O1 |
333
|
|
5333
|
3506
|
3594
|
|
63594
|
|
11/1911 |
21/04/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
24/10/1936 |
O1 |
408
|
|
5408
|
3529
|
3678
|
|
63678
|
|
05/1912 |
18/07/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
24/06/1936 |
O1 |
1195
|
|
6195
|
3542
|
3711
|
|
63711
|
|
09/1912 |
17/11/1962 |
Ross Pop |
24/03/1923 |
O1 |
1216
|
|
6216
|
3563
|
3789
|
|
63789
|
|
09/1912 |
17/11/1962 |
Drop Grate fitted |
04/1946 |
O1 |
1224
|
|
6224
|
3571
|
|
|
63571
|
|
10/1912 |
13/12/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
12/03/1938 |
O1 |
1231
|
|
6231
|
3578
|
|
|
63578
|
|
11/1912 |
17/11/1962 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
28/01/1950 |
O1 |
1242
|
|
6242
|
3589
|
|
|
63589
|
|
12/1912 |
11/07/1965 |
Ross Pop |
11/02/1922 |
O1 |
1244
|
|
6244
|
3591
|
|
|
63591
|
|
12/1912 |
17/11/1962 |
Ross Pop |
17/06/1922 |
O1 |
1249
|
|
6249
|
3596
|
|
|
63596
|
|
12/1912 |
29/08/1963 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
18/01/1936 |
O1 |
385
|
|
5385
|
3610
|
|
|
63610
|
|
12/1913 |
24/11/1962 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
16/04/1949 |
O1 |
394
|
|
5394
|
3619
|
|
|
63619
|
|
04/1914 |
21/10/1963 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
20/08/1949 |
O1 |
|
2963
|
6571
|
3746
|
|
1821
|
63746
|
3746
|
10/1917 |
27/02/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
28/07/1934 |
O1 |
|
|
6575
|
3752
|
|
1834
|
63752
|
3752
|
12/1917 |
17/11/1962 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O1 |
|
2966
|
6578
|
3755
|
|
1840
|
63755
|
|
12/1917 |
26/11/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
05/07/1952 |
O1 |
|
2903
|
6356
|
3670
|
|
1651
|
63670
|
|
09/1917 |
04/06/1964 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
14/03/1936 |
O1 |
|
|
6324
|
3687
|
|
1669
|
63687
|
|
02/1918 |
16/10/1963 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
03/06/1961 |
O1 |
|
|
6555
|
3630
|
|
1712
|
63630
|
|
02/1918 |
11/07/1965 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
27/08/1949 |
O1 |
|
2870
|
6374
|
3646
|
|
1605
|
63646
|
3646
|
02/1918 |
11/07/1965 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O1 |
|
|
6545
|
3650
|
|
1609
|
63650
|
|
03/1918 |
27/06/1965 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
03/09/1949 |
O1 |
|
2901
|
6371
|
3652
|
|
1611
|
63652
|
|
03/1918 |
11/11/1963 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O1 |
|
|
6359
|
3663
|
|
1625
|
63663
|
|
08/1918 |
01/11/1964 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
06/08/1949 |
O1 |
|
2933
|
6579
|
3760
|
|
1849
|
63760
|
|
02/1918 |
26/11/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
26/07/1952 |
O1 |
|
|
6513
|
3768
|
|
1861
|
63768
|
|
03/1918 |
11/07/1965 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O1 |
|
|
6505
|
3780
|
|
1876
|
63780
|
|
05/1918 |
07/07/1963 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
14/10/1961 |
O1 |
|
2894
|
6515
|
3786
|
|
1884
|
63786
|
|
06/1918 |
27/09/1964 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
12/02/1949 |
O1 |
1283
|
|
6283
|
3792
|
|
1895
|
63792
|
|
02/1918 |
27/10/1962 |
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles |
18/08/1934 |
O1 |
|
|
6596
|
3796
|
|
1902
|
63796
|
|
03/1918 |
27/10/1962 |
Wakefield 2C Lubricator added to axles |
14/07/1934 |
O1 |
|
2884
|
6601
|
3806
|
|
1915
|
63806
|
|
05/1918 |
24/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
13/08/1938 |
O1 |
|
2892
|
6519
|
3808
|
|
1917
|
63808
|
|
05/1918 |
17/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
23/05/1936 |
O1 |
|
|
6263
|
3817
|
|
1933
|
63817
|
|
07/1918 |
17/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
04/07/1936 |
O1 |
1334
|
2917
|
6334
|
3712
|
|
1692
|
63712
|
|
01/1919 |
26/11/1962 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
08/09/1962 |
O1 |
|
|
6261
|
3838
|
|
1981
|
63838
|
|
11/1918 |
27/10/1962 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
31/01/1962 |
O1 |
|
2835
|
6617
|
3856
|
|
2062
|
63856
|
3856
|
06/1919 |
26/11/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
17/05/1952 |
O1 |
|
|
6533
|
3863
|
|
2074
|
63863
|
|
08/1919 |
20/06/1965 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
27/06/1936 |
O1 |
|
|
6535
|
3865
|
|
2076
|
63865
|
3865
|
08/1919 |
17/11/1962 |
Drop Grate fitted |
1946 |
O1 |
|
|
6624
|
3867
|
|
2079
|
63867
|
|
08/1919 |
17/11/1962 |
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
22/02/1936 |
O1 |
|
|
6625
|
3868
|
|
2081
|
63868
|
|
08/1919 |
11/07/1965 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
14/10/1961 |
O1 |
|
|
6626
|
3869
|
|
2082
|
63869
|
|
08/1919 |
17/11/1962 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
31/10/1936 |
O1 |
|
2845
|
6525
|
3872
|
|
2094
|
63872
|
|
05/1919 |
30/01/1964 |
Drop Grate fitted |
08/1946 |
O1 |
|
|
6630
|
3874
|
|
2096
|
63874
|
|
06/1919 |
26/11/1962 |
Westinghouse Brake fitted |
18/10/1952 |
O1 |
|
|
6635
|
3886
|
|
2133
|
63886
|
|
09/1919 |
27/10/1962 |
Intensifore lubricator removed |
21/03/1936 |
O1 |
|
|
6636
|
3887
|
|
2134
|
63887
|
|
09/1919 |
02/03/1963 |
Drop Grate fitted |
04/1946 |
O1 |
|
2846
|
6639
|
3890
|
|
2144
|
63890
|
|
05/1919 |
17/03/1963 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
03/02/1962 |
O1 |
|
|
6642
|
3901
|
|
2165
|
63901
|
|
12/1919 |
17/11/1962 |
Drop Grate fitted |
02/1946 |
O1 |
|
2832
|
6328
|
3725
|
|
1641
|
63725
|
|
08/1919 |
11/07/1965 |
Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted |
20/08/1949 |