GER/LNER Holden "J69" Class 0-6-0T
Class | GER | GER (2nd) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | DP (Dept) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J69/1 | 327 | 7327 | 8490 | 68490 | 03/1890 | KL W |
Kings Lynn Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1958 |
07/05/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 328 | 7328 | 8491 | 68491 | 03/1890 | BOS LEI STR STR 31A 35B 35A W |
Boston Leicester (G.C.) Stratford Stratford Cambridge Grantham New England Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 30/11/1949 03/12/1949 22/08/1953 21/04/1956 25/05/1956 03/06/1958 |
03/06/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 329 | 7329 | 8492 | 68492 | 03/1890 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1956 |
22/06/1956 | ||
J69/1 | 331 | 7331 | 8494 | 68494 | 03/1890 | KL 32A 32A 31D W |
Kings Lynn Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe South Lynn Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 22/08/1953 08/04/1958 |
08/04/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 332 | 7332 | 8495 | 68495 | 04/1890 | NOR 31C W |
Norwich Thorpe Kings Lynn Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1953 07/05/1958 |
07/05/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 333 | 7333 | 04/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1939 | 09/1939 | ||||
J69/1 | 334 | 7334 | 8496 | 68496 | 04/1890 | STR 34D 35A 34D W |
Stratford Hitchin (GNR) New England Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 23/10/1954 19/02/1955 14/05/1956 |
14/05/1956 | ||
J69/1 | 335 | 7335 | 8497 | 68497 | 04/1890 | BSE 41A 41F 41B W |
Bury St Edmunds Sheffield Darnall Mexborough Sheffield Grimesthorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1958 12/04/1958 12/03/1960 19/09/1960 |
19/09/1960 | ||
J69/2 | 336 | 7336 | 8498 | 68498 | 44 | 04/1890 | IPS 31C 36E 36A W |
Ipswich Kings Lynn Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1953 16/08/1958 15/11/1958 03/08/1959 |
03/08/1959 | |
J69/1 | 337 | 7337 | 8499 | 68499 | 04/1890 | CAR 9E 8E 8E 8E 40A 40F 30A 31C 31D 31C 31B 30A W |
Carlisle Canal Trafford Park (LMS) Brunswick Brunswick Brunswick Lincoln Boston Stratford Kings Lynn South Lynn Kings Lynn March Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 03/03/1951 24/03/1951 29/11/1952 14/02/1953 22/08/1953 23/04/1955 22/10/1955 10/05/1958 16/08/1958 26/11/1960 17/06/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 338 | 7338 | 8500 | 68500 | 05/1890 | STR PKS 30A 30F 30F 30A 30F 30A W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Parkeston Quay Parkeston Quay Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 23/07/1950 14/04/1951 21/04/1951 19/02/1955 19/11/1960 07/01/1961 13/01/1961 |
13/01/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 339 | 7339 | 8501 | 68501 | 05/1890 | IPS NOR 40F 40A W |
Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Boston Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 22/08/1953 15/06/1957 16/08/1960 |
16/08/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 340 | 7340 | 8502 | 68502 | 05/1890 | IPS KL 36E 36A 36E W |
Ipswich Kings Lynn Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 14/06/1958 15/11/1958 11/07/1959 06/02/1961 |
06/02/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 341 | 7341 | 8503 | 68503 | 05/1890 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1957 |
03/01/1957 | ||
J69/1 | 342 | 7342 | 8504 | 68504 | 05/1890 | THJ W |
Thornton Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/01/1956 |
23/01/1956 | ||
J69/1 | 343 | 7343 | 8505 | 68505 | 05/1890 | STM 68B W |
St Margarets Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 11/11/1953 |
11/11/1953 | ||
J69/1 | 344 | 7344 | 8506 | 05/1890 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 345 | 7345 | 8507 | 68507 | 05/1890 | STR 35A 36A W |
Stratford New England Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1955 17/12/1955 06/06/1960 |
