GNR/LNER Ivatt "J6" Class 0-6-0
GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
521 | 3521 | 4170 | 64170 | 08/1911 | 03/07/1961 | 49.92 | 49.95 | |||||
522 | 3522 | 4171 | 64171 | 09/1911 | 20/09/1961 | 50 | 50.12 | |||||
523 | 3523 | 4172 | 64172 | 09/1911 | 07/03/1960 | 48.5 | 48.53 | |||||
524 | 3524 | 4173 | 64173 | 10/1911 | 11/01/1961 | 49.25 | 49.29 | |||||
525 | 3525 | 4174 | 64174 | 10/1911 | 20/09/1961 | 49.92 | 50.04 | |||||
526 | 3526 | 4175 | 64175 | 10/1911 | 01/06/1960 | 48.67 | 48.78 | |||||
527 | 3527 | 4176 | 64176 | 11/1911 | 24/03/1959 | 47.33 | 47.53 | |||||
528 | 3528 | 4177 | 64177 | 11/1911 | 21/02/1962 | 50.25 | 50.29 | |||||
529 | 3529 | 4178 | 64178 | 11/1911 | 27/04/1960 | 48.42 | 48.53 | |||||
530 | 3530 | 4179 | 64179 | 11/1911 | 05/05/1960 | 48.5 | 48.53 | |||||
531 | 3531 | 4180 | 64180 | 11/1911 | 03/03/1960 | 48.33 | 48.45 | |||||
532 | 3532 | 4181 | 64181 | 11/1911 | 01/08/1959 | 47.75 | 47.78 | |||||
533 | 3533 | 4182 | 64182 | 12/1911 | 29/11/1960 | 48.92 | 49.04 | |||||
534 | 3534 | 4183 | 64183 | 12/1911 | 08/11/1958 | 46.92 | 47.12 | |||||
535 | 3535 | 4184 | 64184 | 12/1911 | 20/11/1959 | 47.92 | 48.03 | |||||
536 | 3536 | 4185 | 64185 | 11/1912 | 05/04/1961 | 48.42 | 48.45 | |||||
537 | 3537 | 4186 | 64186 | 11/1912 | 03/01/1958 | 45.17 | 45.28 | |||||
538 | 3538 | 4187 | 64187 | 11/1912 | 02/01/1958 | 45.17 | 45.28 | |||||
539 | 3539 | 4188 | 64188 | 11/1912 | 05/10/1959 | 46.92 | 46.95 | |||||
540 | 3540 | 4189 | 64189 | 11/1912 | 22/10/1958 | 45.92 | 46.11 | |||||
541 | 3541 | 4190 | 64190 | 11/1912 | 14/09/1959 | 46.83 | 46.95 | |||||
542 | 3542 | 4191 | 64191 | 11/1912 | 21/02/1962 | 49.25 | 49.28 | |||||
543 | 3543 | 4192 | 64192 | 12/1912 | 12/04/1960 | 47.33 | 47.45 | |||||
544 | 3544 | 4193 | 64193 | 12/1912 | 24/12/1957 | 45 | 45.20 | |||||
545 | 3545 | 4194 | 64194 | 12/1912 | 25/11/1955 | 42.92 | 43.03 | |||||
546 | 3546 | 4195 | 64195 | 05/1913 | 29/01/1958 | 44.67 | 44.86 | |||||
547 | 3547 | 4196 | 64196 | 05/1913 | 12/09/1960 | 47.33 | 47.45 | |||||
548 | 3548 | 4197 | 64197 | 05/1913 | 13/10/1959 | 46.42 | 46.62 | |||||
549 | 3549 | 4198 | 64198 | 05/1913 | 18/03/1959 | 45.83 | 45.95 | |||||
550 | 3550 | 4199 | 64199 | 05/1913 | 21/04/1958 | 44.92 | 45.03 | |||||
551 | 3551 | 4200 | 64200 | 06/1913 | 10/02/1958 | 44.67 | 44.78 | |||||
552 | 3552 | 4201 | 64201 | 06/1913 | 03/11/1958 | 45.42 | 45.62 | |||||
553 | 3553 | 4202 | 64202 | 06/1913 | 25/09/1958 | 45.25 | 45.36 | |||||
554 | 3554 | 4203 | 64203 | 06/1913 | 19/06/1962 | 49 | 49.03 | |||||
555 | 3555 | 4204 | 64204 | 06/1913 | 23/12/1957 | 44.5 | 44.70 | |||||
556 | 3556 | 4205 | 64205 | 06/1913 | 31/10/1958 | 45.33 | 45.62 | |||||
557 | 3557 | 4206 | 64206 | 06/1913 | 27/09/1960 | 47.25 | 47.45 | |||||
558 | 3558 | 4207 | 64207 | 07/1913 | 10/10/1959 | 46.25 | 46.37 | |||||
559 | 3559 | 4208 | 64208 | 07/1913 | 24/04/1961 | 47.75 | 47.87 | |||||
560 | 3560 | 4209 | 64209 | 07/1913 | 12/09/1960 | 47.17 | 47.28 | |||||
561 | 3561 | 4210 | 64210 | 07/1913 | 15/05/1959 | 45.83 | 45.95 | |||||
562 | 3562 | 4211 | 64211 | 08/1913 | 19/03/1958 | 44.58 | 44.70 | |||||
563 | 3563 | 4212 | 64212 | 08/1913 | 14/12/1955 | 42.33 | 42.36 | |||||
564 | 3564 | 4213 | 64213 | 08/1913 | 18/02/1960 | 46.5 | 46.61 | |||||
565 | 3565 | 4214 | 64214 | 08/1913 | 19/10/1959 | 46.17 | 46.28 | |||||
566 | 3566 | 4215 | 64215 | 08/1913 | 24/03/1959 | 45.58 | 45.70 | |||||
567 | 3567 | 4216 | 64216 | 09/1913 | 12/12/1958 | 45.25 | 45.36 | |||||
568 | 3568 | 4217 | 64217 | 09/1913 | 01/01/1959 | 45.33 | 45.36 | |||||
569 | 3569 | 4218 | 64218 | 09/1913 | 18/09/1958 | 45 | 45.11 | |||||
570 | 3570 | 4219 | 64219 | 09/1913 | 13/11/1961 | 48.17 | 48.20 | |||||
571 | 3571 | 4220 | 64220 | 09/1913 | 09/06/1958 | 44.75 | 45.11 | |||||
572 | 3572 | 4221 | 64221 | 09/1913 | 01/01/1958 | 44.33 | 44.45 | |||||
573 | 3573 | 4222 | 64222 | 10/1913 | 26/11/1960 | 47.08 | 47.20 | |||||
574 | 3574 | 4223 | 64223 | 10/1913 | 12/04/1961 | 47.5 | 47.61 | |||||
575 | 3575 | 4224 | 64224 | 10/1913 | 14/05/1959 | 45.58 | 45.70 | |||||
576 | 3576 | 4225 | 64225 | 07/1914 | 08/07/1958 | 44 | 44.03 | |||||
577 | 3577 | 4226 | 64226 | 07/1914 | 20/06/1962 | 47.92 | 47.95 | |||||
578 | 3578 | 4227 | 64227 | 07/1914 | 28/07/1958 | 44 | 44.28 | |||||
579 | 3579 | 4228 | 64228 | 07/1914 | 15/08/1959 | 45.08 | 45.20 | |||||
580 | 3580 | 4229 | 64229 | 07/1914 | 09/10/1959 | 45.25 | 45.37 | |||||
581 | 3581 | 4230 | 64230 | 07/1914 | 27/01/1958 | 43.5 | 43.70 | |||||
582 | 3582 | 4231 | 64231 | 07/1914 | 14/02/1961 | 46.58 | 46.62 | |||||
583 | 3583 | 4232 | 64232 | 08/1914 | 24/01/1961 | 46.42 | 46.54 | |||||
584 | 3584 | 4233 | 64233 | 08/1914 | 07/07/1961 | 46.92 | 46.95 | |||||
585 | 3585 | 4234 | 64234 | 08/1914 | 19/12/1959 | 45.33 | 45.36 | |||||
586 | 3586 | 4235 | 64235 | 09/1914 | 03/12/1959 | 45.25 | 45.28 | |||||
587 | 3587 | 4236 | 64236 | 09/1914 | 13/04/1961 | 46.58 | 46.70 | |||||
588 | 3588 | 4237 | 64237 | 10/1914 | 30/11/1959 | 45.08 | 45.20 | |||||
589 | 3589 | 4238 | 64238 | 10/1914 | 01/10/1959 | 45 | 45.12 | |||||
590 | 3590 | 4239 | 64239 | 10/1914 | 31/10/1959 | 45 | 45.12 | |||||
591 | 3591 | 4240 | 64240 | 10/1914 | 01/08/1960 | 45.83 | 45.87 | |||||
592 | 3592 | 4241 | 64241 | 11/1914 | 26/11/1959 | 45 | 45.11 | |||||
593 | 3593 | 4242 | 64242 | 11/1914 | 29/08/1955 | 40.75 | 40.86 | |||||
