J27 |
790
|
5780
|
65780
|
04/1906 |
24/04/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
01/1950 |
J27 |
814
|
5781
|
65781
|
04/1906 |
19/10/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
08/1956 |
J27 |
836
|
5782
|
65782
|
04/1906 |
20/11/1961 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
10/1958 |
J27 |
839
|
5783
|
65783
|
05/1906 |
02/06/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1956 |
J27 |
880
|
5784
|
65784
|
05/1906 |
27/08/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
06/1946 |
J27 |
883
|
5785
|
65785
|
06/1906 |
16/06/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
09/1948 |
J27 |
888
|
5786
|
65786
|
06/1906 |
16/04/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
09/1946 |
J27 |
891
|
5787
|
65787
|
06/1906 |
14/05/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
10/1939 |
J27 |
917
|
5788
|
65788
|
06/1906 |
05/06/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
10/1945 |
J27 |
938
|
5789
|
65789
|
06/1906 |
01/07/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
08/1948 |
J27 |
1006
|
5790
|
65790
|
09/1906 |
07/08/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
11/1952 |
J27 |
1016
|
5791
|
65791
|
09/1906 |
12/10/1964 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
06/1955 |
J27 |
1018
|
5792
|
65792
|
09/1906 |
10/05/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
12/1958 |
J27 |
1052
|
5793
|
65793
|
10/1906 |
16/04/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1952 |
J27 |
1189
|
5794
|
65794
|
10/1906 |
28/06/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1944 |
J27 |
1227
|
5795
|
65795
|
10/1906 |
12/07/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
12/1950 |
J27 |
1256
|
5796
|
65796
|
11/1906 |
15/05/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1963 |
J27 |
1393
|
5797
|
65797
|
11/1906 |
27/11/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1944 |
J27 |
1402
|
5798
|
65798
|
11/1906 |
02/06/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
11/1955 |
J27 |
1686
|
5799
|
65799
|
12/1906 |
06/08/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1946 |
J27 |
1001
|
5800
|
65800
|
06/1908 |
10/09/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
05/1946 |
J27 |
1003
|
5801
|
65801
|
06/1908 |
31/07/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
06/1946 |
J27 |
1004
|
5802
|
65802
|
06/1908 |
07/08/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
10/1957 |
J27 |
1005
|
5803
|
65803
|
06/1908 |
16/04/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
09/1945 |
J27 |
1007
|
5804
|
65804
|
08/1908 |
01/07/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1948 |
J27 |
1013
|
5805
|
65805
|
09/1908 |
20/01/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1942 |
J27 |
1008
|
5806
|
65806
|
10/1908 |
08/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1944 |
J27 |
1010
|
5807
|
65807
|
10/1908 |
14/05/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
10/1958 |
J27 |
1011
|
5808
|
65808
|
11/1908 |
15/03/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1945 |
J27 |
1012
|
5809
|
65809
|
11/1908 |
04/09/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
08/1945 |
J27 |
1014
|
5810
|
65810
|
05/1908 |
23/12/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
07/1941 |
J27 |
1015
|
5811
|
65811
|
05/1908 |
09/09/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1946 |
J27 |
1017
|
5812
|
65812
|
05/1908 |
05/06/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
01/1959 |
J27 |
1022
|
5813
|
65813
|
05/1908 |
24/05/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
09/1944 |
J27 |
1023
|
5814
|
65814
|
05/1908 |
29/06/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
05/1952 |
J27 |
1024
|
5815
|
65815
|
05/1908 |
21/11/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1944 |
J27 |
1025
|
5816
|
65816
|
05/1908 |
14/10/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
07/1952 |
J27 |
1027
|
5817
|
65817
|
05/1908 |
01/05/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
