Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 167 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6556 Week
» 26998 Month
» 363844 Year
» 1585409 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "J3" Class 0-6-0


Class GNR MGNR LNER (1924) LNER (1936) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
J3 102   3102       12/1881 W Withdrawn 10/1931 10/1931
J3 716   3716       08/1882 W Withdrawn 07/1931 07/1931
J3 717   3717       08/1882 W Withdrawn 11/1939 11/1939
J3 721   3721       09/1882 W Withdrawn 05/1933 05/1933
J3 724   3724       10/1882 W Withdrawn 12/1929 12/1929
J3 730   3730       11/1882 W Withdrawn 07/1930 07/1930
J3 731   3731       06/1882 W Withdrawn 05/1934 05/1934
J3 748   3748       11/1882 W Withdrawn 09/1930 09/1930
J3 792   3792       04/1886 W Withdrawn 04/1930 04/1930
J3 793   3793       05/1886 W Withdrawn 07/1933 07/1933
J3 799   3799       10/1886 W Withdrawn 09/1930 09/1930
J3 342   3342       02/1890 W Withdrawn 03/1929 03/1929
J3 378   3378       08/1890 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
J3 379   3379       07/1891 W Withdrawn 05/1932 05/1932
J3 837   3837       08/1891 W Withdrawn 12/1929 12/1929
J3 850   3850       04/1892 W Withdrawn 01/1940 01/1940
J3 313   3313   4105 64105 12/1892 W Withdrawn 21/01/1952 21/01/1952
J3 1011   4011       01/1894 W Withdrawn 01/1940 01/1940
J3 1012   4012       02/1894 W Withdrawn 06/1930 06/1930
J3 1031   4031       06/1896 W Withdrawn 10/1931 10/1931
J3 1032   4032       06/1896 W Withdrawn 01/1926 01/1926
J3 1033   4033       06/1896 W Withdrawn 07/1938 07/1938
J3 1035   4035   4106 64106 06/1896 91E
W
To Eastern Region (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
05/1939
10/1939
05/1949
05/1949
J3 1036   4036   4107 64107 06/1896 W Withdrawn 16/10/1948 16/10/1948
J3 1037   4037       06/1896 W Withdrawn 02/1939 02/1939
J3 1039   4039   4108   07/1896 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3 1045   4045       07/1896 W Withdrawn 10/1935 10/1935
J3 1081   4081       09/1896 W Withdrawn 02/1939 02/1939
J3 1082   4082       10/1896 W Withdrawn 04/1935 04/1935
J3 1086   4086       11/1896 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935
J3 1087   4087       11/1896 W Withdrawn 10/1931 10/1931
J3 1088   4088   4111   11/1896 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3 1091   4091       12/1897 W Withdrawn 11/1932 11/1932
J3 1092   4092   4113   12/1897 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3 1093   4093   4114 64114 12/1897 W Withdrawn 10/1952 10/1952
J3 1094   4094   4115 64115 12/1897 W Withdrawn 03/1951 03/1951
J3 1095   4095       01/1898 W Withdrawn 04/1934 04/1934
J3 1096   4096       02/1898 W Withdrawn 11/1938 11/1938
J3 1097   4097   4116 64116 02/1898 W Withdrawn 02/06/1952 02/06/1952
J3 1098   4098       02/1898 W Withdrawn 05/1933 05/1933
J3 1099   4099       02/1898 W Withdrawn 11/1937 11/1937
J3 1100   4100   4117 64117 03/1898 W Withdrawn 06/1952 06/1952
J3 1101   4101       12/1898 W Withdrawn 04/1933 04/1933
J3 1102   4102       12/1898 W Withdrawn 11/1932 11/1932
J3 1103   4103   4118 64118 01/1899 37A
W
Ardsley
Withdrawn
22/03/1952
02/06/1952
02/06/1952
J3 1104   4104       01/1899 W Withdrawn 10/1935 10/1935
J3 1105   4105   4119 64119 01/1899 W Withdrawn 07/1951 07/1951
J3 1108   4108       02/1899 W Withdrawn 09/1935 09/1935
J3 1109   4109   4122 64122 02/1899 W Withdrawn 04/1953 04/1953
J3 1110   4110       02/1899 W Withdrawn 08/1938 08/1938
J3 1111   4111       03/1899 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
J3 1112   4112       03/1899 W Withdrawn 07/1932 07/1932
J3 1113   4113   4123 64123 03/1899 W Withdrawn 21/05/1951 21/05/1951
