Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 647 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14053 Week
» 67069 Month
» 186596 Year
» 3213449 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NER/LNER Worsdell "N9" Class 0-6-2T
Class |
NER |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
N9 |
1640
|
9412
|
|
06/1893 |
08/1947 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
1923 |
N9 |
1641
|
9413
|
(69413)
|
06/1893 |
12/1950 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted |
12/1947 |
N9 |
1642
|
9414
|
(69414)
|
07/1893 |
07/1950 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted |
09/1942 |
N9 |
1643
|
9415
|
(69415)
|
08/1893 |
10/1949 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
12/1946 |
N9 |
1644
|
9416
|
|
08/1893 |
12/1947 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1930 |
N9 |
1645
|
(9417)
|
|
08/1893 |
06/1946 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1928 |
N9 |
1646
|
9418
|
69418
|
09/1893 |
01/01/1951 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
08/1944 |
N9 |
1648
|
9420
|
(69420)
|
10/1893 |
07/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted |
12/1946 |
N9 |
1651
|
9423
|
(69423)
|
12/1893 |
07/1951 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
03/1945 |
N9 |
1652
|
9424
|
69424
|
12/1893 |
27/06/1955 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted |
07/1947 |
N9 |
1653
|
9425
|
(69425)
|
12/1893 |
11/1950 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted |
07/1947 |
N9 |
1654
|
9426
|
69426
|
12/1893 |
23/02/1953 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted |
01/1949 |
N9 |
1655
|
9427
|
69427
|
12/1893 |
27/06/1955 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1930 |
N9 |
383
|
9428
|
(69428)
|
02/1894 |
08/1950 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted |
04/1947 |
N9 |
1705
|
9429
|
69429
|
02/1894 |
04/07/1955 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1930 |