NER/LNER Raven "H1" Class 4-4-4T
Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR | Build Date | Rebuild | Rebuild Date | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2143 | 9850 | 69850 | 10/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 05/12/1933 | |
2144 | 9851 | 69851 | 10/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 26/03/1935 | |
2145 | 9852 | 69852 | 11/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 02/1936 | |
2146 | 9853 | 69853 | 11/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 09/05/1935 | |
2147 | 9854 | 69854 | 12/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 31/08/1933 | |
2148 | 9855 | 69855 | 12/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 26/03/1936 | |
2149 | 9856 | 9856 69856 |
12/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 07/09/1934 | |
2150 | 9857 | 69857 | 01/1914 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 14/06/1935 | |
2151 | 9858 | 69858 | 12/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 11/06/1936 | |
2152 | 9859 | 69859 | 12/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 13/03/1936 | |
2153 | 9860 | 69860 | 12/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 08/08/1934 | |
2154 | 9861 | 69861 | 12/1913 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 23/08/1935 | |
2155 | 9862 | 69862 | 02/1914 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 15/01/1933 | |
2156 | 9863 | 69863 | 02/1914 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 05/09/1935 | |
2157 | 9864 | 69864 | 02/1914 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 27/06/1935 | |
2158 | 9865 | 69865 | 03/1914 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 24/05/1935 | |
2159 | 9866 | 69866 | 03/1914 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 30/08/1934 | |
2160 | 9867 | 9867 69867 |
03/1914 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 14/07/1936 | |
2161 | 9868 | 69868 | 04/1914 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 23/01/1936 | |
2162 | 9869 | 69869 | 04/1914 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 30/06/1931 | |
1517 | 9870 | 69870 | 05/1920 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 12/08/1936 | |
1518 | 9871 | 69871 | 06/1920 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 18/05/1933 | |
1519 | 9872 | 69872 | 06/1920 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 05/09/1934 | |
1520 | 9873 | 69873 | 06/1920 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 08/04/1935 | |
1523 | 9874 | 69874 | 06/1920 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 25/04/1935 | |
1528 | 9875 | 69875 | 06/1920 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 03/01/1933 | |
1529 | 9876 | 69876 | 06/1920 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 05/1934 | |
1531 | 9877 | 69877 | 06/1920 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 23/02/1934 | |
1499 | 9878 | 69878 | 06/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 24/06/1936 | |
1500 | 9879 | 9879 69879 |
03/1922 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 19/05/1934 | |
1501 | 9880 | 69880 | 06/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 23/01/1934 | |
1502 | 9881 | 69881 | 07/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 16/04/1936 | |
1503 | 9882 | 69882 | 07/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 13/02/1936 | |
1524 | 9883 | 69883 | 08/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 09/08/1934 | |
1525 | 9884 | 69884 | 08/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 14/06/1933 | |
1526 | 9885 | 69885 | 09/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 20/05/1936 | |
1527 | 9886 | 69886 | 09/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 28/05/1936 | |
1327 | 9887 | 69887 | 10/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 10/01/1934 | |
1329 | 9888 | 69888 | 11/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 01/05/1934 | |
1330 | 9889 | 69889 | 12/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 26/05/1934 | |
1521 | 9890 | 69890 | 12/1921 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 09/10/1935 | |
1328 | 9891 | 69891 | 02/1922 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 14/05/1934 | |
1326 | 9892 | 69892 | 02/1922 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 04/03/1935 | |
1522 | 9893 | 69893 | 05/1922 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 08/02/1934 | |
1530 | 9894 | 69894 | 05/1922 | Rebuilt from H1 to A8 | 09/03/1935 |