GCR/LNER Robinson "J63" Class 0-6-0T
Class | GCR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J63 | 60 | 5060 | 8204 | 68204 | 08/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 06/04/1956 | 06/04/1956 |
J63 | 61 | 5061 | 8205 | 68205 | 09/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 06/04/1956 | 06/04/1956 |
J63 | 89 | 5089 | 8206 | 68206 | 10/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 04/03/1955 | 04/03/1955 |
J63 | 157 | 5157 | 8207 | 68207 | 10/1906 | IMM W |
Immingham Withdrawn |
05/03/1949 04/04/1956 |
04/04/1956 |
J63 | 321 | 5321 | 8208 | 68208 | 11/1906 | IMM W |
Immingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/10/1953 |
26/10/1953 |
J63 | 538 | 5538 | 8209 | 68209 | 11/1906 | GOR IMM 6E W |
Gorton Immingham Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 26/01/1952 01/1955 |
01/1955 |
J63 | 277 | 5277 | 8210 | 68210 | 06/1914 | IMM W |
Immingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1957 |
25/02/1957 |