Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "L3" Class 2-6-4T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
12/1914 To Service 272   NEW IMM Immingham  
12/1914 To Service 273   NEW GOR Gorton  
02/1915 To Service 274   NEW GOR Gorton  
03/1915 To Service 275   NEW GOR Gorton  
04/1915 To Service 276   NEW GOR Gorton  
04/1915 To Service 336   NEW GOR Gorton  
05/1915 To Service 337   NEW GOR Gorton  
06/1915 To Service 338   NEW WFD Woodford Halse  
11/1915 To Service 339   NEW NEA Neasden  
12/1915 To Service 340   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
06/1916 To Service 341   NEW NEA Neasden  
06/1916 To Service 342   NEW NEA Neasden  
06/1916 To Service 343   NEW GOR Gorton  
08/1916 To Service 344   NEW GOR Gorton  
1917 To Service 370   NEW GOR Gorton  
01/1917 To Service 345   NEW GOR Gorton  
02/1917 To Service 366   NEW LNG Langwith Junction  
03/1917 To Service 367   NEW GOR Gorton  
03/1917 To Service 368   NEW GOR Gorton  
04/1917 To Service 369   NEW GOR Gorton  
08/11/1919 Reallocation 273 GOR Gorton ANN Annesley  
08/11/1919 Reallocation 274 GOR Gorton ANN Annesley  
08/11/1919 Reallocation 337 GOR Gorton ANN Annesley  
08/11/1919 Reallocation 344 GOR Gorton WFD Woodford Halse  
08/11/1919 Reallocation 368 GOR Gorton WFD Woodford Halse  
07/01/1920 Reallocation 345 GOR Gorton ANN Annesley  
12/03/1920 Reallocation 343 GOR Gorton ANN Annesley  
09/04/1920 Reallocation 370 GOR Gorton ANN Annesley  
16/05/1920 Reallocation 369 GOR Gorton WFD Woodford Halse  
14/10/1921 Reallocation 336 GOR Gorton NEA Neasden  
20/10/1922 Reallocation 276 GOR Gorton NEA Neasden  
20/10/1922 Reallocation 367 GOR Gorton NEA Neasden  
02/02/1923 Reallocation 366 LNG Langwith Junction ANN Annesley  
10/03/1923 Reallocation 273 ANN Annesley IMM Immingham  
10/03/1923 Reallocation 274 ANN Annesley IMM Immingham  
10/03/1923 Reallocation 276 NEA Neasden IMM Immingham  
10/03/1923 Reallocation 337 ANN Annesley IMM Immingham  
10/03/1923 Reallocation 340 LNG Langwith Junction ANN Annesley  
10/03/1923 Reallocation 367 NEA Neasden IMM Immingham  
30/01/1925 Reallocation 5369 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
31/01/1925 Reallocation 5274 IMM Immingham NEA Neasden  
09/08/1925 Reallocation 5338 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
09/08/1925 Reallocation 5342 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
01/08/1926 Reallocation 5368 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
02/11/1927 Reallocation 5370 ANN Annesley GOR Gorton  
14/04/1928 Reallocation 5370 GOR Gorton ANN Annesley  
09/02/1929 Reallocation 5343 ANN Annesley MEX Mexborough  
18/02/1929 Reallocation 5340 ANN Annesley MEX Mexborough  
23/02/1929 Reallocation 5345 ANN Annesley MEX Mexborough  
23/02/1929 Reallocation 5366 ANN Annesley MEX Mexborough  
23/02/1929 Reallocation 5370 ANN Annesley MEX Mexborough  
12/03/1929 Reallocation 5345 MEX Mexborough MEX Mexborough  
25/03/1929 Reallocation 5368 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
25/03/1929 Reallocation 5369 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
28/03/1929 Reallocation 5274 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
28/03/1929 Reallocation 5341 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
11/05/1929 Reallocation 5342 WFD Woodford Halse MAR March  
11/05/1929 Reallocation 5344 WFD Woodford Halse MAR March  
24/06/1929 Reallocation 5273 IMM Immingham KEA Keadby  
24/06/1929 Reallocation 5367 IMM Immingham KEA Keadby  
29/06/1929 Reallocation 5274 WFD Woodford Halse MEX Mexborough  
29/06/1929 Reallocation 5368 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
29/06/1929 Reallocation 5369 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
01/07/1929 Reallocation 5338 NEA Neasden MEX Mexborough  
17/08/1929 Reallocation 5276 IMM Immingham MAR March  
24/09/1929 Reallocation 5368 NEA Neasden MAR March  
02/10/1929 Reallocation 5272 IMM Immingham SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
06/10/1929 Reallocation 5272 SHF Sheffield Neepsend RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
05/11/1929 Reallocation 5369 NEA Neasden IMM Immingham  
