
223 | 7223 | 11/1907 | 02/1935 | 27.25 | |||||||||
224 | 7224 | 11/1907 | 02/1935 | 27.25 | |||||||||
225 | 7225 | 11/1907 | 05/1935 | 27.5 | |||||||||
232 | 7232 | 7165 | 67165 | 11/1907 | 15/01/1951 | 43.17 | |||||||
233 | 7233 | 7166 | 67166 | 12/1907 | 09/04/1951 | 43.33 | 43.36 | ||||||
234 | 7234 | 12/1907 | 04/1933 | 25.33 | |||||||||
235 | 7235 | 12/1907 | 06/1935 | 27.5 | |||||||||
170 | 7170 | 7215 | 67215 | 08/1908 | 19/09/1955 | 01/1915 to F5 |
47.08 | ||||||
171 | 7171 | 7167 | 67167 | 09/1908 | 04/1948 | 39.58 | 39.61 | ||||||
172 | 7172 | 7168 | 67168 | 09/1908 | 24/04/1948 | 39.58 | 39.61 | ||||||
173 | 7173 | 7169 | 67169 | 09/1908 | 24/04/1948 | 39.58 | 39.61 | ||||||
174 | 7174 | 7170 | 67170 | 09/1908 | 24/04/1948 | 39.58 | |||||||
175 | 7175 | 7171 | 67171 | 10/1908 | 01/08/1951 | 42.83 | |||||||
176 | 7176 | 10/1908 | 04/1943 | 34.5 | |||||||||
177 | 7177 | 7172 | 67172 | 10/1908 | 24/04/1948 | 39.5 | 39.53 | ||||||
178 | 7178 | 7173 | 67173 | 10/1908 | 24/04/1948 | 39.5 | |||||||
179 | 7179 | 7216 | 67216 | 11/1908 | 17/12/1956 | 12/1914 to F5 |
48.08 | ||||||
180 | 7180 | 7174 | 67174 | 11/1908 | 13/12/1954 | 46.08 | 46.78 | ||||||
181 | 7181 | 11/1908 | 11/1935 | 27 | |||||||||
182 | 7182 | 12/1908 | 01/1931 | 22.08 | |||||||||
183 | 7183 | 12/1908 | 10/1934 | 25.83 | |||||||||
184 | 7184 | 7175 | 67175 | 12/1908 | 01/08/1951 | 42.67 | |||||||
185 | 7185 | 7176 | 67176 | 01/1909 | 22/07/1953 | 44.5 | |||||||
186 | 7186 | 7177 | 67177 | 01/1909 | 12/03/1951 | 42.17 | |||||||
187 | 7187 | 7178 | 67178 | 02/1909 | 18/08/1952 | 43.5 | |||||||
188 | 7188 | 7217 | 67217 | 02/1909 | 21/11/1955 | 06/1920 to F5 |
46.75 | ||||||
189 | 7189 | 7179 | 67179 | 02/1909 | 24/04/1948 | 39.17 | |||||||
71 | 7071 | 7180 | 67180 | 03/1909 | 24/04/1948 | 39.08 | 39.11 | ||||||
72 | 7072 | 7181 | 67181 | 03/1909 | 24/04/1948 | 39.08 | 39.11 | ||||||
73 | 7073 | 03/1909 | 03/1935 | 26 | |||||||||
74 | 7074 | 7182 | 67182 | 03/1909 | 12/01/1953 | 43.83 | |||||||
75 | 7075 | 7183 | 67183 | 04/1909 | 04/1950 | 41 | |||||||
76 | 7076 | 7184 | 67184 | 04/1909 | 08/12/1952 | 43.67 | |||||||
77 | 7077 | 7185 | 67185 | 04/1909 | 24/04/1948 | 39 | 39.03 | ||||||
78 | 7078 | 7186 | 67186 | 04/1909 | 22/07/1953 | 44.25 | |||||||
79 | 7079 | 7187 | 67187 | 05/1909 | 18/08/1955 | 46.25 | 46.28 | ||||||
80 | 7080 | 05/1909 | 02/1936 | 26.75 |