Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 144 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6533 Week
» 26975 Month
» 363821 Year
» 1585386 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Ivatt "J3" Class 0-6-0


GNR MGNR LNER (1924) LNER (1936) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
102 3102 12/1881 07/1927
from J4
10/1931 49.83
716 3716 08/1882 02/1925
from J4
07/1931 48.92
717 3717 08/1882 03/1917
from J4
11/1939 57.25
721 3721 09/1882 01/1924
from J4
05/1933 50.67
724 3724 10/1882 05/1925
from J4
12/1929 47.17
730 3730 11/1882 12/1923
from J4
07/1930 47.67
731 3731 06/1882 02/1927
from J4
05/1934 51.92
748 3748 11/1882 05/1924
from J4
09/1930 47.83
792 3792 04/1886 11/1925
from J4
04/1930 44
793 3793 05/1886 06/1925
from J4
07/1933 47.17
799 3799 10/1886 07/1925
from J4
09/1930 43.92
342 3342 02/1890 10/1918
from J4
03/1929 39.08
378 3378 08/1890 04/1925
from J4
09/1933 43.08
379 3379 07/1891 02/1919
from J4
05/1932 40.83
837 3837 08/1891 09/1924
from J4
12/1929 38.33
850 3850 04/1892 09/1929
from J4
01/1940 47.75
313 3313 4105 64105 12/1892 10/1925
from J4
21/01/1952 59.08
1011 4011 01/1894 04/1927
from J4
01/1940 46
1012 4012 02/1894 05/1927
from J4
06/1930 36.33
1031 4031 06/1896 07/1926
from J4
10/1931 35.33
1032 4032 06/1896 02/1928
from J4
01/1926 29.58
1033 4033 06/1896 03/1928
from J4
07/1938 42.08
1035 4035 4106 64106 06/1896 08/1927
from J4
05/1949 52.92
1036 4036 4107 64107 06/1896 01/1924
from J4
16/10/1948 52.33
1037 4037 06/1896 02/1924
from J4
02/1939 42.67
1039 4039 4108 07/1896 05/1925
from J4
08/1947 51.08
1045 4045 07/1896 01/1919
from J4
10/1935 39.25
1081 4081 09/1896 12/1923
from J4
02/1939 42.42
1082 4082 10/1896 07/1913
from J4
04/1935 38.5
1086 4086 11/1896 04/1924
from J4
08/1935 38.75
1087 4087 11/1896 02/1928
from J4
10/1931 34.92
1088 4088 4111 11/1896 08/1929
from J4
08/1947 50.75
1091 4091 12/1897 01/1918
from J4
11/1932 34.92
1092 4092 4113 12/1897 09/1923
from J4
08/1947 49.67
1093 4093 4114 64114 12/1897 07/1925
from J4
10/1952 54.83
1094 4094 4115 64115 12/1897 12/1917
from J4
03/1951 53.25
1095 4095 01/1898 02/1924
from J4
04/1934 36.25
1096 4096 02/1898 11/1914
from J4
11/1938 40.75
1097 4097 4116 64116 02/1898 12/1923
from J4
02/06/1952 54.33
1098 4098 02/1898 06/1926
from J4
05/1933 35.25
1099 4099 02/1898 02/1914
from J4
11/1937 39.75
1100 4100 4117 64117 03/1898 11/1918
from J4
06/1952 54.25
1101 4101 12/1898 08/1925
from J4
04/1933 34.33
1102 4102 12/1898 05/1923
from J4
11/1932 33.92
1103 4103 4118 64118 01/1899 07/1916
from J4
02/06/1952 53.42
1104 4104 01/1899 08/1919
from J4
10/1935 36.75
1105 4105 4119 64119 01/1899 11/1917
from J4
07/1951 52.5
1108 4108 02/1899 09/1918
from J4
09/1935 36.58
1109 4109 4122 64122 02/1899 05/1919
from J4
04/1953 54.17
1110 4110 02/1899 09/1923
from J4
08/1938 39.5
1111 4111 03/1899 06/1925
from J4
06/1937 38.25
