NER/LNER Worsdell "J21" Class 0-6-0
Class | NER | NER (Renum) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J21 Compound | 16 | 5025 | 65025 | 09/1886 | BLA W |
Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1951 |
13/11/1951 | |
J21 Simple | 22 | 08/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1932 | 11/1932 | |||
J21 Simple | 480 | 08/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1931 | 12/1931 | |||
J21 Simple | 539 | 08/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |||
J21 Simple | 86 | 10/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1930 | 07/1930 | |||
J21 Simple | 182 | 10/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||
J21 Simple | 4 | 974 | 11/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1931 | 12/1931 | ||
J21 Simple | 152 | 11/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1932 | 10/1932 | |||
J21 Simple | 360 | 11/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1930 | 03/1930 | |||
J21 Simple | 558 | 12/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | |||
J21 Simple | 667 | 12/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1931 | 11/1931 | |||
J21 Compound | 1301 | 05/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1935 | 01/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 1305 | 5026 | 65026 | 05/1887 | TWD SBH HLD W |
Tweedmouth Blyth (South) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 26/03/1949 10/1949 |
10/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 1309 | 06/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1937 | 02/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 1315 | 5027 | 65027 | 06/1887 | YK HLD W 52F |
York (North) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn Blyth (North) |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 27/02/1950 23/09/1950 |
27/02/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 1323 | 5028 | 65028 | 06/1887 | KBY W |
Kirkby Stephen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/08/1951 |
28/08/1951 | |
J21 Compound | 1332 | 05/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1931 | 12/1931 | |||
J21 Compound | 1336 | 06/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | |||
J21 Compound | 1337 | 5029 | 65029 | 09/1887 | BLA SBH HLD W |
Blaydon Blyth (South) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 13/11/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 1338 | 09/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1932 | 10/1932 | |||
J21 Compound | 1339 | 10/1887 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1929 | 02/1929 | |||
J21 Compound | 160 | 06/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |||
J21 Compound | 56 | 06/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 1161 | 06/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1935 | 09/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 5 | 975 | 06/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1933 | 01/1933 | ||
J21 Compound | 101 | 06/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1935 | 06/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 95 | 06/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1932 | 06/1932 | |||
J21 Compound | 7 | 979 | 09/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1935 | 02/1935 | ||
J21 Compound | 31 | 09/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 | |||
J21 Compound | 110 | 09/1888 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1931 | 12/1931 | |||
J21 Compound | 800 | 5030 | 65030 | 10/1888 | HTN 51J W |
Heaton Northallerton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 18/04/1951 |
18/04/1951 | |
J21 Compound | 458 | 02/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1938 | 11/1938 | |||
J21 Compound | 564 | 02/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1934 | 10/1934 | |||
J21 Compound | 869 | 02/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1931 | 01/1931 | |||
J21 Compound | 871 | 03/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1943 | 05/1943 | |||
J21 Compound | 872 | 03/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 11/1933 | |||
J21 Compound | 874 | 5031 | 65031 | 03/1889 | DAR W |
Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/06/1948 |
11/06/1948 | |
J21 Compound | 875 | 5032 | 65032 | 03/1889 | CUD AUK W |
Cudworth West Auckland Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 16/08/1948 |
16/08/1948 | |
J21 Compound | 876 | 5033 | 65033 | 03/1889 | DAR 52F 52C 52F 52C 52F 52B 52F W |
Darlington Blyth (North) Blaydon Blyth (North) Blaydon Blyth (North) Heaton Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1951 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 17/12/1955 13/09/1958 10/01/1959 07/05/1960 21/01/1961 08/04/1961 23/04/1962 |
23/04/1962 | |
J21 Compound | 877 | 5034 | 04/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1944 | 05/1944 | ||
J21 Compound | 878 | 04/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1933 | 04/1933 | |||
J21 Compound | 611 | 04/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1934 | 05/1934 | |||
J21 Compound | 613 | 5035 | 65035 | 05/1889 | HLS BLA 52B 52B W |
Hull Springhead Blaydon Heaton Heaton Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 24/07/1948 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 28/05/1956 |
28/05/1956 | |
J21 Compound | 619 | 5036 | 65036 | 05/1889 | NEV W |
Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1949 |
