10/1922 |
To Service |
221 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
11/1922 |
To Service |
222 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
11/1922 |
To Service |
223 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
11/1922 |
To Service |
224 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
11/1922 |
To Service |
225 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
12/1922 |
To Service |
226 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
12/1922 |
To Service |
227 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
12/1922 |
To Service |
228 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
12/1922 |
To Service |
229 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
12/1922 |
To Service |
230 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/1936 |
Reallocation |
3222 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/1936 |
Reallocation |
3224 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
01/1936 |
Reallocation |
591 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8890 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8891 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8892 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8893 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8894 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8895 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8896 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8897 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8898 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8899 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8900 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8901 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8902 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8903 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8904 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8905 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8906 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8907 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8908 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8909 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8910 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8911 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8912 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8913 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8914 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8915 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8916 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8917 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8918 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8919 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8920 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8921 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8922 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8923 |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8924 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8925 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8926 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8927 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8928 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8929 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8930 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8931 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8932 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8933 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8934 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8935 |
|
|
ANN |
Annesley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8936 |
|
|
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8937 |
|
|
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8938 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8939 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8940 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8941 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8942 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8943 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8944 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8945 |
|
|
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8946 |
|
|
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8947 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8948 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8949 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8950 |
|
|
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8951 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8952 |
|
|
STM |
St Margarets |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8953 |
|
|
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8954 |
|
|
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8955 |
|
|
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8956 |
|
|
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8957 |
|
|
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8958 |
|
|
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8959 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8960 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8961 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8962 |
|
|
FRO |
Frodingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8963 |
|
|
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8964 |
|
|
FRO |
Frodingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8965 |
|
|
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8966 |
|
|
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8967 |
|
|
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8968 |
|
|
FRO |
Frodingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8969 |
|
|
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8970 |
|
|
FRO |
Frodingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8971 |
|
|
FRO |
Frodingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8972 |
|
|
ANN |
Annesley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8973 |
|
|
FRO |
Frodingham |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8974 |
|
|
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8975 |
|
|
ANN |
Annesley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8976 |
|
|
ANN |
Annesley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8977 |
|
|
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8978 |
|
|
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8979 |
|
|
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8980 |
|
|
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8981 |
|
|
CLK |
Colwick |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8982 |
|
|
CLK |
Colwick |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8983 |
|
|
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8984 |
|
|
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8985 |
|
|
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8986 |
|
|
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8987 |
|
|
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8988 |
|
|
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8989 |
|
|
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8990 |
|
|
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
8991 |
|
|
DON |
Doncaster |
|
06/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
8972 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
24/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
8925 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
04/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
68917 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
04/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
68960 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
22/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
8905 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
8979 |
DON |
Doncaster |
FRO |
Frodingham |
|
16/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
68945 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
16/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
68946 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
07/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
68899 |
DON |
Doncaster |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8891 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
68894 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
8920 |
WFD |
Woodford Halse |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
07/1949 |
Reallocation |
68894 |
CLK |
Colwick |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
07/1949 |
Reallocation |
8920 |
CLK |
Colwick |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
03/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
68981 |
CLK |
Colwick |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
10/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
8924 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
68890 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
68946 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
68960 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
8974 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
8935 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
28/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
8944 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
31/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
8944 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
09/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
8944 |
36A |
Doncaster |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
16/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
68890 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
16/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
68960 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
16/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
8974 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
16/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
8979 |
FRO |
Frodingham |
36B |
Mexborough |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
68890 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
68960 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
8974 |
36C |
Frodingham |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
21/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
8979 |
36B |
Mexborough |
36B |
Mexborough |
|
05/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
68960 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
19/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
68960 |
36C |
Frodingham |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
02/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
68949 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
34E |
Neasden |
|
23/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
68949 |
34E |
Neasden |
34E |
Neasden |
|
17/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
68980 |
DON |
Doncaster |
36B |
Mexborough |
|
26/01/1952 |
Reallocation |
68952 |
STM |
St Margarets |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
16/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
68949 |
34E |
Neasden |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
68949 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
68893 |
DON |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
68926 |
DON |
Doncaster |
40B |
Immingham |
|
21/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
68893 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
21/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
68926 |
40B |
Immingham |
40B |
Immingham |
|
20/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
68981 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68891 |
CLK |
Colwick |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68894 |
CLK |
Colwick |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68918 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68920 |
CLK |
Colwick |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68931 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68935 |
CLK |
Colwick |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68936 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68945 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68961 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68972 |
CLK |
Colwick |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68981 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68991 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68891 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68894 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68918 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68920 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68931 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68935 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68936 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68945 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68961 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68972 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
18/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
68991 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68890 |
36A |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68903 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68917 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68921 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68927 |
ANN |
Annesley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68928 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68929 |
ANN |
Annesley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68930 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68968 |
FRO |
Frodingham |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68971 |
FRO |
Frodingham |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68975 |
ANN |
Annesley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68976 |
ANN |
Annesley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68981 |
38A |
Colwick |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68982 |
CLK |
Colwick |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68983 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68985 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68986 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68987 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68989 |
DON |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68990 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68890 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68903 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68917 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68921 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68927 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68928 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68929 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68930 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68968 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68971 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68975 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68976 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68981 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68982 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68983 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68985 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68986 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68987 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68989 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68990 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68890 |
34B |
Hornsey |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68927 |
34B |
Hornsey |
38B |
Annesley |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68975 |
34B |
Hornsey |
38B |
Annesley |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
68976 |
34B |
Hornsey |
38B |
Annesley |
|
13/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
68890 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
13/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
68896 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
38B |
Annesley |
|
13/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
68927 |
38B |
Annesley |
38B |
Annesley |
|
13/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
68975 |
38B |
Annesley |
38B |
Annesley |
|
13/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
68976 |
38B |
Annesley |
38B |
Annesley |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
68896 |
38B |
Annesley |
38B |
Annesley |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
68902 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
68906 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
21/03/1953 |
Reallocation |
68907 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
68941 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
20/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
68975 |
38B |
Annesley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
20/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
68980 |
36B |
Mexborough |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
25/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
68946 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
40B |
Immingham |
|
25/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
68973 |
FRO |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
25/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
68974 |
36C |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
25/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
68975 |
34B |
Hornsey |
38B |
Annesley |
|
25/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
68979 |
36B |
Mexborough |
40B |
Immingham |
|
24/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
68973 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
19/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
68893 |
40B |
Immingham |
30A |
Stratford |
|
19/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
68979 |
40B |
Immingham |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
68946 |
40B |
Immingham |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
22/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
68926 |
40B |
Immingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
12/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
68975 |
38B |
Annesley |
38A |
Colwick |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
68893 |
30A |
Stratford |
38A |
Colwick |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
68927 |
38B |
Annesley |
38A |
Colwick |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
68950 |
STR |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
68963 |
STR |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
68965 |
STR |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
68967 |
STR |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
18/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
68977 |
STR |
Stratford |
40B |
Immingham |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
68966 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
25/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
68980 |
36C |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
21/07/1956 |
Reallocation |
68950 |
40B |
Immingham |
38A |
Colwick |
|
25/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
68963 |
40B |
Immingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
22/09/1956 |
Reallocation |
68967 |
40B |
Immingham |
38A |
Colwick |
|
15/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
68965 |
40B |
Immingham |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
19/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
68963 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
19/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
68977 |
40B |
Immingham |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
11/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
68953 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
11/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
68958 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
21/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
68895 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
21/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
68898 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
21/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
68937 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
19/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
68895 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
19/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
68959 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68892 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68895 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68897 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68908 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68912 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68922 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68923 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68932 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68933 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68934 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68940 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68942 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68943 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68944 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68969 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
08/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
68974 |
36A |
Doncaster |
38A |
Colwick |
|
08/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
68897 |
56F |
Low Moor |
51A |
Darlington |
|
08/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
68912 |
56F |
Low Moor |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
08/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
68934 |
56F |
Low Moor |
51A |
Darlington |
|
10/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
68892 |
56F |
Low Moor |
51E |
Stockton |
|
10/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
68908 |
56F |
Low Moor |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
10/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
68942 |
56F |
Low Moor |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
68898 |
56B |
Ardsley |
51A |
Darlington |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
68908 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
68909 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
51E |
Stockton |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
68912 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
53E |
Goole |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
68941 |
37A |
Ardsley |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
68942 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
68948 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
68951 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
68959 |
56B |
Ardsley |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
19/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
68960 |
36C |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
19/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
68970 |
FRO |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
15/09/1958 |
Condemned |
68940 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
19/09/1958 |
Condemned |
68942 |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
COND |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
68909 |
51E |
Stockton |
51A |
Darlington |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
68926 |
36A |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
68960 |
36A |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
68970 |
36A |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
68980 |
36A |
Doncaster |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
19/11/1958 |
Condemned |
68978 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
13/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
68948 |
51L |
Thornaby |
50C |
Selby |
|
20/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
68896 |
38B |
Annesley |
34E |
New England |
|
20/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
68976 |
38B |
Annesley |
34E |
New England |
|
24/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
68959 |
51F |
West Auckland |
51A |
Darlington |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
68908 |
51L |
Thornaby |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
68912 |
53E |
Goole |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
68962 |
FRO |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
68964 |
FRO |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
68965 |
36C |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
68973 |
36C |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
28/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
68904 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
28/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
68910 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
28/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
68939 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
14/04/1959 |
Condemned |
68949 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
06/05/1959 |
Condemned |
68906 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
09/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
68963 |
36C |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
09/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
68977 |
36C |
Frodingham |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
16/06/1959 |
Condemned |
68967 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
68892 |
51E |
Stockton |
50C |
Selby |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
68897 |
51A |
Darlington |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
68898 |
51A |
Darlington |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
68909 |
51A |
Darlington |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
68941 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
50C |
Selby |
|
21/07/1959 |
Condemned |
68973 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1959 |
Condemned |
68953 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
68959 |
51A |
Darlington |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
03/08/1959 |
Condemned |
68974 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
08/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
68934 |
51A |
Darlington |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
14/09/1959 |
Condemned |
68912 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
68892 |
50C |
Selby |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
68941 |
50C |
Selby |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
68948 |
50C |
Selby |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
21/09/1959 |
Condemned |
68919 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
68892 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
03/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
68948 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
05/10/1959 |
Condemned |
68893 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
05/10/1959 |
Condemned |
68938 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1959 |
Condemned |
68985 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
08/12/1959 |
Condemned |
68955 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
COND |
|
04/01/1960 |
Condemned |
68898 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
68896 |
34E |
New England |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
68976 |
34E |
New England |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
20/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
68950 |
38A |
Colwick |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
22/02/1960 |
Condemned |
68969 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
22/02/1960 |
Condemned |
68980 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
21/03/1960 |
Condemned |
68958 |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
COND |
|
28/03/1960 |
Condemned |
68895 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
04/04/1960 |
Condemned |
68909 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
68899 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
30A |
Stratford |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
68905 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
30A |
Stratford |
|
09/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
68924 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
30A |
Stratford |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
68933 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
68959 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
68892 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
17/08/1960 |
Condemned |
68952 |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1960 |
Condemned |
68956 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
COND |
|
18/08/1960 |
Condemned |
68954 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
COND |
|
24/08/1960 |
Condemned |
68957 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
COND |
|
29/08/1960 |
Condemned |
68913 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
17/09/1960 |
Condemned |
68944 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
30/09/1960 |
Condemned |
68902 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
04/10/1960 |
Condemned |
68915 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1960 |
Condemned |
68901 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
05/11/1960 |
Condemned |
68897 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1960 |
Condemned |
68914 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
22/11/1960 |
Condemned |
68911 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
04/12/1960 |
Condemned |
68899 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
04/12/1960 |
Condemned |
68905 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
06/02/1961 |
Condemned |
68930 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
06/02/1961 |
Condemned |
68979 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
14/02/1961 |
Condemned |
68924 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
20/02/1961 |
Condemned |
68943 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
20/02/1961 |
Condemned |
68947 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
23/02/1961 |
Condemned |
68946 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
20/03/1961 |
Condemned |
68890 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
10/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68916 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
14/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68903 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68927 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68970 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68981 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
21/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68945 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
21/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68990 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
26/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68907 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
26/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68921 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
26/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68936 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
26/04/1961 |
Condemned |
68968 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
02/05/1961 |
Condemned |
68929 |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
COND |
|
16/06/1961 |
Condemned |
68962 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
68951 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
03/07/1961 |
Condemned |
68951 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68989 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34E |
New England |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68891 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68894 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68896 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68917 |
34B |
Hornsey |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68918 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68920 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68926 |
34B |
Hornsey |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68928 |
34B |
Hornsey |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68931 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68950 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68960 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68961 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34E |
New England |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68966 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68971 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34E |
New England |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68972 |
34B |
Hornsey |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68975 |
38A |
Colwick |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68976 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34E |
New England |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68982 |
34B |
Hornsey |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68983 |
34B |
Hornsey |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68986 |
34B |
Hornsey |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68987 |
34B |
Hornsey |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
15/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68991 |
34B |
Hornsey |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
20/07/1961 |
Condemned |
68918 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
20/07/1961 |
Condemned |
68920 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
25/07/1961 |
Condemned |
68960 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1961 |
Condemned |
68891 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
29/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
68964 |
36A |
Doncaster |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
29/07/1961 |
Condemned |
68975 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
01/08/1961 |
Condemned |
68966 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
68963 |
36A |
Doncaster |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
68965 |
36A |
Doncaster |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
12/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
68977 |
36A |
Doncaster |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
68963 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
68964 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
19/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
68965 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
23/08/1961 |
Condemned |
68896 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
25/08/1961 |
Condemned |
68931 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
68932 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
26/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
68977 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
30/08/1961 |
Condemned |
68991 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
31/08/1961 |
Condemned |
68959 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1961 |
Condemned |
68894 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1961 |
Condemned |
68950 |
34A |
Kings Cross |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
68982 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40E |
Colwick |
|
15/11/1961 |
Condemned |
68948 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
12/12/1961 |
Condemned |
68932 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
12/12/1961 |
Condemned |
68933 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
13/12/1961 |
Condemned |
68923 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
13/12/1961 |
Condemned |
68941 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
68963 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
13/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
68964 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
22/01/1962 |
Condemned |
68900 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1962 |
Condemned |
68926 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1962 |
Condemned |
68963 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
68937 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
68965 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
24/04/1962 |
Condemned |
68983 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1962 |
Condemned |
68987 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
68937 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
05/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
68965 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
09/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
68961 |
34E |
New England |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
09/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
68971 |
34E |
New England |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
09/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
68976 |
34E |
New England |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
09/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
68989 |
34E |
New England |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
68982 |
40E |
Colwick |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
02/07/1962 |
Condemned |
68986 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
11/07/1962 |
Condemned |
68989 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
09/1962 |
Condemned |
13 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
09/1962 |
Condemned |
14 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
09/1962 |
Condemned |
15 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
09/1962 |
Condemned |
16 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
68972 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
16/09/1962 |
Condemned |
68982 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
01/10/1962 |
Condemned |
68964 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1962 |
Condemned |
68939 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1962 |
Condemned |
68910 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
68908 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
29/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
68922 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
29/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
68977 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
18/03/1963 |
Condemned |
68925 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
25/03/1963 |
Condemned |
68984 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68892 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68904 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68908 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68922 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68934 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68935 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68937 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68965 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68977 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
23/09/1963 |
Condemned |
68988 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
COND |
|
05/1965 |
Condemned |
12 |
98W |
|
|
COND |
|