NBR/LNER Reid "J37" Class 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 9139 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
12/1935 | Reallocation | 9478 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9435 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9123 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9274 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9305 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9314 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9462 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9480 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9313 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9491 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 9046 | TWD | Tweedmouth | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4536 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4537 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4538 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4539 | HAW | Hawick | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4540 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4541 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4542 | STG | Stirling | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4543 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4544 | STG | Stirling | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4545 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4546 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4547 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4548 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4549 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4550 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4551 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4552 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4553 | TWD | Tweedmouth | THJ | Thornton Junction | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4554 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4565 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4556 | STG | Stirling | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4557 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4558 | TWD | Tweedmouth | EFD | Eastfield | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4559 | EFD | Eastfield | PKD | Parkhead | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4560 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4561 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4562 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4563 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4564 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4565 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4566 | TWD | Tweedmouth | STM | St Margarets | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4567 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4568 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4569 | STG | Stirling | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4570 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4571 | TWD | Tweedmouth | POL | Polmont | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4572 | TWD | Tweedmouth | STM | St Margarets | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4573 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4574 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4575 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4576 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4577 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4578 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4579 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4580 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4581 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4582 | TWD | Tweedmouth | STM | St Margarets | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4583 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4584 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4585 | STG | Stirling | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4586 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4587 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4588 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4589 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4590 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4591 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4592 | STM | St Margarets | STM | St Margarets | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4593 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4594 | TWD | Tweedmouth | STM | St Margarets | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4595 | TWD | Tweedmouth | STM | St Margarets | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4596 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4597 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4598 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4599 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4600 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4601 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4602 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4603 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4604 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4605 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4606 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4607 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4608 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4609 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4610 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4611 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4612 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4613 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4614 | TWD | Tweedmouth | STM | St Margarets | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4615 | TWD | Tweedmouth | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4616 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4617 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4618 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4619 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4620 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4621 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4622 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4623 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4624 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4625 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4626 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4627 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4628 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4629 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4630 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4631 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4632 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4633 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4634 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4635 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4636 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4637 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4638 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4639 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4553 | THJ | Thornton Junction | POL | Polmont | |
