NER/LNER Raven "H1" Class 4-4-4T
NER | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2143 | 9850 | 69850 | 10/1913 | Neville Hill | 21/06/1960 | 05/12/1933 to A8 |
Sunderland | 46.67 | 46.87 | |||
2144 | 9851 | 69851 | 10/1913 | Saltburn | 11/11/1958 | 26/03/1935 to A8 |
West Auckland | 45.08 | 45.78 | |||
2145 | 9852 | 69852 | 11/1913 | Saltburn | 04/11/1959 | 02/1936 to A8 |
Sunderland | 46 | 46.11 | |||
2146 | 9853 | 69853 | 11/1913 | Saltburn | 25/01/1960 | 09/05/1935 to A8 |
Sunderland | 46.17 | 46.28 | |||
2147 | 9854 | 69854 | 12/1913 | Neville Hill | 10/05/1960 | 31/08/1933 to A8 |
Sunderland | 46.42 | 46.45 | |||
2148 | 9855 | 69855 | 12/1913 | Saltburn | 25/01/1960 | 26/03/1936 to A8 |
Sunderland | 46.08 | 46.20 | |||
2149 | 9856 | 69856 | 12/1913 | Saltburn | 02/12/1959 | 07/09/1934 to A8 |
West Auckland | 46 | 46.03 | |||
2150 | 9857 | 69857 | 01/1914 | Saltburn | 05/02/1960 | 14/06/1935 to A8 |
Sunderland | 46.08 | 46.12 | |||
2151 | 9858 | 69858 | 12/1913 | Saltburn | 10/05/1960 | 11/06/1936 to A8 |
Sunderland | 46.42 | 46.45 | |||
2152 | 9859 | 69859 | 12/1913 | Saltburn | 08/02/1960 | 13/03/1936 to A8 |
Sunderland | 46.17 | 46.20 | |||
2153 | 9860 | 69860 | 12/1913 | Gateshead | 14/06/1960 | 08/08/1934 to A8 |
Thornaby | 46.5 | 46.78 | |||
2154 | 9861 | 69861 | 12/1913 | Gateshead | 20/06/1960 | 23/08/1935 to A8 |
Malton | 46.5 | 46.70 | |||
2155 | 9862 | 69862 | 02/1914 | Gateshead | 30/07/1958 | 15/01/1933 to A8 |
Sunderland | 44.42 | 44.61 | |||
2156 | 9863 | 69863 | 02/1914 | Gateshead | 03/11/1958 | 05/09/1935 to A8 |
Sunderland | 44.75 | 45.03 | |||
2157 | 9864 | 69864 | 02/1914 | Heaton | 29/10/1958 | 27/06/1935 to A8 |
Whitby | 44.67 | 45.03 | |||
2158 | 9865 | 69865 | 03/1914 | Heaton | 21/04/1958 | 24/05/1935 to A8 |
Whitby | 44.08 | 44.53 | |||
2159 | 9866 | 69866 | 03/1914 | Heaton | 18/11/1958 | 30/08/1934 to A8 |
Thornaby | 44.67 | 44.78 | |||
2160 | 9867 | 69867 | 03/1914 | Heaton | 23/12/1959 | 14/07/1936 to A8 |
Scarborough | 45.75 | 45.87 | |||
2161 | 9868 | 69868 | 04/1914 | Starbeck | 07/11/1957 | 23/01/1936 to A8 |
West Auckland | 43.58 | 43.62 | |||
2162 | 9869 | 69869 | 04/1914 | Saltburn | 13/06/1960 | 30/06/1931 to A8 |
Thornaby | 46.17 | 46.45 | |||
1517 | 9870 | 69870 | 05/1920 | Gateshead | 24/06/1960 | 12/08/1936 to A8 |
Sunderland | 40.08 | 40.28 | |||
1518 | 9871 | 69871 | 06/1920 | Neville Hill | 07/11/1958 | 18/05/1933 to A8 |
Darlington | 38.42 | 38.44 | |||
