LNER Riddles "J94" Class 0-6-0ST
Class | WD | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
J94 | 75094 | 8006 | 68006 | 01/1944 | IMM GOR BID 17D 16C 9L W |
Immingham Gorton Bidston Rowsley Derby Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 05/02/1949 11/08/1956 02/05/1964 24/04/1965 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 |
J94 | 75097 | 8007 | 68007 | 02/1944 | NPT 51A W |
Newport (Teeside) Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1956 15/10/1962 |
15/10/1962 |
J94 | 75101 | 8008 | 68008 | 02/1944 | DAR 56B 51A W |
Darlington Ardsley Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/01/1961 12/10/1963 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 |
J94 | 75108 | 8009 | 68009 | 03/1944 | IMM 40E 30A W |
Immingham Colwick Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/02/1960 04/08/1962 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
J94 | 75117 | 8010 | 68010 | 05/1944 | BLA 51A W |
Blaydon Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1961 24/05/1965 |
24/05/1965 |
J94 | 75119 | 8011 | 68011 | 05/1944 | NPT 51L 53A 56B 51A W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Hull Dairycoates Ardsley Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 11/10/1958 07/01/1961 12/10/1963 24/05/1965 |
24/05/1965 |
J94 | 75124 | 8012 | 68012 | 06/1944 | IMM GOR 17C 9G 17C 16C 9L 16G W |
Immingham Gorton Rowsley Gorton Rowsley Derby Buxton (LNWR) Westhouses Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 03/10/1959 01/10/1960 28/04/1962 02/05/1964 20/06/1964 13/05/1967 07/10/1967 |
07/10/1967 |
J94 | 75125 | 8013 | 68013 | 06/1944 | IMM 6C 6F 17D 16C W |
Immingham Birkenhead Mollington Street Bidston Rowsley Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 06/09/1952 11/08/1956 02/05/1964 15/08/1964 |
15/08/1964 |
J94 | 75134 | 8014 | 68014 | 09/1944 | BLA HTN 52C 51A W |
Blaydon Heaton Blaydon Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/01/1950 02/05/1959 09/09/1961 05/10/1964 |
05/10/1964 |
J94 | 75139 | 8015 | 68015 | 10/1944 | BLA DAR 56B W |
Blaydon Darlington Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 07/01/1961 22/08/1963 |
22/08/1963 |
J94 | 75148 | 8016 | 68016 | 12/1944 | SUN BOR SUN 52H 52A 52H 51A W |
Sunderland Borough Gardens Sunderland Tyne Dock Gateshead Tyne Dock Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 25/12/1948 26/08/1961 24/03/1962 07/04/1962 26/01/1963 25/05/1964 |
25/05/1964 |
J94 | 75149 | 8017 | 68017 | 12/1944 | SCA YK 54D 54D 54A 54A 51A W |
Scarborough York (North) Consett Consett Sunderland Sunderland Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1950 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 04/02/1951 17/02/1951 20/12/1958 26/11/1962 |
26/11/1962 |
J94 | 75150 | 8018 | 68018 | 05/1944 | IMM 40E 40F 40E 30A W |
Immingham Colwick Boston Colwick Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/04/1961 17/06/1961 30/06/1962 04/08/1962 04/08/1962 |
04/08/1962 |
J94 | 75153 | 8019 | 68019 | 06/1944 | BLA 54D 54D 52H 51C W |
Blaydon Consett Consett Tyne Dock West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 20/01/1951 02/05/1959 12/10/1963 05/10/1964 |
05/10/1964 |
J94 | 75164 | 8020 | 68020 | 09/1944 | IMM 36A 41J W |
Immingham Doncaster Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1955 29/04/1961 15/06/1963 |
15/06/1963 |
J94 | 75183 | 8021 | 68021 | 04/1944 | BLA 52B 52B 51C W |
Blaydon Heaton Heaton West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1951 23/06/1951 22/10/1955 14/10/1963 |
14/10/1963 |
J94 | 75184 | 8022 | 68022 | 04/1944 | IMM 36A W |
Immingham Doncaster Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1955 06/09/1960 |
06/09/1960 |
