J21 |
16
|
|
5025
|
(65025)
|
09/1886 |
13/11/1951 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
07/1908 |
J21 |
1301
|
|
|
|
05/1887 |
01/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1904 |
J21 |
1305
|
|
5026
|
(65026)
|
05/1887 |
10/1949 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
09/1927 |
J21 |
1309
|
|
|
|
06/1887 |
02/1937 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
03/1903 |
J21 |
1315
|
|
5027
|
65027
|
06/1887 |
27/02/1950 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
02/1928 |
J21 |
1323
|
|
5028
|
65028
|
06/1887 |
28/08/1951 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
10/1914 |
J21 |
1332
|
|
|
|
05/1887 |
12/1931 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
03/1909 |
J21 |
1336
|
|
|
|
06/1887 |
05/1932 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
05/1904 |
J21 |
1337
|
|
5029
|
(65029)
|
09/1887 |
05/1949 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
06/1904 |
J21 |
1338
|
|
|
|
09/1887 |
10/1932 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
12/1905 |
J21 |
1339
|
|
|
|
10/1887 |
02/1929 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1904 |
J21 |
160
|
|
|
|
06/1888 |
12/1932 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
07/1903 |
J21 |
56
|
|
|
|
06/1888 |
04/1937 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1904 |
J21 |
1161
|
|
|
|
06/1888 |
09/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
06/1903 |
J21 |
5
|
975
|
|
|
06/1888 |
01/1933 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1903 |
J21 |
101
|
|
|
|
06/1888 |
06/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
11/1903 |
J21 |
95
|
|
|
|
06/1888 |
06/1932 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1903 |
J21 |
7
|
979
|
|
|
09/1888 |
02/1935 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
07/1915 |
J21 |
31
|
|
|
|
09/1888 |
12/1932 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
11/1903 |
J21 |
110
|
|
|
|
09/1888 |
12/1931 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1910 |
J21 |
800
|
|
5030
|
65030
|
10/1888 |
18/04/1951 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
03/1911 |
J21 |
458
|
|
|
|
02/1889 |
11/1938 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
04/1905 |
J21 |
564
|
|
|
|
02/1889 |
10/1934 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
04/1905 |
J21 |
869
|
|
|
|
02/1889 |
01/1931 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
01/1904 |
J21 |
871
|
|
|
|
03/1889 |
05/1943 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1906 |
J21 |
872
|
|
|
|
03/1889 |
11/1933 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1905 |
J21 |
874
|
|
5031
|
(65031)
|
03/1889 |
11/06/1948 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
03/1937 |
J21 |
875
|
|
5032
|
(65032)
|
03/1889 |
16/08/1948 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
07/1915 |
J21 |
876
|
|
5033
|
65033
|
03/1889 |
23/04/1962 |
Superheater removed |
09/1956 |
J21 |
877
|
|
(5034)
|
|
04/1889 |
05/1944 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
11/1909 |
J21 |
878
|
|
|
|
04/1889 |
04/1933 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
04/1907 |
J21 |
611
|
|
|
|
04/1889 |
05/1934 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
06/1907 |
J21 |
613
|
|
5035
|
65035
|
05/1889 |
28/05/1956 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
08/1927 |
J21 |
619
|
|
5036
|
65036
|
05/1889 |
12/12/1949 |
Superheater removed |
10/1932 |
J21 |
944
|
|
5037
|
(65037)
|
05/1889 |
04/1950 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
11/1914 |
J21 |
960
|
1508
|
|
|
05/1889 |
01/1934 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1903 |
J21 |
992
|
|
|
|
05/1889 |
04/1937 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1903 |
J21 |
993
|
|
5038
|
65038
|
06/1889 |
30/11/1954 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
06/1915 |
J21 |
994
|
|
|
|
06/1889 |
03/1934 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1901 |
J21 |
996
|
1509
|
|
|
06/1889 |
08/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1904 |
J21 |
899
|
1507
|
5039
|
65039
|
06/1889 |
26/11/1958 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
10/1910 |
J21 |
680
|
1510
|
5040
|
65040
|
06/1889 |
15/09/1952 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
02/1917 |
J21 |
776
|
1511
|
5041
|
65041
|
06/1889 |
01/02/1951 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1911 |
J21 |
778
|
1512
|
5042
|
65042
|
06/1889 |
07/07/1954 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
10/1907 |
J21 |
806
|
1513
|
5043
|
(65043)
|
06/1889 |
01/1951 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
07/1906 |
J21 |
962
|
1514
|
5044
|
65044
|
06/1889 |
