K3 |
1000
|
4000
|
1800
|
61800
|
03/1920 |
13/07/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
07/1932 |
K3 |
1001
|
4001
|
1801
|
61801
|
06/1920 |
17/04/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
03/1933 |
K3 |
1002
|
4002
|
1802
|
61802
|
09/1920 |
07/03/1960 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
10/1933 |
K3 |
1003
|
4003
|
1803
|
61803
|
10/1920 |
13/07/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
05/1933 |
K3 |
1004
|
4004
|
1804
|
61804
|
12/1920 |
31/03/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
10/1929 |
K3 |
1005
|
4005
|
1805
|
61805
|
12/1920 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1930 |
K3 |
1006
|
4006
|
1806
|
61806
|
04/1921 |
07/03/1960 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
02/1934 |
K3 |
1007
|
4007
|
1807
|
61807
|
05/1921 |
04/11/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
08/1931 |
K3 |
1008
|
4008
|
1808
|
61808
|
07/1921 |
25/09/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
12/1931 |
K3 |
1009
|
4009
|
1809
|
61809
|
08/1921 |
03/03/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
07/1933 |
K3 |
|
17
|
1810
|
61810
|
08/1924 |
15/08/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
03/1934 |
K3 |
|
28
|
1811
|
61811
|
08/1924 |
04/11/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1935 |
K3 |
|
32
|
1812
|
61812
|
08/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1932 |
K3 |
|
33
|
1813
|
61813
|
09/1924 |
09/04/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
12/1934 |
K3 |
|
36
|
1814
|
61814
|
09/1924 |
27/12/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
08/1935 |
K3 |
|
38
|
1815
|
61815
|
10/1924 |
11/07/1960 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
10/1934 |
K3 |
|
39
|
1816
|
61816
|
10/1924 |
31/05/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
11/1934 |
K3 |
|
46
|
1817
|
61817
|
10/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
04/1936 |
K3 |
|
52
|
1818
|
61818
|
10/1924 |
05/03/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
11/1934 |
K3 |
|
53
|
1819
|
61819
|
10/1924 |
17/12/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
09/1934 |
K3 |
|
58
|
1820
|
61820
|
10/1924 |
04/11/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1931 |
K3 |
|
69
|
1821
|
61821
|
10/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
02/1932 |
K3 |
|
73
|
1822
|
61822
|
10/1924 |
04/11/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
03/1932 |
K3 |
|
75
|
1823
|
61823
|
11/1924 |
29/12/1959 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1934 |
K3 |
|
80
|
1824
|
61824
|
11/1924 |
05/07/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1932 |
K3 |
|
91
|
1825
|
61825
|
11/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
02/1931 |
K3 |
|
92
|
1826
|
61826
|
11/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
12/1932 |
K3 |
|
109
|
1827
|
61827
|
11/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1930 |
K3 |
|
111
|
1828
|
61828
|
11/1924 |
20/03/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
11/1931 |
K3 |
|
112
|
1829
|
61829
|
12/1924 |
28/02/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
02/1933 |
K3 |
|
113
|
1830
|
61830
|
12/1924 |
04/11/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
12/1933 |
K3 |
|
114
|
1831
|
61831
|
12/1924 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1931 |
K3 |
|
116
|
1832
|
61832
|
12/1924 |
03/11/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1933 |
K3 |
|
118
|
1833
|
61833
|
12/1924 |
20/09/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
11/1933 |
K3 |
|
120
|
1834
|
61834
|
12/1924 |
15/05/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
12/1930 |
K3 |
|
121
|
1835
|
61835
|
01/1925 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
04/1933 |
K3 |
|
125
|
1836
|
61836
|
01/1925 |
08/02/1960 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
04/1931 |
K3 |
|
126
|
1837
|
61837
|
01/1925 |
27/04/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
07/1932 |
K3 |
|
127
|
1838
|
61838
|
01/1925 |
21/03/1960 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
07/1933 |
K3 |
|
134
|
1839
|
61839
|
01/1925 |
09/01/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
10/1928 |
K3 |
|
135
|
1840
|
61840
|
02/1925 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1931 |
K3 |
|
140
|
1841
|
61841
|
02/1925 |
31/03/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
06/1931 |
K3 |
|
141
|
1842
|
61842
|
02/1925 |
21/08/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
05/1934 |
K3 |
|
143
|
1843
|
61843
|
02/1925 |
03/11/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
03/1930 |
K3 |
|
146
|
1844
|
61844
|
02/1925 |
05/06/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
07/1932 |
K3 |
|
153
|
1845
|
61845
|
02/1925 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
11/1932 |
K3 |
|
156
|
1846
|
61846
|
02/1925 |
17/12/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
06/1932 |
K3 |
|
158
|
1847
|
61847
|
02/1925 |
10/12/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
08/1931 |
K3 |
|
159
|
1848
|
61848
|
03/1925 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
11/1931 |
K3 |
|
163
|
1849
|
61849
|
03/1925 |
17/04/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
03/1932 |
K3 |
|
167
|
1850
|
61850
|
03/1925 |
30/06/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
05/1934 |
K3 |
|
170
|
1851
|
61851
|
03/1925 |
25/11/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
02/1933 |
K3 |
|
178
|
1852
|
61852
|
03/1925 |
18/07/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
12/1933 |
K3 |
|
180
|
1853
|
61853
|
03/1925 |
18/12/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
07/1931 |
K3 |
|
184
|
1854
|
61854
|
03/1925 |
29/10/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
06/1931 |
K3 |
|
186
|
1855
|
61855
|
03/1925 |
06/07/1959 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
07/1933 |
K3 |
|
188
|
1856
|
61856
|
03/1925 |
17/12/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
01/1932 |
K3 |
|
191
|
1857
|
61857
|
04/1925 |
03/12/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
07/1932 |
K3 |
|
195
|
1858
|
61858
|
04/1925 |
26/04/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
02/1933 |
K3 |
|
200
|
1859
|
61859
|
04/1925 |
04/11/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
11/1932 |
K3 |
|
203
|
1860
|
61860
|
08/1925 |
16/11/1961 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
08/1931 |
K3 |
|
202
|
1861
|
61861
|
08/1925 |
12/01/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
11/1932 |
K3 |
|
204
|
1862
|
61862
|
08/1925 |
16/01/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
06/1932 |
K3 |
|
206
|
1863
|
61863
|
09/1925 |
06/06/1960 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
05/1933 |
K3 |
|
207
|
1864
|
61864
|
09/1925 |
16/09/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
04/1932 |
K3 |
|
208
|
1865
|
61865
|
09/1925 |
06/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
04/1932 |
K3 |
|
227
|
1866
|
61866
|
10/1925 |
19/10/1961 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
05/1931 |
K3 |
|
228
|
1867
|
61867
|
10/1925 |
04/11/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
05/1931 |
K3 |
|
229
|
1868
|
61868
|
10/1925 |
10/05/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
02/1932 |
K3 |
|
231
|
1869
|
61869
|
12/1925 |
03/12/1962 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
11/1931 |
K3 |
|
1300
|
1870
|
61870
|
04/1929 |
12/07/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1932 |
K3 |
|
1312
|
1871
|
61871
|
05/1929 |
03/12/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1932 |
K3 |
|
1318
|
1872
|
61872
|
06/1929 |
03/12/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1933 |
K3 |
|
1331
|
1873
|
61873
|
06/1929 |
08/05/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1931 |
K3 |
|
1345
|
1874
|
61874
|
07/1929 |
22/05/1961 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1932 |
K3 |
|
1364
|
1875
|
61875
|
07/1929 |
10/12/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1931 |
K3 |
|
1365
|
1876
|
61876
|
07/1929 |
17/09/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1933 |
K3 |
|
1367
|
1877
|
61877
|
08/1929 |
24/07/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1933 |
K3 |
|
1368
|
1878
|
61878
|
08/1929 |
06/08/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1932 |
K3 |
|
1386
|
1879
|
61879
|
09/1929 |
16/06/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1932 |
K3 |
|
1387
|
1880
|
61880
|
10/1929 |
16/09/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1932 |
K3 |
|
1388
|
1881
|
61881
|
10/1929 |
21/04/1960 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1932 |
K3 |
|
1389
|
1882
|
61882
|
10/1929 |
28/05/1960 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1932 |
K3 |
|
1391
|
1883
|
61883
|
10/1929 |
03/12/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1931 |
K3 |
|
1392
|
1884
|
61884
|
11/1929 |
23/07/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1931 |
K3 |
|
1394
|
1885
|
61885
|
11/1929 |
03/11/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1932 |
K3 |
|
1395
|
1886
|
61886
|
11/1929 |
16/09/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1932 |
K3 |
|
1396
|
1887
|
61887
|
11/1929 |
02/03/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1932 |
K3 |
|
1397
|
1888
|
61888
|
12/1929 |
25/09/1961 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
03/1932 |
K3 |
|
1398
|
1889
|
61889
|
12/1929 |
04/11/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1932 |