06/06/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 346 | 7346 | 8508 | 68508 | 05/1890 | STR 30E 30A 36E 36A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1953 18/02/1956 20/10/1956 11/10/1958 02/02/1961 |
02/02/1961 | ||
J69/2 | 398 | 7398 | 8510 | 68510 | 11/1890 | IPS STR 40A W |
Ipswich Stratford Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/03/1948 14/06/1958 28/09/1959 |
28/09/1959 | ||
J69/2 | 400 | 7400 | 8512 | 68512 | 11/1890 | HIT 35A 35A 34D 34D 40A 38D 40A 38D W |
Hitchin (GNR) New England New England Hitchin (GNR) Hitchin (GNR) Lincoln Staveley (G.C.) Lincoln Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 22/08/1953 21/08/1954 25/09/1954 23/04/1955 01/04/1957 |
01/04/1957 | ||
J69/2 | 401 | 7401 | 8513 | 68513 | 11/1890 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/10/1960 |
18/10/1960 | ||
J69/2 | 408 | 12 | 7012 | 8517 | 68517 | 12/1890 | CAM STR W |
Cambridge Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/03/1948 01/03/1956 |
01/03/1956 | |
J69/2 | 410 | 14 | 7014 | 8519 | 68519 | 01/1891 | PKS STR 35A 36E W |
Parkeston Quay Stratford New England Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 12/11/1955 17/12/1955 06/08/1958 |
06/08/1958 | |
J69/2 | 411 | 15 | 7015 | 8520 | 68520 | 01/1891 | STR 36B 36A 36E 36A W |
Stratford Mexborough Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1954 17/12/1955 21/01/1956 16/03/1957 17/08/1959 |
17/08/1959 | |
J69/2 | 414 | 18 | 7018 | 8522 | 68522 | 01/1891 | STR 30E 30E 52F 30A 40E 40F W |
Stratford Colchester Colchester Blyth (North) Stratford Colwick Boston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1950 31/05/1950 07/07/1951 14/06/1958 16/08/1958 14/11/1959 17/03/1961 |
17/03/1961 | |
J69/1 | 347 | 7347 | 8524 | 68524 | 02/1892 | POL W |
Polmont Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1959 |
16/06/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 348 | 7348 | 8525 | 68525 | 02/1892 | STM 61A 61A 40A 40A W |
St Margarets Kittybrewster Kittybrewster Lincoln Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 06/01/1952 19/01/1952 14/12/1953 |
14/12/1953 | ||
J69/1 | 349 | 7349 | 8526 | 68526 | 03/1892 | STR 30F 30A W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 30/01/1960 03/10/1960 |
03/10/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 350 | 7350 | 8527 | 68527 | 03/1892 | BOS CLK STR STR 30F 30F 30A 30A 35A 36E W |
Boston Colwick Stratford Stratford Parkeston Quay Parkeston Quay Stratford Stratford New England Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 30/11/1949 03/12/1949 17/09/1950 23/09/1950 18/02/1951 24/03/1951 22/10/1955 17/12/1955 20/06/1958 |
20/06/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 351 | 7351 | 8528 | 68528 | 03/1892 | BOS 40A 40A W |
Boston Lincoln Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 28/10/1959 |
28/10/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 352 | 7352 | 8529 | 68529 | 03/1892 | LIN 34D 30A 31C 31A 30A W |
Lincoln Hitchin (GNR) Stratford Kings Lynn Cambridge Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1953 19/06/1954 22/10/1955 12/11/1955 24/03/1956 18/08/1958 |
18/08/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 353 | 7353 | 8530 | 68530 | 03/1892 | CAM SL CAM 41A 41E 36E 36A 36E W |
Cambridge South Lynn Cambridge Sheffield Darnall Staveley (Barrow Hill) Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1948 21/12/1948 08/03/1958 10/05/1958 14/06/1958 11/10/1958 11/07/1959 14/02/1961 |
14/02/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 354 | 7354 | 8531 | 68531 | 03/1892 | WRX W |
Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1955 |
08/10/1955 | ||
J69/1 | 355 | 7355 | 8532 | 68532 | 43 | 03/1892 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/12/1958 |
16/12/1958 | |
J69/1 | 356 | 7356 | 8533 | 68533 | 03/1892 | POL 68B 64A 64F W |
Polmont Dumfries St Margarets Bathgate Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 12/07/1952 01/11/1952 14/07/1953 |
14/07/1953 | ||
J69/1 | 357 | 7357 | 8534 | 68534 | 04/1892 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/08/1954 |