594 | 3594 | 4243 | 64243 | 11/1914 | 02/06/1958 | 43.58 | 43.69 | |||||
595 | 3595 | 4244 | 64244 | 11/1914 | 21/05/1958 | 43.5 | 43.69 | |||||
596 | 3596 | 4245 | 64245 | 10/1917 | 20/02/1962 | 44.33 | 44.44 | |||||
597 | 3597 | 4246 | 64246 | 10/1917 | 06/06/1959 | 41.67 | 41.78 | |||||
598 | 3598 | 4247 | 64247 | 10/1917 | 09/10/1959 | 42 | 42.11 | |||||
599 | 3599 | 4248 | 64248 | 01/1918 | 04/03/1959 | 41.17 | 41.36 | |||||
600 | 3600 | 4249 | 64249 | 01/1918 | 27/10/1958 | 40.75 | 41.03 | |||||
601 | 3601 | 4250 | 64250 | 10/1918 | 08/10/1959 | 41 | 41.11 | |||||
602 | 3602 | 4251 | 64251 | 11/1918 | 04/10/1960 | 41.92 | 42.03 | |||||
603 | 3603 | 4252 | 64252 | 11/1918 | 08/07/1958 | 39.67 | 39.69 | |||||
604 | 3604 | 4253 | 64253 | 02/1919 | 14/05/1962 | 43.25 | 43.27 | |||||
605 | 3605 | 4254 | 64254 | 02/1919 | 21/10/1959 | 40.67 | 40.78 | |||||
606 | 3606 | 4255 | 64255 | 03/1919 | 18/08/1958 | 39.42 | 39.61 | |||||
607 | 3607 | 4256 | 64256 | 04/1919 | 29/04/1960 | 41 | 41.20 | |||||
608 | 3608 | 4257 | 64257 | 04/1919 | 06/06/1960 | 41.17 | 41.20 | |||||
609 | 3609 | 4258 | 64258 | 04/1919 | 13/05/1959 | 40.08 | 40.36 | |||||
610 | 3610 | 4259 | 64259 | 05/1919 | 31/08/1959 | 40.25 | 40.45 | |||||
621 | 3621 | 4260 | 64260 | 12/1919 | 01/03/1961 | 41.25 | 41.28 | |||||
622 | 3622 | 4261 | 64261 | 12/1919 | 26/03/1959 | 39.25 | 39.36 | |||||
623 | 3623 | 4262 | 64262 | 12/1919 | 16/02/1959 | 39.17 | 39.36 | |||||
624 | 3624 | 4263 | 64263 | 12/1919 | 08/07/1958 | 38.58 | 38.61 | |||||
625 | 3625 | 4264 | 64264 | 01/1920 | 28/01/1958 | 38 | 38.27 | |||||
626 | 3626 | 4265 | 64265 | 02/1920 | 07/07/1961 | 41.42 | 41.44 | |||||
627 | 3627 | 4266 | 64266 | 02/1920 | 29/04/1959 | 39.17 | 39.27 | |||||
628 | 3628 | 4267 | 64267 | 03/1920 | 28/07/1958 | 38.33 | 38.61 | |||||
629 | 3629 | 4268 | 64268 | 05/1920 | 18/01/1961 | 40.67 | 40.78 | |||||
630 | 3630 | 4269 | 64269 | 05/1920 | 31/10/1959 | 39.42 | 39.53 | |||||
631 | 3631 | 4270 | 64270 | 12/1921 | 11/04/1960 | 38.33 | 38.44 | |||||
632 | 3632 | 4271 | 64271 | 12/1921 | 03/10/1958 | 36.83 | 36.86 | |||||
633 | 3633 | 4272 | 64272 | 12/1921 | 02/09/1959 | 37.75 | 37.86 | |||||
634 | 3634 | 4273 | 64273 | 03/1922 | 19/12/1959 | 37.75 | 37.78 | |||||
635 | 3635 | 4274 | 64274 | 06/1922 | 02/12/1958 | 36.5 | 36.61 | |||||
636 | 3636 | 4275 | 64275 | 06/1922 | 04/08/1958 | 36.17 | 36.36 | |||||
637 | 3637 | 4276 | 64276 | 07/1922 | 24/10/1958 | 36.25 | 36.53 | |||||
638 | 3638 | 4277 | 64277 | 08/1922 | 20/06/1962 | 39.83 | 39.86 | |||||
639 | 3639 | 4278 | 64278 | 08/1922 | 02/03/1961 | 38.58 | 38.61 | |||||
640 | 3640 | 4279 | 64279 | 09/1922 | 31/08/1959 | 36.92 | 37.11 |