Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 45 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1970 Week
» 19306 Month
» 297102 Year
» 1181483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Holden "J17" Class 0-6-0


Class GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
J17 1150 8150 5500 65500 09/1900 STR
31A
W
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/02/1955
03/1958
03/1958
J17 1151 8151 5501 65501 09/1900 CAM
31C
31B
31A
W
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
March
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1952
18/05/1957
19/10/1957
01/1958
01/1958
J17 1152 8152 5502 65502 09/1900 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1959
09/1959
J17 1153 8153 5503 65503 09/1900 CAM
31B
31D
31B
31D
31B
30E
30A
W
Cambridge
March
South Lynn
March
South Lynn
March
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
18/06/1955
12/11/1955
19/07/1958
15/11/1958
20/12/1958
12/12/1959
08/1960
08/1960
J17 1154 8154 5504 65504 10/1900 SL
31B
31C
31A
30A
W
South Lynn
March
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
22/03/1952
16/05/1953
12/04/1958
10/1958
10/1958
J17 1155 8155 5505 65505 10/1900 SL
31A
30A
30E
W
South Lynn
Cambridge
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
12/04/1958
20/12/1958
11/1959
11/1959
J17 1156 8156 5506 65506 10/1900 CAM
31D
31A
30A
30E
30A
W
Cambridge
South Lynn
Cambridge
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/02/1955
25/05/1956
16/03/1957
20/12/1958
12/12/1959
08/1960
08/1960
J17 1157 8157 5507 65507 10/1900 STR
32C
32A
32C
32A
32C
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
22/09/1951
17/01/1953
23/07/1955
12/11/1955
20/12/1958
07/11/1959
09/1961
09/1961
J17 1158 8158 5508 65508 11/1900 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1958
06/1958
J17 1159 8159 5509 65509 11/1900 MC
32F
32A
32G
32A
W
Melton Constable
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1952
25/07/1953
23/01/1954
19/10/1957
01/1958
01/1958
J17 1160 8160 5510 65510 11/1900 IPS
32A
W
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
03/1955
03/1955
J17 1161 8161 5511 65511 11/1900 STR
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1958
12/12/1959
11/1960
11/1960
J17 1162 8162 5512 65512 11/1900 MAR
32B
32A
31A
32A
32B
W
March
Ipswich
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/02/1951
19/05/1951
16/02/1952
23/04/1955
17/09/1955
12/1959
12/1959
J17 1163 8163 5513 65513 11/1900 MAR
32B
31C
31A
W
March
Ipswich
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/03/1954
02/04/1960
17/09/1960
03/1961
03/1961
J17 1164 8164 5514 65514 12/1900 MC
32C
32A
32C
32A
32G
30A
30E
30A
W
Melton Constable
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/05/1951
23/06/1951
16/02/1952
17/01/1953
12/11/1955
16/03/1957
20/12/1958
07/11/1959
01/1960
01/1960
J17 1165 8165 5515 65515 01/1901 MAR
W
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1958
09/1958
J17 1166 8166 5516 65516 01/1901 NOR
32A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
03/1955
03/1955
J17 1167 8167 5517 65517 01/1901 CAM
31E
31A
31D
W
Cambridge
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
South Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
16/02/1952
25/07/1953
09/05/1955
09/05/1955
J17 1168 8168 5518 65518 01/1901 MAR
30A
31A
31C
W
March
Stratford
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
18/10/1952
16/05/1953
09/1958
09/1958
J17 1169 8169 5519 65519 02/1901 STR
32A
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1955
03/1960
03/1960
J17 1170 8170 5520 65520 09/1901 CAM
31E
31A
31D
31A
W
Cambridge
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
South Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
17/01/1953
25/07/1953
20/03/1954
02/1961
02/1961
J17 1171 8171 5521 65521 09/1901 SL
31C
31B
30A
32A
W
South Lynn
Kings Lynn
March
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/03/1952
27/02/1960
17/06/1961
16/09/1961
11/02/1962
11/02/1962
J17 1172 8172 5522 65522 09/1901 COL
W
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1958
09/1958
J17 1173 8173 5523 65523 10/1901 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1957
05/1957
J17 1174 8174 5524 65524 10/1901 MAR
W
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1955
03/1955
J17 1175 8175 5525 65525 10/1901 MAR
30A
W
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1952
04/1959
04/1959
J17 1176 8176 5526 65526 10/1901 SL
31B
31C
W
South Lynn
March
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
22/03/1952
08/1959
08/1959
J17 1177 8177 5527 65527 10/1901 KL
W
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1959
04/1959
J17 1178 8178 5528 65528 10/1901 STR
31A
W
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1959
14/11/1961
14/11/1961
J17 1179 8179 5529 65529 10/1901 KL
31C
31B
31C
W
Kings Lynn
Kings Lynn
March
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
19/06/1954
17/12/1955
05/1958
05/1958
J17 1180 8180 5530 65530 11/1901 KL
W
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1960
01/1960
J17 1181 8181 5531 65531 11/1901 COL
W
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1959
04/1959
J17 1182 8182 5532 65532 11/1901 SL
31E
31A
W
South Lynn
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/10/1954
19/02/1955
11/02/1962
11/02/1962
J17 1183 8183 5533 65533 11/1901 SL
31A
33A
32A
31C
W
South Lynn
Cambridge
Plaistow
Norwich Thorpe
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
16/02/1952
14/05/1955
22/10/1955
01/1960
01/1960
J17 1184 8184 5534 65534 11/1901 NOR
31A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
05/1958
05/1958
J17 1185 8185 5535 65535 12/1901 CAM
30A
W
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/02/1955
05/1958
05/1958
J17 1186 8186 5536 65536 12/1901 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1960
03/1960
J17 1187 8187 5537 65537 12/1901 CAM
32A
32C
32A
W
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/03/1955
22/10/1955
12/11/1955
01/1957
01/1957
J17 1188 8188 5538 65538 12/1901 MAR
31B
30A
31B
W
March
March
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
19/01/1952
23/01/1954
04/1959
04/1959
J17 1190 8190 5540 65540 09/1902 STR
31A
W
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1959
04/1959
04/1959
J17 1191 8191 5541 65541 09/1902 STR
32A
30A
31B
31A
31B
W
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
Stratford
March
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
17/01/1953
21/11/1953
23/04/1955
12/11/1960
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
J17 1192 8192 5542 65542 09/1902 KL
32A
W
Kings Lynn
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
05/1959
05/1959
J17 1193 8193 5543 65543 09/1902 COL
W
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/05/1955
02/05/1955
J17 1194 8194 5544 65544 09/1902 SL
W
South Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1959
11/1959
J17 1195 8195 5545 65545 10/1902 SL
31A
33A
33C
30A
30E
W
South Lynn
Cambridge
Plaistow
Shoeburyness
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
22/03/1952
19/04/1952
23/01/1954
20/12/1958
10/1959
10/1959
J17 1196 8196 5546 65546 10/1902 CAM
30A
W
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1952
01/1960
01/1960
J17 1197 8197 5547 65547 10/1902 MAR
32A
31B
31C
31A
W
March
Norwich Thorpe
March
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
16/02/1952
22/03/1952
16/05/1953
09/1954
09/1954
J17 1198 8198 5548 65548 10/1902 KL
31E
31A
30A
W
Kings Lynn
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1950
23/08/1952
12/04/1958
03/1960
03/1960
J17 1199 8199 5549 65549 11/1902 KL
31B
W
Kings Lynn
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1960
12/1960
12/1960
J17 1200 8200 5550   11/1902 W Withdrawn 11/1944 11/1944
J17 1201 8201 5551 65551 12/1902 MC
32A
32G
32A
W
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1952
22/05/1954
07/03/1959
02/1960
02/1960
J17 1202 8202 5552 65552 12/1902 MC
30A
33A
30A
W
Melton Constable
Stratford
Plaistow
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/02/1952
19/04/1952
23/01/1954
01/1955
01/1955
J17 1203 8203 5553 65553 12/1902 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1959
04/1959
J17 1204 8204 5554 65554 12/1902 MAR
30A
W
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/06/1961
09/1961
09/1961
J17 1205 8205 5555 65555 01/1903 MAR
30A
W
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1952
03/1960
03/1960
J17 1206 8206 5556 65556 01/1903 MAR
30A
31A
W
March
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/04/1958
14/02/1959
03/1961
03/1961
J17 1207 8207 5557 65557 02/1903 MC
32A
32F
32G
32A
W
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth Beach
Melton Constable
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/01/1954
21/07/1956
20/10/1956
16/03/1957
04/1959
04/1959
J17 1208 8208 5558 65558 02/1903 YB
32C
W
Yarmouth Beach
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
01/1960
01/1960
J17 1209 8209 5559 65559 02/1903 YB
32C
W
Yarmouth Beach
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/09/1951
11/1959
11/1959
J17 1210 8210 5560 65560 04/1905 IPS
31C
31A
31B
W
Ipswich
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/04/1960
17/09/1960
22/07/1961
05/06/1962
05/06/1962
J17 1211 8211 5561 65561 04/1905 SL
31E
31A
32B
W
South Lynn
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
17/01/1953
14/06/1958
12/1959
12/1959
J17 1212 8212 5562 65562 04/1905 SL
31B
31A
31D
31B
31C
