GNR/LNER Gresley "K1" Class 2-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/1912 | To Service | 1630 | NEW | CLK | Colwick | ||
02/1913 | To Service | 1631 | NEW | CLK | Colwick | ||
02/1913 | To Service | 1632 | NEW | KX | Kings Cross | ||
02/1913 | To Service | 1633 | NEW | CLK | Colwick | ||
02/1913 | To Service | 1634 | NEW | ARD | Ardsley | ||
03/1913 | To Service | 1635 | NEW | CLK | Colwick | ||
03/1913 | To Service | 1636 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
03/1913 | To Service | 1637 | NEW | NWE | New England | ||
04/1913 | To Service | 1638 | NEW | CLK | Colwick | ||
04/1913 | To Service | 1639 | NEW | CLK | Colwick | ||
25/03/1923 | Reallocation | 1632 | KX | Kings Cross | DON | Doncaster | |
25/03/1923 | Reallocation | 1637 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
12/07/1923 | Reallocation | 1636 | NWE | New England | STR | Stratford | |
09/1923 | Reallocation | 1639 | CLK | Colwick | STR | Stratford | |
05/1924 | Reallocation | 4630 | CLK | Colwick | MAR | March | |
05/1924 | Reallocation | 1632 | DON | Doncaster | STR | Stratford | |
05/1924 | Reallocation | 1633 | CLK | Colwick | STR | Stratford | |
05/1924 | Reallocation | 1634 | ARD | Ardsley | STR | Stratford | |
22/06/1925 | Reallocation | 4634 | STR | Stratford | CLK | Colwick | |
01/07/1925 | Reallocation | 4633 | STR | Stratford | CLK | Colwick | |
22/07/1925 | Reallocation | 4637 | DON | Doncaster | CLK | Colwick | |
30/07/1925 | Reallocation | 4630 | MAR | March | CLK | Colwick | |
07/08/1925 | Reallocation | 4636 | STR | Stratford | CLK | Colwick | |
15/08/1925 | Reallocation | 1639 | STR | Stratford | CLK | Colwick | |
17/04/1926 | Reallocation | 4632 | STR | Stratford | CLK | Colwick | |
11/06/1927 | Reallocation | 4630 | CLK | Colwick | CAM | Cambridge | |
23/08/1927 | Reallocation | 4634 | CLK | Colwick | NWE | New England | |
30/09/1927 | Reallocation | 4630 | CAM | Cambridge | NWE | New England | |
10/05/1929 | Reallocation | 4634 | NWE | New England | DON | Doncaster | |
11/05/1929 | Reallocation | 4637 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
16/05/1929 | Reallocation | 4634 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
16/05/1929 | Reallocation | 4637 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
29/07/1930 | Reallocation | 4636 | CLK | Colwick | MEX | Mexborough | |
04/08/1930 | Reallocation | 4639 | CLK | Colwick | NWE | New England | |
13/08/1930 | Reallocation | 4632 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
09/10/1930 | Reallocation | 4632 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
09/10/1930 | Reallocation | 4639 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
30/12/1930 | Reallocation | 4630 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
31/12/1930 | Reallocation | 4639 | GRA | Grantham | NWE | New England | |
14/01/1931 | Reallocation | 4633 | CLK | Colwick | MEX | Mexborough | |
14/07/1931 | Reallocation | 4639 | NWE | New England | ARD | Ardsley | |
17/08/1931 | Reallocation | 4639 | ARD | Ardsley | NWE | New England | |
14/06/1932 | Reallocation | 4639 | NWE | New England | GRA | Grantham | |
01/11/1933 | Reallocation | 4638 | CLK | Colwick | DON | Doncaster | |
27/04/1935 | Reallocation | 4638 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
27/05/1936 | Reallocation | 4637 | MEX | Mexborough | DON | Doncaster |