J3 1114   4114   4124 64124 03/1899 W Withdrawn 10/1951 10/1951
J3 1115   4115       03/1899 W Withdrawn 01/1933 01/1933
J3 1116   4116       04/1899 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
J3 1117   4117       04/1899 W Withdrawn 04/1933 04/1933
J3 1118   4118       04/1899 W Withdrawn 03/1934 03/1934
J3 1119   4119       04/1899 W Withdrawn 07/1932 07/1932
J3 1120   4120       04/1899 W Withdrawn 11/1932 11/1932
J3 1121   4121       04/1899 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
J3 1122   4122       04/1899 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
J3 1123   4123       04/1899 W Withdrawn 03/1934 03/1934
J3 1124   4124       04/1899 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
J3 1125   4125     64125 05/1899 W Withdrawn 31/12/1953 31/12/1953
J3 1126   4126       05/1899 91E
W
To Eastern Region (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
08/1939
04/1940
02/1946
02/1946
J3 1127   4127       05/1899 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
J3 1128   4128       05/1899 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936
J3 1129   4129   4127 64127 05/1899 W Withdrawn 04/1949 04/1949
J3 1130   4130       05/1899 W Withdrawn 07/1932 07/1932
J3 1131   4131   4128 64128 05/1899 W Withdrawn 25/11/1950 25/11/1950
J3 1132   4132       05/1899 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935
J3 1133   4133   4129 64129 05/1899 W Withdrawn 01/09/1952 01/09/1952
J3 1134   4134   4130   05/1899 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3 1135   4135       05/1899 W Withdrawn 02/1932 02/1932
J3 315   3315       08/1898 W Withdrawn 11/1932 11/1932
J3 316   3316       08/1898 W Withdrawn 10/1931 10/1931
J3 318   3318       08/1898 W Withdrawn 07/1932 07/1932
J3 329   3329   4131 64131 08/1898 W Withdrawn 13/12/1954 13/12/1954
J3 331   3331   4132 64132 09/1898 36E
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
24/10/1953
14/06/1954
14/06/1954
J3 332   3332   4133 64133 08/1898 W Withdrawn 19/01/1953 19/01/1953
J3 334   3334       08/1898 W Withdrawn 05/1929 05/1929
J3 336   3336   4134   09/1898 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3 337   3337       09/1898 W Withdrawn 12/1935 12/1935
J3 338   3338       10/1898 W Withdrawn 05/1933 05/1933
J3 343   3343       07/1899 W Withdrawn 04/1933 04/1933
J3 344   3344       07/1899 W Withdrawn 04/1933 04/1933
J3 345   3345   4135 64135 07/1899 W Withdrawn 01/1951 01/1951
J3 349   3349       06/1899 W Withdrawn 07/1934 07/1934
J3 350   3350   4136 64136 07/1899 W Withdrawn 25/03/1948 25/03/1948
J3 351   3351       07/1899 W Withdrawn 02/1932 02/1932
J3 352   3352       07/1899 W Withdrawn 09/1934 09/1934
J3 353   3353       06/1899 W Withdrawn 07/1932 07/1932
J3 359   3359       07/1899 W Withdrawn 02/1932 02/1932
J3 361   3361       08/1899 W Withdrawn 05/1932 05/1932
J3 362   3362       08/1899 W Withdrawn 07/1932 07/1932
J3 368   3368       09/1899 W Withdrawn 11/1932 11/1932
J3 371   3371       08/1899 W Withdrawn 10/1935 10/1935
J3 375   3375   4137 64137 09/1899 W Withdrawn 26/02/1951 26/02/1951
J3 381   3381       09/1899 W Withdrawn 10/1932 10/1932
J3 165   3165       04/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1933 08/1933
J3 177   3177       05/1900 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
J3 179   3179   4138   06/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3 180   3180       05/1900 W Withdrawn 02/1933 02/1933
J3 192   3192       05/1900 W Withdrawn 10/1933 10/1933
J3 302   3302   4139   05/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3 303   3303       05/1900 W Withdrawn 04/1936 04/1936
J3 306   3306   4140 64140 06/1900 36E
W
