GNR/LNER Ivatt "J4" Class 0-6-0
Class | GNR | MGNR | GNR (Dup) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1936) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J4 | 171 | 12/1873 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 193 | 3193 | 12/1873 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1927 | 02/1927 | |||||
J4 | 372 | 3372 | 04/1874 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1926 | 04/1926 | |||||
J4 | 373 | 3373 | 05/1874 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1926 | 01/1926 | |||||
J4 | 354 | 3354 | 07/1874 | W BOR |
Withdrawn Borough Gardens |
08/1926 06/03/1948 |
08/1926 | |||||
J4 | 198 | 3198 | 08/1874 | W MAR |
Withdrawn March |
05/1927 18/09/1948 |
05/1927 | |||||
J4 | 196 | 3196 | 12/1874 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1927 | 02/1927 | |||||
J4 | 173 | 03/1875 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 340 | 03/1875 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 365 | 3365 | 04/1875 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1925 | 08/1925 | |||||
J4 | 141 | 05/1875 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 163 | 05/1875 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 339 | 3339 | 06/1875 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 | |||||
J4 | 187 | 3187 | 08/1875 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1926 | 01/1926 | |||||
J4 | 328 | 09/1875 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 194 | 09/1875 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 312 | 3312 | 03/1876 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1926 | 04/1926 | |||||
J4 | 314 | 3314 | 04/1876 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1926 | 01/1926 | |||||
J4 | 310 | 06/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 393 | 06/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 641 | 3641 | 08/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1926 | 04/1926 | |||||
J4 | 642 | 3642 | 10/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1927 | 10/1927 | |||||
J4 | 643 | 3643 | 12/1878 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1929 | 11/1929 | |||||
J4 | 644 | 3644 | 02/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1924 | 02/1924 | |||||
J4 | 645 | 04/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 160 | 05/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 646 | 3646 | 07/1879 | W 38B |
Withdrawn Annesley |
03/1928 02/07/1950 |
03/1928 | |||||
J4 | 133 | 08/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 168 | 09/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 154 | 10/1879 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 640 | 640 | 3640 | 06/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1929 | 08/1929 | ||||
J4 | 647 | 09/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 648 | 3648 | 10/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1926 | 04/1926 | |||||
J4 | 649 | 11/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 650 | 12/1880 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 651 | 12/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 102 | 3102 | 12/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1931 | 10/1931 | |||||
J4 | 101 | 3101 | 12/1881 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 | |||||
J4 | 716 | 3716 | 08/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1931 | 07/1931 | |||||
J4 | 717 | 3717 | 08/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1939 | 11/1939 | |||||
J4 | 718 | 3718 | 08/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1926 | 08/1926 | |||||
J4 | 719 | 3719 | 09/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1929 | 12/1929 | |||||
J4 | 720 | 09/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 721 | 3721 | 09/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1933 | 05/1933 | |||||
J4 | 722 | 09/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 723 | 10/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 724 | 3724 | 10/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1929 | 12/1929 | |||||
J4 | 725 | 3725 | 10/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |||||
J4 | 726 | 3726 | 10/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1928 | 08/1928 | |||||
J4 | 727 | 3727 | 10/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1926 | 08/1926 | |||||
J4 | 728 | 11/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 729 | 3729 | 11/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1926 | 08/1926 | |||||
J4 | 730 | 3730 | 11/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1930 | 07/1930 | |||||
J4 | 731 | 3731 | 06/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1934 | 05/1934 | |||||
J4 | 732 | 06/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 733 | 06/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 734 | 3734 | 07/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1926 | 01/1926 | |||||
J4 | 735 | 07/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 736 | 07/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 737 | 07/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 738 | 08/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 739 | 08/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 740 | 08/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 741 | 09/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 742 | 09/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 743 | 09/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 744 | 3744 | 10/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1925 | 06/1925 | |||||
J4 | 745 | 3745 | 10/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1928 | 10/1928 | |||||
J4 | 746 | 3746 | 11/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1926 | 01/1926 | |||||
