Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "L3" Class 2-6-4T


Class GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
L3 272 5272 9050   69050 12/1914 IMM
SHF
RET
MEX
SHF
MEX
NEA
MEX
WFD
W
Immingham
Sheffield Neepsend
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Mexborough
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Neasden
Mexborough
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
12/1914
02/10/1929
06/10/1929
09/03/1933
21/11/1942
20/02/1944
21/07/1946
30/04/1947
17/08/1947
12/03/1955
12/03/1955
L3 273 5273 9051   69051 12/1914 GOR
ANN
IMM
KEA
IMM
FRO
MEX
SHF
13D
SHF
MEX
FRO
W
Gorton
Annesley
Immingham
Keadby
Immingham
Frodingham
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Northwich
Sheffield Darnall
Mexborough
Frodingham
Withdrawn
12/1914
08/11/1919
10/03/1923
24/06/1929
30/11/1929
15/09/1932
16/11/1944
08/09/1946
16/02/1947
02/04/1947
07/05/1947
22/02/1948
14/05/1951
14/05/1951
L3 274 5274 9052   69052 02/1915 GOR
ANN
IMM
NEA
WFD
MEX
WFD
13D
GOR
13D
W
Gorton
Annesley
Immingham
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Mexborough
Woodford Halse
Northwich
Gorton
Northwich
Withdrawn
02/1915
08/11/1919
10/03/1923
31/01/1925
28/03/1929
29/06/1929
06/08/1942
19/01/1943
09/12/1945
12/05/1946
09/08/1954
09/08/1954
L3 275 5275 9053 9053 69053 03/1915 GOR
MEX
WFD
NEA
W
Gorton
Mexborough
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Withdrawn
03/1915
27/04/1940
05/08/1942
31/01/1943
17/07/1950
17/07/1950
L3 276 5276 9054   69054 04/1915 GOR
NEA
IMM
MAR
IMM
NEA
WFD
NEA
W
Gorton
Neasden
Immingham
March
Immingham
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Withdrawn
04/1915
20/10/1922
10/03/1923
17/08/1929
16/03/1931
18/01/1941
02/02/1941
27/09/1941
29/08/1949
29/08/1949
L3 336 5336 9055   69055 04/1915 GOR
NEA
IMM
NEA
WFD
NEA
W
Gorton
Neasden
Immingham
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Withdrawn
04/1915
14/10/1921
24/06/1931
26/10/1939
02/02/1941
27/09/1941
23/07/1951
23/07/1951
L3 337 5337 9056 9056 69056 05/1915 GOR
ANN
IMM
WFD
MEX
NEA
W
Gorton
Annesley
Immingham
Woodford Halse
Mexborough
Neasden
Withdrawn
05/1915
08/11/1919
10/03/1923
18/02/1943
21/06/1943
25/08/1946
22/01/1951
22/01/1951
L3 338 5338 9057   69057 06/1915 WFD
NEA
MEX
SHF
MEX
SHF
FRO
W
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Mexborough
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Frodingham
Withdrawn
06/1915
09/08/1925
01/07/1929
21/11/1942
20/02/1944
28/08/1946
09/03/1947
10/10/1949
10/10/1949
L3 339 5339 9058   69058 11/1915 NEA
SHF
FRO
W
Neasden
Sheffield Darnall
Frodingham
Withdrawn
11/1915
20/10/1946
16/02/1947
29/08/1949
29/08/1949
L3 340 5340 9059   69059 12/1915 LNG
ANN
MEX
NEA
SHF
NEA
WFD
NEA
MEX
NEA
W
Langwith Junction
Annesley
Mexborough
Neasden
Sheffield Neepsend
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Mexborough
Neasden
Withdrawn
12/1915
10/03/1923
18/02/1929
15/08/1933
16/12/1937
15/01/1938
02/02/1941
27/09/1941
28/10/1947
11/04/1948
29/08/1949
29/08/1949
L3 341 5341 9060   69060 06/1916 NEA
WFD
NEA
MEX
NEA
WFD
NEA
34A
36C
W
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Mexborough