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Withdrawn
14/02/1953
22/12/1954
22/12/1954
J3 308   3308       07/1900 W Withdrawn 09/1932 09/1932
J3 384   3384       08/1900 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
J3 386   3386       07/1900 W Withdrawn 05/1932 05/1932
J3 387   3387   4141 64141 07/1900 W Withdrawn 28/09/1953 28/09/1953
J3 388   3388   4142 64142 08/1900 W Withdrawn 30/07/1951 30/07/1951
J3 390   3390       07/1900 W Withdrawn 07/1936 07/1936
J3 396   3396       06/1900 W Withdrawn 05/1933 05/1933
J3 398   3398   4143   07/1900 W Withdrawn 09/1947 09/1947
J3 399   3399   4144   08/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3 1136   4136       04/1900 W Withdrawn 09/1936 09/1936
J3 1137   4137   4145 64145 04/1900 W Withdrawn 02/03/1948 02/03/1948
J3 1138   4138       05/1900 W Withdrawn 06/1939 06/1939
J3 1139   4139   4146   05/1900 W Withdrawn 06/11/1947 06/11/1947
J3 1140   4140       05/1900 W Withdrawn 05/1928 05/1928
J3 1141   4141       05/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
J3 1142   4142       05/1900 W Withdrawn 09/1940 09/1940
J3 1143   4143   4147   05/1900 W Withdrawn 26/10/1946 26/10/1946
J3 1144   4144       05/1900 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
J3 1146   4146   4148 64148 06/1900 W Withdrawn 30/04/1951 30/04/1951
J3 1147   4147       06/1900 W Withdrawn 10/1936 10/1936
J3 1149   4149       06/1900 W Withdrawn 02/1939 02/1939
J3 1150   4150       06/1900 W Withdrawn 03/1933 03/1933
J3 1151   4151   4149   06/1900 W Withdrawn 28/11/1947 28/11/1947
J3 1152   4152       06/1900 W Withdrawn 11/1936 11/1936
J3 1153   4153   4150 64150 06/1900 W Withdrawn 06/1951 06/1951
J3 1154   4154       06/1900 W Withdrawn 11/1942 11/1942
J3 1155   4155       06/1900 W Withdrawn 06/1938 06/1938
J3 1156   4156       07/1900 W Withdrawn 03/1933 03/1933
J3 1157   4157       07/1900 W Withdrawn 07/1937 07/1937
J3 1158   4158       07/1900 W Withdrawn 11/1933 11/1933
J3 1159   4159       07/1900 W Withdrawn 01/1936 01/1936
J3 1160   4160   4151 64151 07/1900 W Withdrawn 03/1951 03/1951
J3   81   081 4156   10/1900 W Withdrawn 09/1947 09/1947
J3   82   082 4157   10/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3   83   083 4158 64158 10/1900 W Withdrawn 07/1951 07/1951
J3   84   084 4159   10/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3   85   085 4160 64160 10/1900 W Withdrawn 03/12/1951 03/12/1951
J3   86   086 4161   10/1900 91E
W
To Eastern Region (Re-instd)
Withdrawn
07/1939
10/1939
09/1947
09/1947
J3   87   087 4162 64162 10/1900 W Withdrawn 12/1950 12/1950
J3   88   088 4163 64163 10/1900 W Withdrawn 01/1949 01/1949
J3   89   089 4164   10/1900 W Withdrawn 08/1947 08/1947
J3   90   090 4165   11/1900 W Withdrawn 07/1946 07/1946
J3   91   091 4166   10/1900 W Withdrawn 01/1946 01/1946
J3   92   092 4167 64167 11/1900 W Withdrawn 02/07/1948 02/07/1948
J3 1161   4161       07/1901 W Withdrawn 08/1933 08/1933
J3 1162   4162   4152 64152 07/1901 W Withdrawn 12/04/1948 12/04/1948
J3 1163   4163       07/1901 W Withdrawn 06/1938 06/1938
J3 1164   4164       07/1901 W Withdrawn 07/1934 07/1934
J3 1165   4165       07/1901 W Withdrawn 09/1933 09/1933
J3 1166   4166   4153 64153 08/1901 W Withdrawn 19/05/1952 19/05/1952
J3 1167   4167       08/1901 W Withdrawn 07/1932 07/1932
J3 1168   4168       08/1901 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
J3 1169   4169       08/1901 W Withdrawn 08/1936 08/1936
J3 1170   4170       08/1901 W Withdrawn 08/1933 08/1933
J3 1171   4171   4154   08/1901 W Withdrawn 02/11/1946 02/11/1946
J3 1172   4172       08/1901 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
J3 1173   4173   4155   08/1901 W Withdrawn 06/1947 06/1947