17/01/1948 | Reallocation | 4592 | STM | St Margarets | POL | Polmont | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 4621 | POL | Polmont | PKD | Parkhead | |
29/05/1948 | Reallocation | 4548 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | PKD | Parkhead | |
15/01/1949 | Reallocation | 4556 | STG | Stirling | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |
02/04/1949 | Reallocation | 64610 | EFD | Eastfield | PKD | Parkhead | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 64537 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | POL | Polmont | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 64593 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | POL | Polmont | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 64628 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | EFD | Eastfield | |
04/03/1950 | Reallocation | 64536 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | 64C | Dalry Road | |
04/03/1950 | Reallocation | 64591 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | 64D | Carstairs | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 64591 | 64D | Carstairs | 64C | Dalry Road | |
04/06/1950 | Reallocation | 64598 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
17/06/1950 | Reallocation | 64598 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
12/02/1951 | Reallocation | 64548 | PKD | Parkhead | 65E | Kipps | |
17/02/1951 | Reallocation | 64548 | 65E | Kipps | 65E | Kipps | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 64601 | EFD | Eastfield | 64F | Bathgate | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 64601 | 64F | Bathgate | 64F | Bathgate | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 64579 | EFD | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
19/05/1951 | Reallocation | 64547 | STM | St Margarets | 64C | Dalry Road | |
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 64583 | EFD | Eastfield | 64F | Bathgate | |
01/12/1951 | Reallocation | 64613 | POL | Polmont | 64A | St Margarets | |
01/12/1951 | Reallocation | 64636 | STM | St Margarets | 64E | Polmont | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 64553 | POL | Polmont | 64F | Bathgate | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 64553 | 64F | Bathgate | 64F | Bathgate | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 64547 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64A | St Margarets | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 64590 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 64A | St Margarets | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 64597 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 64A | St Margarets | |
16/05/1953 | Reallocation | 64601 | 64F | Bathgate | 64A | St Margarets | |
01/10/1955 | Reallocation | 64612 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 64D | Carstairs | |
01/10/1955 | Reallocation | 64634 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64D | Carstairs | |
12/05/1956 | Reallocation | 64612 | 64D | Carstairs | 64C | Dalry Road | |
12/05/1956 | Reallocation | 64634 | 64D | Carstairs | 64F | Bathgate | |
27/10/1956 | Reallocation | 64554 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 64C | Dalry Road | |
27/10/1956 | Reallocation | 64561 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 64C | Dalry Road | |
27/10/1956 | Reallocation | 64574 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 64C | Dalry Road | |
22/12/1956 | Reallocation | 64545 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
22/12/1956 | Reallocation | 64556 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
11/05/1957 | Reallocation | 64543 | STM | St Margarets | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
11/05/1957 | Reallocation | 64597 | 64A | St Margarets | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 64542 | STG | Stirling | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 64544 | STG | Stirling | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 64585 | STG | Stirling | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 64548 | 65E | Kipps | 65A | Eastfield | |
26/10/1957 | Reallocation | 64628 | EFD | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
27/09/1958 | Reallocation | 64536 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64A | St Margarets | |
27/09/1958 | Reallocation | 64574 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64A | St Margarets | |
27/09/1958 | Reallocation | 64591 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64A | St Margarets | |
27/09/1958 | Reallocation | 64612 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/01/1959 | Reallocation | 64574 | 64A | St Margarets | 65E | Kipps | |
17/01/1959 | Reallocation | 64588 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | 65F | Grangemouth | |
17/01/1959 | Reallocation | 64589 | POL | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
17/01/1959 | Reallocation | 64592 | POL | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
17/01/1959 | Reallocation | 64593 | POL | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 64569 | STG | Stirling | 64C | Dalry Road | |
22/05/1959 | Condemned | 64536 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
15/07/1959 | Condemned | 64584 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
29/08/1959 | Reallocation | 64600 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
29/08/1959 | Reallocation | 64602 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
26/09/1959 | Reallocation | 64588 | 65F | Grangemouth | 65C | Parkhead | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 64539 | HAW | Hawick | 64A | St Margarets | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 64542 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 65E | Kipps | |
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 64544 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 65E | Kipps | |
07/12/1959 | Condemned | 64538 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 64545 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
16/01/1960 | Reallocation | 64585 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
04/03/1960 | Condemned | 64567 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
08/03/1961 | Condemned | 64560 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
05/04/1961 | Condemned | 64596 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
08/04/1961 | Reallocation | 64561 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64A | St Margarets | |
08/09/1961 | Condemned | 64539 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
02/10/1961 | Condemned | 64542 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
02/10/1961 | Condemned | 64565 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
18/11/1961 | Reallocation | 64593 | 65F | Grangemouth | 65E | Kipps | |