21/11/1929 Reallocation 5367 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
30/11/1929 Reallocation 5273 KEA Keadby IMM Immingham  
19/02/1931 Reallocation 5341 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
08/03/1931 Reallocation 5342 MAR March WFD Woodford Halse  
16/03/1931 Reallocation 5276 MAR March IMM Immingham  
17/03/1931 Reallocation 5342 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
24/06/1931 Reallocation 5336 NEA Neasden IMM Immingham  
01/08/1931 Reallocation 5344 MAR March GOR Gorton  
03/10/1931 Reallocation 5368 MAR March GOR Gorton  
15/09/1932 Reallocation 5273 IMM Immingham FRO Frodingham  
20/09/1932 Reallocation 5369 IMM Immingham FRO Frodingham  
18/10/1932 Reallocation 5344 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
18/10/1932 Reallocation 5368 GOR Gorton TFD Trafford Park (LNER)  
09/03/1933 Reallocation 5272 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) MEX Mexborough  
15/08/1933 Reallocation 5340 MEX Mexborough NEA Neasden  
07/09/1933 Reallocation 5341 NEA Neasden MEX Mexborough  
27/12/1933 Reallocation 5344 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) MEX Mexborough  
27/12/1933 Reallocation 5368 TFD Trafford Park (LNER) MEX Mexborough  
27/01/1934 Reallocation 5368 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
10/02/1934 Reallocation 5344 MEX Mexborough DON Doncaster  
30/05/1934 Reallocation 5368 DON Doncaster MEX Mexborough  
29/12/1935 Reallocation 5344 DON Doncaster NEA Neasden  
24/01/1936 Reallocation 5368 MEX Mexborough IMM Immingham  
29/10/1937 Reallocation 5367 IMM Immingham MEX Mexborough  
11/11/1937 Reallocation 5370 MEX Mexborough IMM Immingham  
16/12/1937 Reallocation 5340 NEA Neasden SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
15/01/1938 Reallocation 5340 SHF Sheffield Neepsend NEA Neasden  
26/10/1939 Reallocation 5336 IMM Immingham NEA Neasden  
18/11/1939 Reallocation 5341 MEX Mexborough NEA Neasden  
27/04/1940 Reallocation 5275 GOR Gorton MEX Mexborough  
18/01/1941 Reallocation 5276 IMM Immingham NEA Neasden  
20/01/1941 Reallocation 5370 IMM Immingham NEA Neasden  
02/02/1941 Reallocation 5276 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
02/02/1941 Reallocation 5336 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
02/02/1941 Reallocation 5340 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
02/02/1941 Reallocation 5341 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
02/02/1941 Reallocation 5342 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
02/02/1941 Reallocation 5344 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
27/09/1941 Reallocation 5276 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
27/09/1941 Reallocation 5336 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
27/09/1941 Reallocation 5340 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
27/09/1941 Reallocation 5341 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
27/09/1941 Reallocation 5342 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
27/09/1941 Reallocation 5344 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
04/10/1941 Reallocation 5369 FRO Frodingham NEA Neasden  
04/08/1942 Reallocation 5343 MEX Mexborough WFD Woodford Halse  
04/08/1942 Reallocation 5344 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
05/08/1942 Reallocation 5275 MEX Mexborough WFD Woodford Halse  
06/08/1942 Reallocation 5274 MEX Mexborough WFD Woodford Halse  
07/08/1942 Reallocation 5367 MEX Mexborough WFD Woodford Halse  
21/11/1942 Reallocation 5272 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
21/11/1942 Reallocation 5338 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
21/11/1942 Reallocation 5345 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Neepsend  
19/01/1943 Reallocation 5274 WFD Woodford Halse 13D Northwich  
22/01/1943 Reallocation 5343 WFD Woodford Halse 13D Northwich  
31/01/1943 Reallocation 5275 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
31/01/1943 Reallocation 5344 WFD Woodford Halse NEA Neasden  
15/02/1943 Reallocation 5344 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