12/12/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 944 | 5037 | 65037 | 05/1889 | NEV HLD NEV AUK W |
Neville Hill Hull Dairycoates Neville Hill West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 23/10/1948 09/04/1949 04/1950 |
04/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 960 | 1508 | 05/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1934 | 01/1934 | ||
J21 Compound | 992 | 05/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 993 | 5038 | 65038 | 06/1889 | DAR 51B 51B 51J W |
Darlington Newport (Teeside) Newport (Teeside) Northallerton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1951 19/01/1952 17/05/1952 30/11/1954 |
30/11/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 994 | 06/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1934 | 03/1934 | |||
J21 Compound | 996 | 1509 | 06/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1935 | 08/1935 | ||
J21 Compound | 899 | 1507 | 5039 | 65039 | 06/1889 | TWD MAL 50C 52C 52C 51A 52B 52C 54B W |
Tweedmouth Malton Selby Blaydon Blaydon Darlington Heaton Blaydon Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/09/1949 04/03/1950 07/04/1951 21/04/1951 13/12/1952 27/12/1952 17/01/1953 20/10/1956 19/01/1957 26/11/1958 |
26/11/1958 |
J21 Compound | 680 | 1510 | 5040 | 65040 | 06/1889 | KBY W |
Kirkby Stephen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1952 |
15/09/1952 |
J21 Compound | 776 | 1511 | 5041 | 65041 | 06/1889 | NEV NEV 51J 50B 50B W |
Neville Hill Neville Hill Northallerton Neville Hill Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 03/09/1950 10/09/1950 23/09/1950 01/02/1951 |
01/02/1951 |
J21 Compound | 778 | 1512 | 5042 | 65042 | 06/1889 | SEL 52C 52C 52C W |
Selby Blaydon Blaydon Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/04/1951 21/04/1951 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 07/07/1954 |
07/07/1954 |
J21 Compound | 806 | 1513 | 5043 | 65043 | 06/1889 | SEL YK W |
Selby York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 01/1951 |
01/1951 |
J21 Compound | 962 | 1514 | 5044 | 65044 | 06/1889 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/10/1949 |
31/10/1949 |
J21 Compound | 963 | 1515 | 5045 | 06/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1947 | 10/1947 | |
J21 Compound | 965 | 1516 | 5046 | 06/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1947 | 07/1947 | |
J21 Compound | 973 | 5047 | 65047 | 10/1889 | KBY W |
Kirkby Stephen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1954 |
29/12/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 976 | 5048 | 11/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 11/1945 | ||
J21 Compound | 981 | 5049 | 65049 | 11/1889 | NEV W |
Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/06/1948 |
02/06/1948 | |
J21 Compound | 960 | 11/1889 | SUN W |
Sunderland Withdrawn |
12/1935 03/1937 |
03/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 996 | 5054 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1944 | 01/1944 | ||
J21 Compound | 899 | 5052 | 65052 | 12/1889 | SKN W |
Stockton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 680 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1934 | 12/1934 | |||
J21 Compound | 776 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1935 | 05/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 778 | 5050 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1944 | 07/1944 | ||
J21 Compound | 806 | 5051 | 65051 | 12/1889 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 |
07/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 962 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1933 | 01/1933 | |||
J21 Compound | 963 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1935 | 03/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 965 | 5053 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||
J21 Compound | 122 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1938 | 11/1938 | |||
J21 Compound | 133 | 12/1889 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1938 | 11/1938 | |||
J21 Compound | 209 | 5055 | 04/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1945 | 10/1945 | ||
J21 Compound | 259 | 04/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1935 | 07/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 291 | 05/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1937 | 08/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 470 | 5056 | 65056 | 05/1890 | YAR YK HLD W |
Yarmouth South Town York (North) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 25/09/1948 20/12/1948 |
20/12/1948 | |
J21 Compound | 510 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 511 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1938 | 07/1938 | |||
J21 Compound | 1073 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1935 | 02/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 1075 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 294 | 5057 | 65057 | 06/1890 | SKN AUK W |
Stockton West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1948 02/10/1950 |
02/10/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 431 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1943 | 07/1943 | |||
J21 Compound | 432 | 5058 | 65058 | 06/1890 | RET DON W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 11/1949 |
11/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 520 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1929 | 12/1929 | |||
