NBR/LNER Reid "N15" Class 0-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/1935 | Reallocation | 9029 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9126 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9127 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9128 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9129 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9130 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9131 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9132 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9133 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9134 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9135 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9136 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9137 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9138 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9139 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9140 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9141 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9142 | BGT | Bathgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9143 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9144 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9145 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9146 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9147 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9148 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9149 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9150 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9151 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9152 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9153 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9154 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9155 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9156 | BGT | Bathgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9157 | BGT | Bathgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9158 | BGT | Bathgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9159 | BGT | Bathgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9160 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9161 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9162 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9163 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9185 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9164 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9165 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9166 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9167 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9168 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9169 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9170 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9171 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9172 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9173 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9174 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9175 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9176 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9177 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9179 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9180 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9181 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9182 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9183 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9184 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9186 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9187 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9188 | EFD | Eastfield | EFD | Eastfield | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9189 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9190 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9191 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9192 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9193 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9194 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9195 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9196 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9197 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9198 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9199 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9200 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9201 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9202 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9203 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9204 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9205 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9178 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9206 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9207 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9208 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9209 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9210 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9211 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9212 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9213 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9214 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9215 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9216 | BGT | Bathgate | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9217 | PKD | Parkhead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9218 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9219 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9220 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9221 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9222 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9223 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9224 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 69141 | KPS | Kipps | STM | St Margarets | |
01/10/1949 | Reallocation | 69157 | BGT | Bathgate | PKD | Parkhead | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 69201 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69163 | EFD | Eastfield | 65D | Dawsholm | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69165 | EFD | Eastfield | 65C | Parkhead | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69166 | EFD | Eastfield | 65C | Parkhead | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69176 | EFD | Eastfield | 65D | Dawsholm | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69177 | EFD | Eastfield | 65D | Dawsholm | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69184 | EFD | Eastfield | 65D | Dawsholm | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69203 | EFD | Eastfield | 65D | Dawsholm | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69205 | EFD | Eastfield | 65D | Dawsholm | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69208 | EFD | Eastfield | 65D | Dawsholm | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69163 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65D | Dawsholm | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69165 | 65C | Parkhead | 65C | Parkhead | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69166 | 65C | Parkhead | 65C | Parkhead | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69176 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65D | Dawsholm | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69177 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65D | Dawsholm | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69184 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65D | Dawsholm | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69203 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65D | Dawsholm | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69205 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65D | Dawsholm | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 69208 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65D | Dawsholm | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69185 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | 65A | Eastfield | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69197 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | 65A | Eastfield | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 69218 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69185 | 65A | Eastfield | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69197 | 65A | Eastfield | 65A | Eastfield | |
09/09/1951 | Reallocation | 69218 | 65A | Eastfield | 65A | Eastfield | |
29/12/1951 | Reallocation | 69185 | 65A | Eastfield | 64A | St Margarets | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 69143 | PKD | Parkhead | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 69171 | PKD | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 69214 | PKD | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 69171 | 65A | Eastfield | 65A | Eastfield | |
19/04/1952 | Reallocation | 69214 | 65A | Eastfield | 65A | Eastfield | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 69222 | EFD | Eastfield | 64A | St Margarets | |
12/06/1954 | Reallocation | 69163 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65A | Eastfield | |
14/05/1955 | Reallocation | 69173 | STM | St Margarets | 64B | Haymarket | |
06/08/1955 | Reallocation | 69172 | STM | St Margarets | 64A | St Margarets | |
06/08/1955 | Reallocation | 69173 | 64B | Haymarket | 64A | St Margarets | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 69138 | EFD | Eastfield | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 69163 | 65A | Eastfield | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 69189 | EFD | Eastfield | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 69212 | PKD | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
06/07/1957 | Reallocation | 69217 | PKD | Parkhead | 65D | Dawsholm | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69126 | EFD | Eastfield | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69127 | EFD | Eastfield | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69135 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69136 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69150 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69154 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69163 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 65A | Eastfield | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69180 | EFD | Eastfield | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69189 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69204 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