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 64554 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64F | Bathgate | |
27/01/1962 | Reallocation | 64569 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64F | Bathgate | |
08/03/1962 | Condemned | 64553 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 64592 | 65F | Grangemouth | 65K | Polmont | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 64611 | EFD | Eastfield | 65K | Polmont | |
29/03/1962 | Condemned | 64628 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
09/04/1962 | Condemned | 64566 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 64541 | EFD | Eastfield | 67C | Ayr | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 64626 | PKD | Parkhead | 67C | Ayr | |
14/05/1962 | Condemned | 64590 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
21/05/1962 | Condemned | 64578 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
16/06/1962 | Reallocation | 64552 | STM | St Margarets | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
25/06/1962 | Condemned | 64545 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
13/08/1962 | Condemned | 64607 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
27/08/1962 | Condemned | 64604 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
27/08/1962 | Condemned | 64637 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
06/09/1962 | Condemned | 64598 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
06/09/1962 | Condemned | 64630 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 64573 | PKD | Parkhead | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
08/09/1962 | Reallocation | 64588 | 65C | Parkhead | 64A | St Margarets | |
10/12/1962 | Condemned | 64543 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
17/12/1962 | Condemned | 64556 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 64550 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64540 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64544 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Reallocation | 64559 | PKD | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
29/12/1962 | Reallocation | 64563 | PKD | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64574 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64581 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64594 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64601 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64609 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64612 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64615 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64622 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64631 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64635 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64638 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 64639 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/1963 | Reallocation | 64612 | 98W | 64A | St Margarets | ||
01/1963 | Reallocation | 64615 | 98W | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
01/1963 | Reallocation | 64617 | 98W | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
01/1963 | Reallocation | 64631 | 98W | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
01/1963 | Reallocation | 64635 | 98W | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64557 | STM | St Margarets | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64557 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64576 | STM | St Margarets | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64576 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64577 | STM | St Margarets | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64577 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64586 | STM | St Margarets | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64588 | 64A | St Margarets | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64593 | 65E | Kipps | 65F | Grangemouth | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64603 | STM | St Margarets | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64603 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64605 | STM | St Margarets | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64605 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64610 | PKD | Parkhead | 65F | Grangemouth | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64611 | 65K | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
19/01/1963 | Reallocation | 64621 | PKD | Parkhead | 65F | Grangemouth | |
11/02/1963 | Reallocation | 64601 | 98W | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
11/02/1963 | Condemned | 64617 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
16/03/1963 | Reallocation | 64601 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 65F | Grangemouth | |
31/05/1963 | Condemned | 64589 | 65F | Grangemouth | COND | ||
06/07/1963 | Reallocation | 64541 | 67C | Ayr | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
06/07/1963 | Reallocation | 64597 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
09/07/1963 | Condemned | 64600 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
03/08/1963 | Reallocation | 64625 | STM | St Margarets | 64F | Bathgate | |
05/08/1963 | Condemned | 64568 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
07/09/1963 | Reallocation | 64625 | 64F | Bathgate | 64A | St Margarets | |
18/09/1963 | Condemned | 64551 | POL | Polmont | COND | ||
14/10/1963 | Condemned | 64627 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
28/10/1963 | Condemned | 64557 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
28/10/1963 | Condemned | 64629 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
02/11/1963 | Reallocation | 64593 | 65F | Grangemouth | 65K | Polmont | |
14/11/1963 | Condemned | 64562 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
25/11/1963 | Condemned | 64582 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/11/1963 | Condemned | 64548 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/11/1963 | Condemned | 64559 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/11/1963 | Condemned | 64593 | 65K | Polmont | COND | ||
29/11/1963 | Condemned | 64626 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 64558 | EFD | Eastfield | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 64595 | STM | St Margarets | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 64608 | STM | St Margarets | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 64624 | STM | St Margarets | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
30/11/1963 | Reallocation | 64632 | EFD | Eastfield | 65K | Polmont | |
09/12/1963 | Condemned | 64619 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
16/12/1963 | Condemned | 64603 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
23/12/1963 | Condemned | 64583 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
25/12/1963 | Condemned | 64550 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 64575 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 64579 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