31A
W
South Lynn
March
Cambridge
South Lynn
March
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
22/09/1951
21/03/1953
20/03/1954
19/06/1954
20/07/1957
08/1958
08/1958
J17 1213 8213 5563 65563 05/1905 CAM
30A
W
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/01/1952
01/1960
01/1960
J17 1214 8214 5564 65564 05/1905 COL
30A
W
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/12/1959
08/1960
08/1960
J17 1215 8215 5565 65565 05/1905 SL
31E
31A
31C
W
South Lynn
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
16/02/1952
06/12/1958
04/1960
04/1960
J17 1216 8216 5566 65566 05/1905 MC
32C
32F
30A
33A
32A
W
Melton Constable
Lowestoft
Yarmouth Beach
Stratford
Plaistow
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
19/05/1951
16/02/1952
22/03/1952
18/06/1955
07/1960
07/1960
J17 1217 8217 5567 65567 05/1905 MC
32G
32C
32A
31B
W
Melton Constable
Melton Constable
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/10/1955
15/11/1958
24/09/1960
07/04/1962
06/08/1962
06/08/1962
J17 1218 8218 5568 65568 05/1905 MAR
31A
31C
W
March
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
16/05/1953
09/1958
09/1958
J17 1219 8219 5569 65569 06/1905 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1955
02/1955
J17 1220 8220 5570 65570 01/1906 NOR
32C
32A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1950
24/03/1951
04/1960
04/1960
J17 1221 8221 5571 65571 01/1906 MAR
W
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1958
02/1958
J17 1222 8222 5572 65572 01/1906 KL
30A
31B
W
Kings Lynn
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
21/11/1953
12/1957
12/1957
J17 1223 8223 5573 65573 01/1906 MAR
31B
32A
W
March
March
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
15/11/1952
10/1958
10/1958
J17 1224 8224 5574 65574 01/1906 YB
32G
W
Yarmouth Beach
Melton Constable
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
04/1955
04/1955
J17 1225 8225 5575 65575 02/1906 CAM
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1958
02/1958
J17 1226 8226 5576 65576 02/1906 MAR
31A
31B
W
March
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/04/1962
23/06/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
J17 1227 8227 5577 65577 02/1906 MAR
31C
31B
W
March
Kings Lynn
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/08/1959
26/11/1960
11/02/1962
11/02/1962
J17 1228 8228 5578 65578 03/1906 NOR
32B
31A
31B
W
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/11/1950
05/12/1959
22/07/1961
05/03/1962
05/03/1962
J17 1229 8229 5579 65579 03/1906 SL
31B
31D
W
South Lynn
March
South Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
21/03/1953
29/11/1954
29/11/1954
J17 1230 8230 5580 65580 10/1910 KL
31A
32B
31B
31E
31A
W
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Ipswich
March
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/01/1951
20/10/1951
16/02/1952
24/10/1953
20/02/1954
11/1959
11/1959
J17 1231 8231 5581 65581 11/1910 YB
32A
31A
W
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/03/1959
10/02/1962
25/04/1962
25/04/1962
J17 1232 8232 5582 65582 11/1910 SL
31C
31A
31B
31A
31B
W
South Lynn
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
March
Cambridge
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/10/1951
17/09/1960
22/07/1961
02/12/1961
23/06/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
J17 1233 8233 5583 65583 11/1910 MAR
31E
31B
32A
W
March
Bury St Edmunds
March
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/10/1953
20/02/1954
16/09/1961
11/02/1962
11/02/1962
J17 1234 8234 5584 65584 11/1910 MAR
31A
31B
31D
31B
31C
W
March
Cambridge
March
South Lynn
March
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1952
15/11/1952
12/11/1955
15/11/1958
21/11/1959
02/1960
02/1960
J17 1235 8235 5585 65585 11/1910 CAM
31C
31A
W
Cambridge
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/06/1952
24/10/1953
01/11/1954
01/11/1954
J17 1236 8236 5586 65586 12/1910 MC
32C
32A
35A
32A
31B
W
Melton Constable
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
New England
Norwich Thorpe
March
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1952
17/01/1953
25/07/1953
07/03/1959
10/02/1962
17/04/1962
17/04/1962
J17 1237 8237 5587 65587 12/1910 MAR
30A
31A
W
March
Stratford
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
23/01/1954
12/1958
12/1958
J17 1238 8238 5588 65588 01/1911 SL
31A
33A
32A
32G
32C
32A
W
South Lynn
Cambridge
Plaistow
Norwich Thorpe
Melton Constable
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/01/1951
22/03/1952
18/06/1955
16/03/1957
15/11/1958
18/06/1960
05/1961
05/1961
J17 1239 8239 5589 65589 01/1911 SL
31E
31A
W
South Lynn
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/10/1954
19/02/1955
01/1961
01/1961