31/10/1949 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
04/1904 |
J21 |
963
|
1515
|
5045
|
|
06/1889 |
10/1947 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
03/1918 |
J21 |
965
|
1516
|
5046
|
|
06/1889 |
07/1947 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
05/1916 |
J21 |
973
|
|
5047
|
65047
|
10/1889 |
29/12/1954 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
12/1917 |
J21 |
976
|
|
(5048)
|
|
11/1889 |
11/1945 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
09/1907 |
J21 |
981
|
|
5049
|
(65049)
|
11/1889 |
02/06/1948 |
Superheater removed |
11/1932 |
J21 |
960
|
|
|
|
11/1889 |
03/1937 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1903 |
J21 |
996
|
|
(5054)
|
|
12/1889 |
01/1944 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
12/1916 |
J21 |
899
|
|
5052
|
(65052)
|
12/1889 |
08/1949 |
Superheater removed |
07/1946 |
J21 |
680
|
|
|
|
12/1889 |
12/1934 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1911 |
J21 |
776
|
|
|
|
12/1889 |
05/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1904 |
J21 |
778
|
|
(5050)
|
|
12/1889 |
07/1944 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
08/1916 |
J21 |
806
|
|
5051
|
(65051)
|
12/1889 |
07/1949 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1906 |
J21 |
962
|
|
|
|
12/1889 |
01/1933 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1904 |
J21 |
963
|
|
|
|
12/1889 |
03/1935 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
06/1915 |
J21 |
965
|
|
5053
|
|
12/1889 |
08/1947 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
05/1903 |
J21 |
122
|
|
|
|
12/1889 |
11/1938 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1910 |
J21 |
133
|
|
|
|
12/1889 |
11/1938 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
05/1903 |
J21 |
209
|
|
(5055)
|
|
04/1890 |
10/1945 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
05/1916 |
J21 |
259
|
|
|
|
04/1890 |
07/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
01/1905 |
J21 |
291
|
|
|
|
05/1890 |
08/1937 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1910 |
J21 |
470
|
|
5056
|
(65056)
|
05/1890 |
20/12/1948 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1904 |
J21 |
510
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
05/1937 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
10/1927 |
J21 |
511
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
07/1938 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1905 |
J21 |
1073
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
02/1935 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
03/1917 |
J21 |
1075
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
05/1937 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
09/1914 |
J21 |
294
|
|
5057
|
65057
|
06/1890 |
02/10/1950 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
05/1918 |
J21 |
431
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
07/1943 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1909 |
J21 |
432
|
|
5058
|
(65058)
|
06/1890 |
11/1949 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
09/1927 |
J21 |
520
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
12/1929 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1911 |
J21 |
530
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
08/1938 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1906 |
J21 |
534
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
11/1929 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
03/1904 |
J21 |
538
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
03/1937 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1905 |
J21 |
556
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
07/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1911 |
J21 |
579
|
|
|
|
06/1890 |
05/1937 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
04/1916 |
J21 |
582
|
|
5059
|
(65059)
|
06/1890 |
08/1949 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
11/1906 |
J21 |
93
|
|
|
|
09/1890 |
04/1943 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
12/1916 |
J21 |
123
|
|
5060
|
(65060)
|
09/1890 |
08/1949 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
01/1911 |
J21 |
312
|
|
5061
|
65061
|
09/1890 |
12/05/1958 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
04/1925 |
J21 |
313
|
|
5063
|
(65063)
|
10/1890 |
14/02/1948 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
11/1903 |
J21 |
314
|
|
5064
|
65064
|
10/1890 |
16/09/1958 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
10/1915 |
J21 |
315
|
|
|
|
10/1890 |
10/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
03/1906 |
J21 |
316
|
|
|
|
10/1890 |
08/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
07/1906 |
J21 |
97
|
|
5062
|
65062
|
10/1890 |
06/12/1954 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
01/1919 |
J21 |
99
|
|
|
|
10/1890 |
03/1931 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
09/1916 |
J21 |
668
|
|
|
|
10/1890 |
01/1933 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
03/1913 |
J21 |
68
|
|
5066
|
65066
|
11/1890 |
21/11/1949 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
08/1925 |
J21 |
139
|
|
5067
|
65067
|
11/1890 |
27/11/1951 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
02/1925 |
J21 |
300
|
|
5068
|
65068
|
12/1890 |
21/06/1954 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
12/1916 |
J21 |
810
|
|
5069
|
(65069)
|
12/1890 |
29/04/1948 |
Superheater removed |
02/1935 |
J21 |
997
|
|
5073
|
(65073)
|
01/1891 |
02/1950 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
06/1905 |
J21 |
26
|
|
5070
|
65070
|
01/1891 |
05/09/1960 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
01/1929 |
J21 |
102
|
|
5071
|
|
01/1891 |
08/1946 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
11/1917 |
J21 |
147
|
|
5072
|
(65072)
|
01/1891 |
02/1950 |
Superheater removed |
05/1934 |
J21 |
148
|
|
|
|
02/1891 |
09/1929 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1911 |
J21 |
157
|
|
|
|
02/1891 |
11/1942 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1909 |
J21 |
30
|
|
(5065)
|
|
12/1890 |
08/1946 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
03/1924 |
J21 |
34
|
|
|
|
12/1890 |
05/1937 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
09/1914 |
J21 |
48
|
|
|
|
12/1890 |
05/1937 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
04/1917 |
J21 |
104
|
|
|
|
12/1890 |
02/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
08/1909 |
J21 |
107
|
|
|
|
03/1891 |
09/1933 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
11/1916 |
J21 |
289
|
|
|
|
04/1891 |
08/1938 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1905 |
J21 |
331
|
|
|
|
04/1891 |
10/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
08/1912 |
J21 |
665
|
|
5081
|
65081
|
04/1891 |
30/01/1950 |
Superheater removed |
01/1944 |
J21 |
666
|
|
|
|
05/1891 |
02/1937 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
01/1905 |
J21 |
807
|
|
5082
|
65082
|
05/1891 |
01/01/1955 |
Superheater removed |
12/1943 |
J21 |
1547
|
|
|
|
02/1891 |
05/1931 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
03/1910 |
J21 |
1548
|
|
|
|
02/1891 |
02/1937 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
05/1917 |
J21 |
1549
|
|
5074
|
|
03/1891 |
12/1946 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
08/1927 |
J21 |
1550
|
|
5075
|
65075
|
03/1891 |
28/06/1954 |
Superheater removed |
02/1944 |
J21 |
1551
|
|
|
|
03/1891 |
05/1937 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
09/1906 |
J21 |
1552
|
|
5076
|
(65076)
|
04/1891 |
06/1951 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
06/1928 |
J21 |
1553
|
|
5077
|
65077
|
04/1891 |
24/08/1953 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
06/1923 |
J21 |
1554
|
|
5078
|
65078
|
04/1891 |
04/03/1957 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
12/1921 |
J21 |
1555
|
|
5079
|
(65079)
|
05/1891 |
11/1949 |
Superheater removed |
06/1934 |
J21 |
1556
|
|
5080
|
65080
|
05/1891 |
05/12/1951 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
09/1926 |
J21 |
1557
|
|
5083
|
(65083)
|
05/1891 |
04/1950 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
04/1906 |
J21 |
1558
|
|
|
|
05/1891 |
12/1936 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
10/1910 |
J21 |
1559
|
|
5084
|
65084
|
05/1891 |
17/07/1950 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
04/1917 |
J21 |
1560
|
|
|
|
05/1891 |
08/1936 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
06/1915 |
J21 |
1561
|
|
5089
|
65089
|
06/1891 |
06/12/1954 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
04/1916 |
J21 |
1562
|
|
5090
|
65090
|
06/1891 |
05/12/1955 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
03/1925 |
J21 |
1563
|
|
|
|
06/1891 |
11/1929 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
06/1907 |
J21 |
1564
|
|
5091
|
65091
|
06/1891 |
09/11/1957 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
09/1916 |
J21 |
1565
|
|
5092
|
65092
|
06/1891 |
30/12/1954 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
08/1914 |
J21 |
1566
|
|
5093
|
(65093)
|
06/1891 |
09/1949 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
10/1925 |
J21 |
1567
|
|
5094
|
(65094)
|
07/1891 |
02/1950 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
06/1908 |
J21 |
1568
|
|
|
|
07/1891 |
01/1937 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
12/1910 |
J21 |
1569
|
|
5095
|
65095
|
07/1891 |
02/04/1951 |
Superheater removed |
08/1944 |
J21 |
1570
|
|
|
|
07/1891 |