J21 Compound | 530 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 | |||
J21 Compound | 534 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1929 | 11/1929 | |||
J21 Compound | 538 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1937 | 03/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 556 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1935 | 07/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 579 | 06/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 582 | 5059 | 65059 | 06/1890 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 93 | 09/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1943 | 04/1943 | |||
J21 Compound | 123 | 5060 | 65060 | 09/1890 | YK NEV W |
York (North) Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 08/1949 |
08/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 312 | 5061 | 65061 | 09/1890 | AUK 51A 52B 52D W |
West Auckland Darlington Heaton Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1954 18/02/1956 14/12/1957 12/05/1958 |
12/05/1958 | |
J21 Compound | 313 | 5063 | 65063 | 10/1890 | SBH W |
Blyth (South) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 |
14/02/1948 | |
J21 Compound | 314 | 5064 | 65064 | 10/1890 | WHD AUK 51J 51A W |
Wearhead West Auckland Northallerton Darlington Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 18/12/1954 19/03/1955 16/09/1958 |
16/09/1958 | |
J21 Compound | 315 | 10/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 316 | 10/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1935 | 08/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 97 | 5062 | 65062 | 10/1890 | BLA NEV 51F 51F W |
Blaydon Neville Hill West Auckland West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 06/12/1954 |
06/12/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 99 | 10/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1931 | 03/1931 | |||
J21 Compound | 668 | 10/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1933 | 01/1933 | |||
J21 Compound | 68 | 5066 | 65066 | 11/1890 | SEL W |
Selby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1949 |
21/11/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 139 | 5067 | 65067 | 11/1890 | TWD 50A 50B 52F 52B 52B W |
Tweedmouth York (North) Neville Hill Blyth (North) Heaton Heaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/03/1950 30/04/1950 03/09/1950 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 27/11/1951 |
27/11/1951 | |
J21 Compound | 300 | 5068 | 65068 | 12/1890 | LOW YK SEL DAR W |
Lowestoft York (North) Selby Darlington Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 20/11/1948 09/04/1949 21/06/1954 |
21/06/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 810 | 5069 | 65069 | 12/1890 | SBH W |
Blyth (South) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/04/1948 |
29/04/1948 | |
J21 Compound | 997 | 5073 | 65073 | 01/1891 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1950 |
02/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 26 | 5070 | 65070 | 01/1891 | RET DON RET 51A 51A 52C 52D 52F W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Darlington Darlington Blaydon Tweedmouth Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1948 19/11/1949 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 12/11/1955 14/12/1957 17/10/1959 05/09/1960 |
05/09/1960 | |
J21 Compound | 102 | 5071 | 01/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1946 | 08/1946 | ||
J21 Compound | 147 | 5072 | 65072 | 01/1891 | DAR SEL NEV W |
Darlington Selby Neville Hill Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 12/02/1949 02/1950 |
02/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 148 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1929 | 09/1929 | |||
J21 Compound | 157 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1942 | 11/1942 | |||
J21 Compound | 30 | 5065 | 12/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1946 | 08/1946 | ||
J21 Compound | 34 | 12/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 48 | 12/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 104 | 12/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1935 | 02/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 107 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1933 | 09/1933 | |||
J21 Compound | 289 | 04/1891 | NOR W |
Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
11/1935 08/1938 |
08/1938 | |||
J21 Compound | 331 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 665 | 5081 | 65081 | 04/1891 | HTN BLA KBY NLN W |
Heaton Blaydon Kirkby Stephen Northallerton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 12/02/1949 19/02/1949 30/01/1950 |
30/01/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 666 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1937 | 02/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 807 | 5082 | 65082 | 05/1891 | TWD 52D W |
Tweedmouth Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 01/01/1955 |
01/01/1955 | |
J21 Compound | 1547 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1931 | 05/1931 | |||
J21 Compound | 1548 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1937 | 02/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 1549 | 5074 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1946 | 12/1946 | ||
J21 Compound | 1550 | 5075 | 65075 | 03/1891 | AUK SEL YK 51J 51J 52C 52B W |
West Auckland Selby York (North) Northallerton Northallerton Blaydon Heaton Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 10/12/1949 10/09/1950 23/09/1950 24/11/1951 14/02/1953 28/06/1954 |