1112 4112 03/1899 05/1923
from J4
07/1932 33.33
1113 4113 4123 64123 03/1899 02/1916
from J4
21/05/1951 52.17
1114 4114 4124 64124 03/1899 09/1916
from J4
10/1951 52.58
1115 4115 03/1899 02/1915
from J4
01/1933 33.83
1116 4116 04/1899 06/1923
from J4
01/1936 36.75
1117 4117 04/1899 11/1925
from J4
04/1933 34
1118 4118 04/1899 05/1925
from J4
03/1934 34.92
1119 4119 04/1899 07/1916
from J4
07/1932 33.25
1120 4120 04/1899 12/1914
from J4
11/1932 33.58
1121 4121 04/1899 03/1924
from J4
02/1935 35.83
1122 4122 04/1899 12/1922
from J4
09/1933 34.42
1123 4123 04/1899 03/1915
from J4
03/1934 34.92
1124 4124 04/1899 02/1922
from J4
04/1936 37
1125 4125 64125 05/1899 03/1924
from J4
31/12/1953 54.58
1126 4126 05/1899 09/1913
from J4
02/1946 46.75
1127 4127 05/1899 09/1916
from J4
03/1936 36.83
1128 4128 05/1899 06/1919
from J4
02/1936 36.75
1129 4129 4127 64127 05/1899 10/1923
from J4
04/1949 49.92
1130 4130 05/1899 03/1918
from J4
07/1932 33.17
1131 4131 4128 64128 05/1899 12/1924
from J4
25/11/1950 51.5
1132 4132 05/1899 06/1916
from J4
08/1935 36.25
1133 4133 4129 64129 05/1899 08/1916
from J4
01/09/1952 53.33
1134 4134 4130 05/1899 10/1914
from J4
08/1947 48.25
1135 4135 05/1899 08/1925
from J4
02/1932 32.75
315 3315 08/1898 07/1923
from J4
11/1932 34.25
316 3316 08/1898 04/1919
from J4
10/1931 33.17
318 3318 08/1898 10/1925
from J4
07/1932 33.92
329 3329 4131 64131 08/1898 01/1924
from J4
13/12/1954 56.33
331 3331 4132 64132 09/1898 02/1926
from J4
14/06/1954 55.75
332 3332 4133 64133 08/1898 08/1925
from J4
19/01/1953 54.42
334 3334 08/1898 07/1927
from J4
05/1929 30.75
336 3336 4134 09/1898 11/1925
from J4
08/1947 48.92
337 3337 09/1898 08/1928
from J4
12/1935 37.25
338 3338 10/1898 08/1924
from J4
05/1933 34.58
343 3343 07/1899 06/1916
from J4
04/1933 33.75
344 3344 07/1899 05/1916
from J4
04/1933 33.75
345 3345 4135 64135 07/1899 09/1924
from J4
01/1951 51.5
349 3349 06/1899 02/1926
from J4
07/1934 35.08
350 3350 4136 64136 07/1899 03/1914
from J4
25/03/1948 48.67
351 3351 07/1899 04/1916
from J4
02/1932 32.58
352 3352 07/1899 07/1924
from J4
09/1934 35.17
353 3353 06/1899 12/1922
from J4
07/1932 33.08
359 3359 07/1899 01/1925
from J4
02/1932 32.58
361 3361 08/1899 11/1924
from J4
05/1932 32.75
362 3362 08/1899 06/1919
from J4
07/1932 32.92
368 3368 09/1899 06/1924
from J4
11/1932 33.17
371 3371 08/1899 12/1925
from J4
10/1935 36.17
375 3375 4137 64137 09/1899 02/1916
from J4
26/02/1951 51.42
381 3381 09/1899 12/1915
from J4
10/1932 33.08
165 3165 04/1900 03/1926
from J4
08/1933 33.33
177 3177 05/1900 12/1918
from J4
04/1936 35.92
179 3179 4138 06/1900 02/1927
from J4
08/1947 47.17
180 3180 05/1900 09/1929
from J4
02/1933 32.75
192 3192 05/1900 02/1926
from J4
10/1933 33.42
302 3302 4139 05/1900 06/1928
from J4
08/1947 47.25
303 3303 05/1900 10/1916
from J4
04/1936 35.92
306 3306 4140 64140 06/1900 10/1914
from J4
22/12/1954 54.5
308 3308 07/1900 12/1917
