MET/LNER "H2" Class 4-4-4T
Class | MET | LNER (1943) | LNER (1946) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
H2 | 103 | 6415 | 7510 | 10/1920 | NEA CLK W |
Neasden Colwick Withdrawn |
10/1920 06/12/1941 04/03/1946 |
04/03/1946 |
H2 | 104 | 6416 | 7511 | 10/1920 | NEA CLK W |
Neasden Colwick Withdrawn |
10/1920 05/12/1941 20/11/1947 |
20/11/1947 |
H2 | 105 | 6417 | 7512 | 11/1920 | NEA CLK W |
Neasden Colwick Withdrawn |
11/1920 07/12/1941 17/10/1947 |
17/10/1947 |
H2 | 106 | 6418 | 7513 | 11/1920 | NEA CLK W |
Neasden Colwick Withdrawn |
11/1920 04/12/1941 21/05/1946 |
21/05/1946 |
H2 | 107 | 6419 | 7514 | 03/1921 | NEA CLK W |
Neasden Colwick Withdrawn |
03/1921 05/12/1941 23/09/1943 |
23/09/1943 |
H2 | 108 | 6420 | 7515 | 04/1921 | NEA LNG CLK W |
Neasden Langwith Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
04/1921 12/12/1941 14/08/1942 03/01/1946 |
03/01/1946 |
H2 | 109 | 6421 | 06/1921 | NEA CLK LNG W |
Neasden Colwick Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
06/1921 06/12/1941 12/12/1941 15/04/1942 |
15/04/1942 | |
H2 | 110 | 6422 | 7516 | 06/1921 | NEA CLK LNG CLK W |
Neasden Colwick Langwith Junction Colwick Withdrawn |
06/1921 04/12/1941 12/12/1941 18/07/1942 04/05/1946 |
04/05/1946 |