J6 |
521
|
3521
|
4170
|
64170
|
08/1911 |
03/07/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1941 |
J6 |
522
|
3522
|
4171
|
64171
|
09/1911 |
20/09/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1941 |
J6 |
523
|
3523
|
4172
|
64172
|
09/1911 |
07/03/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
08/1940 |
J6 |
524
|
3524
|
4173
|
64173
|
10/1911 |
11/01/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
01/1940 |
J6 |
525
|
3525
|
4174
|
64174
|
10/1911 |
20/09/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
11/1940 |
J6 |
526
|
3526
|
4175
|
64175
|
10/1911 |
01/06/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1939 |
J6 |
527
|
3527
|
4176
|
64176
|
11/1911 |
24/03/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1940 |
J6 |
528
|
3528
|
4177
|
64177
|
11/1911 |
21/02/1962 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1941 |
J6 |
529
|
3529
|
4178
|
64178
|
11/1911 |
27/04/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1941 |
J6 |
530
|
3530
|
4179
|
64179
|
11/1911 |
05/05/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
11/1940 |
J6 |
531
|
3531
|
4180
|
64180
|
11/1911 |
03/03/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1940 |
J6 |
532
|
3532
|
4181
|
64181
|
11/1911 |
01/08/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
05/1941 |
J6 |
533
|
3533
|
4182
|
64182
|
12/1911 |
29/11/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1939 |
J6 |
534
|
3534
|
4183
|
64183
|
12/1911 |
08/11/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1940 |
J6 |
535
|
3535
|
4184
|
64184
|
12/1911 |
20/11/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
02/1941 |
J6 |
536
|
3536
|
4185
|
64185
|
11/1912 |
05/04/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
11/1939 |
J6 |
537
|
3537
|
4186
|
64186
|
11/1912 |
03/01/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
11/1940 |
J6 |
538
|
3538
|
4187
|
64187
|
11/1912 |
02/01/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1939 |
J6 |
539
|
3539
|
4188
|
64188
|
11/1912 |
05/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
05/1943 |
J6 |
540
|
3540
|
4189
|
64189
|
11/1912 |
22/10/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
01/1940 |
J6 |
541
|
3541
|
4190
|
64190
|
11/1912 |
14/09/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1939 |
J6 |
542
|
3542
|
4191
|
64191
|
11/1912 |
21/02/1962 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1940 |
J6 |
543
|
3543
|
4192
|
64192
|
12/1912 |
12/04/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
05/1941 |
J6 |
544
|
3544
|
4193
|
64193
|
12/1912 |
24/12/1957 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1940 |
J6 |
545
|
3545
|
4194
|
64194
|
12/1912 |
25/11/1955 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1939 |
J6 |
546
|
3546
|
4195
|
64195
|
05/1913 |
29/01/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
04/1941 |
J6 |
547
|
3547
|
4196
|
64196
|
05/1913 |
12/09/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
05/1941 |
J6 |
548
|
3548
|
4197
|
64197
|
05/1913 |
13/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1940 |
J6 |
549
|
3549
|
4198
|
64198
|
05/1913 |
18/03/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1939 |
J6 |
550
|
3550
|
4199
|
64199
|
05/1913 |
21/04/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
02/1940 |
J6 |
551
|
3551
|
4200
|
64200
|
06/1913 |
10/02/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1939 |
J6 |
552
|
3552
|
4201
|
64201
|
06/1913 |
03/11/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1939 |
J6 |
553
|
3553
|
4202
|
64202
|
06/1913 |
25/09/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1939 |
J6 |
554
|
3554
|
4203
|
64203
|
06/1913 |
19/06/1962 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1940 |
J6 |
555
|
3555
|
4204
|
64204
|
06/1913 |
23/12/1957 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1941 |
J6 |
556
|
3556
|
4205
|
64205
|
06/1913 |
31/10/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1939 |
J6 |
557
|
3557
|
4206
|
64206
|
06/1913 |
27/09/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
02/1940 |
J6 |
558
|
3558
|
4207
|
64207
|
07/1913 |
10/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1939 |
J6 |
559
|
3559
|
4208
|
64208
|
07/1913 |
24/04/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1939 |
J6 |
560
|
3560
|
4209
|
64209
|
07/1913 |
12/09/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1941 |
J6 |
561
|
3561
|
4210
|
64210
|
07/1913 |
15/05/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1939 |
J6 |
562
|
3562
|
4211
|
64211
|
08/1913 |
19/03/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
01/1940 |
J6 |
563
|
3563
|
4212
|
64212
|
08/1913 |
14/12/1955 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1940 |
J6 |
564
|
3564
|
4213
|
64213
|
08/1913 |
18/02/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
04/1941 |
J6 |
565
|
3565
|
4214
|
64214
|
08/1913 |
19/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
11/1939 |
J6 |
566
|
3566
|
4215
|
64215
|
08/1913 |
24/03/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1939 |
J6 |
567
|
3567
|
4216
|
64216
|
09/1913 |
12/12/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1940 |
J6 |
568
|
3568
|
4217
|
64217
|
09/1913 |
01/01/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
05/1940 |
J6 |
569
|
3569
|
4218
|
64218
|
09/1913 |
18/09/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
01/1941 |
J6 |
570
|
3570
|
4219
|
64219
|
09/1913 |
13/11/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1940 |
J6 |
571
|
3571
|
4220
|
64220
|
09/1913 |
09/06/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1940 |
J6 |
572
|
3572
|
4221
|
64221
|
09/1913 |
01/01/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
02/1942 |
J6 |
573
|
3573
|
4222
|
64222
|
10/1913 |
26/11/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1939 |
J6 |
574
|
3574
|
4223
|
64223
|
10/1913 |
12/04/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1939 |
J6 |
575
|
3575
|
4224
|
64224
|
10/1913 |
14/05/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
03/1943 |
J6 |
576
|
3576
|
4225
|
64225
|
07/1914 |
08/07/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1940 |
J6 |
577
|
3577
|
4226
|
64226
|
07/1914 |
20/06/1962 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1939 |
J6 |
578
|
3578
|
4227
|
64227
|
07/1914 |
28/07/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
03/1940 |
J6 |
579
|
3579
|
4228
|
64228
|
07/1914 |
15/08/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1940 |
J6 |
580
|
3580
|
4229
|
64229
|
07/1914 |
09/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
02/1940 |
J6 |
581
|
3581
|
4230
|
64230
|
07/1914 |
27/01/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
08/1939 |
J6 |
582
|
3582
|
4231
|
64231
|
07/1914 |
14/02/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
03/1941 |
J6 |
583
|
3583
|
4232
|
64232
|
08/1914 |
24/01/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
11/1940 |
J6 |
584
|
3584
|
4233
|
64233
|
08/1914 |
07/07/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
02/1941 |
J6 |
585
|
3585
|
4234
|
64234
|
08/1914 |
19/12/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
01/1941 |
J6 |
586
|
3586
|
4235
|
64235
|
09/1914 |
03/12/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1939 |
J6 |
587
|
3587
|
4236
|
64236
|
09/1914 |
13/04/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
02/1940 |
J6 |
588
|
3588
|
4237
|
64237
|
10/1914 |
30/11/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
11/1940 |
J6 |
589
|
3589
|
4238
|
64238
|
10/1914 |
01/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1939 |
J6 |
590
|
3590
|
4239
|
64239
|
10/1914 |
31/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1939 |
J6 |
591
|
3591
|
4240
|
64240
|
10/1914 |
01/08/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1941 |
J6 |
592
|
3592
|
4241
|
64241
|
11/1914 |
26/11/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1940 |
J6 |
593
|
3593
|
4242
|
64242
|
11/1914 |
29/08/1955 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
08/1939 |
J6 |
594
|
3594
|
4243
|
64243
|
11/1914 |