01/1960 |
J27 |
1028
|
5818
|
65818
|
05/1908 |
30/07/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1948 |
J27 |
1029
|
5819
|
65819
|
05/1908 |
09/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1945 |
J27 |
1030
|
5820
|
65820
|
06/1908 |
06/05/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1957 |
J27 |
1034
|
5821
|
65821
|
06/1908 |
27/02/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
12/1951 |
J27 |
1035
|
5822
|
65822
|
06/1908 |
01/03/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
11/1955 |
J27 |
1036
|
5823
|
65823
|
06/1908 |
20/03/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
05/1953 |
J27 |
1039
|
5824
|
65824
|
06/1908 |
11/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
07/1955 |
J27 |
1040
|
5825
|
65825
|
06/1908 |
07/06/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
08/1961 |
J27 |
1044
|
5826
|
65826
|
06/1908 |
26/08/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
07/1946 |
J27 |
1046
|
5827
|
65827
|
06/1908 |
03/07/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
01/1949 |
J27 |
1047
|
5828
|
65828
|
06/1908 |
05/1964 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
01/1945 |
J27 |
1048
|
5829
|
65829
|
06/1908 |
30/03/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1945 |
J27 |
1049
|
5830
|
65830
|
04/1909 |
18/03/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
09/1951 |
J27 |
1050
|
5831
|
65831
|
04/1909 |
13/02/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1955 |
J27 |
1053
|
5832
|
65832
|
05/1909 |
27/03/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
10/1939 |
J27 |
1056
|
5833
|
65833
|
05/1909 |
01/05/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
06/1945 |
J27 |
1060
|
5834
|
65834
|
06/1909 |
24/05/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1942 |
J27 |
1061
|
5835
|
65835
|
07/1909 |
23/01/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1944 |
J27 |
1064
|
5836
|
65836
|
07/1909 |
13/04/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1952 |
J27 |
1065
|
5837
|
65837
|
09/1909 |
30/10/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1958 |
J27 |
1066
|
5838
|
65838
|
09/1909 |
23/01/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1942 |
J27 |
1067
|
5839
|
65839
|
09/1909 |
22/01/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1946 |
J27 |
1201
|
5840
|
65840
|
07/1908 |
13/05/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
08/1949 |
J27 |
1203
|
5841
|
65841
|
07/1908 |
30/08/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
11/1951 |
J27 |
1204
|
5842
|
65842
|
07/1908 |
18/01/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
11/1958 |
J27 |
1205
|
5843
|
65843
|
07/1908 |
13/04/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1944 |
J27 |
1211
|
5844
|
65844
|
08/1908 |
27/12/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1949 |
J27 |
1212
|
5845
|
65845
|
08/1908 |
22/02/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
30/04/1948 |
J27 |
1213
|
5846
|
65846
|
08/1908 |
25/10/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
14/04/1947 |
J27 |
1214
|
5847
|
65847
|
08/1908 |
08/02/1960 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1948 |
J27 |
1216
|
5848
|
65848
|
08/1908 |
04/09/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
06/1946 |
J27 |
1219
|
5849
|
65849
|
08/1908 |
06/05/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1948 |
J27 |
1220
|
5850
|
65850
|
08/1908 |
29/04/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1942 |
J27 |
1221
|
5851
|
65851
|
08/1908 |
27/12/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1948 |
J27 |
1222
|
5852
|
65852
|
08/1908 |
23/12/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
12/1958 |
J27 |
1224
|
5853
|
65853
|
08/1908 |
14/02/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1946 |
J27 |
1225
|
5854
|
65854
|
08/1908 |
23/12/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
06/1945 |
J27 |
1226
|
5855
|
65855
|
08/1908 |
08/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