18/02/1943 Reallocation 5337 IMM Immingham WFD Woodford Halse  
13/03/1943 Reallocation 5368 IMM Immingham GOR Gorton  
21/06/1943 Reallocation 5337 WFD Woodford Halse MEX Mexborough  
21/06/1943 Reallocation 5344 WFD Woodford Halse MEX Mexborough  
21/06/1943 Reallocation 5367 WFD Woodford Halse MEX Mexborough  
20/02/1944 Reallocation 5272 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
20/02/1944 Reallocation 5338 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
20/02/1944 Reallocation 5345 SHF Sheffield Neepsend MEX Mexborough  
11/04/1944 Reallocation 5368 GOR Gorton MEX Mexborough  
16/11/1944 Reallocation 5273 FRO Frodingham MEX Mexborough  
09/12/1945 Reallocation 5274 13D Northwich GOR Gorton  
12/05/1946 Reallocation 5274 GOR Gorton 13D Northwich  
21/07/1946 Reallocation 5272 MEX Mexborough NEA Neasden  
21/07/1946 Reallocation 9067 MEX Mexborough NEA Neasden  
25/08/1946 Reallocation 9056 MEX Mexborough NEA Neasden  
25/08/1946 Reallocation 9065 MEX Mexborough NEA Neasden  
25/08/1946 Reallocation 9066 MEX Mexborough NEA Neasden  
28/08/1946 Reallocation 9057 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Darnall  
08/09/1946 Reallocation 5273 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Darnall  
10/09/1946 Reallocation 9063 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Darnall  
12/10/1946 Reallocation 9064 MEX Mexborough SHF Sheffield Darnall  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 9058 NEA Neasden SHF Sheffield Darnall  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 9064 SHF Sheffield Darnall NEA Neasden  
02/02/1947 Reallocation 9062 13D Northwich GOR Gorton  
16/02/1947 Reallocation 9051 SHF Sheffield Darnall 13D Northwich  
16/02/1947 Reallocation 9058 SHF Sheffield Darnall FRO Frodingham  
09/03/1947 Reallocation 9057 SHF Sheffield Darnall FRO Frodingham  
09/03/1947 Reallocation 9064 NEA Neasden NWE New England  
02/04/1947 Reallocation 9051 13D Northwich SHF Sheffield Darnall  
02/04/1947 Reallocation 9062 GOR Gorton 13D Northwich  
22/04/1947 Reallocation 9065 NEA Neasden MEX Mexborough  
30/04/1947 Reallocation 9050 NEA Neasden MEX Mexborough  
07/05/1947 Reallocation 9051 SHF Sheffield Darnall MEX Mexborough  
25/07/1947 Condemned 9063 SHF Sheffield Darnall   COND  
11/08/1947 Reallocation 9066 NEA Neasden MEX Mexborough  
14/08/1947 Reallocation 9069 NEA Neasden WFD Woodford Halse  
17/08/1947 Reallocation 9050 MEX Mexborough WFD Woodford Halse  
28/10/1947 Reallocation 9059 NEA Neasden MEX Mexborough  
22/02/1948 Reallocation 9051 MEX Mexborough FRO Frodingham  
22/02/1948 Reallocation 9066 MEX Mexborough FRO Frodingham  
11/04/1948 Reallocation 9059 MEX Mexborough NEA Neasden  
11/04/1948 Reallocation 9065 MEX Mexborough NEA Neasden  
29/08/1949 Condemned 69054 NEA Neasden   COND  
29/08/1949 Condemned 69058 FRO Frodingham   COND  
29/08/1949 Condemned 69059 NEA Neasden   COND  
10/10/1949 Condemned 69057 FRO Frodingham   COND  
17/04/1950 Condemned 69066 FRO Frodingham   COND  
05/06/1950 Condemned 69068 NEA Neasden   COND  
17/07/1950 Condemned 69053 NEA Neasden   COND  
10/12/1950 Reallocation 69064 NWE New England 34E Neasden  
22/01/1951 Condemned 69056 NEA Neasden   COND  
19/02/1951 Condemned 69067 NEA Neasden   COND  
14/05/1951 Condemned 69051 FRO Frodingham   COND  
14/05/1951 Condemned 69062 13D Northwich   COND  
23/07/1951 Condemned 69055 NEA Neasden   COND  
09/02/1953 Condemned 69061 NEA Neasden   COND  
31/05/1953 Reallocation 69060 NEA Neasden 34A Kings Cross  
31/05/1953 Reallocation 69064 34E Neasden 34A Kings Cross  
31/05/1953 Reallocation 69065 NEA Neasden 34A Kings Cross  
21/06/1953 Reallocation 69060 34A Kings Cross 36C Frodingham  
21/06/1953 Reallocation 69064 34A Kings Cross 36C Frodingham  
21/06/1953 Reallocation 69065 34A Kings Cross 36C Frodingham  
10/05/1954 Condemned 69065 36C Frodingham   COND  
07/06/1954 Condemned 69060 36C Frodingham   COND  
09/08/1954 Condemned 69052 13D Northwich   COND  
24/01/1955 Condemned 69064 36C Frodingham   COND  
12/03/1955 Condemned 69050 WFD Woodford Halse   COND  
07/07/1955 Condemned 69069 WFD Woodford Halse   COND