GER/LNER Holden "F6" Class 2-4-2T
Class | GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
F6 | 789 | 7789 | 7218 | 67218 | 12/1904 | STR LOW YAR 30A 32D 30A W |
Stratford Lowestoft Yarmouth South Town Stratford Yarmouth South Town Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 12/11/1949 23/10/1954 13/11/1954 23/04/1955 10/03/1958 |
10/03/1958 |
F6 | 800 | 7790 | 7219 | 67219 | 12/1904 | STR COL 30A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 22/03/1952 06/11/1956 |
06/11/1956 |
F6 | 61 | 7061 | 7220 | 67220 | 04/1911 | STR IPS W |
Stratford Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 25/07/1955 |
25/07/1955 |
F6 | 62 | 7062 | 7221 | 67221 | 04/1911 | STR CAM KL 31E 31E 31A 31A 31C 31A 30A W |
Stratford Cambridge Kings Lynn Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Cambridge Kings Lynn Cambridge Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/01/1950 21/01/1950 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 23/10/1954 25/12/1954 17/12/1955 31/10/1957 |
31/10/1957 |
F6 | 63 | 7063 | 7222 | 67222 | 04/1911 | STR KL CAM 31E 31E W |
Stratford Kings Lynn Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 21/01/1950 09/08/1952 23/08/1952 17/08/1955 |
17/08/1955 |
F6 | 64 | 7064 | 7223 | 67223 | 05/1911 | YB 32C W |
Yarmouth Beach Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 13/12/1955 |
13/12/1955 |
F6 | 65 | 7065 | 7224 | 67224 | 05/1911 | STR YAR LOW 32A 32G 32A 32A 32G 32C W |
Stratford Yarmouth South Town Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Melton Constable Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Melton Constable Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 30/11/1949 09/07/1950 30/07/1950 17/09/1950 23/09/1950 20/10/1951 17/12/1955 19/11/1956 |
19/11/1956 |
F6 | 66 | 7066 | 7225 | 67225 | 05/1911 | STR MC 30E W |
Stratford Melton Constable Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 17/12/1955 28/05/1956 |
28/05/1956 |
F6 | 67 | 7067 | 7226 | 67226 | 05/1911 | YB 32C W |
Yarmouth Beach Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 14/11/1955 |
14/11/1955 |
F6 | 68 | 7068 | 7227 | 67227 | 05/1911 | STR KL 31D 31C 31D 31D 31A 31A 31C 31A 30A 30E W |
Stratford Kings Lynn South Lynn Kings Lynn South Lynn South Lynn Cambridge Cambridge Kings Lynn Cambridge Stratford Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 06/05/1950 31/05/1950 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 26/01/1952 16/02/1952 23/10/1954 25/12/1954 17/12/1955 16/06/1956 08/05/1958 |
08/05/1958 |
F6 | 69 | 7069 | 7228 | 67228 | 06/1911 | STR MC 30A 30E 30A W |
Stratford Melton Constable Stratford Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 10/12/1949 17/12/1955 24/03/1956 08/01/1958 21/04/1958 |
21/04/1958 |
F6 | 70 | 7070 | 7229 | 67229 | 06/1911 | PKS NOR 32G 32G 32D 32C W |
Parkeston Quay Norwich Thorpe Melton Constable Melton Constable Yarmouth South Town Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/07/1948 25/12/1948 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 25/09/1954 13/11/1954 18/03/1958 |
18/03/1958 |
F6 | 1 | 7001 | 7230 | 67230 | 10/1911 | STR COL LOW 30A W |
Stratford Colchester Lowestoft Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 07/02/1948 17/11/1956 13/05/1958 |
13/05/1958 |
F6 | 2 | 7002 | 7231 | 67231 | 10/1911 | STR LOW NOR NOR 32C W |
Stratford Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 30/11/1949 10/12/1949 09/07/1950 14/03/1958 |
14/03/1958 |
F6 | 3 | 7003 | 7232 | 67232 | 11/1911 | STR COL LOW NOR NOR 32C W |
Stratford Colchester Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 21/02/1948 07/1949 16/07/1949 23/06/1951 14/11/1955 |
14/11/1955 |
F6 | 4 | 7004 | 7233 | 67233 | 11/1911 | YB LOW YB 32C W |
Yarmouth Beach Lowestoft Yarmouth Beach Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1949 21/01/1950 24/10/1953 13/12/1955 |
13/12/1955 |
F6 | 5 | 7005 | 7234 | 67234 | 11/1911 | YB 32C W |
Yarmouth Beach Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 17/08/1956 |
17/08/1956 |
F6 | 6 | 7006 | 7235 | 67235 | 12/1911 | YB 32D W 30A |
Yarmouth Beach Yarmouth South Town Withdrawn Stratford |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 16/01/1956 21/01/1956 |
16/01/1956 |
F6 | 7 | 7007 | 7236 | 67236 | 12/1911 | KL 31B 31B 31E 31E W |
Kings Lynn March March Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 13/12/1952 27/12/1952 17/08/1955 |
17/08/1955 |
F6 | 8 | 7008 | 7237 | 67237 | 01/1912 | BSE KL BSE 31A 31A 31E W |
Bury St Edmunds Kings Lynn Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 30/11/1949 03/12/1949 15/11/1952 29/11/1952 20/06/1953 08/1953 |
08/1953 |
F6 | 9 | 7009 | 7238 | 67238 | 01/1912 | BSE CAM CAM 31E 31E 31A W |
Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 30/11/1949 09/08/1952 23/08/1952 20/06/1953 07/11/1955 |
07/11/1955 |
F6 | 10 | 7010 | 7239 | 67239 | 01/1912 | KL IPS W |
Kings Lynn Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 30/12/1955 |
30/12/1955 |