Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 398 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5367 Week
» 17880 Month
» 106072 Year
» 990453 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "N2" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9490     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9491     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9492     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9493     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9494     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9495     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9496     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9497     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9498     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9499     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9500     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9501     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9502     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9503     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9504     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9505     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9506     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9507     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9508     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9509     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9510     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9511     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9512     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9513     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9514     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9515     HITL Hitchin (GNR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9516     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9517     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9518     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9519     NEA Neasden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9520     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9521     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9522     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9523     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9524     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9525     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9526     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9527     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9528     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9529     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9530     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9531     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9532     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9533     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9534     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9535     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9536     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9537     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9538     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9539     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9540     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9541     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9542     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9543     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9544     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9545     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9546     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9547     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9548     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9549     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9550     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9551     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9552     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9553     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9554     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9555     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9556     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9557     HITL Hitchin (GNR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9558     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9559     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9560     CLK Colwick  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9561     NEA Neasden  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9562     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9563     KPS Kipps  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9564     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9565     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9566     HSY Hornsey  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9567     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9568     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9569     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9570     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9571     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9572     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9573     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9574     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9575     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9576     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9577     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9578     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9579     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9580     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9581     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9582     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9583     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9584     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9585     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9586     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9587     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9588     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9589     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9590     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9591     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9592     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9593     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9594     HAT Hatfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9595     PKD Parkhead  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 9596     KPS Kipps  
07/1949 Reallocation 69493 KX Kings Cross HAT Hatfield  
07/1949 Reallocation 69590 HAT Hatfield KX Kings Cross  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 69563 KPS Kipps 64A St Margarets  
25/11/1950 Reallocation 69563 64A St Margarets 65E Kipps  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69501 CLK Colwick 34C Hatfield  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69550 CLK Colwick 34C Hatfield  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69552 CLK Colwick 34C Hatfield  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69555 CLK Colwick 34C Hatfield  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 69560 CLK Colwick 34C Hatfield  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69494 KX Kings Cross 34A Kings Cross  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69516 HSY Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69522 HSY Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69560 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69561 NEA Neasden 30F Parkeston Quay  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69566 HSY Hornsey 30F Parkeston Quay  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 69567 KX Kings Cross 34A Kings Cross  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 69507 PKD Parkhead 65E Kipps  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 69508 KPS Kipps 65C Parkhead  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 69509 KPS Kipps 65C Parkhead  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 69510 PKD Parkhead 65E Kipps  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 69511 KPS Kipps 65C Parkhead  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 69553 KPS Kipps 65E Kipps  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 69507 65E Kipps 65C Parkhead  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 69510 65E Kipps 65C Parkhead  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 69553 65E Kipps 65C Parkhead  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 69509 65C Parkhead 65D Dawsholm  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 69511 65C Parkhead 65D Dawsholm  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 69553 65C Parkhead 65D Dawsholm  
21/06/1952 Reallocation 69516 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
21/06/1952 Reallocation 69552 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 69502 HAT Hatfield 30A Stratford  
19/07/1952 Reallocation 69590 KX Kings Cross 30A Stratford  
23/08/1952 Reallocation 69502 30A Stratford 30F Parkeston Quay  
23/08/1952 Reallocation 69551 HAT Hatfield 30F Parkeston Quay  
23/08/1952 Reallocation 69552 34A Kings Cross 30F Parkeston Quay  
23/08/1952 Reallocation 69590 30A Stratford 34A Kings Cross  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 69550 34C Hatfield 30A Stratford  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 69555 34C Hatfield 30A Stratford  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 69558 HAT Hatfield 30A Stratford  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 69550 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 69555 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 69558 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
15/11/1952 Reallocation 69522 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
15/11/1952 Reallocation 69560 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
15/11/1952 Reallocation 69590 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 69563 65E Kipps 65C Parkhead  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 69550 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 69567 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 69590 34B Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 69516 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 69586 HAT Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
20/06/1953 Reallocation 69588 HAT Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
25/07/1953 Reallocation 69504 KX Kings Cross 34A Kings Cross  
25/07/1953 Reallocation 69588 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
22/08/1953 Reallocation 69554 HAT Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 69501 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 69504 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 69586 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
24/10/1953 Reallocation 69587 HAT Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
21/11/1953 Reallocation 69516 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
21/11/1953 Reallocation 69580 HAT Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 69534 HAT Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 69537 HAT Hatfield 34B Hornsey  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 69554 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 69580 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
23/01/1954 Reallocation 69587 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 69501 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 69534 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
20/02/1954 Reallocation 69588 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
20/03/1954 Reallocation 69504 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69504 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 69594 HAT Hatfield 34B Hornsey  
22/05/1954 Reallocation 69504 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
12/06/1954 Reallocation 69503 KPS Kipps 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 69516 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 69580 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
24/07/1954 Reallocation 69588 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
21/08/1954 Reallocation 69504 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 69516 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 69580 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
22/09/1955 Condemned 69514 PKD Parkhead   COND  
12/11/1955 Reallocation 69547 HSY Hornsey 34C Hatfield  
12/11/1955 Reallocation 69554 34C Hatfield 34B Hornsey  
17/12/1955 Reallocation 69555 30E Colchester 34B Hornsey  
01/1956 Condemned 69562 PKD Parkhead   COND  
21/01/1956 Reallocation 69555 34B Hornsey 30E Colchester  
25/08/1956 Reallocation 69558 30E Colchester 34A Kings Cross  
25/08/1956 Reallocation 69559 HAT Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 69550 30A Stratford 34A Kings Cross  
20/10/1956 Reallocation 69555 30E Colchester 34A Kings Cross  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69502 30F Parkeston Quay 34A Kings Cross  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69551 30F Parkeston Quay 34A Kings Cross  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69552 30F Parkeston Quay 34A Kings Cross  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69561 30F Parkeston Quay 34A Kings Cross  
17/11/1956 Reallocation 69566 30F Parkeston Quay 34A Kings Cross  
01/1957 Condemned 69503 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill   COND  
16/02/1957 Reallocation 69510 65C Parkhead 64G Hawick  
20/04/1957 Reallocation 69555 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
18/05/1957 Reallocation 69502 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
06/1957 Condemned 69557 HITL Hitchin (GNR)   COND  
06/1957 Condemned 69558 34A Kings Cross   COND  
06/1957 Condemned 69566 34A Kings Cross   COND  
06/1957 Condemned 69590 34A Kings Cross   COND  
07/1957 Condemned 69559 34A Kings Cross   COND  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 69550 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 69551 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 69552 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
20/07/1957 Reallocation 69561 34A Kings Cross 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
08/1957 Condemned 69500 PKD Parkhead   COND  
31/08/1957 Reallocation 69509 65D Dawsholm 65C Parkhead  
31/08/1957 Reallocation 69564 PKD Parkhead 68E Carlisle Canal  
10/1957 Condemned 69519 NEA Neasden   COND  
10/1957 Condemned 69595 PKD Parkhead   COND  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69496 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69525 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69541 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69548 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69568 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
19/10/1957 Reallocation 69572 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
11/1957 Condemned 69501 34B Hornsey   COND  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 69496 34B Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 69541 34B Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 69548 34B Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
14/12/1957 Reallocation 69568 34B Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
01/1958 Condemned 69494 34A Kings Cross   COND  
03/1958 Condemned 69497 KX Kings Cross   COND  
04/1958 Condemned 69496 34A Kings Cross   COND  
04/1958 Condemned 69565 PKD Parkhead   COND  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 69516 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
12/04/1958 Reallocation 69580 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
05/1958 Condemned 69502 34B Hornsey   COND  
06/1958 Condemned 69527 KX Kings Cross   COND  
06/1958 Condemned 69554 34B Hornsey   COND  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 69504 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 69516 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
14/06/1958 Reallocation 69534 34C Hatfield 34B Hornsey  
16/08/1958 Reallocation 69525 34B Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
16/08/1958 Reallocation 69561 34D Hitchin (GNR) 34B Hornsey  
09/1958 Condemned 69495 KX Kings Cross   COND  
09/1958 Condemned 69499 KX Kings Cross   COND  
09/1958 Condemned 69550 34B Hornsey   COND  
11/1958 Condemned 69573 KX Kings Cross   COND  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 69516 34B Hornsey 34F Grantham  
22/11/1958 Reallocation 69552 34B Hornsey 34F Grantham  
12/1958 Condemned 69493 HAT Hatfield   COND  
12/1958 Condemned 69544 KX Kings Cross   COND  
12/1958 Condemned 69551 34B Hornsey   COND  
13/12/1958 Reallocation 69548 34A Kings Cross 31E Bury St Edmunds  
01/1959 Condemned 69491 KX Kings Cross   COND  
02/1959 Condemned 69534 34B Hornsey   COND  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 69531 HSY Hornsey 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 69536 KX Kings Cross 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 69540 KX Kings Cross 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 69548 31E Bury St Edmunds 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 69577 KX Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
07/02/1959 Reallocation 69591 KX Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
03/1959 Condemned 69525 34A Kings Cross   COND  
03/1959 Condemned 69569 KX Kings Cross   COND  
04/1959 Condemned 69537 34B Hornsey   COND  
04/1959 Condemned 69542 KX Kings Cross   COND  
04/1959 Condemned 69555 34B Hornsey   COND  
04/1959 Condemned 69567 34B Hornsey   COND  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 69531 34D Hitchin (GNR) 34C Hatfield  
11/04/1959 Reallocation 69571 KX Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
05/1959 Condemned 69577 34C Hatfield   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 69532 KX Kings Cross   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 69536 34D Hitchin (GNR)   COND  
06/1959 Condemned 69547 34C Hatfield   COND  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 69505 HSY Hornsey 34F Grantham  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 69513 HSY Hornsey 34E New England  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 69540 34D Hitchin (GNR) 34E New England  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 69560 34B Hornsey 34F Grantham  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 69561 34B Hornsey 34F Grantham  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 69571 34C Hatfield 34E New England  
20/06/1959 Reallocation 69582 HAT Hatfield 34E New England  
07/1959 Condemned 69490 KX Kings Cross   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 69515 HITL Hitchin (GNR)   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 69539 KX Kings Cross   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 69545 KX Kings Cross   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 69548 34D Hitchin (GNR)   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 69576 KX Kings Cross   COND  
07/1959 Condemned 69584 KX Kings Cross   COND  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 69522 34B Hornsey 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
18/07/1959 Reallocation 69594 34B Hornsey 34D Hitchin (GNR)  
08/1959 Condemned 69517 KX Kings Cross   COND  
08/1959 Condemned 69526 KX Kings Cross   COND  
08/1959 Condemned 69541 34A Kings Cross   COND  
08/1959 Condemned 69591 34C Hatfield   COND  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 69521 KX Kings Cross 34E New England  
01/08/1959 Reallocation 69580 34A Kings Cross 34C Hatfield  
11/1959 Condemned 69492 KX Kings Cross   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 69510 64G Hawick   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 69522 34D Hitchin (GNR)   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 69524 KX Kings Cross   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 69528 KX Kings Cross   COND  
11/1959 Condemned 69578 KX Kings Cross   COND  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 69504 34A Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 69520 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 69533 HSY Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
21/11/1959 Reallocation 69572 34B Hornsey 34A Kings Cross  
12/1959 Condemned 69508 65C Parkhead   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 69530 HSY Hornsey   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 69553 65D Dawsholm   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 69556 HSY Hornsey   COND  
12/1959 Condemned 69570 KX Kings Cross   COND  
01/1960 Condemned 69594 34D Hitchin (GNR)   COND  
02/01/1960 Reallocation 69530 98W   34A Kings Cross  
30/01/1960 Reallocation 69506 KX Kings Cross 34E New England  
02/1960 Condemned 69588 34C Hatfield   COND  
03/1960 Condemned 69589 KX Kings Cross   COND  
26/03/1960 Reallocation 69586 34C Hatfield 34A Kings Cross  
04/1960 Condemned 69507 65C Parkhead   COND  
04/1960 Condemned 69563 65C Parkhead   COND  
05/1960 Condemned 69552 34F Grantham   COND  
04/06/1960 Reallocation 69549 KX Kings Cross 34F Grantham  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 69531 34C Hatfield 34F Grantham  
18/06/1960 Reallocation 69580 34C Hatfield 34F Grantham  
07/1960 Condemned 69540 34E New England   COND  
07/1960 Condemned 69587 34B Hornsey   COND  
23/07/1960 Reallocation 69579 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
09/1960 Condemned 69582 34E New England   COND  
09/1960 Condemned 69596 KPS Kipps   COND  
10/1960 Condemned 69509 65C Parkhead   COND  
10/1960 Condemned 69560 34F Grantham   COND  
01/10/1960 Reallocation 69498 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
01/10/1960 Reallocation 69512 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
01/10/1960 Reallocation 69543 KX Kings Cross 34B Hornsey  
10/11/1960 Condemned 69505 34F Grantham   COND  
12/1960 Condemned 69511 65D Dawsholm   COND  
12/1960 Condemned 69581 KX Kings Cross   COND  
01/1961 Condemned 69516 34F Grantham   COND  
01/1961 Condemned 69518 KPS Kipps   COND  
02/1961 Condemned 69574 KX Kings Cross   COND  
18/02/1961 Reallocation 69583 KX Kings Cross 34F Grantham  
03/1961 Condemned 69572 34A Kings Cross   COND  
03/1961 Condemned 69586 34A Kings Cross   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 69506 34E New England   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 69513 34E New England   COND  
05/1961 Condemned 69561 34F Grantham   COND  
27/05/1961 Reallocation 69531 34F Grantham 34E New England  
27/05/1961 Reallocation 69549 34F Grantham 34E New England  
27/05/1961 Reallocation 69580 34F Grantham 34E New England  
27/05/1961 Reallocation 69583 34F Grantham 34E New England  
06/1961 Condemned 69521 34E New England   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 69564 68E Carlisle Canal   COND  
06/1961 Condemned 69571 34E New England   COND  
07/1961 Condemned 69531 34E New England   COND  
08/07/1961 Reallocation 69504 34B Hornsey 34E New England  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 69498 34B Hornsey 34E New England  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 69512 34B Hornsey 34E New England  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 69520 34B Hornsey 34E New England  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 69543 34B Hornsey 34E New England  
15/07/1961 Reallocation 69579 34B Hornsey 34E New England  
09/1961 Condemned 69498 34E New England   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 69533 34A Kings Cross   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 69543 34E New England   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 69549 34E New England   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 69580 34E New England   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 69585 KX Kings Cross   COND  
09/1961 Condemned 69592 KX Kings Cross   COND  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 69529 KX Kings Cross 34E New England  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 69546 KX Kings Cross 34E New England  
16/09/1961 Reallocation 69575 KX Kings Cross 34E New England  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 69523 KX Kings Cross 34E New England  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 69535 KX Kings Cross 34E New England  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 69538 KX Kings Cross 34E New England  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 69568 34A Kings Cross 34E New England  
26/05/1962 Reallocation 69593 KX Kings Cross 34E New England  
24/07/1962 Condemned 69512 34E New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69523 34E New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69535 34E New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69538 34E New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69568 34E New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69575 34E New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69579 34E New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69583 34E New England   COND  
16/09/1962 Condemned 69593 34E New England   COND  
23/09/1962 Condemned 69504 34E New England   COND  
23/09/1962 Condemned 69520 34E New England   COND  
23/09/1962 Condemned 69529 34E New England   COND  
23/09/1962 Condemned 69546 34E New England   COND