30/08/1954 | ||
J69/1 | 358 | 7358 | 8535 | 68535 | 04/1892 | THJ 62B W |
Thornton Junction Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1954 20/08/1959 |
20/08/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 359 | 7359 | 8536 | 68536 | 04/1892 | CAM NOR W |
Cambridge Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1948 01/05/1948 20/08/1949 21/02/1958 |
21/02/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 360 | 7360 | 8537 | 68537 | 04/1892 | LIN W |
Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1958 |
20/06/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 361 | 7361 | 8538 | 68538 | 04/1892 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1961 |
10/09/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 362 | 7362 | 8539 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 363 | 7363 | 8540 | 68540 | 05/1892 | TFD 40A 34D W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Lincoln Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 22/08/1953 16/01/1956 |
16/01/1956 | ||
J69/1 | 364 | 7364 | 05/1892 | W LTH |
Withdrawn Louth |
01/1931 17/01/1948 |
01/1931 | ||||
J69/1 | 365 | 7365 | 8541 | 68541 | 05/1892 | HIT 40A W |
Hitchin (GNR) Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1953 12/08/1958 |
12/08/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 366 | 7366 | 8542 | 68542 | 05/1892 | KL SL 31C 30A W |
Kings Lynn South Lynn Kings Lynn Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 16/08/1958 30/07/1960 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 367 | 7367 | 8543 | 68543 | 45 | 04/1894 | BOS 30A 40A W |
Boston Stratford Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/06/1957 14/06/1958 02/11/1959 |
02/11/1959 | |
J69/1 | 368 | 7368 | 8544 | 68544 | 04/1894 | POL W |
Polmont Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1955 |
31/01/1955 | ||
J69/1 | 369 | 7369 | 8545 | 68545 | 04/1894 | STR KL 40A 40E W |
Stratford Kings Lynn Lincoln Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/01/1949 16/08/1958 31/01/1959 03/02/1961 |
03/02/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 370 | 7370 | 8546 | 68546 | 05/1894 | NWE STR W |
New England Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/09/1949 05/05/1958 |
05/05/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 371 | 7371 | 8547 | 68547 | 05/1894 | LIV 8E 8E W |
Brunswick Brunswick Brunswick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 28/11/1953 21/04/1956 |
21/04/1956 | ||
J69/1 | 372 | 7372 | 8548 | 68548 | 05/1894 | STR STR COL STR W |
Stratford Stratford Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 22/05/1948 14/08/1948 09/11/1953 |
09/11/1953 | ||
J69/1 | 373 | 7373 | 8549 | 68549 | 05/1894 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1962 |
11/02/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 374 | 7374 | 8550 | 68550 | 06/1894 | THJ 30A 30A 30A 38A 40F W |
Thornton Junction Stratford Stratford Stratford Colwick Boston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/02/1952 16/02/1952 22/03/1952 17/12/1955 27/02/1960 25/07/1961 |
25/07/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 375 | 7375 | 8551 | 68551 | 06/1894 | EFD 65G 65G 62B W |
Eastfield Yoker Yoker Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/04/1951 21/04/1951 17/04/1954 21/06/1957 |
21/06/1957 | ||
J69/1 | 376 | 7376 | 8552 | 68552 | 06/1894 | EFD 61A 64A 30A 30A 38A 30E 30F 30A W |
Eastfield Kittybrewster St Margarets Stratford Stratford Colwick Colchester Parkeston Quay Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1951 16/06/1951 17/02/1952 22/03/1952 17/12/1955 24/03/1956 07/11/1959 05/03/1960 10/09/1961 |
10/09/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 377 | 7377 | 8553 | 68553 | 10/1895 | LIN 6E 6F W |
Lincoln Wrexham Rhosddu Bidston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/04/1957 01/11/1958 20/12/1958 |