02/06/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1939 |
J6 |
595
|
3595
|
4244
|
64244
|
11/1914 |
21/05/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
05/1941 |
J6 |
596
|
3596
|
4245
|
64245
|
10/1917 |
20/02/1962 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1941 |
J6 |
597
|
3597
|
4246
|
64246
|
10/1917 |
06/06/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1939 |
J6 |
598
|
3598
|
4247
|
64247
|
10/1917 |
09/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
03/1940 |
J6 |
599
|
3599
|
4248
|
64248
|
01/1918 |
04/03/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
02/1940 |
J6 |
600
|
3600
|
4249
|
64249
|
01/1918 |
27/10/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
08/1940 |
J6 |
601
|
3601
|
4250
|
64250
|
10/1918 |
08/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
08/1939 |
J6 |
602
|
3602
|
4251
|
64251
|
11/1918 |
04/10/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1940 |
J6 |
603
|
3603
|
4252
|
64252
|
11/1918 |
08/07/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
01/1940 |
J6 |
604
|
3604
|
4253
|
64253
|
02/1919 |
14/05/1962 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
11/1940 |
J6 |
605
|
3605
|
4254
|
64254
|
02/1919 |
21/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1940 |
J6 |
606
|
3606
|
4255
|
64255
|
03/1919 |
18/08/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
08/1940 |
J6 |
607
|
3607
|
4256
|
64256
|
04/1919 |
29/04/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
01/1940 |
J6 |
608
|
3608
|
4257
|
64257
|
04/1919 |
06/06/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1940 |
J6 |
609
|
3609
|
4258
|
64258
|
04/1919 |
13/05/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1940 |
J6 |
610
|
3610
|
4259
|
64259
|
05/1919 |
31/08/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1943 |
J6 |
621
|
3621
|
4260
|
64260
|
12/1919 |
01/03/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1939 |
J6 |
622
|
3622
|
4261
|
64261
|
12/1919 |
26/03/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1941 |
J6 |
623
|
3623
|
4262
|
64262
|
12/1919 |
16/02/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
04/1940 |
J6 |
624
|
3624
|
4263
|
64263
|
12/1919 |
08/07/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1939 |
J6 |
625
|
3625
|
4264
|
64264
|
01/1920 |
28/01/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
02/1940 |
J6 |
626
|
3626
|
4265
|
64265
|
02/1920 |
07/07/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1940 |
J6 |
627
|
3627
|
4266
|
64266
|
02/1920 |
29/04/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
11/1939 |
J6 |
628
|
3628
|
4267
|
64267
|
03/1920 |
28/07/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1939 |
J6 |
629
|
3629
|
4268
|
64268
|
05/1920 |
18/01/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
04/1940 |
J6 |
630
|
3630
|
4269
|
64269
|
05/1920 |
31/10/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1940 |
J6 |
631
|
3631
|
4270
|
64270
|
12/1921 |
11/04/1960 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
12/1939 |
J6 |
632
|
3632
|
4271
|
64271
|
12/1921 |
03/10/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1940 |
J6 |
633
|
3633
|
4272
|
64272
|
12/1921 |
02/09/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1939 |
J6 |
634
|
3634
|
4273
|
64273
|
03/1922 |
19/12/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
06/1939 |
J6 |
635
|
3635
|
4274
|
64274
|
06/1922 |
02/12/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
08/1941 |
J6 |
636
|
3636
|
4275
|
64275
|
06/1922 |
04/08/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1939 |
J6 |
637
|
3637
|
4276
|
64276
|
07/1922 |
24/10/1958 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1940 |
J6 |
638
|
3638
|
4277
|
64277
|
08/1922 |
20/06/1962 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
10/1939 |
J6 |
639
|
3639
|
4278
|
64278
|
08/1922 |
02/03/1961 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
09/1939 |
J6 |
640
|
3640
|
4279
|
64279
|
09/1922 |
31/08/1959 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
07/1940 |