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Kings Cross
Frodingham
Withdrawn
06/1916
28/03/1929
19/02/1931
07/09/1933
18/11/1939
02/02/1941
27/09/1941
31/05/1953
21/06/1953
07/06/1954
07/06/1954
L3 342 5342 9061   69061 06/1916 NEA
WFD
MAR
WFD
NEA
WFD
NEA
W
Neasden
Woodford Halse
March
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Withdrawn
06/1916
09/08/1925
11/05/1929
08/03/1931
17/03/1931
02/02/1941
27/09/1941
09/02/1953
09/02/1953
L3 343 5343 9062   69062 06/1916 GOR
ANN
MEX
WFD
13D
GOR
13D
W
Gorton
Annesley
Mexborough
Woodford Halse
Northwich
Gorton
Northwich
Withdrawn
06/1916
12/03/1920
09/02/1929
04/08/1942
22/01/1943
02/02/1947
02/04/1947
14/05/1951
14/05/1951
L3 344 5344 9063     08/1916 GOR
WFD
MAR
GOR
TFD
MEX
DON
NEA
WFD
NEA
WFD
NEA
WFD
MEX
SHF
W
Gorton
Woodford Halse
March
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Mexborough
Doncaster
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Withdrawn
08/1916
08/11/1919
11/05/1929
01/08/1931
18/10/1932
27/12/1933
10/02/1934
29/12/1935
02/02/1941
27/09/1941
04/08/1942
31/01/1943
15/02/1943
21/06/1943
10/09/1946
25/07/1947
25/07/1947
L3 345 5345 9064   69064 01/1917 GOR
ANN
MEX
MEX
SHF
MEX
SHF
NEA
NWE
34E
34A
36C
W
Gorton
Annesley
Mexborough
Mexborough
Sheffield Neepsend
Mexborough
Sheffield Darnall
Neasden
New England
Neasden
Kings Cross
Frodingham
Withdrawn
01/1917
07/01/1920
23/02/1929
12/03/1929
21/11/1942
20/02/1944
12/10/1946
20/10/1946
09/03/1947
10/12/1950
31/05/1953
21/06/1953
24/01/1955
24/01/1955
L3 366 5366 9065 9065 69065 02/1917 LNG
ANN
MEX
NEA
MEX
NEA
34A
36C
W
Langwith Junction
Annesley
Mexborough
Neasden
Mexborough
Neasden
Kings Cross
Frodingham
Withdrawn
02/1917
02/02/1923
23/02/1929
25/08/1946
22/04/1947
11/04/1948
31/05/1953
21/06/1953
10/05/1954
10/05/1954
L3 367 5367 9066   69066 03/1917 GOR
NEA
IMM
KEA
IMM
MEX
WFD
MEX
NEA
MEX
FRO
W
Gorton
Neasden
Immingham
Keadby
Immingham
Mexborough
Woodford Halse
Mexborough
Neasden
Mexborough
Frodingham
Withdrawn
03/1917
20/10/1922
10/03/1923
24/06/1929
21/11/1929
29/10/1937
07/08/1942
21/06/1943
25/08/1946
11/08/1947
22/02/1948
17/04/1950
17/04/1950
L3 368 5368 9067   69067 03/1917 GOR
WFD
NEA
WFD
NEA
MAR
GOR
TFD
MEX
DON
MEX
IMM
GOR
MEX
NEA
W
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
March
Gorton
Trafford Park (LNER)
Mexborough
Doncaster
Mexborough
Immingham
Gorton
Mexborough
Neasden
Withdrawn
03/1917
08/11/1919
01/08/1926
25/03/1929
29/06/1929
24/09/1929
03/10/1931
18/10/1932
27/12/1933
27/01/1934
30/05/1934
24/01/1936
13/03/1943
11/04/1944
21/07/1946
19/02/1951
19/02/1951
L3 369 5369 9068 9068 69068 04/1917 GOR
WFD
NEA
WFD
NEA
IMM
FRO
NEA
W
Gorton
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Neasden
Immingham
Frodingham
Neasden
Withdrawn
04/1917
16/05/1920
30/01/1925
25/03/1929
29/06/1929
05/11/1929
20/09/1932
04/10/1941
05/06/1950
05/06/1950
L3 370 5370 9069   69069 1917 GOR
ANN
GOR
ANN
MEX
IMM
NEA
WFD
W
Gorton
Annesley
Gorton
Annesley
Mexborough
Immingham
Neasden
Woodford Halse
Withdrawn
1917
09/04/1920
02/11/1927
14/04/1928
23/02/1929
11/11/1937
20/01/1941
14/08/1947
07/07/1955
07/07/1955