08/1950 |
J27 |
1228
|
5856
|
65856
|
08/1908 |
26/08/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
07/1955 |
J27 |
1229
|
5857
|
65857
|
08/1908 |
02/04/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
05/1956 |
J27 |
1230
|
5858
|
65858
|
08/1908 |
04/10/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
05/1941 |
J27 |
1231
|
5859
|
65859
|
08/1908 |
04/09/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
06/1946 |
J27 |
2338
|
5860
|
65860
|
11/1921 |
01/07/1967 |
Superheater removed |
07/1945 |
J27 |
2339
|
5861
|
65861
|
12/1921 |
22/05/1967 |
Superheater removed |
03/1947 |
J27 |
2340
|
5862
|
65862
|
12/1921 |
04/10/1965 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
07/1945 |
J27 |
2341
|
5863
|
65863
|
12/1921 |
06/08/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
03/1959 |
J27 |
2342
|
5864
|
65864
|
12/1921 |
23/12/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
05/1946 |
J27 |
2343
|
5865
|
65865
|
12/1921 |
05/02/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1961 |
J27 |
2344
|
5866
|
65866
|
03/1922 |
18/06/1959 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1955 |
J27 |
2345
|
5867
|
65867
|
03/1922 |
06/06/1962 |
Superheater removed |
03/1947 |
J27 |
2346
|
5868
|
65868
|
03/1922 |
29/05/1961 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
05/1946 |
J27 |
2347
|
5869
|
65869
|
04/1922 |
14/02/1967 |
Superheater removed |
08/1956 |
J27 |
2348
|
5870
|
65870
|
05/1922 |
12/10/1964 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1944 |
J27 |
2349
|
5871
|
65871
|
05/1922 |
14/01/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted |
07/1957 |
J27 |
2350
|
5872
|
65872
|
05/1922 |
31/01/1967 |
Superheater removed |
01/1958 |
J27 |
2351
|
5873
|
65873
|
06/1922 |
30/10/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1946 |
J27 |
2352
|
5874
|
65874
|
06/1922 |
07/08/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1960 |
J27 |
2353
|
5875
|
65875
|
06/1922 |
25/03/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
09/1945 |
J27 |
2354
|
5876
|
65876
|
06/1922 |
16/03/1964 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
04/1944 |
J27 |
2355
|
5877
|
65877
|
06/1922 |
29/10/1962 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
09/1955 |
J27 |
2356
|
5878
|
65878
|
06/1922 |
12/10/1964 |
Superheater removed |
07/1955 |
J27 |
2357
|
5879
|
65879
|
06/1922 |
09/09/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
06/1956 |
J27 |
2358
|
5880
|
65880
|
08/1922 |
12/06/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
10/1948 |
J27 |
2359
|
5881
|
65881
|
08/1922 |
04/02/1963 |
Superheater removed |
01/1961 |
J27 |
2360
|
5882
|
65882
|
08/1922 |
09/09/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1944 |
J27 |
2361
|
5883
|
65883
|
09/1922 |
01/04/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
09/1945 |
J27 |
2362
|
5884
|
65884
|
10/1922 |
09/12/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
06/1955 |
J27 |
2383
|
5885
|
65885
|
06/1923 |
07/06/1967 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
07/1943 |
J27 |
2384
|
5886
|
65886
|
06/1923 |
24/08/1959 |
Superheater removed |
07/1954 |
J27 |
2385
|
5887
|
65887
|
06/1923 |
06/05/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
10/1958 |
J27 |
2386
|
5888
|
65888
|
06/1923 |
09/12/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
12/1945 |
J27 |
2387
|
5889
|
65889
|
06/1923 |
10/02/1964 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
01/1956 |
J27 |
2388
|
5890
|
65890
|
07/1923 |
06/05/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
10/1951 |
J27 |
2389
|
5891
|
65891
|
07/1923 |
23/12/1963 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
02/1947 |
J27 |
2390
|
5892
|
65892
|
08/1923 |
07/08/1967 |
Superheater removed |
09/1948 |
J27 |
2391
|
5893
|
65893
|
09/1923 |
31/07/1966 |
LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted |
12/1949 |
J27 |
2392
|
5894
|
65894
|
09/1923 |
09/09/1967 |
Superheater removed |
03/1963 |