GER/LNER Hill "J20" Class 0-6-0
Class | GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J20/1 | 1270 | 8270 | 4675 | 64675 | 04/1920 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/12/1959 |
14/12/1959 |
J20/1 | 1271 | 8271 | 4676 | 64676 | 12/1920 | CAM STR W |
Cambridge Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 10/09/1961 |
10/09/1961 |
J20 | 1272 | 8272 | 4677 | 64677 | 12/1920 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1961 |
10/09/1961 |
J20 | 1273 | 8273 | 4678 | 64678 | 12/1920 | CAM 34B 34B 31B 30F 30A W |
Cambridge Hornsey Hornsey March Parkeston Quay Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1951 17/02/1951 24/10/1953 20/06/1959 30/07/1960 23/09/1960 |
23/09/1960 |
J20/1 | 1274 | 8274 | 4679 | 64679 | 12/1920 | CAM 34B 34B 31B 30F 30A W |
Cambridge Hornsey Hornsey March Parkeston Quay Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/02/1951 17/02/1951 24/10/1953 20/06/1959 07/01/1961 13/01/1961 |
13/01/1961 |
J20/1 | 1275 | 8275 | 4680 | 64680 | 09/1922 | CAM STR 30F 30A W |
Cambridge Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/03/1948 30/07/1960 07/01/1961 13/01/1961 |
13/01/1961 |
J20 | 1276 | 8276 | 4681 | 64681 | 09/1922 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/11/1960 |
02/11/1960 |
J20 | 1277 | 8277 | 4682 | 64682 | 09/1922 | MAR STR W |
March Stratford Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 23/09/1960 |
23/09/1960 |
J20 | 1278 | 8278 | 4683 | 64683 | 09/1922 | CAM 31B 31B 31A W |
Cambridge March March Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 19/05/1951 20/10/1951 11/1959 |
11/1959 |
J20 | 1279 | 8279 | 4684 | 64684 | 09/1922 | CAM 34B 34B 31B 31A W |
Cambridge Hornsey Hornsey March Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 24/10/1953 21/11/1959 27/06/1960 |
27/06/1960 |
J20 | 1280 | 8280 | 4685 | 64685 | 10/1922 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1960 |
06/10/1960 |
J20 | 1281 | 8281 | 4686 | 64686 | 10/1922 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1960 |
22/08/1960 |
J20/1 | 1282 | 8282 | 4687 | 64687 | 10/1922 | CAM 31B 31B W |
Cambridge March March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 19/05/1951 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
J20/1 | 1283 | 8283 | 4688 | 64688 | 11/1922 | MAR 31A W |
March Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1951 12/01/1959 |
12/01/1959 |
J20 | 1284 | 8284 | 4689 | 64689 | 11/1922 | MAR MAR 31A 30A W |
March March Cambridge Stratford Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 20/10/1951 18/06/1955 13/01/1961 |
13/01/1961 |
J20 | 1285 | 8285 | 4690 | 64690 | 12/1922 | MAR STR 31B W |
March Stratford March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 23/01/1954 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
J20 | 1286 | 8286 | 4691 | 64691 | 12/1922 | STR 31B W |
Stratford March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/01/1954 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
J20 | 1287 | 8287 | 4692 | 64692 | 12/1922 | MAR MAR 30A W |
March March Stratford Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 26/11/1960 10/09/1961 |
10/09/1961 |
J20 | 1288 | 8288 | 4693 | 64693 | 12/1922 | MAR MAR 31A 30A W |
March March Cambridge Stratford Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 25/12/1954 18/06/1955 22/08/1960 |
22/08/1960 |
J20 | 1289 | 8289 | 4694 | 64694 | 12/1922 | MAR 31A 31A 31B 31A 30A W |
March Cambridge Cambridge March Cambridge Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 25/12/1954 18/06/1955 06/01/1960 |
06/01/1960 |
J20/1 | 1290 | 8290 | 4695 | 64695 | 12/1922 | STR 31B 31A W |
Stratford March Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1953 18/06/1955 12/01/1960 |
12/01/1960 |
J20/1 | 1291 | 8291 | 4696 | 64696 | 12/1922 | STR 31B W |
Stratford March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1954 06/04/1962 |
06/04/1962 |
J20 | 1292 | 8292 | 4697 | 64697 | 01/1923 | MAR 30A W |
March Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1960 10/09/1961 |
10/09/1961 |
J20 | 1293 | 8293 | 4698 | 64698 | 01/1923 | MAR 31A W |
March Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1959 20/03/1961 |
20/03/1961 |
J20/1 | 1294 | 8294 | 4699 | 64699 | 01/1923 | MAR 34B 34B 31B W |
March Hornsey Hornsey March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1951 23/06/1951 24/10/1953 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |