Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 640 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3285 Week
» 5867 Month
» 270500 Year
» 1492065 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "L3" Class 2-6-4T


Old Number Company Old Num Type New Number Company Subtype New Num Type Date
273 GCR Pre Grouping 5273 LNER 1924 Big Four   16/02/1924
341 GCR Pre Grouping 5341 LNER 1924 Big Four   01/03/1924
336 GCR Pre Grouping 5336 LNER 1924 Big Four   23/08/1924
339 GCR Pre Grouping 5339 LNER 1924 Big Four   27/09/1924
368 GCR Pre Grouping 5368 LNER 1924 Big Four   27/09/1924
369 GCR Pre Grouping 5369 LNER 1924 Big Four   03/01/1925
272 GCR Pre Grouping 5272 LNER 1924 Big Four   17/01/1925
274 GCR Pre Grouping 5274 LNER 1924 Big Four   17/01/1925
343 GCR Pre Grouping 5343 LNER 1924 Big Four   07/02/1925
338 GCR Pre Grouping 5338 LNER 1924 Big Four   28/02/1925
275 GCR Pre Grouping 5275 LNER 1924 Big Four   07/03/1925
370 GCR Pre Grouping 5370 LNER 1924 Big Four   21/03/1925
342 GCR Pre Grouping 5342 LNER 1924 Big Four   28/03/1925
340 GCR Pre Grouping 5340 LNER 1924 Big Four   27/06/1925
344 GCR Pre Grouping 5344 LNER 1924 Big Four   11/07/1925
345 GCR Pre Grouping 5345 LNER 1924 Big Four   28/11/1925
366 GCR Pre Grouping 5366 LNER 1924 Big Four   03/04/1926
337 GCR Pre Grouping 5337 LNER 1924 Big Four   03/07/1926
367 GCR Pre Grouping 5367 LNER 1924 Big Four   09/10/1926
276 GCR Pre Grouping 5276 LNER 1924 Big Four   30/10/1926
5336 LNER Big Four 9055 LNER 1946 Big Four 03/02/1946
5337 LNER Big Four 9056 LNER 1946 Big Four 24/03/1946
5338 LNER Big Four 9057 LNER 1946 Big Four 24/03/1946
5341 LNER Big Four 9060 LNER 1946 Big Four   31/03/1946
5339 LNER Big Four 9058 LNER 1946 Big Four   05/05/1946
5340 LNER Big Four 9059 LNER 1946 Big Four   29/06/1946
5368 LNER Big Four 9067 LNER 1946 Big Four   21/07/1946
5344 LNER Big Four 9063 LNER 1946 Big Four   11/08/1946
5366 LNER Big Four 9065 LNER 1946 Big Four   11/08/1946
5367 LNER Big Four 9066 LNER 1946 Big Four   11/08/1946
5272 LNER Big Four 9050 LNER 1946 Big Four   18/08/1946
5275 LNER Big Four 9053 LNER 1946 Big Four   18/08/1946
5276 LNER Big Four 9054 LNER 1946 Big Four   25/08/1946
5369 LNER Big Four 9068 LNER 1946 Big Four   25/08/1946
5370 LNER Big Four 9069 LNER 1946 Big Four   25/08/1946
5345 LNER Big Four 9064 LNER 1946 Big Four   12/10/1946
5343 LNER Big Four 9062 LNER 1946 Big Four   13/10/1946
5274 LNER Big Four 9052 LNER 1946 Big Four   20/10/1946
5342 LNER Big Four 9061 LNER 1946 Big Four   09/11/1946
5273 LNER Big Four 9051 LNER 1946 Big Four   01/12/1946
9053 LNER Big Four E9053 BR BR Tmp British Rail   17/01/1948
9065 LNER Big Four E9065 BR BR Tmp British Rail   31/01/1948
9056 LNER Big Four E9056 BR BR Tmp British Rail   07/02/1948
9068 LNER Big Four E9068 BR BR Tmp British Rail   14/02/1948
9054 LNER Big Four 69054 BR   British Rail   10/04/1948
9060 LNER Big Four 69060 BR   British Rail   01/05/1948
9062 LNER Big Four 69062 BR   British Rail   19/06/1948
9052 LNER Big Four 69052 BR   British Rail   26/06/1948
9055 LNER Big Four 69055 BR   British Rail   25/09/1948
9051 LNER Big Four 69051 BR   British Rail   06/11/1948
9061 LNER Big Four 69061 BR   British Rail   06/11/1948
9069 LNER Big Four 69069 BR   British Rail   17/09/1949
9050 LNER Big Four 69050 BR   British Rail   01/04/1950
9064 LNER Big Four 69064 BR   British Rail   12/08/1950
E9065 BR British Rail 69065 BR   British Rail   12/08/1950