Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 2387 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15793 Week
» 68809 Month
» 188336 Year
» 3215189 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Riddles "J94" Class 0-6-0ST
Class |
LNER (1946) |
WD |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
J94 |
8006
|
75094
|
68006
|
01/1944 |
06/05/1967 |
Extended bunker fitted |
08/1947 |
J94 |
8007
|
75097
|
68007
|
02/1944 |
15/10/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
11/1949 |
J94 |
8008
|
75101
|
68008
|
02/1944 |
09/12/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
09/1949 |
J94 |
8009
|
75108
|
68009
|
03/1944 |
04/08/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
06/1948 |
J94 |
8010
|
75117
|
68010
|
05/1944 |
24/05/1965 |
Extended bunker fitted |
01/1949 |
J94 |
8011
|
75119
|
68011
|
05/1944 |
24/05/1965 |
Extended bunker fitted |
10/1949 |
J94 |
8012
|
75124
|
68012
|
06/1944 |
07/10/1967 |
Extended bunker fitted |
11/1947 |
J94 |
8013
|
75125
|
68013
|
06/1944 |
15/08/1964 |
Extended bunker fitted |
03/1948 |
J94 |
8014
|
75134
|
68014
|
09/1944 |
05/10/1964 |
Extended bunker fitted |
10/1948 |
J94 |
8015
|
75139
|
68015
|
10/1944 |
22/08/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
11/1948 |
J94 |
8016
|
75148
|
68016
|
12/1944 |
25/05/1964 |
Extended bunker fitted |
12/1948 |
J94 |
8018
|
75150
|
68018
|
05/1944 |
04/08/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
11/1948 |
J94 |
8020
|
75164
|
68020
|
09/1944 |
15/06/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
10/1948 |
J94 |
8022
|
75184
|
68022
|
04/1944 |
06/09/1960 |
Extended bunker fitted |
10/1948 |
J94 |
8023
|
75190
|
68023
|
06/1944 |
24/05/1965 |
Extended bunker fitted |
07/1949 |
J94 |
8025
|
71498
|
68025
|
11/1944 |
14/10/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
11/1949 |
J94 |
8026
|
71506
|
68026
|
04/1945 |
17/03/1961 |
Extended bunker fitted |
09/1948 |
J94 |
8027
|
71440
|
68027
|
02/1945 |
05/12/1960 |
Extended bunker fitted |
04/1949 |
J94 |
8028
|
71447
|
68028
|
04/1945 |
07/09/1960 |
Extended bunker fitted |
01/1949 |
J94 |
8030
|
71452
|
68030
|
05/1945 |
07/04/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
11/1948 |
J94 |
8033
|
75287
|
68033
|
06/1945 |
25/10/1960 |
Extended bunker fitted |
09/1948 |
J94 |
8034
|
75297
|
68034
|
06/1945 |
27/10/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
06/1948 |
J94 |
8035
|
75320
|
68035
|
07/1945 |
14/10/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
03/1949 |
J94 |
8037
|
75322
|
68037
|
07/1945 |
24/05/1965 |
Extended bunker fitted |
01/1949 |
J94 |
8039
|
75324
|
68039
|
07/1945 |
14/10/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
02/1949 |
J94 |
8042
|
75327
|
68042
|
07/1945 |
23/12/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
10/1949 |
J94 |
8045
|
75330
|
68045
|
08/1945 |
16/09/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
10/1949 |
J94 |
8047
|
75258
|
68047
|
07/1945 |
24/05/1965 |
Extended bunker fitted |
09/1949 |
J94 |
8048
|
75259
|
68048
|
07/1945 |
08/10/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
12/1949 |
J94 |
8049
|
75260
|
68049
|
08/1945 |
23/09/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
03/1950 |
J94 |
8050
|
75261
|
68050
|
08/1945 |
07/12/1964 |
Extended bunker fitted |
09/1949 |
J94 |
8051
|
75262
|
68051
|
09/1945 |
29/06/1964 |
Extended bunker fitted |
09/1948 |
J94 |
8052
|
75263
|
68052
|
09/1945 |
18/06/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
10/1949 |
J94 |
8053
|
75265
|
68053
|
10/1945 |
24/05/1965 |
Extended bunker fitted |
12/1949 |
J94 |
8054
|
75266
|
68054
|
11/1945 |
29/06/1964 |
Extended bunker fitted |
03/1950 |
J94 |
8055
|
75267
|
68055
|
12/1945 |
16/07/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
05/1950 |
J94 |
8056
|
75268
|
68056
|
12/1945 |
15/10/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
01/1950 |
J94 |
8057
|
75269
|
68057
|
12/1945 |
18/06/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
12/1949 |
J94 |
8060
|
71467
|
68060
|
09/1945 |
24/05/1965 |
Extended bunker fitted |
12/1949 |
J94 |
8062
|
71469
|
68062
|
10/1945 |
24/05/1965 |
Extended bunker fitted |
09/1949 |
J94 |
8063
|
71470
|
68063
|
10/1945 |
06/01/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
04/1950 |
J94 |
8064
|
71471
|
68064
|
11/1945 |
10/02/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
12/1950 |
J94 |
8065
|
71472
|
68065
|
12/1945 |
22/12/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
01/1950 |
J94 |
8066
|
71473
|
68066
|
12/1945 |
22/12/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
02/1950 |
J94 |
8067
|
71474
|
68067
|
01/1946 |
10/02/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
08/1951 |
J94 |
8068
|
71475
|
68068
|
02/1946 |
08/05/1965 |
Extended bunker fitted |
03/1948 |
J94 |
8069
|
71476
|
68069
|
02/1946 |
23/09/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
12/1948 |
J94 |
8070
|
71486
|
68070
|
09/1945 |
19/03/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
05/1948 |
J94 |
8071
|
71532
|
68071
|
06/1945 |
07/08/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
02/1949 |
J94 |
8072
|
71533
|
68072
|
07/1945 |
07/09/1960 |
Extended bunker fitted |
03/1949 |
J94 |
8073
|
71534
|
68073
|
10/1945 |
28/08/1961 |
Extended bunker fitted |
07/1948 |
J94 |
8074
|
71535
|
68074
|
12/1945 |
17/10/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
07/1950 |
J94 |
8075
|
71536
|
68075
|
03/1946 |
29/12/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
08/1948 |
J94 |
8076
|
71462
|
68076
|
04/1946 |
02/09/1960 |
Extended bunker fitted |
01/1949 |
J94 |
8077
|
71466
|
68077
|
01/1947 |
29/12/1962 |
Extended bunker fitted |
08/1949 |
J94 |
8078
|
71463
|
68078
|
07/1946 |
10/03/1963 |
Extended bunker fitted |
08/1949 |
J94 |
8079
|
71464
|
68079
|
09/1946 |
29/10/1966 |
Extended bunker fitted |
10/1950 |
J94 |
8080
|
71465
|
68080
|
11/1946 |
14/04/1961 |
Extended bunker fitted |
04/1949 |