from J4
09/1932 32.17
384 3384 08/1900 12/1917
from J4
01/1936 35.42
386 3386 07/1900 12/1918
from J4
05/1932 31.83
387 3387 4141 64141 07/1900 04/1919
from J4
28/09/1953 53.17
388 3388 4142 64142 08/1900 10/1917
from J4
30/07/1951 50.92
390 3390 07/1900 02/1916
from J4
07/1936 36
396 3396 06/1900 01/1926
from J4
05/1933 32.92
398 3398 4143 07/1900 07/1925
from J4
09/1947 47.17
399 3399 4144 08/1900 01/1914
from J4
08/1947 47
1136 4136 04/1900 09/1916
from J4
09/1936 36.42
1137 4137 4145 64145 04/1900 08/1916
from J4
02/03/1948 47.92
1138 4138 05/1900 12/1927
from J4
06/1939 39.08
1139 4139 4146 05/1900 05/1914
from J4
06/11/1947 47.5
1140 4140 05/1900 12/1923
from J4
05/1928 28
1141 4141 05/1900 06/1916
from J4
08/1936 36.25
1142 4142 05/1900 02/1918
from J4
09/1940 40.33
1143 4143 4147 05/1900 02/1924
from J4
26/10/1946 46.42
1144 4144 05/1900 01/1923
from J4
05/1937 37
1146 4146 4148 64148 06/1900 10/1918
from J4
30/04/1951 50.83
1147 4147 06/1900 08/1915
from J4
10/1936 36.33
1149 4149 06/1900 03/1927
from J4
02/1939 38.67
1150 4150 06/1900 01/1928
from J4
03/1933 32.75
1151 4151 4149 06/1900 01/1916
from J4
28/11/1947 47.42
1152 4152 06/1900 10/1917
from J4
11/1936 36.42
1153 4153 4150 64150 06/1900 11/1925
from J4
06/1951 51
1154 4154 06/1900 08/1925
from J4
11/1942 42.42
1155 4155 06/1900 01/1924
from J4
06/1938 38
1156 4156 07/1900 08/1916
from J4
03/1933 32.67
1157 4157 07/1900 01/1916
from J4
07/1937 37
1158 4158 07/1900 10/1924
from J4
11/1933 33.33
1159 4159 07/1900 03/1915
from J4
01/1936 35.5
1160 4160 4151 64151 07/1900 06/1925
from J4
03/1951 50.67
81 081 4156 10/1900 06/1927
from J4
09/1947 46.92
82 082 4157 10/1900 08/1921
from J4
08/1947 46.83
83 083 4158 64158 10/1900 01/1921
from J4
07/1951 50.75
84 084 4159 10/1900 12/1924
from J4
08/1947 46.83
85 085 4160 64160 10/1900 04/1926
from J4
03/12/1951 51.17
86 086 4161 10/1900 10/1927
from J4
09/1947 46.92
87 087 4162 64162 10/1900 05/1925
from J4
12/1950 50.17
88 088 4163 64163 10/1900 11/1920
from J4
01/1949 48.25
89 089 4164 10/1900 02/1926
from J4
08/1947 46.83
90 090 4165 11/1900 12/1926
from J4
07/1946 45.67
91 091 4166 10/1900 01/1927
from J4
01/1946 45.25
92 092 4167 64167 11/1900 10/1921
from J4
02/07/1948 47.67
1161 4161 07/1901 02/1917
from J4
08/1933 32.08
1162 4162 4152 64152 07/1901 12/1913
from J4
12/04/1948 46.75
1163 4163 07/1901 05/1912
from J4
06/1938 36.92
1164 4164 07/1901 03/1920
from J4
07/1934 33
1165 4165 07/1901 03/1917
from J4
09/1933 32.17
1166 4166 4153 64153 08/1901 10/1924
from J4
19/05/1952 50.75
1167 4167 08/1901 04/1917
from J4
07/1932 30.92
1168 4168 08/1901 02/1916
from J4
02/1935 33.5
1169 4169 08/1901 08/1919
from J4
08/1936 35
1170 4170 08/1901 09/1917
from J4
08/1933 32
1171 4171 4154 08/1901 03/1925
from J4
02/11/1946 45.25
1172 4172 08/1901 08/1925
from J4
03/1936 34.58
1173 4173 4155 08/1901 11/1916
from J4
06/1947 45.83