GNR/LNER Gresley "J51" Class 0-6-0T
GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1945) | LNER (1946) | BR | BR (Dept) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
157 | 3157 | 3180 | 8890 | 68890 | 12/1913 | Ardsley | 20/03/1961 | 11/1929 to J50 |
47.25 | ||||||
158 | 3158 | 3181 | 8891 | 68891 | 02/1914 | Ardsley | 27/07/1961 | 03/1935 to J50 |
47.42 | ||||||
159 | 3159 | 3182 | 8892 | 68892 | 02/1914 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 23/09/1963 | 08/1929 to J50 |
49.58 | ||||||
160 | 3160 | 3183 | 8893 | 68893 | 02/1914 | Ardsley | 05/10/1959 | 11/1931 to J50 |
45.67 | ||||||
161 | 3161 | 3184 | 8894 | 68894 | 02/1914 | Ardsley | 22/09/1961 | 09/1932 to J50 |
47.58 | ||||||
162 | 3162 | 3185 | 8895 | 68895 | 02/1914 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 28/03/1960 | 03/1932 to J50 |
46.08 | ||||||
163 | 3163 | 3186 | 8896 | 68896 | 03/1914 | Ardsley | 23/08/1961 | 06/1934 to J50 |
47.42 | ||||||
164 | 3164 | 3187 | 8897 | 68897 | 03/1914 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 05/11/1960 | 04/1932 to J50 |
46.67 | ||||||
166 | 3166 | 3188 | 8898 | 68898 | 03/1914 | Ardsley | 04/01/1960 | 11/1929 to J50 |
45.83 | ||||||
167 | 3167 | 3189 | 8899 | 68899 | 04/1914 | Ardsley | 04/12/1960 | 10/1930 to J50 |
46.67 |