20/12/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 378 | 7378 | 8554 | 68554 | 10/1895 | STR PKS STR 30F 31A 38A 40A 40F 40A W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Parkeston Quay Cambridge Colwick Lincoln Boston Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 14/01/1950 19/02/1955 20/10/1956 08/03/1958 17/10/1959 29/04/1961 17/06/1961 25/07/1961 |
25/07/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 379 | 7379 | 8555 | 68555 | 10/1895 | THJ 32B 32B 31A 31E 31A 31D 31A 32A 32B W |
Thornton Junction Ipswich Ipswich Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Cambridge South Lynn Cambridge Norwich Thorpe Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/02/1952 22/03/1952 22/08/1953 24/10/1953 20/02/1954 23/10/1954 23/04/1955 24/03/1956 08/03/1958 05/05/1958 |
05/05/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 380 | 7380 | 8556 | 68556 | 10/1895 | STR PKS 30A 30A 31C 31D 34E 36A 41J 36E 30A W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Stratford Kings Lynn South Lynn New England Doncaster Langwith Junction Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 14/04/1951 21/04/1951 22/10/1955 10/05/1958 14/06/1958 19/07/1958 02/04/1960 28/01/1961 24/06/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 381 | 7381 | 8557 | 68557 | 10/1895 | STR PKS 30A 30A 32A 32A 32B 40F W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Stratford Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Ipswich Boston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/04/1949 17/09/1950 23/09/1950 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 14/02/1953 22/08/1953 20/10/1959 |
20/10/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 382 | 7382 | 8558 | 68558 | 11/1895 | LIN 38D 40A 36A 40E W |
Lincoln Staveley (G.C.) Lincoln Doncaster Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 22/08/1953 20/04/1957 18/06/1960 13/01/1961 |
13/01/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 383 | 7383 | 8559 | 68559 | 11/1895 | LIV 8E 9E 8E 6E 8E 6C W 6E |
Brunswick Brunswick Trafford Park (LMS) Brunswick Wrexham Rhosddu Brunswick Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn Wrexham Rhosddu |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 01/01/1955 29/01/1955 21/05/1955 04/1956 21/04/1956 |
04/1956 | ||
J69/1 | 384 | 7384 | 8560 | 68560 | 11/1895 | BOS 40A W |
Boston Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/03/1959 10/01/1961 |
10/01/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 385 | 7385 | 8561 | 68561 | 11/1895 | BOS STR IPS CAM 30F 30A 30E 36E W |
Boston Stratford Ipswich Cambridge Parkeston Quay Stratford Colchester Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 06/08/1949 15/10/1949 23/07/1950 21/03/1953 19/02/1955 22/09/1956 14/07/1958 |
14/07/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 386 | 7386 | 8562 | 68562 | 12/1895 | STM 68B 68B 64E W |
St Margarets Dumfries Dumfries Polmont Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 16/04/1955 15/08/1956 |
15/08/1956 | ||
J69/1 | 387 | 7387 | 8563 | 68563 | 12/1895 | STR 30F 30A W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 05/03/1960 03/10/1960 |
03/10/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 388 | 7388 | 8564 | 12/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 389 | 7389 | 8565 | 68565 | 12/1895 | HAT 30A 30A 32D 32C 30A W |
Hatfield Stratford Stratford Yarmouth South Town Lowestoft Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 17/12/1955 24/03/1956 07/11/1959 06/08/1962 |
06/08/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 390 | 7390 | 8566 | 68566 | 12/1895 | SL 31A 31C 30A W |
South Lynn Cambridge Kings Lynn Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/03/1959 20/06/1959 30/07/1960 05/09/1962 |
05/09/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 391 | 7391 | 8567 | 68567 | 01/1896 | PKD 32B 32B 32A 31A 31C 31A 31D 31A W |
Parkhead Ipswich Ipswich Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Kings Lynn Cambridge South Lynn Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/02/1952 16/02/1952 22/03/1952 22/08/1953 24/10/1953 20/02/1954 22/10/1955 18/02/1956 18/08/1957 |
