Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 128 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7869 Week
» 28311 Month
» 365157 Year
» 1586722 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "J3" Class 0-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
05/1928 Condemned 4140       COND  
03/1929 Condemned 3342       COND  
05/1929 Condemned 3334       COND  
12/1929 Condemned 3724       COND  
12/1929 Condemned 3837       COND  
04/1930 Condemned 3792       COND  
06/1930 Condemned 4012       COND  
07/1930 Condemned 3730       COND  
09/1930 Condemned 3748       COND  
09/1930 Condemned 3799       COND  
07/1931 Condemned 3716       COND  
10/1931 Condemned 3102       COND  
10/1931 Condemned 4031       COND  
10/1931 Condemned 4087       COND  
10/1931 Condemned 3316       COND  
02/1932 Condemned 4135       COND  
02/1932 Condemned 3351       COND  
02/1932 Condemned 3359       COND  
05/1932 Condemned 3379       COND  
05/1932 Condemned 3361       COND  
05/1932 Condemned 3386       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 4112       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 4119       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 4130       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 3318       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 3353       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 3362       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 4167       COND  
09/1932 Condemned 3308       COND  
10/1932 Condemned 3381       COND  
11/1932 Condemned 4091       COND  
11/1932 Condemned 4102       COND  
11/1932 Condemned 4120       COND  
11/1932 Condemned 3315       COND  
11/1932 Condemned 3368       COND  
01/1933 Condemned 4115       COND  
02/1933 Condemned 3180       COND  
03/1933 Condemned 4150       COND  
03/1933 Condemned 4156       COND  
04/1933 Condemned 4101       COND  
04/1933 Condemned 4117       COND  
04/1933 Condemned 3343       COND  
04/1933 Condemned 3344       COND  
05/1933 Condemned 3721       COND  
05/1933 Condemned 4098       COND  
05/1933 Condemned 3338       COND  
05/1933 Condemned 3396       COND  
07/1933 Condemned 3793       COND  
08/1933 Condemned 3165       COND  
08/1933 Condemned 4161       COND  
08/1933 Condemned 4170       COND  
09/1933 Condemned 3378       COND  
09/1933 Condemned 4122       COND  
09/1933 Condemned 4165       COND  
10/1933 Condemned 3192       COND  
11/1933 Condemned 4158       COND  
03/1934 Condemned 4118       COND  
03/1934 Condemned 4123       COND  
04/1934 Condemned 4095       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 3731       COND  
07/1934 Condemned 3349       COND  
07/1934 Condemned 4164       COND  
09/1934 Condemned 3352       COND  
02/1935 Condemned 4121       COND  
02/1935 Condemned 4168       COND  
04/1935 Condemned 4082       COND  
08/1935 Condemned 4086       COND  
08/1935 Condemned 4132       COND  
09/1935 Condemned 4108       COND  
10/1935 Condemned 4045       COND  
10/1935 Condemned 4104       COND  
10/1935 Condemned 3371       COND  
12/1935 Condemned 3337       COND  
01/1936 Condemned 4116       COND  
01/1936 Condemned 3384       COND  
01/1936 Condemned 4159       COND  
02/1936 Condemned 4128       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 4127       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 4172       COND  
04/1936 Condemned 4124       COND  
04/1936 Condemned 3177       COND  
04/1936 Condemned 3303       COND  
07/1936 Condemned 3390       COND  
08/1936 Condemned 4141       COND  
08/1936 Condemned 4169       COND  
09/1936 Condemned 4136       COND  
10/1936 Condemned 4147       COND  
11/1936 Condemned 4152       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 4144       COND  
06/1937 Condemned 4111       COND  
07/1937 Condemned 4157       COND  
11/1937 Condemned 4099       COND  
06/1938 Condemned 4155       COND  
06/1938 Condemned 4163       COND  
07/1938 Condemned 4033       COND  
08/1938 Condemned 4110       COND  
11/1938 Condemned 4096       COND  
02/1939 Condemned 4037       COND  
02/1939 Condemned 4081       COND  
02/1939 Condemned 4149       COND  
06/1939 Condemned 4138       COND  
10/1939 Reallocation 4035 98W   91E To Eastern Region  
10/1939 Reallocation 086 98W   91E To Eastern Region  
11/1939 Condemned 3717       COND  
01/1940 Condemned 3850       COND  
01/1940 Condemned 4011       COND  
04/1940 Reallocation 4126 98W   91E To Eastern Region  
09/1940 Condemned 4142       COND  
11/1942 Condemned 4154       COND  
02/1946 Condemned 4126 91E To Eastern Region   COND  
26/10/1946 Condemned 4147       COND  
02/11/1946 Condemned 4154       COND  
06/1947 Condemned 4155       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 4108       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 4111       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 4113       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 4130       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 4134       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 4138       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 4139       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 4144       COND  
09/1947 Condemned 4143       COND  
09/1947 Condemned 4156       COND  
09/1947 Condemned 4161 91E To Eastern Region   COND  
06/11/1947 Condemned 4146       COND  
28/11/1947 Condemned 4149       COND  
02/03/1948 Condemned 64145       COND  
25/03/1948 Condemned 64136       COND  
12/04/1948 Condemned 64152       COND  
16/10/1948 Condemned 64107       COND  
01/1949 Condemned 64163       COND  
04/1949 Condemned 64127       COND  
05/1949 Condemned 64106 91E To Eastern Region   COND  
25/11/1950 Condemned 64128       COND  
01/1951 Condemned 64135       COND  
26/02/1951 Condemned 64137       COND  
03/1951 Condemned 64115       COND  
03/1951 Condemned 64151       COND  
30/04/1951 Condemned 64148       COND  
21/05/1951 Condemned 64123       COND  
06/1951 Condemned 64150       COND  
07/1951 Condemned 64119       COND  
07/1951 Condemned 64158       COND  
30/07/1951 Condemned 64142       COND  
10/1951 Condemned 64124       COND  
21/01/1952 Condemned 64105       COND  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 64118     37A Ardsley  
19/05/1952 Condemned 64153       COND  
06/1952 Condemned 64117       COND  
02/06/1952 Condemned 64116       COND  
02/06/1952 Condemned 64118 37A Ardsley   COND  
01/09/1952 Condemned 64129       COND  
10/1952 Condemned 64114       COND  
19/01/1953 Condemned 64133       COND  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 64140     36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
04/1953 Condemned 64122       COND  
28/09/1953 Condemned 64141       COND  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 64132     36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
31/12/1953 Condemned 64125       COND  
14/06/1954 Condemned 64132 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
13/12/1954 Condemned 64131       COND  
22/12/1954 Condemned 64140 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND