Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 121 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1029 Week
» 22011 Month
» 163965 Year
» 1048346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "J50" Class 0-6-0T


Class GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1945) LNER (1946) BR BR (Dept) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
J50/1 157 3157 3180 8890 68890   12/1913 ARD
DON
36A
34B
37A
W
Ardsley
Doncaster
Doncaster
Hornsey
Ardsley
Withdrawn
12/1913
01/01/1948
21/10/1950
15/11/1952
13/12/1952
03/1961
03/1961
J50/1 158 3158 3181 8891 68891   02/1914 ARD
WFD
34B
W
34A
Ardsley
Woodford Halse
Hornsey
Withdrawn
Kings Cross
02/1914
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
07/1961
15/07/1961
07/1961
J50/1 159 3159 3182 8892 68892   02/1914 BFD
BFD
56F
51E
50C
56C
56B
56C
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Stockton
Selby
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
02/1914
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
10/05/1958
20/06/1959
19/09/1959
03/10/1959
18/06/1960
09/1963
09/1963
J50/1 160 3160 3183 8893 68893   02/1914 ARD
DON
40B
30A
38A
W
Ardsley
Doncaster
Immingham
Stratford
Colwick
Withdrawn
02/1914
01/01/1948
21/06/1952
19/03/1955
18/02/1956
10/1959
10/1959
J50/1 161 3161 3184 8894 68894   02/1914 ARD
WFD
CLK
34B
34A
W
Ardsley
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Hornsey
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
02/1914
01/01/1948
07/1949
18/10/1952
15/07/1961
09/1961
09/1961
J50/1 162 3162 3185 8895 68895   02/1914 BFD
BFD
56B
56G
56F
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
02/1914
01/01/1948
21/09/1957
19/10/1957
08/02/1958
03/1960
03/1960
J50/1 163 3163 3186 8896 68896   03/1914 ARD
ARD
38B
34E
34B
34A
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Annesley
New England
Hornsey
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
03/1914
01/01/1948
13/12/1952
20/12/1958
30/01/1960
15/07/1961
08/1961
08/1961
J50/1 164 3164 3187 8897 68897   03/1914 BFD
BFD
56F
51A
56A
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Darlington
Wakefield
Withdrawn
03/1914
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
08/03/1958
20/06/1959
11/1960
11/1960
J50/1 166 3166 3188 8898 68898   03/1914 ARD
BFD
56B
51A
56A
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Darlington
Wakefield
Withdrawn
03/1914
01/01/1948
21/09/1957
14/06/1958
20/06/1959
01/1960
01/1960
J50/1 167 3167 3189 8899 68899   04/1914 ARD
DON
30A
W
Ardsley
Doncaster
Stratford
Withdrawn
04/1914
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
12/1960
12/1960
J50/2 168 3168   8900 68900   12/1914 ARD
ARD
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
12/1914
01/01/1948
22/01/1962
22/01/1962
J50/2 169 3169   8901 68901   12/1914 ARD
ARD
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
12/1914
01/01/1948
10/1960
10/1960
J50/2 170 3170   8902 68902   12/1914 ARD
BFD
37A
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
Withdrawn
12/1914
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
09/1960
09/1960
J50/2 171 3171   8903 68903   02/1915 ARD
ARD
34B
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Hornsey
Withdrawn
02/1915
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
04/1961
04/1961
J50/2 172 3172   8904 68904   02/1915 ARD
ARD
56A
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
02/1915
01/01/1948
28/02/1959
09/1963
09/1963
J50/2 173 3173   8905 68905   03/1915 ARD
STR
30A
W
Ardsley
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
03/1915
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
12/1960
12/1960
J50/2 174 3174   8906 68906   04/1915 ARD
BFD
34B
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Hornsey
Withdrawn
04/1915
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
05/1959
05/1959
J50/2 175 3175   8907 68907   04/1915 ARD
ARD
34B
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Hornsey
Withdrawn
04/1915
01/01/1948
21/03/1953
04/1961
04/1961
J50/2 176 3176   8908 68908   06/1915 ARD
BFD
56F
51D
51L
56F
56A
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Middlesbrough
Thornaby
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
06/1915
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
10/05/1958
14/06/1958
31/01/1959
29/12/1962
09/1963
09/1963
J50/2 178 3178   8909 68909   06/1915 ARD
ARD
51E
51A
56A
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Stockton
Darlington
Wakefield
Withdrawn
06/1915
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
11/10/1958
20/06/1959
04/1960
04/1960
J50/2 211 3211   8910 68910   06/1919 ARD
ARD
56A
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
06/1919
01/01/1948
28/02/1959
26/11/1962
26/11/1962
J50/2 212 3212   8911 68911 10 06/1919 ARD
COP
W
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
06/1919
01/01/1948
11/1960
11/1960
J50/2 213 3213   8912 68912   07/1919 ARD
BFD
56F
53A
53E
56F
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Hull Dairycoates
Goole
Low Moor
Withdrawn
07/1919
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
08/03/1958
14/06/1958
31/01/1959
09/1959
09/1959
J50/2 214 3214   8913 68913   07/1919 ARD
COP
W
Ardsley
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
07/1919
01/01/1948
08/1960
08/1960
J50/2 215 3215   8914 68914 11 07/1919 ARD
ARD
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
07/1919
01/01/1948
11/1960
11/1960
J50/2 216 3216   8915 68915   07/1919 ARD
ARD
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
07/1919
01/01/1948
10/1960
10/1960
J50/2 217 3217   8916 68916   07/1919 ARD
ARD
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
07/1919
01/01/1948
04/1961
04/1961
J50/2 218 3218   8917 68917 12 08/1919 ARD
ARD
34B
36A

W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Hornsey
Doncaster

Withdrawn
08/1919
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
15/07/1961
09/1962
05/1965
05/1965
J50/2 219 3219   8918 68918   08/1919 ARD
DON
34B
W
34A
Ardsley
Doncaster
Hornsey
Withdrawn
Kings Cross
08/1919
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
07/1961
15/07/1961
07/1961
J50/2 220 3220   8919 68919   08/1919 ARD
ARD
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
08/1919
01/01/1948
09/1959
09/1959
J50/2 221 3221   8920 68920   10/1922 ARD
WFD
CLK
34B
W
34A
Ardsley
Woodford Halse
Colwick
Hornsey
Withdrawn
Kings Cross
10/1922
01/01/1948
07/1949
18/10/1952
07/1961
15/07/1961
07/1961
J50/2 222 3222   8921 68921   11/1922 ARD
ARD
34B
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Hornsey
Withdrawn
11/1922
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
04/1961
04/1961
J50/2 223 3223   8922 68922   11/1922 ARD
BFD
56F
56A
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
11/1922
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
29/12/1962
09/1963
09/1963
J50/2 224 3224   8923 68923   11/1922 ARD
BFD
56F
W
Ardsley
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
11/1922
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
13/12/1961
13/12/1961
J50/2 225 3225   8924 68924   11/1922 ARD
STR
30A
W
Ardsley
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
11/1922
01/01/1948
09/04/1960
02/1961
02/1961
J50/2 226 3226   8925 68925   12/1922 ARD
ARD
W
Ardsley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
12/1922
01/01/1948
18/03/1963
18/03/1963
J50/2 227 3227   8926 68926   12/1922 ARD
DON
40B
36A
34B
36A
W
Ardsley
Doncaster
Immingham
Doncaster
Hornsey
Doncaster
Withdrawn
12/1922
01/01/1948
21/06/1952
22/10/1955
15/11/1958
15/07/1961
13/02/1962
13/02/1962
J50/2 228 3228   8927 68927   12/1922 ARD
ANN
34B
38B
38A
W
Ardsley
Annesley
Hornsey
Annesley
Colwick
Withdrawn
12/1922
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
13/12/1952
18/02/1956
04/1961
04/1961
J50/2 229 3229   8928 68928 13 12/1922 ARD
SHF
34B
36A
W
Ardsley
Sheffield Darnall
Hornsey
Doncaster
Withdrawn
12/1922
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
15/07/1961
09/1962
09/1962
J50/2 230 3230   8929 68929   12/1922 ARD
ANN
34B
W
Ardsley
Annesley
Hornsey
Withdrawn
12/1922
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
05/1961
05/1961
J50/2   3231   8930 68930   02/1924 ARD
34B
W
Ardsley
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
02/1961
02/1961
J50/2   3232   8931 68931   02/1924 ARD
34B
34A
W
Ardsley
Hornsey
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
15/07/1961
08/1961
08/1961
J50/2   3233   8932 68932   03/1924 BFD
56F
56C
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
26/08/1961
12/12/1961
12/12/1961
J50/2   3234   8933 68933   03/1924 BFD
56F
56A
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
07/05/1960
12/12/1961
12/12/1961
J50/2   3235   8934 68934   03/1924 BFD
56F
51A
56B
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Darlington
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
08/03/1958
08/08/1959
09/1963
09/1963
J50/2   3236   8935 68935   04/1924 ANN
37A
W
Annesley
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
09/1963
09/1963
J50/2   3237   8936 68936   04/1924 DON
34B
W
Doncaster
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
04/1961
04/1961
J50/2   3238   8937 68937   05/1924 COP
56B
56D
56B
W
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Ardsley
Mirfield
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/09/1957
17/03/1962
05/05/1962
09/1963
09/1963
J50/2   3239   8938 68938   05/1924 ARD
W
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1959
10/1959
J50/2   3240   8939 68939   06/1924 ARD
56A
W
Ardsley
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1959
29/10/1962
29/10/1962
J50/3   583   8940 68940   03/1926 BFD
56F
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
09/1958
09/1958
J50/3   586   8941 68941   03/1926 BFD
37A
51C
50C
56B
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
West Hartlepool
Selby
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/05/1953
14/06/1958
20/06/1959
19/09/1959
13/12/1961
13/12/1961
J50/3   588   8942 68942   04/1926 BFD
56F
51D
51L
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Middlesbrough
Thornaby
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
10/05/1958
14/06/1958
09/1958
09/1958
J50/3   589   8943 68943   04/1926 BFD
56F
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
02/1961
02/1961
J50/3   591   8944 68944   04/1926 BFD
36A
56F
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Doncaster
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/05/1950
08/02/1958
09/1960
09/1960
J50/3   593   8945 68945   04/1926 COP
34B
W
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
04/1961
04/1961
J50/3   594   8946 68946   04/1926 COP
40B
34B
W
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Immingham
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/07/1953
23/04/1955
02/1961
02/1961
J50/3   596   8947 68947   05/1926 ARD
W
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1961
02/1961
J50/3   601   8948 68948   05/1926 ARD
51L
50C
56C
56F
W
Ardsley
Thornaby
Selby
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
13/12/1958
19/09/1959
03/10/1959
15/11/1961
15/11/1961
J50/3   603   8949 68949   06/1926 ARD
34E
34B
W
Ardsley
Neasden
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/06/1951
16/02/1952
04/1959
04/1959
J50/3   609   8950 68950   08/1926 STR
40B
38A
34B
34A
W
Stratford
Immingham
Colwick
Hornsey
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1956
21/07/1956
20/02/1960
15/07/1961
09/1961
09/1961
J50/3   610   8951 68951   08/1926 ARD
51C
56B
W
Ardsley
West Hartlepool
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/06/1958
17/06/1961
07/1961
07/1961
J50/3   616   8952 68952   08/1926 STM
65A
W
St Margarets
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/01/1952
08/1960
08/1960
J50/3   617   8953 68953   08/1926 EFD
66A
W
Eastfield
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/05/1957
07/1959
07/1959
J50/3   618   8954 68954   08/1926 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1960
08/1960
J50/3   621   8955 68955   09/1926 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1959
12/1959
J50/3   622   8956 68956   09/1926 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1960
08/1960
J50/3   635   8957 68957   09/1926 EFD
W
Eastfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1960
08/1960
J50/3   636   8958 68958   10/1926 EFD
66A
W
Eastfield
Polmadie
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/05/1957
03/1960
03/1960
J50/3   1037   8959 68959   11/1926 BFD
56B
51F
51A
56A
56F
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Ardsley
West Auckland
Darlington
Wakefield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/10/1957
14/06/1958
24/01/1959
25/07/1959
07/05/1960
08/1961
08/1961
J50/3   1041   8960 68960   11/1926 ARD
36A
36C
36A
34B
W
34A
Ardsley
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Hornsey
Withdrawn
Kings Cross
01/01/1948
21/10/1950
19/05/1951
19/07/1958
15/11/1958
07/1961
15/07/1961
07/1961
J50/3   1045   8961 68961 14 11/1926 BFD
34B
34E
36A
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Hornsey
New England
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
15/07/1961
09/06/1962
09/1962
09/1962
J50/3   1058   8962 68962   12/1926 FRO
36A
W
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/01/1959
06/1961
06/1961
J50/3   1063   8963 68963   12/1926 STR
40B
36A
36C
36A
56B
56B
56F
W
Stratford
Immingham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Ardsley
Ardsley
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1956
25/08/1956
19/01/1957
09/05/1959
05/08/1961
19/08/1961
13/01/1962
13/02/1962
13/02/1962
J50/3   1068   8964 68964   12/1926 FRO
36A
56B
56B
56F
W
Frodingham
Doncaster
Ardsley
Ardsley
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/01/1959
29/07/1961
19/08/1961
13/01/1962
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
J50/3   1069   8965 68965   12/1926 STR
40B
36C
36A
56B
56B