06/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
02/1911 |
J21 |
1571
|
|
|
|
08/1891 |
03/1936 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
11/1908 |
J21 |
1572
|
|
|
|
08/1891 |
08/1936 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
08/1920 |
J21 |
1573
|
|
5096
|
|
08/1891 |
06/1947 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
11/1910 |
J21 |
1574
|
|
5097
|
65097
|
09/1891 |
13/12/1954 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
03/1918 |
J21 |
1575
|
|
5098
|
65098
|
09/1891 |
30/12/1954 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
03/1916 |
J21 |
1576
|
|
5099
|
65099
|
09/1891 |
30/10/1961 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
02/1908 |
J21 |
51
|
|
(5085)
|
|
06/1891 |
04/1944 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
06/1916 |
J21 |
424
|
|
|
|
06/1891 |
07/1934 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
06/1916 |
J21 |
513
|
|
5086
|
(65086)
|
06/1891 |
02/1949 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1904 |
J21 |
568
|
|
|
|
06/1891 |
08/1938 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
01/1904 |
J21 |
569
|
|
5087
|
|
06/1891 |
06/1947 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
08/1907 |
J21 |
570
|
|
5088
|
65088
|
06/1891 |
21/11/1955 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
09/1914 |
J21 |
1071
|
|
|
|
06/1891 |
08/1933 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
01/1905 |
J21 |
1122
|
|
5100
|
65100
|
08/1891 |
13/12/1954 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
08/1916 |
J21 |
1187
|
|
|
|
09/1891 |
02/1936 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
09/1904 |
J21 |
1188
|
|
|
|
09/1891 |
09/1935 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
10/1904 |
J21 |
1587
|
|
|
|
01/1892 |
01/1931 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
03/1909 |
J21 |
1588
|
|
5101
|
(65101)
|
01/1892 |
04/1950 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
04/1907 |
J21 |
1589
|
|
5102
|
65102
|
01/1892 |
14/11/1951 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
03/1924 |
J21 |
1590
|
|
5103
|
65103
|
02/1892 |
05/12/1958 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
09/1915 |
J21 |
1591
|
|
5104
|
65104
|
02/1892 |
04/10/1948 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
05/1909 |
J21 |
1592
|
|
|
|
03/1892 |
09/1937 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
01/1928 |
J21 |
1593
|
|
5105
|
65105
|
03/1892 |
12/09/1951 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
06/1928 |
J21 |
1594
|
|
5106
|
|
03/1892 |
05/1947 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
04/1926 |
J21 |
1595
|
|
5107
|
65107
|
03/1892 |
16/05/1949 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
03/1928 |
J21 |
1596
|
|
5108
|
(65108)
|
04/1892 |
10/1949 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
05/1925 |
J21 |
1607
|
|
|
|
10/1892 |
01/1943 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
11/1906 |
J21 |
1608
|
|
5109
|
(65109)
|
10/1892 |
04/1949 |
Superheater removed |
05/1946 |
J21 |
1609
|
|
5110
|
65110
|
11/1892 |
18/07/1960 |
Superheater removed |
11/1956 |
J21 |
1610
|
|
5111
|
65111
|
11/1892 |
21/03/1951 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
11/1904 |
J21 |
1611
|
|
5112
|
(65112)
|
12/1892 |
11/1949 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
07/1904 |
J21 |
1612
|
|
|
|
12/1892 |
05/1937 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
05/1925 |
J21 |
1613
|
|
5113
|
|
12/1892 |
08/1947 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
02/1923 |
J21 |
1614
|
|
5114
|
(65114)
|
12/1892 |
05/1949 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
11/1902 |
J21 |
1615
|
|
5115
|
(65115)
|
12/1892 |
26/06/1948 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
02/1931 |
J21 |
1616
|
|
|
|
12/1892 |
10/1929 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
05/1905 |
J21 |
1804
|
|
|
|
03/1894 |
05/1937 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
09/1924 |
J21 |
1806
|
|
5117
|
65117
|
04/1894 |
23/02/1959 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
03/1928 |
J21 |
1807
|
|
|
|
04/1894 |
10/1935 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
05/1923 |
J21 |
1808
|
|
|
|
05/1894 |
05/1937 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
05/1916 |
J21 |
1809
|
|
|
|
05/1894 |
03/1943 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
07/1923 |
J21 |
1810
|
|
5118
|
65118
|
05/1894 |
29/11/1951 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
12/1923 |
J21 |
1811
|
|
5119
|
65119
|
06/1894 |
13/12/1954 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
05/1917 |
J21 |
1814
|
|
5121
|
(65121)
|
06/1894 |
12/1949 |
Superheater removed |
10/1943 |