GNR/LNER Gresley "J50" Class 0-6-0T
GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1945) | LNER (1946) | BR | BR (Dept) | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
168 | 3168 | 8900 | 68900 | 12/1914 | 01/1932 from J51 |
Ardsley | 22/01/1962 | 47.08 | |||||||
169 | 3169 | 8901 | 68901 | 12/1914 | 02/1930 from J51 |
Ardsley | 08/10/1960 | 45.83 | |||||||
170 | 3170 | 8902 | 68902 | 12/1914 | 03/1931 from J51 |
Ardsley | 30/09/1960 | 45.75 | |||||||
171 | 3171 | 8903 | 68903 | 02/1915 | 04/1932 from J51 |
Ardsley | 14/04/1961 | 46.17 | |||||||
172 | 3172 | 8904 | 68904 | 02/1915 | 03/1930 from J51 |
Ardsley | 23/09/1963 | 48.58 | |||||||
173 | 3173 | 8905 | 68905 | 03/1915 | 03/1930 from J51 |
Ardsley | 04/12/1960 | 45.75 | |||||||
174 | 3174 | 8906 | 68906 | 04/1915 | 05/1932 from J51 |
Ardsley | 06/05/1959 | 44.08 | |||||||
175 | 3175 | 8907 | 68907 | 04/1915 | 10/1932 from J51 |
Ardsley | 26/04/1961 | 46 | |||||||
176 | 3176 | 8908 | 68908 | 06/1915 | 09/1929 from J51 |
Ardsley | 23/09/1963 | 48.25 | |||||||
178 | 3178 | 8909 | 68909 | 06/1915 | 04/1934 from J51 |
Ardsley | 04/04/1960 | 44.83 | |||||||
211 | 3211 | 8910 | 68910 | 06/1919 | 03/1929 from J51 |
Ardsley | 26/11/1962 | 43.42 | |||||||
212 | 3212 | 8911 | 68911 | 10 | 06/1919 | 08/1930 from J51 |
Ardsley | 22/11/1960 | 41.42 | ||||||
213 | 3213 | 8912 | 68912 | 07/1919 | 08/1930 from J51 |
Ardsley | 14/09/1959 | 40.17 | |||||||
214 | 3214 | 8913 | 68913 | 07/1919 | 10/1929 from J51 |
Ardsley | 29/08/1960 | 41.08 | |||||||
215 | 3215 | 8914 | 68914 | 11 | 07/1919 | 02/1931 from J51 |
Ardsley | 12/11/1960 | 41.33 | ||||||
216 | 3216 | 8915 | 68915 | 07/1919 | 05/1929 from J51 |
Ardsley | 04/10/1960 | 41.25 | |||||||
217 | 3217 | 8916 | 68916 | 07/1919 | 03/1929 from J51 |
Ardsley | 10/04/1961 | 41.75 | |||||||
218 | 3218 | 8917 | 68917 | 12 | 08/1919 | 10/1932 from J51 |
Ardsley | 05/1965 | 45.75 | ||||||
219 | 3219 | 8918 | 68918 | 08/1919 | 04/1930 from J51 |
Ardsley | 20/07/1961 | 41.92 | |||||||
220 | 3220 | 8919 | 68919 | 08/1919 | 11/1929 from J51 |
Ardsley | 21/09/1959 | 40.08 | |||||||
221 | 3221 | 8920 | 68920 | 10/1922 | Ardsley | 20/07/1961 | 38.75 | ||||||||
222 | 3222 | 8921 | 68921 | 11/1922 | Ardsley | 26/04/1961 | 38.42 | ||||||||
223 | 3223 | 8922 | 68922 | 11/1922 | Ardsley | 23/09/1963 | 40.83 | ||||||||
224 | 3224 | 8923 | 68923 | 11/1922 | Ardsley | 13/12/1961 | 39.08 | ||||||||
225 | 3225 | 8924 | 68924 | 11/1922 | Ardsley | 14/02/1961 | 38.25 | ||||||||
226 | 3226 | 8925 | 68925 | 12/1922 | Ardsley | 18/03/1963 | 40.25 | ||||||||
227 | 3227 | 8926 | 68926 | 12/1922 | Ardsley | 13/02/1962 | 39.17 | ||||||||
228 | 3228 | 8927 | 68927 | 12/1922 | Ardsley | 17/04/1961 | 38.33 | ||||||||
229 | 3229 | 8928 | 68928 | 13 | 12/1922 | Ardsley | 09/1962 | 39.75 | |||||||
230 | 3230 | 8929 | 68929 | 12/1922 | Ardsley | 02/05/1961 | 38.42 | ||||||||
3231 | 8930 | 68930 | 02/1924 | 06/02/1961 | 37 | ||||||||||
3232 | 8931 | 68931 | 02/1924 | 25/08/1961 | 37.5 | ||||||||||
3233 | 8932 | 68932 | 03/1924 | 12/12/1961 | 37.75 | ||||||||||
3234 | 8933 | 68933 | 03/1924 | 12/12/1961 | 37.75 | ||||||||||
3235 | 8934 | 68934 | 03/1924 | 23/09/1963 | 39.5 | ||||||||||
3236 | 8935 | 68935 | 04/1924 | 23/09/1963 | 39.42 | ||||||||||
3237 | 8936 | 68936 | 04/1924 | 26/04/1961 | 37 | ||||||||||
3238 | 8937 | 68937 | 05/1924 | 23/09/1963 | 39.33 | ||||||||||
3239 | 8938 | 68938 | 05/1924 | 05/10/1959 | 35.42 | ||||||||||
3240 | 8939 | 68939 | 06/1924 | 29/10/1962 | 38.33 |