28/12/1963 | Condemned | 64616 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 64623 | EFD | Eastfield | 65K | Polmont | |
28/12/1963 | Reallocation | 64632 | 65K | Polmont | 65A | Eastfield | |
23/01/1964 | Condemned | 64554 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
23/01/1964 | Condemned | 64613 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
23/01/1964 | Condemned | 64634 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 64561 | 64A | St Margarets | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
25/01/1964 | Reallocation | 64613 | 98W | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
29/02/1964 | Reallocation | 64606 | STM | St Margarets | 64F | Bathgate | |
29/02/1964 | Reallocation | 64614 | STM | St Margarets | 64F | Bathgate | |
25/04/1964 | Reallocation | 64547 | 64A | St Margarets | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
25/04/1964 | Reallocation | 64599 | STM | St Margarets | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
25/04/1964 | Reallocation | 64625 | 64A | St Margarets | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
11/05/1964 | Condemned | 64561 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
14/05/1964 | Condemned | 64546 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 64537 | POL | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 64570 | POL | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 64571 | POL | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 64592 | 65K | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 64623 | 65K | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
30/05/1964 | Reallocation | 64636 | 64E | Polmont | 65F | Grangemouth | |
08/06/1964 | Condemned | 64537 | 65F | Grangemouth | COND | ||
08/06/1964 | Condemned | 64564 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
08/06/1964 | Condemned | 64587 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
08/06/1964 | Condemned | 64605 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
08/06/1964 | Condemned | 64633 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
27/06/1964 | Reallocation | 64580 | EFD | Eastfield | 65F | Grangemouth | |
27/06/1964 | Reallocation | 64625 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
29/06/1964 | Condemned | 64586 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
07/07/1964 | Condemned | 64541 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
13/07/1964 | Condemned | 64549 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
22/08/1964 | Reallocation | 64632 | 65A | Eastfield | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
14/09/1964 | Condemned | 64572 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
26/09/1964 | Reallocation | 64555 | STM | St Margarets | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
26/09/1964 | Reallocation | 64563 | 65A | Eastfield | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
26/09/1964 | Reallocation | 64572 | 98W | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
26/09/1964 | Reallocation | 64591 | 64A | St Margarets | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
12/10/1964 | Condemned | 64552 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
12/10/1964 | Condemned | 64555 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
12/10/1964 | Condemned | 64573 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
12/10/1964 | Condemned | 64591 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
12/10/1964 | Condemned | 64636 | 65F | Grangemouth | COND | ||
19/10/1964 | Condemned | 64563 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
31/10/1964 | Reallocation | 64563 | 98W | 65A | Eastfield | ||
31/10/1964 | Reallocation | 64570 | 65F | Grangemouth | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
31/10/1964 | Reallocation | 64571 | 65F | Grangemouth | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
31/10/1964 | Reallocation | 64611 | 65F | Grangemouth | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
31/10/1964 | Reallocation | 64623 | 65F | Grangemouth | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 64569 | 64F | Bathgate | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
28/11/1964 | Reallocation | 64606 | 64F | Bathgate | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
17/12/1964 | Condemned | 64614 | 64F | Bathgate | COND | ||
30/12/1964 | Condemned | 64585 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
29/05/1965 | Condemned | 64621 | 65F | Grangemouth | COND | ||
31/07/1965 | Condemned | 64592 | 65F | Grangemouth | COND | ||
03/09/1965 | Condemned | 64558 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
04/09/1965 | Condemned | 64625 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
02/10/1965 | Condemned | 64599 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
15/10/1965 | Condemned | 64580 | 65F | Grangemouth | COND | ||
23/10/1965 | Condemned | 64571 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
04/12/1965 | Reallocation | 64610 | 65F | Grangemouth | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
06/12/1965 | Condemned | 64632 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
17/01/1966 | Condemned | 64624 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
01/02/1966 | Condemned | 64610 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
03/03/1966 | Condemned | 64595 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
23/06/1966 | Condemned | 64588 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
14/07/1966 | Condemned | 64606 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
17/08/1966 | Condemned | 64577 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
20/08/1966 | Reallocation | 64602 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
22/08/1966 | Condemned | 64597 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
24/08/1966 | Condemned | 64608 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
24/09/1966 | Reallocation | 64620 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | |
18/11/1966 | Reallocation | 64623 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
19/11/1966 | Condemned | 64570 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
19/11/1966 | Condemned | 64618 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
19/11/1966 | Condemned | 64623 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 64569 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 64602 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 64611 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
26/11/1966 | Reallocation | 64620 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
10/12/1966 | Condemned | 64569 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
31/12/1966 | Condemned | 64547 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
04/04/1967 | Condemned | 64576 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
22/04/1967 | Condemned | 64602 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
22/04/1967 | Condemned | 64611 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
22/04/1967 | Condemned | 64620 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND |