Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 397 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5366 Week
» 17879 Month
» 106071 Year
» 990452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "K3" Class 2-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
09/1925 To Service 206   NEW GOR Gorton  
02/02/1926 Reallocation 206 GOR Gorton NEA Neasden  
31/05/1927 Reallocation 206 NEA Neasden DON Doncaster  
18/07/1930 Reallocation 206 DON Doncaster COP Copley Hill (Leeds)  
20/07/1930 Reallocation 206 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) DON Doncaster  
12/06/1931 Reallocation 206 DON Doncaster NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1800     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1801     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1802     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1803     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1804     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1805     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1806     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1807     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1808     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1809     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1810     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1811     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1812     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1813     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1814     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1815     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1816     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1817     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1818     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1819     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1820     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1821     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1822     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1823     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1824     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1825     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1826     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1827     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1828     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1829     WFD Woodford Halse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1830     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1831     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1832     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1833     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1834     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1835     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1836     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1837     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1838     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1839     WFD Woodford Halse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1840     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1841     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1842     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1843     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1844     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1845     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1846     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1847     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1848     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1849     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1850     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1851     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1852     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1853     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1854     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1855     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1856     DON Doncaster  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1857     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1858     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1859     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1860     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1861     DON Doncaster  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1862     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1864     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1865     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1866     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1867     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1868     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1869     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1870     WFD Woodford Halse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1871     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1872     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1873     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1874     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1875     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1876     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1877     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1878     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1879     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1880     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1881     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1882     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1883     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1884     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1885     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1886     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1887     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1888     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1889     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1890     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1891     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1892     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1893     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1894     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1895     ANN Annesley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1896     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1897     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1898     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1899     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1900     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1901     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1902     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1903     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1904     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1905     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1906     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1907     DON Doncaster  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1908     WFD Woodford Halse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1909     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1910     DON Doncaster  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1911     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1912     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1913     WFD Woodford Halse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1914     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1915     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1916     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1917     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1918     DON Doncaster  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1919     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1920     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1921     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1922     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1923     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1924     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1925     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1926     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1927     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1928     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1929     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1930     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1931     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1932     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1933     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1934     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1935     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1936     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1937     CAR Carlisle Canal  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1938     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1939     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1940     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1941     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1942     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1943     WFD Woodford Halse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1944     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1945     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1946     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1947     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1948     MAR March  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1949     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1950     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1951     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1952     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1953     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1954     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1955     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1956     WFD Woodford Halse  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1957     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1958     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1959     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1960     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1961     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1962     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1963     IMM Immingham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1964     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1965     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1966     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1967     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1968     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1969     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1970     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1971     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1972     NWE New England  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1973     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1974     ANN Annesley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1975     ANN Annesley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1976     ANN Annesley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1977     ANN Annesley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1978     DON Doncaster  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1979     ANN Annesley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1980     ANN Annesley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1981     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1982     LIN Lincoln  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1983     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1984     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1985     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1986     GHD Gateshead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1987     HTN Heaton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1988     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1989     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1990     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1991     STM St Margarets  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 1992     STM St Margarets  
07/1949 Reallocation 61829 WFD Woodford Halse GOR Gorton  
07/1949 Reallocation 1839 WFD Woodford Halse GOR Gorton  
07/1949 Reallocation 61870 WFD Woodford Halse GOR Gorton  
07/1949 Reallocation 1908 WFD Woodford Halse GOR Gorton  
07/1949 Reallocation 61913 WFD Woodford Halse GOR Gorton  
07/1949 Reallocation 1956 WFD Woodford Halse GOR Gorton  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61804 NWE New England 31B March  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61808 CLK Colwick 39A Gorton  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61816 CLK Colwick 31B March  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61833 NWE New England 31B March  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61844 NWE New England 31B March  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61852 LIN Lincoln 39A Gorton  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61856 DON Doncaster 39A Gorton  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61865 CLK Colwick 39A Gorton  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61880 NWE New England 30A Stratford  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61910 DON Doncaster 39A Gorton  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 61961 NWE New England 31B March  
23/09/1950 Reallocation 61833 31B March 38A Colwick  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 61822 LIN Lincoln 38A Colwick  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 61844 31B March 32C Lowestoft  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 61864 NWE New England 32C Lowestoft  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 61961 31B March 32C Lowestoft  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 61982 LIN Lincoln 38A Colwick  
25/11/1950 Reallocation 61971 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 61844 32C Lowestoft 31B March  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 61864 32C Lowestoft 38A Colwick  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 61961 32C Lowestoft 31B March  
23/12/1950 Reallocation 61971 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 61877 NWE New England 32A Norwich Thorpe  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 61908 GOR Gorton 32A Norwich Thorpe  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 61877 32A Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 61908 32A Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 61981 LOW Lowestoft 31B March  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 61839 GOR Gorton 40B Immingham  
23/06/1951 Reallocation 61956 GOR Gorton 40B Immingham  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 61921 NOR Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 61942 NOR Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 61947 NOR Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 61916 STM St Margarets 12B Carlisle Canal  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 61844 31B March 53A Hull Dairycoates  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 61846 MAR March 53A Hull Dairycoates  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 61847 MAR March 53A Hull Dairycoates  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 61869 NWE New England 53A Hull Dairycoates  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 61893 MAR March 53A Hull Dairycoates  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 61877 31B March 32C Lowestoft  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 61908 31B March 32C Lowestoft  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 61981 31B March 32C Lowestoft  
19/01/1952 Reallocation 61877 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
19/01/1952 Reallocation 61901 HTN Heaton 52D Tweedmouth  
19/01/1952 Reallocation 61917 HTN Heaton 52D Tweedmouth  
19/01/1952 Reallocation 61930 GHD Gateshead 52D Tweedmouth  
19/01/1952 Reallocation 61962 HTN Heaton 52D Tweedmouth  
19/01/1952 Reallocation 61985 GHD Gateshead 52D Tweedmouth  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 61807 LIN Lincoln 40A Lincoln  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 61812 MAR March 39A Gorton  
16/02/1952 Reallocation 61966 LIN Lincoln 39A Gorton  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 61915 NWE New England 36A Doncaster  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 61977 ANN Annesley 38A Colwick  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 61862 NWE New England 40A Lincoln  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 61921 31B March 40A Lincoln  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 61942 31B March 40A Lincoln  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 61963 IMM Immingham 40A Lincoln  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 61927 HLD Hull Dairycoates 52B Heaton  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 61932 HLD Hull Dairycoates 52B Heaton  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61862 40A Lincoln 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61921 40A Lincoln 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61942 40A Lincoln 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61951 NWE New England 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61963 40A Lincoln 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61977 38A Colwick 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61981 32C Lowestoft 32C Lowestoft  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 61982 38A Colwick 30A Stratford  
13/12/1952 Reallocation 61899 HLD Hull Dairycoates 52D Tweedmouth  
13/12/1952 Reallocation 61932 52B Heaton 52D Tweedmouth  
13/12/1952 Reallocation 61952 HTN Heaton 52D Tweedmouth  
13/12/1952 Reallocation 61969 HTN Heaton 52D Tweedmouth  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 61981 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 61981 32A Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 61845 IMM Immingham 40A Lincoln  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 61981 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 61884 HTN Heaton 53A Hull Dairycoates  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61804 31B March 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61811 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61816 31B March 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61822 38A Colwick 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61824 CLK Colwick 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61826 CLK Colwick 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61827 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61835 MAR March 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61841 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61842 IMM Immingham 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61843 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61845 40A Lincoln 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61850 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61853 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61861 DON Doncaster 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61864 38A Colwick 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61867 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61868 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61890 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61907 DON Doncaster 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61915 36A Doncaster 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61918 DON Doncaster 32A Norwich Thorpe  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61929 NWE New England 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61943 WFD Woodford Halse 31B March  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61953 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 61989 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 61824 31B March 38A Colwick  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 61932 52D Tweedmouth 52B Heaton  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 61953 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 61989 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61809 NWE New England 38A Colwick  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61812 39A Gorton 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61828 NWE New England 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61829 GOR Gorton 39B Sheffield Darnall  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61848 NWE New England 39B Sheffield Darnall  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61852 39A Gorton 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61856 39A Gorton 38A Colwick  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61870 GOR Gorton 38A Colwick  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61896 NWE New England 38A Colwick  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61914 MAR March 38A Colwick  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61919 MAR March 40A Lincoln  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 61950 NWE New England 39B Sheffield Darnall  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 61801 CLK Colwick 40A Lincoln  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 61815 MAR March 40A Lincoln  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 61989 32A Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 61889 MAR March 40A Lincoln  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 61801 40A Lincoln 30A Stratford  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 61815 40A Lincoln 30A Stratford  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 61829 39B Sheffield Darnall 40A Lincoln  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 61848 39B Sheffield Darnall 40A Lincoln  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 61950 39B Sheffield Darnall 40A Lincoln  
13/11/1954 Reallocation 61989 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
19/02/1955 Reallocation 61856 38A Colwick 38B Annesley  
19/02/1955 Reallocation 61974 ANN Annesley 38A Colwick  
14/05/1955 Reallocation 61852 40A Lincoln 40B Immingham  
14/05/1955 Reallocation 61950 40A Lincoln 40B Immingham  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 61943 31B March 40F Boston  
17/09/1955 Reallocation 61899 52D Tweedmouth 53A Hull Dairycoates  
22/10/1955 Reallocation 61904 GHD Gateshead 53A Hull Dairycoates  
22/10/1955 Reallocation 61932 52B Heaton 53A Hull Dairycoates  
12/11/1955 Reallocation 61918 32A Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 61918 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
21/04/1956 Reallocation 61918 32A Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
25/05/1956 Reallocation 61918 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
25/05/1956 Reallocation 61970 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 61802 CLK Colwick 40A Lincoln  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 61812 40A Lincoln 32A Norwich Thorpe  
16/06/1956 Reallocation 61829 40A Lincoln 32A Norwich Thorpe  
21/07/1956 Reallocation 61804 31B March 40A Lincoln  
21/07/1956 Reallocation 61970 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61841 31B March 38E Woodford Halse  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61842 31B March 38E Woodford Halse  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61843 31B March 38E Woodford Halse  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61850 31B March 36B Mexborough  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61853 31B March 38E Woodford Halse  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61866 MAR March 38E Woodford Halse  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61867 31B March 36B Mexborough  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61868 31B March 36B Mexborough  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61873 MAR March 38A Colwick  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61887 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61888 MAR March 38A Colwick  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61895 ANN Annesley 36A Doncaster  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61907 31B March 41A Sheffield Darnall  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61938 NWE New England 41A Sheffield Darnall  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61940 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61947 31B March 38A Colwick  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61954 NWE New England 41A Sheffield Darnall  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61961 31B March 36A Doncaster  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61967 NWE New England 41A Sheffield Darnall  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61975 ANN Annesley 38A Colwick  
22/09/1956 Reallocation 61982 30A Stratford 38A Colwick  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 61844 53A Hull Dairycoates 52B Heaton  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 61869 53A Hull Dairycoates 52B Heaton  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 61864 31B March 35A New England  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 61978 DON Doncaster 35A New England  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 61979 ANN Annesley 35A New England  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 61975 38A Colwick 38B Annesley  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 61957 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 61970 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 61801 30A Stratford 31B March  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 61812 32A Norwich Thorpe 36A Doncaster  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 61829 32A Norwich Thorpe 36A Doncaster  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 61957 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 61804 40A Lincoln 38A Colwick  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 61805 MAR March 35A New England  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 61830 MAR March 35A New England  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 61831 MAR March 31B March  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 61838 IMM Immingham 38A Colwick  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 61854 CAR Carlisle Canal 53A Hull Dairycoates  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 61857 STM St Margarets 53A Hull Dairycoates  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 61897 GHD Gateshead 53A Hull Dairycoates  
16/03/1957 Reallocation 61970 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
15/06/1957 Reallocation 61957 32A Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 61804 38A Colwick 38E Woodford Halse  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 61838 38A Colwick 38E Woodford Halse  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61808 39A Gorton 38A Colwick  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61825 NWE New England 41A Sheffield Darnall  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61925 LIN Lincoln 36A Doncaster  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61943 40F Boston 41A Sheffield Darnall  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61957 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61964 LIN Lincoln 36A Doncaster  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 61966 39A Gorton 38E Woodford Halse  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 61809 38A Colwick 38E Woodford Halse  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 61824 38A Colwick 38E Woodford Halse  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 61837 IMM Immingham 38A Colwick  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 61852 40B Immingham 38A Colwick  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 61866 38E Woodford Halse 40B Immingham  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 61966 38E Woodford Halse 40B Immingham  
08/01/1958 Reallocation 61989 32A Norwich Thorpe 32D Yarmouth South Town  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 61815 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 61834 NWE New England 30F Parkeston Quay  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 61942 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
08/03/1958 Reallocation 61989 32D Yarmouth South Town 32A Norwich Thorpe  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 61820 MAR March 30F Parkeston Quay  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 61921 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 61826 31B March 32A Norwich Thorpe  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 61854 53A Hull Dairycoates 52D Tweedmouth  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 61934 HLD Hull Dairycoates 52D Tweedmouth  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 61970 32A Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
16/08/1958 Reallocation 61834 30F Parkeston Quay 31A Cambridge  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 61884 53A Hull Dairycoates 52B Heaton  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 61923 HLD Hull Dairycoates 52B Heaton  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 61962 52D Tweedmouth 52B Heaton  
11/10/1958 Reallocation 61970 32C Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
15/11/1958 Reallocation 61806 IMM Immingham 40A Lincoln  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61810 NWE New England 31B March  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61817 MAR March 31A Cambridge  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61840 NWE New England 30F Parkeston Quay  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61849 MAR March 30F Parkeston Quay  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61862 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61880 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61963 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
20/12/1958 Reallocation 61977 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 61949 LOW Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
10/01/1959 Reallocation 61973 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32A Norwich Thorpe  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 61800 IMM Immingham 36A Doncaster  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 61803 IMM Immingham 36A Doncaster  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 61836 IMM Immingham 41F Mexborough  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 61839 40B Immingham 41F Mexborough  
07/02/1959 Condemned 61898 CAR Carlisle Canal   COND  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 61840 30F Parkeston Quay 31B March  
14/02/1959 Reallocation 61880 30F Parkeston Quay 31A Cambridge  
07/03/1959 Reallocation 61849 30F Parkeston Quay 31A Cambridge  
21/03/1959 Reallocation 61816 31B March 41A Sheffield Darnall  
21/03/1959 Reallocation 61954 41A Sheffield Darnall 31B March  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 61882 CAR Carlisle Canal 2F Woodford Halse  
07/05/1959 Condemned 61991 STM St Margarets   COND  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 61853 38E Woodford Halse 56B Ardsley  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 61856 38B Annesley 56B Ardsley  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 61975 38B Annesley 56B Ardsley  
16/05/1959 Reallocation 61980 ANN Annesley 56B Ardsley  
16/06/1959 Condemned 61879 STM St Margarets   COND  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 61836 41F Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 61839 41F Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 61850 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 61867 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 61868 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
27/06/1959 Reallocation 61802 40A Lincoln 31B March  
27/06/1959 Reallocation 61808 38A Colwick 31B March  
27/06/1959 Reallocation 61867 36A Doncaster 31B March  
04/07/1959 Reallocation 61802 31B March 32C Lowestoft  
04/07/1959 Reallocation 61845 31B March 32A Norwich Thorpe  
04/07/1959 Reallocation 61851 CAR Carlisle Canal 31B March  
04/07/1959 Reallocation 61937 CAR Carlisle Canal 31B March  
04/07/1959 Reallocation 61954 31B March 32A Norwich Thorpe  
06/07/1959 Condemned 61855 STM St Margarets   COND  
10/07/1959 Condemned 61983 STM St Margarets   COND  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 61832 NWE New England 2F Woodford Halse  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 61913 GOR Gorton 2F Woodford Halse  
24/07/1959 Condemned 61931 STM St Margarets   COND  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 61802 32C Lowestoft 40A Lincoln  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 61808 31B March 40E Colwick  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 61845 32A Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 61867 31B March 36A Doncaster  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 61954 32A Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
06/08/1959 Condemned 61878 GHD Gateshead   COND  
17/09/1959 Condemned 61876 STM St Margarets   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 61911 STM St Margarets   COND  
03/11/1959 Condemned 61885 STM St Margarets   COND  
14/11/1959 Reallocation 61815 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
14/11/1959 Reallocation 61820 30F Parkeston Quay 30A Stratford  
16/11/1959 Condemned 61988 STM St Margarets   COND  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 61926 LOW Lowestoft 32A Norwich Thorpe  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 61801 31B March 31A Cambridge  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 61907 41A Sheffield Darnall 40E Colwick  
12/12/1959 Reallocation 61943 41A Sheffield Darnall 40E Colwick  
29/12/1959 Condemned 61823 STM St Margarets   COND  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 61869 52B Heaton 50B Hull Dairycoates  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 61875 GHD Gateshead 50B Hull Dairycoates  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 61923 52B Heaton 50B Hull Dairycoates  
23/01/1960 Reallocation 61927 52B Heaton 50B Hull Dairycoates  
05/02/1960 Condemned 61928 GHD Gateshead   COND  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 61826 32A Norwich Thorpe 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 61877 32A Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 61908 32C Lowestoft 31B March  
06/02/1960 Reallocation 61926 32A Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
08/02/1960 Condemned 61836 36A Doncaster   COND  
13/02/1960 Reallocation 61877 31B March 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 61851 31B March 12C Carlisle Canal  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 61908 31B March 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
20/02/1960 Reallocation 61937 31B March 12C Carlisle Canal  
27/02/1960 Reallocation 61926 31B March 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
04/03/1960 Condemned 61900 STM St Margarets   COND  
05/03/1960 Reallocation 61959 LOW Lowestoft 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
07/03/1960 Condemned 61802 40A Lincoln   COND  
07/03/1960 Condemned 61806 40A Lincoln   COND  
12/03/1960 Condemned 61937 12C Carlisle Canal   COND  
12/03/1960 Reallocation 61958 LOW Lowestoft 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
19/03/1960 Reallocation 61910 39A Gorton 2F Woodford Halse  
19/03/1960 Reallocation 61981 32A Norwich Thorpe 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
21/03/1960 Condemned 61838 38E Woodford Halse   COND  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 61877 41H Staveley (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 61926 41H Staveley (G.C.) 40A Lincoln  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 61989 32A Norwich Thorpe 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
01/04/1960 Condemned 61909 STM St Margarets   COND  
02/04/1960 Reallocation 61976 ANN Annesley 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 61820 30A Stratford 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
09/04/1960 Reallocation 61865 39A Gorton 2F Woodford Halse  
16/04/1960 Reallocation 61811 31B March 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
16/04/1960 Reallocation 61973 32A Norwich Thorpe 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
21/04/1960 Condemned 61881 GHD Gateshead   COND  
30/04/1960 Reallocation 61822 31B March 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
27/05/1960 Condemned 61955 STM St Margarets   COND  
28/05/1960 Condemned 61882 2F Woodford Halse   COND  
06/06/1960 Condemned 61992 STM St Margarets   COND  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 61820 41H Staveley (G.C.) 41F Mexborough  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 61822 41H Staveley (G.C.) 41F Mexborough  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 61851 12C Carlisle Canal 2F Woodford Halse  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 61862 30F Parkeston Quay 31B March  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 61918 32A Norwich Thorpe 31B March  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 61921 30F Parkeston Quay 31B March  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 61942 30F Parkeston Quay 31B March  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 61959 41H Staveley (G.C.) 41F Mexborough  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 61963 30F Parkeston Quay 31B March  
11/07/1960 Condemned 61815 30A Stratford   COND  
06/08/1960 Reallocation 61877 40A Lincoln 40B Immingham  
06/08/1960 Reallocation 61914 38A Colwick 40B Immingham  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 61844 52B Heaton 52D Tweedmouth  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 61962 52B Heaton 52D Tweedmouth  
17/09/1960 Reallocation 61984 HTN Heaton 52D Tweedmouth  