28/06/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 1551 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 1552 | 5076 | 65076 | 04/1891 | YK 50B W |
York (North) Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/07/1950 06/1951 |
06/1951 | |
J21 Compound | 1553 | 5077 | 65077 | 04/1891 | NEV KBY AUK W |
Neville Hill Kirkby Stephen West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1948 21/08/1948 24/08/1953 |
24/08/1953 | |
J21 Compound | 1554 | 5078 | 65078 | 04/1891 | DAR 51F 51A 52D W |
Darlington West Auckland Darlington Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/08/1950 24/04/1954 18/06/1955 04/03/1957 |
04/03/1957 | |
J21 Compound | 1555 | 5079 | 65079 | 05/1891 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1949 |
11/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 1556 | 5080 | 65080 | 05/1891 | BLA W |
Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1951 |
05/12/1951 | |
J21 Compound | 1557 | 5083 | 65083 | 05/1891 | BLA AUK NEV W |
Blaydon West Auckland Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 12/02/1949 09/04/1949 04/1950 |
04/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 1558 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1936 | 12/1936 | |||
J21 Compound | 1559 | 5084 | 65084 | 05/1891 | MID AUK W |
Middlesbrough West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1948 17/07/1950 |
17/07/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 1560 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1936 | 08/1936 | |||
J21 Compound | 1561 | 5089 | 65089 | 06/1891 | SKN AUK KBY 51A W |
Stockton West Auckland Kirkby Stephen Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1948 21/08/1948 03/11/1951 06/12/1954 |
06/12/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 1562 | 5090 | 65090 | 06/1891 | DAR 52C W |
Darlington Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1951 05/12/1955 |
05/12/1955 | |
J21 Compound | 1563 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1929 | 11/1929 | |||
J21 Compound | 1564 | 5091 | 65091 | 06/1891 | DAR 51F 52D W |
Darlington West Auckland Tweedmouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/05/1950 22/01/1955 09/11/1957 |
09/11/1957 | |
J21 Compound | 1565 | 5092 | 65092 | 06/1891 | SKN AUK 51H W |
Stockton West Auckland Kirkby Stephen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1948 23/01/1954 30/12/1954 |
30/12/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 1566 | 5093 | 65093 | 06/1891 | DAR SEL YK W |
Darlington Selby York (North) Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 01/05/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 1567 | 5094 | 65094 | 07/1891 | NEV DAR SEL W |
Neville Hill Darlington Selby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 09/04/1949 02/1950 |
02/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 1568 | 07/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1937 | 01/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 1569 | 5095 | 65095 | 07/1891 | RET DON DON W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 23/07/1949 02/04/1951 |
02/04/1951 | |
J21 Compound | 1570 | 07/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1935 | 06/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 1571 | 08/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | |||
J21 Compound | 1572 | 08/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1936 | 08/1936 | |||
J21 Compound | 1573 | 5096 | 08/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1947 | 06/1947 | ||
J21 Compound | 1574 | 5097 | 65097 | 09/1891 | NEV AUK W |
Neville Hill West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/09/1948 13/12/1954 |
13/12/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 1575 | 5098 | 65098 | 09/1891 | DAR W |
Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/12/1954 |
30/12/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 1576 | 5099 | 65099 | 09/1891 | TWD SBH 52C 52F 52D 51E 54B W |
Tweedmouth Blyth (South) Blaydon Blyth (North) Tweedmouth Stockton Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 30/04/1950 19/12/1951 23/04/1955 08/03/1958 13/12/1958 30/10/1961 |
30/10/1961 | |
J21 Compound | 51 | 5085 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1944 | 04/1944 | ||
J21 Compound | 424 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1934 | 07/1934 | |||
J21 Compound | 513 | 5086 | 65086 | 06/1891 | HTN HLD W |
Heaton Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 02/1949 |
02/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 568 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 | |||
J21 Compound | 569 | 5087 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1947 | 06/1947 | ||
J21 Compound | 570 | 5088 | 65088 | 06/1891 | DAR 51F 52C W |
Darlington West Auckland Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1950 23/10/1954 21/11/1955 |
21/11/1955 | |
J21 Compound | 1071 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1933 | 08/1933 | |||
J21 Compound | 1122 | 5100 | 65100 | 08/1891 | BLA KBY W |
Blaydon Kirkby Stephen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/02/1949 13/12/1954 |
13/12/1954 | |
J21 Compound | 1187 | 09/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 | |||
J21 Compound | 1188 | 09/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1935 | 09/1935 | |||
J21 Compound | 1587 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1931 | 01/1931 | |||