J94 | 75190 | 8023 | 68023 | 06/1944 | NPT 51L 51C 51A W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby West Hartlepool Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 21/09/1963 12/12/1964 24/05/1965 |
24/05/1965 |
J94 | 71509 | 8024 | 68024 | 09/1944 | BLA 54A 51A W |
Blaydon Sunderland Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1951 20/12/1958 16/01/1964 |
16/01/1964 |
J94 | 71498 | 8025 | 68025 | 11/1944 | DAR W |
Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/10/1963 |
14/10/1963 |
J94 | 71506 | 8026 | 68026 | 04/1945 | IMM 41J W |
Immingham Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/07/1958 17/03/1961 |
17/03/1961 |
J94 | 71440 | 8027 | 68027 | 02/1945 | DAR W |
Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1960 |
05/12/1960 |
J94 | 71447 | 8028 | 68028 | 04/1945 | IMM 40E W |
Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/12/1958 07/09/1960 |
07/09/1960 |
J94 | 71451 | 8029 | 68029 | 05/1945 | BLA 50A 50A 54B 52A 52H W |
Blaydon York (North) York (North) Tyne Dock Gateshead Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 21/09/1957 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 23/09/1963 |
23/09/1963 |
J94 | 71452 | 8030 | 68030 | 05/1945 | IMM 6C 6F 17D W |
Immingham Birkenhead Mollington Street Bidston Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 06/09/1952 11/08/1956 07/04/1962 |
07/04/1962 |
J94 | 75272 | 8031 | 68031 | 02/1945 | YK 54B 52A 52H W |
York (North) Tyne Dock Gateshead Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/07/1957 07/04/1962 15/09/1962 11/02/1963 |
11/02/1963 |
J94 | 75281 | 8032 | 68032 | 04/1945 | YK 51A 51C W |
York (North) Darlington West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 17/09/1960 25/05/1964 |
25/05/1964 |
J94 | 75287 | 8033 | 68033 | 06/1945 | IMM 38A 40B 34B 34A 34B 40E W |
Immingham Colwick Immingham Hornsey Kings Cross Hornsey Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1958 15/11/1958 20/12/1958 07/02/1959 28/02/1959 27/02/1960 25/10/1960 |
25/10/1960 |
J94 | 75297 | 8034 | 68034 | 06/1945 | IMM 6C 6F 17D W |
Immingham Birkenhead Mollington Street Bidston Rowsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 06/09/1952 07/09/1957 27/10/1962 |
27/10/1962 |
J94 | 75320 | 8035 | 68035 | 07/1945 | BLA 51A W |
Blaydon Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1961 14/10/1963 |
14/10/1963 |
J94 | 75321 | 8036 | 68036 | 07/1945 | BLA 52H 51C W |
Blaydon Tyne Dock West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1960 09/09/1961 25/05/1964 |
25/05/1964 |
J94 | 75322 | 8037 | 68037 | 07/1945 | BLA 51B 51A W |
Blaydon Newport (Teeside) Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/03/1950 21/07/1956 24/05/1965 |
24/05/1965 |
J94 | 75323 | 8038 | 68038 | 07/1945 | BLA 52H W |
Blaydon Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/05/1959 18/11/1963 |
18/11/1963 |
J94 | 75324 | 8039 | 68039 | 07/1945 | SEL YK DAR 51L 51C W |
Selby York (North) Darlington Thornaby West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 30/04/1949 17/09/1960 21/09/1963 14/10/1963 |
14/10/1963 |
J94 | 75325 | 8040 | 68040 | 07/1945 | SEL YK 51A W |
Selby York (North) Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 20/06/1959 14/10/1963 |
14/10/1963 |
J94 | 75326 | 8041 | 68041 | 07/1945 | NPT 52C 54A 51C W |
Newport (Teeside) Blaydon Sunderland West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1950 23/06/1951 09/09/1961 14/10/1963 |
14/10/1963 |
J94 | 75327 | 8042 | 68042 | 07/1945 | YK WHL 50A 50A 53A W |
York (North) West Hartlepool York (North) York (North) Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1950 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 20/07/1957 23/12/1963 |
23/12/1963 |
J94 | 75328 | 8043 | 68043 | 07/1945 | YK DAR W |
York (North) Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/07/1949 24/05/1965 |
24/05/1965 |
J94 | 75329 | 8044 | 68044 | 08/1945 | YK 54A 51C W |
York (North) Sunderland West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/09/1957 09/09/1961 29/10/1962 |
29/10/1962 |
J94 | 75330 | 8045 | 68045 | 08/1945 | YK DAR 56B W |
York (North) Darlington Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/07/1949 07/01/1961 16/09/1963 |
16/09/1963 |
J94 | 75331 | 8046 | 68046 | 08/1945 | YK W |
York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/06/1964 |
29/06/1964 |
J94 | 75258 | 8047 | 68047 | 07/1945 | DAR W |
Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/05/1965 |
24/05/1965 |
J94 | 75259 | 8048 | 68048 | 07/1945 | DAR BLA 54A 52H W |
Darlington Blaydon Sunderland Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 24/11/1951 26/08/1961 08/10/1962 |
08/10/1962 |
J94 | 75260 | 8049 | 68049 | 08/1945 | DAR NPT 51L 51E 51L 56B W |
Darlington Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Stockton Thornaby Ardsley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1949 14/06/1958 11/10/1958 20/06/1959 11/03/1961 23/09/1963 |
23/09/1963 |
J94 | 75261 | 8050 | 68050 | 08/1945 | DAR W |
Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/12/1964 |
07/12/1964 |
J94 | 75262 | 8051 | 68051 | 09/1945 | DAR NPT YK DAR 50A 51C 51A W |
Darlington Newport (Teeside) York (North) Darlington York (North) West Hartlepool Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 30/04/1949 16/07/1949 21/04/1951 22/10/1955 04/04/1964 29/06/1964 |
29/06/1964 |
J94 | 75263 | 8052 | 68052 | 09/1945 | DAR W |
Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1962 |
18/06/1962 |
J94 | 75265 | 8053 | 68053 | 10/1945 | WHL 52A 52H 51C 51A W |
West Hartlepool Gateshead Tyne Dock West Hartlepool Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/04/1962 22/06/1963 12/10/1963 04/04/1964 24/05/1965 |
24/05/1965 |
J94 | 75266 | 8054 | 68054 | 11/1945 | WHL 52H 52A 52H 51C 51A W |
West Hartlepool Tyne Dock Gateshead Tyne Dock West Hartlepool Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1961 24/03/1962 15/09/1962 12/10/1963 04/04/1964 29/06/1964 |
29/06/1964 |
J94 | 75267 | 8055 | 68055 | 12/1945 | WHL W |
West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1962 |
16/07/1962 |
J94 | 75268 | 8056 | 68056 | 12/1945 | WHL W |
West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1962 |
15/10/1962 |
J94 | 75269 | 8057 | 68057 | 12/1945 | WHL W |
West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1962 |
18/06/1962 |
J94 | 75270 | 8058 | 68058 | 02/1946 | BLA 52C 54A 51C W |
Blaydon Blaydon Sunderland West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 16/04/1950 23/06/1951 09/09/1961 29/10/1962 |
29/10/1962 |
J94 | 75271 | 8059 | 68059 | 02/1946 | BLA 52C 52C 54B 52A 52H 51A W |
Blaydon Blaydon Blaydon Tyne Dock Gateshead Tyne Dock Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/04/1950 26/05/1951 23/06/1951 20/07/1957 24/03/1962 22/06/1963 12/10/1963 09/12/1963 |
09/12/1963 |
J94 | 71467 | 8060 | 68060 | 09/1945 | NPT 51L 51L 51A W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Thornaby Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 20/06/1959 09/01/1960 24/05/1965 |
24/05/1965 |
J94 | 71468 | 8061 | 68061 | 10/1945 | DAR YK W |
Darlington York (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 |
J94 | 71469 | 8062 | 68062 | 10/1945 | NPT 51L 56B 51C 51A W |
Newport (Teeside) Thornaby Ardsley West Hartlepool Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 11/03/1961 04/01/1964 04/04/1964 24/05/1965 |
24/05/1965 |
J94 | 71470 | 8063 | 68063 | 10/1945 | GOR WRX 6F W |