J4 | 747 | 11/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 748 | 3748 | 11/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1930 | 09/1930 | |||||
J4 | 749 | 11/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 750 | 3750 | 11/1882 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1925 | 06/1925 | |||||
J4 | 791 | 03/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 792 | 3792 | 04/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1930 | 04/1930 | |||||
J4 | 793 | 3793 | 05/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1933 | 07/1933 | |||||
J4 | 794 | 06/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 795 | 06/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 796 | 07/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 797 | 3797 | 08/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1927 | 11/1927 | |||||
J4 | 798 | 09/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 799 | 3799 | 10/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1930 | 09/1930 | |||||
J4 | 800 | 11/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 322 | 02/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 307 | 3307 | 03/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1927 | 10/1927 | |||||
J4 | 199 | 3199 | 08/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1930 | 01/1930 | |||||
J4 | 320 | 09/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 176 | 09/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 183 | 10/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 389 | 11/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 147 | 147 | 3147 | 12/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1925 | 08/1925 | ||||
J4 | 178 | 07/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 309 | 07/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 150 | 150 | 3150 | 08/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1929 | 05/1929 | ||||
J4 | 324 | 08/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 181 | 3181 | 08/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1926 | 08/1926 | |||||
J4 | 321 | 08/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 323 | 3323 | 12/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1930 | 01/1930 | |||||
J4 | 382 | 12/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 300 | 04/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 301 | 04/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 330 | 06/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 135 | 135 | 3135 | 06/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1926 | 04/1926 | ||||
J4 | 191 | 3191 | 08/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1925 | 08/1925 | |||||
J4 | 195 | 3195 | 09/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1927 | 05/1927 | |||||
J4 | 170 | 170 | 3170 | 10/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1925 | 09/1925 | ||||
J4 | 383 | 3383 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1925 | 08/1925 | |||||
J4 | 342 | 3342 | 02/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1929 | 03/1929 | |||||
J4 | 347 | 02/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 175 | 175 | 3175 | 02/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1926 | 04/1926 | ||||
J4 | 391 | 03/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 378 | 3378 | 08/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1933 | 09/1933 | |||||
J4 | 370 | 08/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 831 | 3831 | 12/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1927 | 02/1927 | |||||
J4 | 832 | 3832 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1926 | 08/1926 | |||||
J4 | 833 | 3833 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 | |||||
J4 | 834 | 3834 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1926 | 04/1926 | |||||
J4 | 835 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 385 | 3385 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1929 | 01/1929 | |||||
J4 | 836 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 379 | 3379 | 07/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | |||||
J4 | 837 | 3837 | 08/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1929 | 12/1929 | |||||
J4 | 839 | 3839 | 08/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1929 | 12/1929 | |||||
J4 | 838 | 3838 | 09/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1928 | 11/1928 | |||||
J4 | 840 | 3840 | 10/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1925 | 06/1925 | |||||
J4 | 841 | 10/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 845 | 3845 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |||||
J4 | 842 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 846 | 3846 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1930 | 03/1930 | |||||
J4 | 843 | 3843 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1930 | 07/1930 | |||||
J4 | 847 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 844 | 3844 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1928 | 10/1928 | |||||
J4 | 848 | 3848 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |||||
J4 | 849 | 3849 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1931 | 12/1931 | |||||
J4 | 850 | 3850 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1940 | 01/1940 | |||||
J4 | 317 | 3317 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 | |||||
J4 | 341 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 143 | 08/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 346 | 08/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 313 | 3313 | 4105 | 64105 | 12/1892 | 37A W |
Ardsley Withdrawn |
22/09/1951 21/01/1952 |
21/01/1952 | |||
J4 | 182 | 3182 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1928 | 03/1928 | |||||
J4 | 319 | 10/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 327 | 11/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 1011 | 4011 | 01/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1940 | 01/1940 | |||||
J4 | 1012 | 4012 | 02/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1930 | 06/1930 | |||||
J4 | 1031 | 4031 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1931 | 10/1931 | |||||
J4 | 1032 | 4032 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1926 | 01/1926 | |||||
J4 | 1033 | 4033 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1938 | 07/1938 | |||||
J4 | 1034 | 4034 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1035 | 4035 | 4106 | 64106 | 06/1896 | 91E W |
To Eastern Region (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
05/1939 10/1939 05/1949 |
05/1949 | |||
J4 | 1036 | 4036 | 4107 | 64107 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 16/10/1948 | 16/10/1948 | |||
J4 | 1037 | 4037 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1939 | 02/1939 | |||||
J4 | 1038 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 1039 | 4039 | 4108 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 1040 | 4040 | 4109 | 64109 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1949 | 10/1949 | |||
J4 | 1041 | 4041 | 4110 | 64110 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1949 | 05/1949 | |||
J4 | 1042 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 1043 | 4043 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1932 | 04/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1044 | 4044 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1932 | 06/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1045 | 4045 | 07/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 | |||||
J4 | 1081 | 4081 | 09/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1939 | 02/1939 | |||||
J4 | 1082 | 4082 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1935 | 04/1935 | |||||
J4 | 1083 | 4083 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1938 | 01/1938 | |||||
J4 | 1084 | 4084 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1933 | 03/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1085 | 4085 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1930 | 01/1930 | |||||
J4 | 1086 | 4086 | 11/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1935 | 08/1935 | |||||
J4 | 1087 | 4087 | 11/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1931 | 10/1931 | |||||
J4 | 1088 | 4088 | 4111 | 11/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 1089 | 12/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1920 | 12/1920 | ||||||
J4 | 1090 | 4090 | 4112 | 64112 | 12/1896 | NWE W |
New England Withdrawn |
12/1935 10/12/1951 |
10/12/1951 | |||
J4 | 1091 | 4091 | 12/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1932 | 11/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1092 | 4092 | 4113 | 12/1897 | CLK W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
01/1936 08/1947 |
08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 1093 | 4093 | 4114 | 64114 | 12/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1952 | 10/1952 | |||
J4 | 1094 | 4094 | 4115 | 64115 | 12/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1951 | 03/1951 | |||
J4 | 1095 | 4095 | 01/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1934 | 04/1934 | |||||
J4 | 1096 | 4096 | 02/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1938 | 11/1938 | |||||
J4 | 1097 | 4097 | 4116 | 64116 | 02/1898 | 35A W |
New England Withdrawn |
26/05/1951 02/06/1952 |
02/06/1952 | |||
J4 | 1098 | 4098 | 02/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1933 | 05/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1099 | 4099 | 02/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1937 | 11/1937 | |||||
J4 | 1100 | 4100 | 4117 | 64117 | 03/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1952 | 06/1952 | |||
J4 | 1101 | 4101 | 12/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1933 | 04/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1102 | 4102 | 12/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1932 | 11/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1103 | 4103 | 4118 | 64118 | 01/1899 | NWE 37A W |
New England Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/1936 22/03/1952 02/06/1952 |
02/06/1952 | |||
J4 | 1104 | 4104 | 01/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 | |||||
J4 | 1105 | 4105 | 4119 | 64119 | 01/1899 | 35A W |
New England Withdrawn |
26/05/1951 07/1951 |
07/1951 | |||
J4 | 1106 | 4106 | 4120 | 64120 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1950 | 11/1950 | |||
J4 | 1107 | 4107 | 4121 | 64121 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 25/11/1950 | 25/11/1950 | |||
J4 | 1108 | 4108 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1935 | 09/1935 | |||||
J4 | 1109 | 4109 | 4122 | 64122 | 02/1899 | CLK W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
11/1935 04/1953 |
04/1953 | |||
J4 | 1110 | 4110 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 | |||||
J4 | 1111 | 4111 | 03/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1937 | 06/1937 | |||||
J4 | 1112 | 4112 | 03/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1113 | 4113 | 4123 | 64123 | 03/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 21/05/1951 | 21/05/1951 | |||
J4 | 1114 | 4114 | 4124 | 64124 | 03/1899 | DON W |
Doncaster Withdrawn |
19/11/1949 10/1951 |
10/1951 | |||
J4 | 1115 | 4115 | 03/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1933 | 01/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1116 | 4116 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1117 | 4117 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1933 | 04/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1118 | 4118 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1934 | 03/1934 | |||||
J4 | 1119 | 4119 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1120 | 4120 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1932 | 11/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1121 | 4121 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1935 | 02/1935 | |||||
J4 | 1122 | 4122 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1933 | 09/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1123 | 4123 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1934 | 03/1934 | |||||
J4 | 1124 | 4124 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1936 | 04/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1125 | 4125 | 64125 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 31/12/1953 | 31/12/1953 | ||||
J4 | 1126 | 4126 | 05/1899 | 91E W |
To Eastern Region (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
08/1939 04/1940 02/1946 |
02/1946 | |||||
J4 | 1127 | 4127 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1128 | 4128 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1129 | 4129 | 4127 | 64127 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1949 | 04/1949 | |||
J4 | 1130 | 4130 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1131 | 4131 | 4128 | 64128 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 25/11/1950 | 25/11/1950 | |||
J4 | 1132 | 4132 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1935 | 08/1935 | |||||
J4 | 1133 | 4133 | 4129 | 64129 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 01/09/1952 | 01/09/1952 | |||
J4 | 1134 | 4134 | 4130 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 1135 | 4135 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1932 | 02/1932 | |||||
J4 | 315 | 3315 | 08/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1932 | 11/1932 | |||||
J4 | 316 | 3316 | 08/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1931 | 10/1931 | |||||
J4 | 318 | 3318 | 08/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||||
J4 | 329 | 3329 | 4131 | 64131 | 08/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 13/12/1954 | 13/12/1954 | |||
J4 | 331 | 3331 | 4132 | 64132 | 09/1898 | 36E W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
24/10/1953 14/06/1954 |
14/06/1954 | |||
J4 | 332 | 3332 | 4133 | 64133 | 08/1898 | CLK W |
Colwick Withdrawn |
01/1936 19/01/1953 |
19/01/1953 | |||
J4 | 334 | 3334 | 08/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1929 | 05/1929 | |||||
J4 | 336 | 3336 | 4134 | 09/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 337 | 3337 | 09/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1935 | 12/1935 | |||||
J4 | 338 | 3338 | 10/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1933 | 05/1933 | |||||
J4 | 343 | 3343 | 07/1899 | W NPT |
Withdrawn Newport (Teeside) |
04/1933 12/02/1949 |
04/1933 | |||||
J4 | 344 | 3344 | 07/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1933 | 04/1933 | |||||
J4 | 345 | 3345 | 4135 | 64135 | 07/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1951 | 01/1951 | |||
J4 | 348 | 3348 | 06/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |||||
J4 | 349 | 3349 | 06/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1934 | 07/1934 | |||||
J4 | 350 | 3350 | 4136 | 64136 | 07/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 25/03/1948 | 25/03/1948 | |||
J4 | 351 | 3351 | 07/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1932 | 02/1932 | |||||
J4 | 352 | 3352 | 07/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1934 | 09/1934 | |||||
J4 | 353 | 3353 | 06/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||||
J4 | 359 | 3359 | 07/1899 | W 51C |
Withdrawn West Hartlepool |
02/1932 31/01/1951 |
02/1932 | |||||
J4 | 360 | 08/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 361 | 3361 | 08/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | |||||
J4 | 362 | 3362 | 08/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||||
J4 | 363 | 08/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 364 | 09/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 367 | 09/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 368 | 3368 | 09/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1932 | 11/1932 | |||||
J4 | 371 | 3371 | 08/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 | |||||
J4 | 375 | 3375 | 4137 | 64137 | 09/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 26/02/1951 | 26/02/1951 | |||
J4 | 381 | 3381 | 09/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1932 | 10/1932 | |||||
J4 | 165 | 3165 | 04/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1933 | 08/1933 | |||||
J4 | 177 | 3177 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1936 | 04/1936 | |||||
J4 | 179 | 3179 | 4138 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 180 | 3180 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1933 | 02/1933 | |||||
J4 | 192 | 3192 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1933 | 10/1933 | |||||
J4 | 302 | 3302 | 4139 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 303 | 3303 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1936 | 04/1936 | |||||
J4 | 304 | 3304 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 | |||||
J4 | 306 | 3306 | 4140 | 64140 | 06/1900 | NWE 36E W |
New England Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/1936 14/02/1953 22/12/1954 |
22/12/1954 | |||
J4 | 308 | 3308 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1932 | 09/1932 | |||||
J4 | 384 | 3384 | 08/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 | |||||
J4 | 386 | 3386 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | |||||
J4 | 387 | 3387 | 4141 | 64141 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 28/09/1953 | 28/09/1953 | |||
J4 | 388 | 3388 | 4142 | 64142 | 08/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 30/07/1951 | 30/07/1951 | |||
J4 | 390 | 3390 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1936 | 07/1936 | |||||