1519 | 9872 | 69872 | 06/1920 | Heaton | 16/10/1958 | 05/09/1934 to A8 |
Sunderland | 38.33 | 38.36 | |||
1520 | 9873 | 69873 | 06/1920 | Starbeck | 08/02/1960 | 08/04/1935 to A8 |
Sunderland | 39.67 | 39.70 | |||
1523 | 9874 | 69874 | 06/1920 | Heaton | 20/05/1960 | 25/04/1935 to A8 |
Sunderland | 39.92 | 40.03 | |||
1528 | 9875 | 69875 | 06/1920 | Starbeck | 20/05/1960 | 03/01/1933 to A8 |
Sunderland | 39.92 | 40.03 | |||
1529 | 9876 | 69876 | 06/1920 | Heaton | 21/10/1957 | 05/1934 to A8 |
Middlesbrough | 37.33 | 37.44 | |||
1531 | 9877 | 69877 | 06/1920 | Neville Hill | 30/12/1959 | 23/02/1934 to A8 |
Scarborough | 39.5 | 39.61 | |||
1499 | 9878 | 69878 | 06/1921 | Heaton | 24/06/1960 | 24/06/1936 to A8 |
Sunderland | 39 | 39.19 | |||
1500 | 9879 | 69879 | 03/1922 | Starbeck | 20/11/1958 | 19/05/1934 to A8 |
Hull Botanic Gardens | 36.67 | 36.78 | |||
1501 | 9880 | 69880 | 06/1921 | Heaton | 23/06/1960 | 23/01/1934 to A8 |
West Hartlepool | 39 | 39.11 | |||
1502 | 9881 | 69881 | 07/1921 | Darlington | 02/06/1958 | 16/04/1936 to A8 |
Scarborough | 36.92 | 37.02 | |||
1503 | 9882 | 69882 | 07/1921 | Darlington | 19/11/1958 | 13/02/1936 to A8 |
Thornaby | 37.33 | 37.36 | |||
1524 | 9883 | 69883 | 08/1921 | Darlington | 01/06/1960 | 09/08/1934 to A8 |
Sunderland | 38.83 | 38.86 | |||
1525 | 9884 | 69884 | 08/1921 | Darlington | 04/11/1958 | 14/06/1933 to A8 |
West Hartlepool | 37.25 | 37.36 | |||
1526 | 9885 | 69885 | 09/1921 | Darlington | 20/06/1960 | 20/05/1936 to A8 |
Scarborough | 38.75 | 39.03 | |||
1527 | 9886 | 69886 | 09/1921 | Darlington | 21/06/1960 | 28/05/1936 to A8 |
Malton | 38.75 | 38.86 | |||
1327 | 9887 | 69887 | 10/1921 | Darlington | 16/12/1959 | 10/01/1934 to A8 |
Darlington | 38.17 | 38.28 | |||
1329 | 9888 | 69888 | 11/1921 | Blaydon | 01/10/1958 | 01/05/1934 to A8 |
Hull Botanic Gardens | 36.92 | 36.94 | |||
1330 | 9889 | 69889 | 12/1921 | Blaydon | 30/05/1960 | 26/05/1934 to A8 |
Sunderland | 38.42 | 38.53 | |||
1521 | 9890 | 69890 | 12/1921 | Blaydon | 13/01/1958 | 09/10/1935 to A8 |
Malton | 36.08 | 36.27 | |||
1328 | 9891 | 69891 | 02/1922 | Blaydon | 16/09/1958 | 14/05/1934 to A8 |
Thornaby | 36.58 | ||||
1326 | 9892 | 69892 | 02/1922 | Neville Hill | 05/11/1958 | 04/03/1935 to A8 |
West Hartlepool | 36.75 | 36.77 | |||
1522 | 9893 | 69893 | 05/1922 | Blaydon | 19/11/1958 | 08/02/1934 to A8 |
Durham | 36.5 | 37.02 | |||
1530 | 9894 | 69894 | 05/1922 | Starbeck | 23/06/1960 | 09/03/1935 to A8 |
West Hartlepool | 38.08 | 38.19 |