Gorton Wrexham Rhosddu Bidston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1949 31/12/1950 06/01/1962 |
06/01/1962 |
J94 | 71471 | 8064 | 68064 | 11/1945 | GOR 91M 39A 9E 39A 39A W |
Gorton To London Midland Region Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Gorton Gorton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 23/09/1950 24/02/1951 12/05/1951 19/05/1951 10/02/1962 |
10/02/1962 |
J94 | 71472 | 8065 | 68065 | 12/1945 | GOR 9E 6F W |
Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Bidston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1953 31/10/1953 22/12/1962 |
22/12/1962 |
J94 | 71473 | 8066 | 68066 | 12/1945 | GOR BID W |
Gorton Bidston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1949 22/12/1962 |
22/12/1962 |
J94 | 71474 | 8067 | 68067 | 01/1946 | GOR SHF GOR 9E 39A 40B 34B 36E 40E W |
Gorton Sheffield Darnall Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Gorton Immingham Hornsey Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 27/11/1948 07/10/1950 25/11/1950 20/03/1954 10/01/1959 24/06/1961 16/06/1962 10/02/1963 |
10/02/1963 |
J94 | 71475 | 8068 | 68068 | 02/1946 | IMM 39A 17C 16C 9L W |
Immingham Gorton Rowsley Derby Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/05/1957 04/08/1962 02/05/1964 24/04/1965 08/05/1965 |
08/05/1965 |
J94 | 71476 | 8069 | 68069 | 02/1946 | IMM 36A 41J W |
Immingham Doncaster Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/02/1958 29/04/1961 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 |
J94 | 71486 | 8070 | 68070 | 09/1945 | IMM 40E 40F 40E 41F W |
Immingham Colwick Boston Colwick Mexborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1960 17/06/1961 30/06/1962 15/12/1962 19/03/1963 |
19/03/1963 |
J94 | 71532 | 8071 | 68071 | 06/1945 | IMM GOR 9E 8E 39A 39A 39A 9E 39A 40B 36A 51A W |
Immingham Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Brunswick Gorton Gorton Gorton Trafford Park (LMS) Gorton Immingham Doncaster Darlington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/07/1948 04/11/1950 31/12/1950 04/02/1951 17/02/1951 28/02/1951 16/06/1951 21/07/1951 20/03/1954 18/05/1957 10/12/1960 07/08/1963 |
07/08/1963 |
J94 | 71533 | 8072 | 68072 | 07/1945 | IMM 40E W |
Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/12/1958 07/09/1960 |
07/09/1960 |
J94 | 71534 | 8073 | 68073 | 10/1945 | IMM 34B 34A W |
Immingham Hornsey Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1959 15/07/1961 28/08/1961 |
28/08/1961 |
J94 | 71535 | 8074 | 68074 | 12/1945 | IMM 40E W |
Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1960 17/10/1962 |
17/10/1962 |
J94 | 71536 | 8075 | 68075 | 03/1946 | IMM 34B 36E 40E W |
Immingham Hornsey Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1959 24/06/1961 16/06/1962 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
J94 | 71462 | 8076 | 68076 | 04/1946 | IMM 40E W |
Immingham Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/12/1958 02/09/1960 |
02/09/1960 |
J94 | 71466 | 8077 | 68077 | 01/1947 | IMM 34B 40F 40E W |
Immingham Hornsey Boston Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1959 15/07/1961 30/06/1962 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
J94 | 71463 | 8078 | 68078 | 07/1946 | IMM 51L 41J W |
Immingham Thornaby Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 25/03/1961 10/03/1963 |
10/03/1963 |
J94 | 71464 | 8079 | 68079 | 09/1946 | IMM GOR 17C 16C 9L W |
Immingham Gorton Rowsley Derby Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/07/1948 14/07/1962 02/05/1964 20/06/1964 29/10/1966 |
29/10/1966 |
J94 | 71465 | 8080 | 68080 | 11/1946 | IMM 41J W |
Immingham Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/07/1958 14/04/1961 |
14/04/1961 |