J4 | 392 | 3392 | 08/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1932 | 02/1932 | |||||
J4 | 394 | 3394 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1932 | 02/1932 | |||||
J4 | 396 | 3396 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1933 | 05/1933 | |||||
J4 | 398 | 3398 | 4143 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1947 | 09/1947 | ||||
J4 | 399 | 3399 | 4144 | 08/1900 | DON W |
Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/1936 08/1947 |
08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 1136 | 4136 | 04/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1936 | 09/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1137 | 4137 | 4145 | 64145 | 04/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/03/1948 | 02/03/1948 | |||
J4 | 1138 | 4138 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1939 | 06/1939 | |||||
J4 | 1139 | 4139 | 4146 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 06/11/1947 | 06/11/1947 | ||||
J4 | 1140 | 4140 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1928 | 05/1928 | |||||
J4 | 1141 | 4141 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1936 | 08/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1142 | 4142 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1940 | 09/1940 | |||||
J4 | 1143 | 4143 | 4147 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 26/10/1946 | 26/10/1946 | ||||
J4 | 1144 | 4144 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||||
J4 | 1145 | 4145 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 | |||||
J4 | 1146 | 4146 | 4148 | 64148 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 30/04/1951 | 30/04/1951 | |||
J4 | 1147 | 4147 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1936 | 10/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1148 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 1923 | 1923 | ||||||
J4 | 1149 | 4149 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1939 | 02/1939 | |||||
J4 | 1150 | 4150 | 06/1900 | W MEX DON RET |
Withdrawn Mexborough Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
03/1933 06/11/1948 04/12/1948 23/07/1949 |
03/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1151 | 4151 | 4149 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 28/11/1947 | 28/11/1947 | ||||
J4 | 1152 | 4152 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1936 | 11/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1153 | 4153 | 4150 | 64150 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1951 | 06/1951 | |||
J4 | 1154 | 4154 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1942 | 11/1942 | |||||
J4 | 1155 | 4155 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1938 | 06/1938 | |||||
J4 | 1156 | 4156 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1933 | 03/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1157 | 4157 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1937 | 07/1937 | |||||
J4 | 1158 | 4158 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 11/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1159 | 4159 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1160 | 4160 | 4151 | 64151 | 07/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1951 | 03/1951 | |||
J4 | 81 | 081 | 4156 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1947 | 09/1947 | ||||
J4 | 82 | 082 | 4157 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 83 | 083 | 4158 | 64158 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1951 | 07/1951 | |||
J4 | 84 | 084 | 4159 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 85 | 085 | 4160 | 64160 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 03/12/1951 | 03/12/1951 | |||
J4 | 86 | 086 | 4161 | 10/1900 | 91E W |
To Eastern Region (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
07/1939 10/1939 09/1947 |
09/1947 | ||||
J4 | 87 | 087 | 4162 | 64162 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1950 | 12/1950 | |||
J4 | 88 | 088 | 4163 | 64163 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1949 | 01/1949 | |||
J4 | 89 | 089 | 4164 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||||
J4 | 90 | 090 | 4165 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1946 | 07/1946 | ||||
J4 | 91 | 091 | 4166 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1946 | 01/1946 | ||||
J4 | 92 | 092 | 4167 | 64167 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/07/1948 | 02/07/1948 | |||
J4 | 1161 | 4161 | 07/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1933 | 08/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1162 | 4162 | 4152 | 64152 | 07/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 12/04/1948 | 12/04/1948 | |||
J4 | 1163 | 4163 | 07/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1938 | 06/1938 | |||||
J4 | 1164 | 4164 | 07/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1934 | 07/1934 | |||||
J4 | 1165 | 4165 | 07/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1933 | 09/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1166 | 4166 | 4153 | 64153 | 08/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 19/05/1952 | 19/05/1952 | |||
J4 | 1167 | 4167 | 08/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||||
J4 | 1168 | 4168 | 08/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1935 | 02/1935 | |||||
J4 | 1169 | 4169 | 08/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1936 | 08/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1170 | 4170 | 08/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1933 | 08/1933 | |||||
J4 | 1171 | 4171 | 4154 | 08/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 02/11/1946 | 02/11/1946 | ||||
J4 | 1172 | 4172 | 08/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | |||||
J4 | 1173 | 4173 | 4155 | 08/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1947 | 06/1947 |