31/08/1957 | Reallocation | 69224 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
28/09/1957 | Reallocation | 69138 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
29/10/1957 | Condemned | 69210 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
20/12/1957 | Condemned | 69167 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
21/12/1957 | Reallocation | 69201 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 61C | Keith | |
27/12/1957 | Condemned | 69130 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
10/01/1958 | Condemned | 69201 | 61C | Keith | COND | ||
18/01/1958 | Reallocation | 69126 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 65D | Dawsholm | |
24/01/1958 | Condemned | 69142 | BGT | Bathgate | COND | ||
14/03/1958 | Condemned | 69195 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
09/04/1958 | Condemned | 69157 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
12/04/1958 | Reallocation | 69160 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 65A | Eastfield | |
12/04/1958 | Reallocation | 69224 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 61C | Keith | |
18/04/1958 | Condemned | 69189 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
26/04/1958 | Condemned | 69139 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | COND | ||
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69127 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 69150 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
18/05/1958 | Condemned | 69158 | BGT | Bathgate | COND | ||
06/06/1958 | Condemned | 69147 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
06/06/1958 | Condemned | 69148 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
13/06/1958 | Condemned | 69140 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
13/06/1958 | Condemned | 69200 | POL | Polmont | COND | ||
26/06/1958 | Condemned | 69203 | 65D | Dawsholm | COND | ||
05/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69135 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
05/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69154 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
05/07/1958 | Reallocation | 69180 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | 65A | Eastfield | |
02/08/1958 | Reallocation | 69164 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
07/08/1958 | Condemned | 69193 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
14/08/1958 | Condemned | 69160 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
22/09/1958 | Condemned | 69153 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
07/10/1958 | Condemned | 69175 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
13/11/1958 | Condemned | 69172 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
15/11/1958 | Condemned | 69174 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | COND | ||
18/11/1958 | Condemned | 69220 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
02/12/1958 | Condemned | 69129 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
30/12/1958 | Condemned | 69152 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
09/02/1959 | Condemned | 69169 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
23/02/1959 | Condemned | 69151 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
02/03/1959 | Condemned | 69162 | POL | Polmont | COND | ||
02/03/1959 | Condemned | 69192 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
14/03/1959 | Reallocation | 69211 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 64B | Haymarket | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 69180 | 65A | Eastfield | 61A | Kittybrewster | |
11/04/1959 | Reallocation | 69224 | 61C | Keith | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
15/04/1959 | Condemned | 69164 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
07/05/1959 | Condemned | 69214 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
22/05/1959 | Condemned | 69222 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
16/06/1959 | Condemned | 69127 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | COND | ||
07/07/1959 | Condemned | 69146 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
27/07/1959 | Condemned | 69185 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
31/07/1959 | Condemned | 69186 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
12/08/1959 | Condemned | 69176 | 65D | Dawsholm | COND | ||
02/09/1959 | Condemned | 69182 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
16/10/1959 | Condemned | 69217 | 65D | Dawsholm | COND | ||
19/10/1959 | Condemned | 69213 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
18/11/1959 | Condemned | 69154 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
25/11/1959 | Condemned | 69208 | 65D | Dawsholm | COND | ||
28/11/1959 | Condemned | 69215 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | COND | ||
07/12/1959 | Condemned | 69166 | 65C | Parkhead | COND | ||
08/12/1959 | Condemned | 69187 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
18/12/1959 | Condemned | 69197 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69132 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 66B | Motherwell | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69136 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69143 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 66B | Motherwell | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69145 | PKD | Parkhead | 66A | Polmadie | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69196 | KPS | Kipps | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69204 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62A | Thornton Junction | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69207 | KPS | Kipps | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69207 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66A | Polmadie | |
19/12/1959 | Reallocation | 69223 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 66B | Motherwell | |
06/01/1960 | Condemned | 69170 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
05/02/1960 | Condemned | 69168 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
17/02/1960 | Condemned | 69207 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
18/02/1960 | Condemned | 69205 | 65D | Dawsholm | COND | ||
25/02/1960 | Condemned | 69144 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
11/03/1960 | Condemned | 69145 | 66A | Polmadie | COND | ||
22/03/1960 | Condemned | 69149 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
17/05/1960 | Condemned | 69202 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
17/05/1960 | Condemned | 69206 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
19/05/1960 | Condemned | 69165 | 65C | Parkhead | COND | ||
06/06/1960 | Condemned | 69198 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
16/06/1960 | Condemned | 69171 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
03/08/1960 | Condemned | 69133 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
09/08/1960 | Condemned | 69177 | 65D | Dawsholm | COND | ||
13/08/1960 | Condemned | 69223 | 66B | Motherwell | COND | ||
16/08/1960 | Condemned | 69161 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
16/08/1960 | Condemned | 69190 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
02/09/1960 | Condemned | 69141 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
16/09/1960 | Condemned | 69143 | 66B | Motherwell | COND | ||
29/09/1960 | Condemned | 69179 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
22/10/1960 | Condemned | 69194 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
22/10/1960 | Condemned | 69209 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
18/11/1960 | Condemned | 69132 | 66B | Motherwell | COND | ||
23/11/1960 | Condemned | 69184 | 65D | Dawsholm | COND | ||
12/01/1961 | Condemned | 69173 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
02/03/1961 | Condemned | 69134 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
20/03/1961 | Condemned | 69180 | 61A | Kittybrewster | COND | ||
11/05/1961 | Condemned | 69136 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
18/05/1961 | Condemned | 69199 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 69128 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64A | St Margarets | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 69138 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64A | St Margarets | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 69178 | EFD | Eastfield | 66A | Polmadie | |
01/07/1961 | Reallocation | 69224 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64A | St Margarets | |
19/07/1961 | Condemned | 69221 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | COND | ||
26/08/1961 | Reallocation | 69178 | 66A | Polmadie | 66C | Hamilton (West) | |
26/08/1961 | Reallocation | 69218 | 65A | Eastfield | 65D | Dawsholm | |
30/10/1961 | Condemned | 69159 | BGT | Bathgate | COND | ||
13/11/1961 | Condemned | 69183 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
18/11/1961 | Reallocation | 69218 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65A | Eastfield | |
05/12/1961 | Condemned | 69219 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 69126 | 65D | Dawsholm | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 69131 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 69156 | BGT | Bathgate | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 69163 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 69181 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 69216 | BGT | Bathgate | COND | ||
21/05/1962 | Condemned | 69137 | POL | Polmont | COND | ||
16/07/1962 | Condemned | 69204 | 62A | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
08/09/1962 | Condemned | 69155 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69128 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69135 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69138 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69150 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69188 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69191 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69196 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69211 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69212 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69218 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 69224 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 69178 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | 66B | Motherwell | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 69178 | 66B | Motherwell | COND |