Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1619 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15025 Week
» 68041 Month
» 187568 Year
» 3214421 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GNR/LNER Ivatt "J1" Class 0-6-0
GNR |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
1
|
5000
|
|
08/1908 |
|
08/1947 |
|
39 |
|
|
|
39.11 |
2
|
5001
|
|
09/1908 |
|
08/1947 |
|
38.92 |
|
|
|
39.02 |
3
|
5002
|
65002
|
09/1908 |
|
21/08/1954 |
|
45.92 |
|
|
|
45.95 |
4
|
5003
|
65003
|
09/1908 |
|
12/01/1953 |
|
44.33 |
|
|
|
44.36 |
5
|
5004
|
65004
|
09/1908 |
|
17/11/1952 |
|
44.17 |
|
|
|
44.20 |
6
|
5005
|
65005
|
09/1908 |
|
19/05/1952 |
|
43.67 |
|
|
|
43.69 |
7
|
5006
|
65006
|
10/1908 |
|
07/1951 |
|
42.75 |
|
|
|
42.95 |
8
|
5007
|
65007
|
10/1908 |
|
04/02/1952 |
|
43.33 |
|
|
|
43.36 |
9
|
5008
|
65008
|
10/1908 |
|
24/03/1952 |
|
43.42 |
|
|
|
43.44 |
10
|
5009
|
65009
|
10/1908 |
|
31/03/1952 |
|
43.42 |
|
|
|
43.53 |
11
|
5010
|
65010
|
10/1908 |
|
19/01/1953 |
|
44.25 |
|
|
|
44.28 |
12
|
5011
|
|
11/1908 |
|
08/1947 |
|
38.75 |
|
|
|
38.86 |
13
|
5012
|
|
11/1908 |
|
08/1947 |
|
38.75 |
|
|
|
38.86 |
14
|
5013
|
65013
|
11/1908 |
|
22/11/1954 |
|
46 |
|
|
|
46.11 |
15
|
5014
|
65014
|
11/1908 |
|
05/08/1953 |
|
44.75 |
|
|
|
44.78 |