13/10/1960 Condemned 61990 STM St Margarets   COND  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 61889 40A Lincoln 40E Colwick  
22/10/1960 Reallocation 61894 CLK Colwick 40E Colwick  
26/11/1960 Reallocation 61901 52D Tweedmouth 50B Hull Dairycoates  
26/11/1960 Reallocation 61985 52D Tweedmouth 50B Hull Dairycoates  
12/1960 Condemned 61916 12B Carlisle Canal   COND  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61810 31B March 40A Lincoln  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61818 HTN Heaton 52H Tyne Dock  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61827 31B March 40A Lincoln  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61831 31B March 40A Lincoln  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61835 31B March 40A Lincoln  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61844 52D Tweedmouth 52B Heaton  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61884 52B Heaton 52H Tyne Dock  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61939 NOR Norwich Thorpe 40A Lincoln  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61949 32A Norwich Thorpe 40A Lincoln  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61951 30A Stratford 40A Lincoln  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61977 30F Parkeston Quay 40A Lincoln  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61986 GHD Gateshead 52H Tyne Dock  
10/12/1960 Reallocation 61987 HTN Heaton 52H Tyne Dock  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61810 40A Lincoln 40E Colwick  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61827 40A Lincoln 40E Colwick  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61831 40A Lincoln 40E Colwick  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61835 40A Lincoln 40E Colwick  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61939 40A Lincoln 40E Colwick  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61949 40A Lincoln 40E Colwick  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61951 40A Lincoln 40E Colwick  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61953 32A Norwich Thorpe 40E Colwick  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61957 32A Norwich Thorpe 40E Colwick  
17/12/1960 Reallocation 61977 40A Lincoln 40E Colwick  
20/12/1960 Condemned 61924 STM St Margarets   COND  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 61818 52H Tyne Dock 51L Thornaby  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 61844 52B Heaton 51L Thornaby  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 61845 31B March 40E Colwick  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 61860 MAR March 40E Colwick  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 61866 40B Immingham 40A Lincoln  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 61944 LIN Lincoln 40B Immingham  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 61950 40B Immingham 40E Colwick  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 61974 38A Colwick 40B Immingham  
24/12/1960 Reallocation 61986 52H Tyne Dock 51L Thornaby  
31/12/1960 Reallocation 61884 52H Tyne Dock 52B Heaton  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 61970 32A Norwich Thorpe 40E Colwick  
07/01/1961 Reallocation 61971 32A Norwich Thorpe 40E Colwick  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 61861 31B March 40E Colwick  
14/01/1961 Reallocation 61972 NWE New England 40E Colwick  
21/01/1961 Reallocation 61884 52B Heaton 52H Tyne Dock  
21/01/1961 Reallocation 61906 HTN Heaton 52H Tyne Dock  
20/03/1961 Condemned 61828 40A Lincoln   COND  
20/03/1961 Condemned 61971 40E Colwick   COND  
01/04/1961 Reallocation 61845 40E Colwick 40A Lincoln  
03/04/1961 Condemned 61967 41A Sheffield Darnall   COND  
17/04/1961 Condemned 61849 31A Cambridge   COND  
26/04/1961 Condemned 61858 CAR Carlisle Canal   COND  
22/05/1961 Condemned 61874 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 61850 36A Doncaster   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 61865 2F Woodford Halse   COND  
05/06/1961 Condemned 61844 51L Thornaby   COND  
05/06/1961 Condemned 61904 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 61818 51L Thornaby 50B Hull Dairycoates  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 61853 56B Ardsley 56F Low Moor  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 61975 56B Ardsley 56F Low Moor  
17/06/1961 Reallocation 61986 51L Thornaby 50B Hull Dairycoates  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 61811 41H Staveley (G.C.) 41J Langwith Junction  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 61908 41H Staveley (G.C.) 41F Mexborough  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 61958 41H Staveley (G.C.) 41J Langwith Junction  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 61976 41H Staveley (G.C.) 41J Langwith Junction  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 61981 41H Staveley (G.C.) 41F Mexborough  
24/06/1961 Reallocation 61989 41H Staveley (G.C.) 41F Mexborough  
29/06/1961 Condemned 61919 40A Lincoln   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 61941 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/07/1961 Condemned 61902 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
05/07/1961 Condemned 61824 38E Woodford Halse   COND  
07/07/1961 Condemned 61964 36A Doncaster   COND  
13/07/1961 Condemned 61803 36A Doncaster   COND  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 61820 41F Mexborough 41C Sheffield Millhouses  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 61822 41F Mexborough 41C Sheffield Millhouses  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 61891 IMM Immingham 40A Lincoln  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 61950 40E Colwick 40B Immingham  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 61960 LIN Lincoln 40B Immingham  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 61966 40B Immingham 40E Colwick  
17/07/1961 Condemned 61927 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
18/07/1961 Condemned 61852 38A Colwick   COND  
22/07/1961 Reallocation 61906 52H Tyne Dock 50B Hull Dairycoates  
22/07/1961 Reallocation 61989 41F Mexborough 41C Sheffield Millhouses  
24/07/1961 Condemned 61925 36A Doncaster   COND  
25/07/1961 Condemned 61921 31B March   COND  
29/07/1961 Reallocation 61959 41F Mexborough 41C Sheffield Millhouses  
05/08/1961 Reallocation 61884 52H Tyne Dock 50B Hull Dairycoates  
05/08/1961 Reallocation 61987 52H Tyne Dock 50B Hull Dairycoates  
17/08/1961 Condemned 61978 35A New England   COND  
19/08/1961 Reallocation 61951 40E Colwick 36A Doncaster  
19/08/1961 Reallocation 61970 40E Colwick 36A Doncaster  
19/08/1961 Reallocation 61972 40E Colwick 36A Doncaster  
21/08/1961 Condemned 61842 38E Woodford Halse   COND  
04/09/1961 Condemned 61975 56F Low Moor   COND  
12/09/1961 Condemned 61891 40A Lincoln   COND  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61853 56F Low Moor 56B Ardsley  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61854 52D Tweedmouth 50B Hull Dairycoates  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61917 52D Tweedmouth 56B Ardsley  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61934 52D Tweedmouth 56B Ardsley  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61952 52D Tweedmouth 50B Hull Dairycoates  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61958 41J Langwith Junction 41F Mexborough  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61959 41C Sheffield Millhouses 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61976 41J Langwith Junction 41A Sheffield Darnall  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61984 52D Tweedmouth 56B Ardsley  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 61989 41C Sheffield Millhouses 41H Staveley (G.C.)  
18/09/1961 Condemned 61920 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
20/09/1961 Condemned 61833 38A Colwick   COND  
23/09/1961 Reallocation 61810 40E Colwick 34E New England  
23/09/1961 Reallocation 61835 40E Colwick 34E New England  
23/09/1961 Reallocation 61861 40E Colwick 34E New England  
23/09/1961 Reallocation 61914 40B Immingham 40E Colwick  
23/09/1961 Reallocation 61949 40E Colwick 36A Doncaster  
23/09/1961 Reallocation 61953 40E Colwick 36A Doncaster  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61808 40E Colwick   COND  
25/09/1961 Condemned 61888 38A Colwick   COND  
02/10/1961 Condemned 61961 36A Doncaster   COND  
14/10/1961 Reallocation 61834 31A Cambridge 31B March  
14/10/1961 Reallocation 61930 52D Tweedmouth 52H Tyne Dock  
14/10/1961 Reallocation 61962 52D Tweedmouth 52H Tyne Dock  
14/10/1961 Reallocation 61969 52D Tweedmouth 52H Tyne Dock  
16/10/1961 Condemned 61979 35A New England   COND  
19/10/1961 Condemned 61866 40A Lincoln   COND  
23/10/1961 Condemned 61968 STM St Margarets   COND  
28/10/1961 Reallocation 61912 IMM Immingham 40A Lincoln  
30/10/1961 Condemned 61892 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
30/10/1961 Condemned 61894 40E Colwick   COND  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 61825 41A Sheffield Darnall 34E New England  
04/11/1961 Reallocation 61877 40B Immingham 40E Colwick  
13/11/1961 Condemned 61959 41H Staveley (G.C.)   COND  
16/11/1961 Condemned 61860 40E Colwick   COND  
23/11/1961 Condemned 61903 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
25/11/1961 Condemned 61851 2F Woodford Halse   COND  
25/11/1961 Condemned 61936 CAR Carlisle Canal   COND  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 61801 31A Cambridge 31B March  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 61817 31A Cambridge 31B March  
02/12/1961 Reallocation 61880 31A Cambridge 31B March  
27/12/1961 Condemned 61814 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
27/12/1961 Condemned 61901 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
29/12/1961 Condemned 61938 41A Sheffield Darnall   COND  
04/01/1962 Condemned 61976 41A Sheffield Darnall   COND  
06/01/1962 Reallocation 61820 41C Sheffield Millhouses 41D Canklow  
06/01/1962 Reallocation 61822 41C Sheffield Millhouses 41D Canklow  
09/01/1962 Condemned 61839 36A Doncaster   COND  
12/01/1962 Condemned 61861 34E New England   COND  
16/01/1962 Condemned 61862 31B March   COND  
19/01/1962 Condemned 61908 41F Mexborough   COND  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 61807 40A Lincoln 40B Immingham  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 61889 40E Colwick 40B Immingham  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 61905 CLK Colwick 40E Colwick  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 61930 52H Tyne Dock 50B Hull Dairycoates  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 61939 40E Colwick 40B Immingham  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 61944 40B Immingham 40E Colwick  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 61950 40B Immingham 40A Lincoln  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 61962 52H Tyne Dock 50B Hull Dairycoates  
20/01/1962 Reallocation 61969 52H Tyne Dock 50B Hull Dairycoates  
12/02/1962 Condemned 61932 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/02/1962 Condemned 61913 2F Woodford Halse   COND  
19/02/1962 Condemned 61966 40E Colwick   COND  
26/02/1962 Condemned 61945 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
28/02/1962 Condemned 61829 36A Doncaster   COND  
02/03/1962 Condemned 61887 36A Doncaster   COND  
03/03/1962 Condemned 61809 38E Woodford Halse   COND  
05/03/1962 Condemned 61818 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
14/03/1962 Condemned 61953 36A Doncaster   COND  
19/03/1962 Condemned 61987 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
28/03/1962 Condemned 61918 31B March   COND  
28/03/1962 Condemned 61948 MAR March   COND  
31/03/1962 Condemned 61804 38E Woodford Halse   COND  
31/03/1962 Condemned 61841 38E Woodford Halse   COND  
09/04/1962 Condemned 61813 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
10/04/1962 Condemned 61926 40A Lincoln   COND  
10/04/1962 Condemned 61949 36A Doncaster   COND  
17/04/1962 Condemned 61801 31B March   COND  
21/04/1962 Reallocation 61835 34E New England 34E New England  
21/04/1962 Reallocation 61912 40A Lincoln 34A Kings Cross  
27/04/1962 Condemned 61837 38A Colwick   COND  
30/04/1962 Condemned 61923 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
04/05/1962 Condemned 61940 36A Doncaster   COND  
07/05/1962 Condemned 61922 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
08/05/1962 Condemned 61873 38A Colwick   COND  
10/05/1962 Condemned 61868 36A Doncaster   COND  
14/05/1962 Condemned 61896 38A Colwick   COND  
15/05/1962 Condemned 61834 31B March   COND  
28/05/1962 Condemned 61986 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
31/05/1962 Condemned 61816 41A Sheffield Darnall   COND  
31/05/1962 Condemned 61958 41F Mexborough   COND  
09/06/1962 Reallocation 61811 41J Langwith Junction 40E Colwick  
09/06/1962 Reallocation 61820 41D Canklow 40E Colwick  
09/06/1962 Reallocation 61822 41D Canklow 40E Colwick  
09/06/1962 Reallocation 61826 41H Staveley (G.C.) 40E Colwick  
09/06/1962 Reallocation 61973 41H Staveley (G.C.) 40E Colwick  
09/06/1962 Reallocation 61981 41F Mexborough 40E Colwick  
14/06/1962 Condemned 61946 NWE New England   COND  
19/06/1962 Condemned 61989 41H Staveley (G.C.)   COND  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 61811 40E Colwick 40A Lincoln  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 61820 40E Colwick 40A Lincoln  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 61822 40E Colwick 40A Lincoln  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 61973 40E Colwick 40A Lincoln  
23/06/1962 Reallocation 61981 40E Colwick 40A Lincoln  
02/07/1962 Condemned 61974 40B Immingham   COND  
04/07/1962 Condemned 61929 31B March   COND  
07/07/1962 Reallocation 61905 40E Colwick 40A Lincoln  
12/07/1962 Condemned 61870 38A Colwick   COND  
13/07/1962 Condemned 61800 36A Doncaster   COND  
18/07/1962 Condemned 61895 36A Doncaster   COND  
21/07/1962 Condemned 61910 2F Woodford Halse   COND  
23/07/1962 Condemned 61884 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
23/07/1962 Condemned 61935 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
24/07/1962 Condemned 61877 40E Colwick   COND  
01/08/1962 Condemned 61947 38A Colwick   COND  
15/08/1962 Condemned 61810 34E New England   COND  
23/08/1962 Condemned 61914 40E Colwick   COND  
09/1962 Condemned 61943 40E Colwick   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61805 35A New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61812 36A Doncaster   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61817 31B March   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61821 CLK Colwick   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61825 34E New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61826 40E Colwick   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61827 40E Colwick   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61831 40E Colwick   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61840 31B March   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61845 40A Lincoln   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61848 40A Lincoln   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61864 35A New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61880 31B March   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61886 MAR March   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61890 31B March   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61907 40E Colwick   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61912 34A Kings Cross   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61915 31B March   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61942 31B March   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61944 40E Colwick   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61954 31B March   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61956 40B Immingham   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61957 40E Colwick   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61960 40B Immingham   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61963 31B March   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61972 36A Doncaster   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61977 40E Colwick   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 61982 38A Colwick   COND  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 61830 35A New England 36A Doncaster  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 61950 40A Lincoln 36A Doncaster  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 61973 40A Lincoln 36A Doncaster  
22/09/1962 Reallocation 61981 40A Lincoln 36A Doncaster  
29/10/1962 Condemned 61854 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
02/11/1962 Condemned 61984 56B Ardsley   COND  
03/11/1962 Condemned 61832 2F Woodford Halse   COND  
03/11/1962 Condemned 61843 38E Woodford Halse   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61807 40B Immingham   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61811 40A Lincoln   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61820 40A Lincoln   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61822 40A Lincoln   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61830 36A Doncaster   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61859 LIN Lincoln   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61867 36A Doncaster   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61889 40B Immingham   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61905 40A Lincoln   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61933 STM St Margarets   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61939 40B Immingham   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61950 36A Doncaster   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61951 36A Doncaster   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61970 36A Doncaster   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61973 36A Doncaster   COND  
04/11/1962 Condemned 61981 36A Doncaster   COND  
26/11/1962 Condemned 61917 56B Ardsley   COND  
26/11/1962 Condemned 61934 56B Ardsley   COND  
03/12/1962 Condemned 61857 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/12/1962 Condemned 61869 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/12/1962 Condemned 61871 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/12/1962 Condemned 61872 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/12/1962 Condemned 61883 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
03/12/1962 Condemned 61965 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
06/12/1962 Condemned 61952 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
10/12/1962 Condemned 61847 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
10/12/1962 Condemned 61875 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 61819 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 61846 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 61856 56B Ardsley   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 61893 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 61897 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 61906 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 61930 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 61969 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
17/12/1962 Condemned 61980 56B Ardsley   COND  
18/12/1962 Condemned 61853 56B Ardsley   COND  
18/12/1962 Condemned 61899 53A Hull Dairycoates   COND  
19/12/1962 Condemned 61962 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
21/12/1962 Condemned 61985 50B Hull Dairycoates   COND  
16/09/1963 Condemned 61835 34E New England   COND