18/08/1957 | ||
J69/1 | 392 | 7392 | 8568 | 68568 | 01/1896 | STM 61B 61A 61A 40A 40A 32A 33A 30A W |
St Margarets Aberdeen Ferryhill Kittybrewster Kittybrewster Lincoln Lincoln Norwich Thorpe Plaistow Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 16/02/1952 22/03/1952 17/05/1952 21/06/1952 25/07/1953 08/05/1958 |
08/05/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 393 | 7393 | 8569 | 68569 | 01/1896 | STR 40A 40F 40A 36A 41J 41B 41J W |
Stratford Lincoln Boston Lincoln Doncaster Langwith Junction Sheffield Grimesthorpe Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/01/1954 17/11/1956 19/01/1957 15/06/1957 21/11/1959 12/03/1960 19/03/1960 02/06/1960 |
02/06/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 394 | 7394 | 8570 | 68570 | 01/1896 | MC NOR NOR 40F 40E 30A W |
Melton Constable Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Boston Colwick Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 28/11/1948 15/12/1948 22/08/1953 27/02/1960 17/06/1961 10/09/1961 |
10/09/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 395 | 7395 | 8571 | 68571 | 02/1896 | PKS STR PKS STR STR W |
Parkeston Quay Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 16/04/1949 19/11/1949 30/11/1949 04/12/1960 |
04/12/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 396 | 7396 | 8572 | 68572 | 02/1896 | HAT 32B W |
Hatfield Ipswich Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 29/11/1954 |
29/11/1954 | ||
J69/1 | 265 | 7265 | 8573 | 68573 | 04/1896 | STR 30E 30F W |
Stratford Colchester Parkeston Quay Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 07/11/1959 01/08/1960 |
01/08/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 266 | 7266 | 8574 | 68574 | 04/1896 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1959 |
19/01/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 267 | 7267 | 8575 | 68575 | 04/1896 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1960 |
06/10/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 268 | 7268 | 8576 | 68576 | 04/1896 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1958 |
12/03/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 269 | 7269 | 8577 | 68577 | 05/1896 | STR 30F W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1960 10/11/1960 |
10/11/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 270 | 7270 | 8578 | 68578 | 05/1896 | STR COL COL 30A 30F 30A W |
Stratford Colchester Colchester Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 10/12/1949 19/02/1955 26/11/1960 07/01/1961 16/01/1961 |
16/01/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 271 | 7271 | 8579 | 68579 | 05/1896 | BSE CAM 30A 30A 52B 30E 30A W |
Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Stratford Stratford Heaton Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 22/09/1956 14/06/1958 07/11/1959 18/01/1960 |
18/01/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 272 | 7272 | 8580 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 273 | 7273 | 8581 | 68581 | 06/1896 | BOS 40A W |
Boston Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1958 28/09/1959 |
28/09/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 274 | 7274 | 8582 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/2 | 258 | 7258 | 8585 | 68585 | 03/1899 | TFD 6E 84K W |
Trafford Park (LNER) Wrexham Rhosddu Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1956 22/02/1958 06/1958 |
06/1958 | ||
J69/2 | 261 | 7261 | 8587 | 68587 | 04/1899 | LIN 36A W |
Lincoln Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/04/1957 01/10/1959 |
01/10/1959 | ||
J69/2 | 262 | 7262 | 8588 | 68588 | 04/1899 | NWE STR W |
New England Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/09/1949 01/05/1958 |
01/05/1958 | ||
J69/2 | 203 | 7203 | 8591 | 68591 | 12/1899 | STR 41H 41J W |
Stratford Staveley (G.C.) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 10/10/1959 04/01/1960 |
04/01/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 189 | 305 | 7305 | 8596 | 68596 | 06/1900 | PKS STR 30A 30A W |
Parkeston Quay Stratford Stratford Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 31/01/1951 17/02/1951 06/11/1959 |
06/11/1959 | |
J69/1 | 190 | 7190 | 8597 | 68597 | 07/1900 | CAM SL 32A W |
Cambridge South Lynn Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 22/08/1953 11/10/1955 |
11/10/1955 | ||
J69/1 | 191 | 7191 | 8598 | 68598 | 07/1900 | GOR 8E 6E W |
Gorton Brunswick Wrexham Rhosddu Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 01/01/1955 26/01/1957 11/05/1957 |
11/05/1957 | ||
J69/1 | 192 | 7192 | 8599 | 68599 | 07/1900 | LIN W |
Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/11/1959 |
02/11/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 193 | 7193 | 8600 | 68600 | 07/1900 | KL SL SL 31C 31C 31A 30A W |
Kings Lynn South Lynn South Lynn Kings Lynn Kings Lynn Cambridge Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 16/07/1949 19/01/1952 26/01/1952 25/07/1953 07/02/1959 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 194 | 7194 | 8601 | 68601 | 07/1900 | STR 30F 30F 30A 30E 38A W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Parkeston Quay Stratford Colchester Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/02/1951 24/03/1951 21/03/1953 23/04/1955 24/03/1956 01/10/1959 |
01/10/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 195 | 7195 | 8602 | 68602 | 07/1900 | LOW NOR NOR 40F W |
Lowestoft Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Boston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1949 30/11/1949 22/08/1953 28/10/1959 |
28/10/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 196 | 7196 | 8603 | 68603 | 08/1900 | NOR 31B W |
Norwich Thorpe March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1953 05/03/1958 |
05/03/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 197 | 7197 | 8604 | 08/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 198 | 7198 | 8605 | 68605 | 08/1900 | HIT 40A W |
Hitchin (GNR) Lincoln Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1953 04/07/1958 |
04/07/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 160 | 7160 | 8607 | 68607 | 06/1901 | STR COL STR W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/09/1949 04/02/1950 05/05/1958 |
05/05/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 162 | 7162 | 8609 | 68609 | 06/1901 | CAM 31E 31E 31A 30A W |
Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 14/02/1953 07/11/1959 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 163 | 7163 | 8610 | 68610 | 06/1901 | LIN 34D W |
Lincoln Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1953 07/01/1957 |
07/01/1957 | ||
J69/1 | 165 | 7165 | 8612 | 68612 | 07/1901 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1961 |
26/06/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 166 | 7166 | 8613 | 68613 | 07/1901 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1961 |
17/09/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 167 | 7167 | 8614 | 07/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 168 | 7168 | 8615 | 08/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 51 | 7051 | 8617 | 68617 | 05/1904 | STR 38D W |
Stratford Staveley (G.C.) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/01/1956 14/07/1958 |
14/07/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 52 | 7052 | 8618 | 68618 | 05/1904 | LIN FRO LIN 38D 40A 38D 38D 40A 40A 39B 39B 40A 40F 40E W |
Lincoln Frodingham Lincoln Staveley (G.C.) Lincoln Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (G.C.) Lincoln Lincoln Sheffield Darnall Sheffield Darnall Lincoln Boston Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 06/08/1949 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 19/07/1952 09/08/1952 06/09/1952 20/09/1952 21/03/1953 08/03/1958 19/07/1958 18/08/1958 |
18/08/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 53 | 7053 | 8619 | 68619 | 05/1904 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/10/1961 |
30/10/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 54 | 7054 | 8620 | 05/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 55 | 7055 | 8621 | 68621 | 05/1904 | STR 36A 36E 36A 41J 41D 36E 30A W |
Stratford Doncaster Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Doncaster Langwith Junction Canklow Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1955 05/12/1959 19/03/1960 02/04/1960 13/08/1960 28/01/1961 24/06/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 56 | 7056 | 8622 | 06/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 57 | 7057 | 8623 | 68623 | 06/1904 | STM 36A 36A 32A 32A 32G 31D 41E 41F 41J W |
St Margarets Doncaster Doncaster Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Melton Constable South Lynn Staveley (Barrow Hill) Mexborough Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/07/1951 28/07/1951 15/09/1951 22/09/1951 17/05/1952 22/08/1953 14/06/1958 19/07/1958 30/01/1960 14/02/1961 |
14/02/1961 | ||
J69/1 | 58 | 7058 | 8624 | 06/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 59 | 7059 | 8625 | 68625 | 06/1904 | YAR 31A 31E 31A 32G 32D W |
Yarmouth South Town Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Melton Constable Yarmouth South Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1953 23/10/1954 19/02/1955 21/01/1956 19/07/1958 01/01/1959 |
01/01/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 60 | 7060 | 8626 | 68626 | 06/1904 | STR 35A 34F 40E 30A W |
Stratford New England Grantham Colwick Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1955 10/05/1958 07/05/1960 17/06/1961 03/05/1962 |
03/05/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 81 | 7081 | 8627 | 08/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 82 | 7082 | 8628 | 68628 | 08/1904 | YAR 32C 32D 32C W |
Yarmouth South Town Lowestoft Yarmouth South Town Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/03/1957 18/05/1957 15/06/1957 24/02/1958 |
24/02/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 83 | 7083 | 8629 | 68629 | 08/1904 | COL STR COL 30A 30A 38A W |
Colchester Stratford Colchester Stratford Stratford Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 19/06/1948 08/10/1950 21/10/1950 17/12/1955 26/11/1959 |
26/11/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 84 | 7084 | 8630 | 68630 | 08/1904 | STR COL STR COL COL 30A 30A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Colchester Colchester Stratford Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 27/11/1948 16/04/1949 04/02/1950 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 01/01/1959 |
01/01/1959 | ||
J69/1 | 85 | 7085 | 8631 | 68631 | 08/1904 | STR COL W |
Stratford Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 28/07/1958 |
28/07/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 86 | 7086 | 8632 | 68632 | 09/1904 | NWE 30A 38D 38D 30A 30A W |
New England Stratford Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (G.C.) Stratford Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 15/11/1952 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 27/12/1952 08/05/1958 |
08/05/1958 | ||
J69/1 | 87 | 7087 | 8633 | 68633 | 09/1904 | STR 30F W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1960 24/11/1960 |
24/11/1960 | ||
J69/1 | 88 | 7088 | 8634 | 09/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1940 | 10/1940 | |||
J69/1 | 89 | 7089 | 8635 | 68635 | 09/1904 | DFU 91E 36A 36A 32A 32A 31C 35A 34F 40E 30A W |
Dunfermline Upper To Eastern Region Doncaster Doncaster Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Kings Lynn New England Grantham Colwick Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/06/1951 30/06/1951 21/07/1951 15/09/1951 22/09/1951 22/08/1953 24/03/1956 31/01/1959 07/05/1960 17/06/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | ||
J69/1 | 90 | 7090 | 8636 | 68636 | 09/1904 | COL STR COL STR 30E 30E 30A W |
Colchester Stratford Colchester Stratford Colchester Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 16/04/1949 03/09/1949 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 19/02/1955 01/01/1959 |
01/01/1959 |