Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 606 Today
» 1269 Yesterday
» 8945 Week
» 6053 Month
» 112999 Year
» 1334564 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "K4" Class 2-6-0


LNER LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
3441 1993 61993 01/1937 02/10/1961 Thornton Junction 24.75 Cut Halbeath Wagon Works (Dunfermline) 1962
3442 1994 61994 07/1938 18/12/1961 Thornton Junction 23.42 Prs Preserved
3443 1995 61995 12/1938 02/10/1961 Thornton Junction 22.83 Cut Halbeath Wagon Works (Dunfermline) 1962
3444 1996 61996 12/1938 02/10/1961 Thornton Junction 22.83
3445 1997 61997 01/1939 12/06/1961 01/12/1945
to K1
Fort William 22.42
3446 1998 61998 01/1939 02/10/1961 Thornton Junction 22.75