56D
56B
W
Stratford
Immingham
Frodingham
Doncaster
Ardsley
Ardsley
Mirfield
Ardsley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1956
15/12/1956
31/01/1959
05/08/1961
19/08/1961
17/03/1962
05/05/1962
09/1963
09/1963
J50/3   1070   8966 68966   12/1926 ARD
34B
34A
W
Ardsley
Hornsey
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1956
15/07/1961
08/1961
08/1961
J50/3   1074   8967 68967   01/1927 STR
40B
38A
W
Stratford
Immingham
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1956
22/09/1956
06/1959
06/1959
J50/3   1079   8968 68968   01/1927 FRO
34B
W
Frodingham
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
04/1961
04/1961
J50/3   1081   8969 68969   03/1927 BFD
56F
W
Bradford Hammerton Street
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/02/1958
02/1960
02/1960
J50/3   1082   8970 68970   04/1927 FRO
36A
34B
W
Frodingham
Doncaster
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1958
15/11/1958
04/1961
04/1961
J50/3   1086   8971 68971 15 05/1927 FRO
34B
34E
36A
W
Frodingham
Hornsey
New England
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
15/07/1961
09/06/1962
09/1962
09/1962
J50/3   2789   8972 68972   03/1930 ANN
34B
36A
W
Annesley
Hornsey
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
15/07/1961
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
J50/3   2790   8973 68973   03/1930 FRO
36A
36C
36A
W
Frodingham
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/07/1953
24/07/1954
31/01/1959
07/1959
07/1959
J50/3   2791   8974 68974   03/1930 DON
36C
36A
38A
W
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Colwick
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1950
25/07/1953
08/02/1958
08/1959
08/1959
J50/3   2792   8975 68975   04/1930 ANN
34B
38B
34B
38B
38A
W
34A
Annesley
Hornsey
Annesley
Hornsey
Annesley
Colwick
Withdrawn
Kings Cross
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
13/12/1952
20/06/1953
25/07/1953
12/11/1955
07/1961
15/07/1961
07/1961
J50/3   2793   8976 68976 16 04/1930 ANN
34B
38B
34E
34B
34E
36A
W
Annesley
Hornsey
Annesley
New England
Hornsey
New England
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
13/12/1952
20/12/1958
30/01/1960
15/07/1961
09/06/1962
09/1962
09/1962
J50/3   2794   8977 68977   04/1930 STR
40B
36C
36A
56C
56F
56A
W
Stratford
Immingham
Frodingham
Doncaster
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1956
19/01/1957
09/05/1959
12/08/1961
26/08/1961
29/12/1962
09/1963
09/1963
J50/4   599   8978 68978   11/1938 COP
W
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1958
11/1958
J50/4   600   8979 68979   11/1938 DON
36B
40B
34B
W
Doncaster
Mexborough
Immingham
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/10/1950
25/07/1953
19/03/1955
02/1961
02/1961
J50/4   602   8980 68980   12/1938 DON
36C
36A
34B
W
Doncaster
Frodingham
Doncaster
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/06/1953
25/05/1956
15/11/1958
02/1960
02/1960
J50/4   605   8981 68981   12/1938 CLK
38A
34B
W
Colwick
Colwick
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/09/1952
15/11/1952
04/1961
04/1961
J50/4   606   8982 68982   12/1938 CLK
34B
40A
40E
36A
W
Colwick
Hornsey
Lincoln
Colwick
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
15/07/1961
28/10/1961
16/06/1962
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
J50/4   608   8983 68983   01/1939 SHF
34B
36A
W
Sheffield Darnall
Hornsey
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
15/07/1961
24/04/1962
24/04/1962
J50/4   611   8984 68984   02/1939 COP
W
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/03/1963
25/03/1963
J50/4   615   8985 68985   04/1939 DON
34B
W
Doncaster
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
11/1959
11/1959
J50/4   584   8986 68986   04/1939 DON
34B
36A
W
Doncaster
Hornsey
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
15/07/1961
02/07/1962
02/07/1962
J50/4   585   8987 68987   05/1939 DON
34B
36A
W
Doncaster
Hornsey
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
15/07/1961
24/04/1962
24/04/1962
J50/4   587   8988 68988   06/1939 COP
W
Copley Hill (Leeds)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/1963
09/1963
J50/4   590   8989 68989   07/1939 DON
34B
34E
36A
W
Doncaster
Hornsey
New England
Doncaster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
08/07/1961
09/06/1962
11/07/1962
11/07/1962
J50/4   595   8990 68990   07/1939 SHF
34B
W
Sheffield Darnall
Hornsey
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/11/1952
04/1961
04/1961
J50/4   598   8991 68991   08/1939 DON
34B
34A
W
Doncaster
Hornsey
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
15/07/1961
08/1961
08/1961