NER/LNER Worsdell "N10" Class 0-6-2T
Class | NER | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N10 | 1321 | 9090 | 69090 | 10/1902 | GHD W |
Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/11/1956 |
19/11/1956 |
N10 | 1667 | 9091 | 69091 | 10/1902 | GHD W |
Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1956 |
26/11/1956 |
N10 | 1683 | 9092 | 69092 | 11/1902 | GHD BOR W |
Gateshead Borough Gardens Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 06/04/1959 |
06/04/1959 |
N10 | 1697 | 9093 | 69093 | 11/1902 | GHD HLD 54B W |
Gateshead Hull Dairycoates Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1949 23/07/1955 23/12/1957 |
23/12/1957 |
N10 | 1774 | 9094 | 69094 | 11/1902 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/07/1957 |
01/07/1957 |
N10 | 89 | 9095 | 69095 | 12/1902 | BLA 52A 52A W |
Blaydon Gateshead Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 25/10/1955 |
25/10/1955 |
N10 | 429 | 9096 | 69096 | 12/1902 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/12/1957 |
27/12/1957 |
N10 | 1109 | 9097 | 69097 | 12/1902 | GHD W |
Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1962 |
09/04/1962 |
N10 | 1112 | 9098 | 69098 | 10/1902 | HLD 50B W |
Hull Dairycoates Neville Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/01/1955 24/09/1957 |
24/09/1957 |
N10 | 1132 | 9099 | 69099 | 12/1902 | GHD HLD W |
Gateshead Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1949 10/02/1958 |
10/02/1958 |
N10 | 1138 | 9100 | 69100 | 10/1902 | GHD W |
Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/11/1957 |
25/11/1957 |
N10 | 1148 | 9101 | 69101 | 12/1902 | NLN 54A 54A 54B 52A W |
Northallerton Sunderland Sunderland Tyne Dock Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1951 17/02/1951 19/07/1958 02/05/1959 09/04/1962 |
09/04/1962 |
N10 | 1317 | 9102 | 69102 | 12/1902 | GHD HLD 54B 52A W |
Gateshead Hull Dairycoates Tyne Dock Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1949 23/07/1955 14/12/1957 09/02/1959 |
09/02/1959 |
N10 | 1706 | 9103 | 69103 | 12/1902 | GHD W |
Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1948 |
11/1948 |
N10 | 1710 | 9104 | 69104 | 12/1902 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/03/1958 |
17/03/1958 |
N10 | 1699 | 9105 | 69105 | 03/1903 | GHD HLD GHD HLD 54B 54B 52A W |
Gateshead Hull Dairycoates Gateshead Hull Dairycoates Tyne Dock Tyne Dock Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/09/1948 12/02/1949 24/09/1949 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 02/05/1959 16/06/1961 |
16/06/1961 |
N10 | 1707 | 9106 | 69106 | 03/1903 | GHD HLD 54B W |
Gateshead Hull Dairycoates Tyne Dock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/09/1948 23/07/1955 17/03/1958 |
17/03/1958 |
N10 | 1711 | 9107 | 69107 | 03/1903 | GHD HLD W |
Gateshead Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1949 27/12/1957 |
27/12/1957 |
N10 | 1785 | 9108 | 69108 | 04/1903 | HLD W |
Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/07/1957 |
30/07/1957 |
N10 | 1716 | 9109 | 69109 | 04/1903 | GHD W |
Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1962 |
09/04/1962 |