J21 Compound | 1588 | 5101 | 65101 | 01/1892 | BLA BLA BLA W |
Blaydon Blaydon Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1949 23/07/1949 29/10/1949 04/1950 |
04/1950 | |
J21 Compound | 1589 | 5102 | 65102 | 01/1892 | HTN HLD 51F W |
Heaton Hull Dairycoates West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/09/1948 11/02/1950 14/11/1951 |
14/11/1951 | |
J21 Compound | 1590 | 5103 | 65103 | 02/1892 | KBY 51A 51A 52C W |
Kirkby Stephen Darlington Darlington Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/11/1951 19/12/1951 23/10/1954 05/12/1958 |
05/12/1958 | |
J21 Compound | 1591 | 5104 | 65104 | 02/1892 | HTN W |
Heaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1948 |
04/10/1948 | |
J21 Compound | 1592 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1937 | 09/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 1593 | 5105 | 65105 | 03/1892 | SEL 52C W |
Selby Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/04/1951 21/04/1951 12/09/1951 |
12/09/1951 | |
J21 Compound | 1594 | 5106 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1947 | 05/1947 | ||
J21 Compound | 1595 | 5107 | 65107 | 03/1892 | NEV W |
Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1949 |
16/05/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 1596 | 5108 | 65108 | 04/1892 | YK NEV W |
York (North) Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 10/1949 |
10/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 1607 | 10/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1943 | 01/1943 | |||
J21 Compound | 1608 | 5109 | 65109 | 10/1892 | NEV DAR W |
Neville Hill Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 04/1949 |
04/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 1609 | 5110 | 65110 | 11/1892 | DAR 52B W |
Darlington Heaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1951 18/07/1960 |
18/07/1960 | |
J21 Compound | 1610 | 5111 | 65111 | 11/1892 | BLA W |
Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 21/03/1951 |
21/03/1951 | |
J21 Compound | 1611 | 5112 | 65112 | 12/1892 | BLA HLD HLS W |
Blaydon Hull Dairycoates Hull Springhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 01/10/1949 11/1949 |
11/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 1612 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
J21 Compound | 1613 | 5113 | 12/1892 | KBY W |
Kirkby Stephen Withdrawn |
12/1935 08/1947 |
08/1947 | ||
J21 Compound | 1614 | 5114 | 65114 | 12/1892 | HTN DAR W |
Heaton Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | |
J21 Compound | 1615 | 5115 | 65115 | 12/1892 | KBY W |
Kirkby Stephen Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 |
26/06/1948 | |
J21 Compound | 1616 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1929 | 10/1929 | |||
J21 Simple | 1801 | 02/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 | |||
J21 Simple | 1802 | 02/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1943 | 04/1943 | |||
J21 Simple | 1803 | 03/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1931 | 07/1931 | |||
J21 Simple | 1804 | 03/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
J21 Simple | 1805 | 5116 | 65116 | 04/1894 | NEV W |
Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1950 |
02/1950 | |
J21 Simple | 1806 | 5117 | 65117 | 04/1894 | RET DON 51A 51A 52C 52B 54B W |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Darlington Darlington Blaydon Heaton Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/11/1949 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 24/03/1956 14/12/1957 12/04/1958 23/02/1959 |
23/02/1959 | |
J21 Simple | 1807 | 04/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 | |||
J21 Simple | 1808 | 05/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
J21 Simple | 1809 | 05/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1943 | 03/1943 | |||
J21 Simple | 1810 | 5118 | 65118 | 05/1894 | NEV NEV MAL MAL 50B 50A 50A W |
Neville Hill Neville Hill Malton Malton Neville Hill York (North) York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 06/1949 02/07/1949 13/05/1950 11/02/1951 17/02/1951 29/11/1951 |
29/11/1951 | |
J21 Simple | 1811 | 5119 | 65119 | 06/1894 | DAR 52C 52C W |
Darlington Blaydon Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1951 19/01/1952 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 13/12/1954 |
13/12/1954 | |
J21 Simple | 1812 | 5120 | 65120 | 06/1894 | SEL YK NEV W |
Selby York (North) Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 30/07/1949 06/02/1950 |
06/02/1950 | |
J21 Simple | 1813 | 06/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1933 | 08/1933 | |||
J21 Simple | 1814 | 5121 | 65121 | 06/1894 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | |
J21 Simple | 1815 | 11/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1935 | 01/1935 | |||
J21 Simple | 1816 | 11/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1942 | 11/1942 | |||
J21 Simple | 1817 | 12/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1943 | 04/1943 | |||
J21 Simple | 1818 | 12/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 | |||
J21 Simple | 1819 | 5122 | 65122 | 12/1894 | HTN SBH 50B W |
Heaton Blyth (South) Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 18/03/1950 29/08/1951 |
29/08/1951 | |
J21 Simple | 1820 | 5123 | 65123 | 02/1895 | SBH AUK W |
Blyth (South) West Auckland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 02/1950 |
02/1950 |